Hendricks et al v. American Medical Systems Inc
Plaintiff: Angela Hendricks and Michael Hendricks
Defendant: American Medical Systems Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv05032
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Washington State Governor Inslee's Stay Home - Stay Healthy Order dated March 23, 2020, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for March 25, 2020, is continued to May 5, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel should call at least five minutes before the scheduled time using the following: Telephone number: 1-888-636-3807 / Access Code: 8839796. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) (AY, Case Administrator)
March 18, 2020 Filing 52 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Medical Systems Inc. (Krashan, Allison)
March 18, 2020 Filing 51 STATUS REPORT JOINT by American Medical Systems Inc. (Talcott, Anne)
March 18, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Kathleen Krashan on behalf of American Medical Systems Inc (Attorney Allison Kathleen Krashan added to party American Medical Systems Inc(pty:dft))(Krashan, Allison)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TEXT ORDER: Defendant's Motions For Admission Pro Hac Vice, ECF Nos. #45 , #46 , #47 , #48 , are GRANTED. Barbara R. Binis, Ryan K. Blake, Whitney L. Mayer, and Stephen J. McConnell are hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Defendant's local counsel of record, Anne M. Talcott, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (AY, Case Administrator)
March 13, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Stephen J. McConnell. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3421737. by American Medical Systems Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Talcott, Anne)
March 13, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Whitney L. Mayer. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3421735. by American Medical Systems Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Talcott, Anne)
March 13, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Ryan K. Blake. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3421732. by American Medical Systems Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Talcott, Anne)
March 13, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Barbara R. Binis. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3421727. by American Medical Systems Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Talcott, Anne)
March 13, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne M Talcott on behalf of American Medical Systems Inc (Attorney Anne M Talcott added to party American Medical Systems Inc(pty:dft))(Talcott, Anne)
February 28, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2020 at 02:00 PM via Teleconference. PHONE NUMBER: 1-888-636-3807, ACCESS CODE: 8839796, SECURITY CODE: None required. (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (AY, Case Administrator)
February 21, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Jason Murphy on behalf of Plaintiffs Angela Hendricks, Michael Hendricks Karolina Kulesza withdrawn from case. (Murphy, Jason) Modified on 2/26/2020 to clarify attorney withdrawing from matter. Notice filed on behalf of Karolina Kulesza. (AY, Case Administrator).
February 21, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Jason Murphy on behalf of Plaintiffs Angela Hendricks, Michael Hendricks Britt Birkenbuel withdrawn from case. (Murphy, Jason) Modified on 2/26/2020 to clarify attorney withdrawing from matter. Notice filed on behalf of Britt Birkenbuel. (AY, Case Administrator).
February 20, 2020 Filing 40 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:16-cv-01944. Docket sheet received.
February 19, 2020 Filing 39 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02325 - American Medical Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 ECF 204 - PTO 12, #2 ECF 231 - PTO 13, #3 ECF 241 - Notice Pltfs Request for Production, #4 ECF 244 - PTO 14, #5 ECF 245 - Master Long Form Complaint & Jury Demand, #6 ECF 246 Master Short Form Complaint, #7 ECF 247 - AMS Answer, #8 ECF 261 - PTO 15, #9 ECF 288 - PTO 17, #10 ECF 302 - PTO 19, #11 ECF 326 - PTO 24, #12 ECF 423 - PTO 40, #13 ECF 469 - PTO 41, #14 ECF 500 - PTO 47, #15 ECF 554 - PTO 54, #16 ECF 662 - PTO 63, #17 ECF 715 - PTO 70, #18 ECF 748 - PTO 73, #19 ECF 749 - PTO 74, #20 ECF 1086 - PTO 116, #21 ECF 1129 - PTO 118, #22 ECF 1209 - PTO 158, #23 ECF 1234 - PTO 171, #24 ECF 1981 PTO - 202, #25 ECF 3216 -PTO 223, #26 ECF 3263 - Motion & Memorandum by Pltfs to Compel Production, #27 ECF 3263 - Motion & Memorandum by Pltfs to Compel Production, #28 ECF 3263 - Motion & Memorandum by Pltfs to Compel Production, #29 ECF 3263 - Motion & Memorandum by Pltfs to Compel Production, #30 ECF 3263 - Motion & Memorandum by Pltfs to Compel Production, #31 ECF 3263 - Motion & Memorandum by Pltfs to Compel Production, #32 ECF 3274 - Certification of Compiance with PTO 223, #33 ECF 3320 - Partial Opposition by AMS to 3263 Motion, #34 ECF 3370 - Pltfs Reply re 3320 Opposition, #35 ECF 3532 - Motion by All Pltfs for Protective Order, #36 ECF 3534 - Suggestion by All Pltfs in support of 3532, #37 ECF 3563 - Opposition by AMS to 3532 Motion, #38 ECF 3592 - Order Granting 3532 Motion Protective Order, #39 ECF 4220 - PTO 238, #40 ECF 6787 Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Galoway, #41 ECF 6787 Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Galoway, #42 ECF 6787 Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Galoway, #43 ECF 7137 - PTO 274, #44 ECF 7410 - Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Mays, #45 ECF 7441 - Notice of Joint Venue Recommendations, #46 ECF 7463 - AMS Motion to Exclude Galloway, #47 ECF 7464 - AMS Memo ISO Motion to Exclude Galloway, #48 ECF 7469 - AMS Motion to Exclude Guelcher, #49 ECF 7470 - AMS Brief ISO Motion to Exclude Guelcher, #50 ECF 7475 - AMS Motion to Exclude Rosenzweig, #51 ECF 7477 - AMS Motion to Exclude Mays, #52 ECF 7478 - AMS Brief ISO Motion to Exclude Rosenzweig, #53 ECF 7480 - AMS Brief ISO Motion to Exclude Mays, #54 ECF 7481 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion (Badylak, Becker, Coad and Kozak), #55 ECF 7493 -Pltfs Notice of Adoption of Prior Response Galloway, #56 ECF 7496 - AMS Response in Opposition to Daubert Motion (Badylak, Becker, Coad and Kozak), #57 ECF 7496 - AMS Response in Opposition to Daubert Motion (Badylak, Becker, Coad and Kozak), #58 ECF 7496 - AMS Response in Opposition to Daubert Motion (Badylak, Becker, Coad and Kozak), #59 ECF 7496 - AMS Response in Opposition to Daubert Motion (Badylak, Becker, Coad and Kozak), #60 ECF 7500 - Pltf Notice of Adoption of Prior Response Guelcher, #61 ECF 7501 - Notice Of Adoption Of Pltfs Prior Memoranda Of Law And Sur-reply ISO Opposition to Motion to Exlcude Rosenzweig, #62 ECF 7505 - Defendant Reply ISO Motion to Exclude Guelcher, #63 ECF 7506 - Reply Brief re AMS Motion to Exclude Galloway, #64 ECF 7512 - Reply of AMS re Motion to Exclude Rosenzweig, #65 ECF 7552 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Response in OppositionMotion to Exclude Guelcher, #66 ECF 7552 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Response in OppositionMotion to Exclude Guelcher, #67 ECF 7552 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Response in OppositionMotion to Exclude Guelcher, #68 ECF 7552 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Response in OppositionMotion to Exclude Guelcher, #69 ECF 7552 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Response in OppositionMotion to Exclude Guelcher, #70 ECF 7552 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Response in OppositionMotion to Exclude Guelcher, #71 ECF 7553 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Response in OppositionMotion to Exclude Mays, #72 ECF 7553 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Response in OppositionMotion to Exclude Mays)(Birkenbuel, Britt) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jason Murphy on behalf of Angela Hendricks, Michael Hendricks. (Murphy, Jason) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 2/20/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 2/19/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 02/06/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY by American Medical Systems, Inc. to #35 Response In Opposition. (Binis, Barbara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE by Angela Hendricks, Michael Hendricks in opposition to #32 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Exclude The Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Ralph Zipper, M.D., Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Birkenbuel, Britt) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE by Angela Hendricks, Michael Hendricks in opposition to #30 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Birkenbuel, Britt) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by American Medical Systems, Inc. in support of #32 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Exclude The Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Ralph Zipper, M.D., Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703. (Weil, Rachel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Exclude The Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Ralph Zipper, M.D., Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A-K)(Weil, Rachel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by American Medical Systems, Inc. in support of #30 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment (Weil, Rachel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibits A-C)(Weil, Rachel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Michael Hendricks on July 30, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. PT (Binis, Barbara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS by Angela Hendricks, Michael Hendricks in opposition to #18 Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Dr. Ralph Zipper, M.D. (Birkenbuel, Britt) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Dr. Larry D. Smith on July 23, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (Binis, Barbara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #19 Emergency Motion by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiffs' Expert Ralph Zipper, M.D.; AMS shall be permitted to schedule and take the depositions of Dr. Zipper without prepayment; after conclusion of the deposition, and upon receipt of Dr. Zipper's invoice, AMS shall have thirty days to pay the fee; the fee shall be calculated using an hourly rate of $900 and may include a fee for reasonable preparation and for the time spent in the depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/17/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 25 TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/14/2019 re: #19 EMERGENCY MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiffs' Expert Ralph Zipper, M.D.; Court Reporter: Kim Kaufman. (hkl) (Modified on 6/14/2019 to replace image to add attorney information) (rea). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #25 Telephonic Motion Hearing held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/14/2019 re: #19 EMERGENCY MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiffs' Expert Ralph Zipper, M.D. ERROR: Incorrect image attached. CORRECTION: Image corrected and replaced. (rea) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by American Medical Systems, Inc. to #23 Response to Court Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Weil, Rachel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE by Angela Hendricks, Michael Hendricks to the Court's #21 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Birkenbuel, Britt) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE by Angela Hendricks, Michael Hendricks to the Court's #21 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Birkenbuel, Britt) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re: #19 EMERGENCY MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiffs' Expert Ralph Zipper, M.D.; Plaintiffs are directed to file their Response by 6/11/2019 and American Medical Systems, Inc. is directed to file its Reply by 6/13/2019; a telephonic hearing on the motion shall take place on Friday, 6/14/2019 at 3:00 p.m. EDT, before the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/7/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 4, 2019 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #19 EMERGENCY MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiffs' Expert Ralph Zipper, M.D. (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by American Medical Systems, Inc. in support of #19 EMERGENCY MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiffs' Expert Ralph Zipper, M.D. (Weil, Rachel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 19 EMERGENCY MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiffs' Expert Ralph Zipper, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Weil, Rachel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Ralph Zipper, M.D. on July 25, 2019 at 9:00 A.M. (Binis, Barbara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS to #15 Notice of Deposition by Angela Hendricks, Michael Hendricks (Birkenbuel, Britt) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Angela Hendricks, Michael Hendricks for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures with reports. (Birkenbuel, Britt) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Angela Hendricks on June 11, 2019 at 1:00 pm (Binis, Barbara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Angela Hendricks on June 21, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (Binis, Barbara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Angela Hendricks, Michael Hendricks for Requests for Admission to Defendant, Requests for Production to Defendant and Interrogatories to Defendant. (Birkenbuel, Britt) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Britt Alicia Birkenbuel on behalf of Angela Hendricks, Michael Hendricks. (Birkenbuel, Britt) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL ORDER # 274 (Docket Control Order - American Medical Systems, Inc. Wave 5 Cases) The cases on Exhibit A are: 1. removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2. placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1. The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2. To the extent other defendants, in addition to American Medical Systems, Inc., are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3. The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B (hereinafter referred to as "Wave 5 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order.; and 4. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 5 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES.. The following deadlines shall apply in all AMS Wave 5 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 02/15/2019; Defendant Fact Sheets due 02/22/2019; Deadline for written discovery requests due 03/25/2019; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 05/24/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 06/24/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 07/01/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 08/01/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 08/14/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 08/28/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 09/04/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 08/14/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 08/29/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 09/05/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3. Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 6/27/2019, and any response is due by 7/11/2019. Any reply is due by 7/18/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 7/8/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/4/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; AMS Wave 5 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2325 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2325 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases on inactive docket) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL AMS Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL AMS Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL AMS Inactive") (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2325 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2325 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases on inactive docket). (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and American Medical Systems have reached a settlement with regard to AMS. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and AMS may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 5/18/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 4714 in MDL Case No. 2325 AMS. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/24/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 1, 2017 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Angela Hendricks, Michael Hendricks. (Kulesza, Karolina) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDER # 223 (Order re: Production of Case-Specific Information For Certain AMS MDL Plaintiffs) It is directed as follows: A) Existing Cases pending as of October 10, 2016. This order applies to certain cases in MDL 2325 alleging claim(s) against AMS, as of 10/10/2016, and listed on Exhibit A. B) Plaintiff Fact Sheets, Authorizations and Documents. Plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A shall submit a full and complete PFS with verifications and the attached authorizations and the other documents identified herein to the individuals identified in Paragraph C by 11/21/2016, as more fully set forth herein. D) This PTO does not in any way relieve plaintiffs from their obligation to serve a Plaintiff Profile Form; and E) Any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/21/2016. (cc: Clerk of JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mks) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
March 4, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael J. Farrell on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Farrell, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
March 4, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Erik W. Legg on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Legg, Erik) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
March 1, 2016 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 205 (Order Scheduling Status Conference and Meetings in MDLs on April 6-7, 2016) entered on 02/04/2016 in MDL 2325 to attorneys in member case. (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
February 29, 2016 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-4429252. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cma) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendricks et al v. American Medical Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems Inc
Represented By: Barbara R. Binis
Represented By: Rachel B. Weil
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Represented By: Michael J Farrell
Represented By: Stephen J McConnell
Represented By: Whitney L Mayer
Represented By: Anne M Talcott
Represented By: Rachel B Weil
Represented By: Allison Kathleen Krashan
Represented By: Ryan K Blake
Represented By: Erik W Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Hendricks
Represented By: Jason Murphy
Represented By: Karolina S. Kulesza
Represented By: Britt Alicia Birkenbuel
Represented By: Karolina S Kulesza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hendricks
Represented By: Jason Murphy
Represented By: Karolina S. Kulesza
Represented By: Britt Alicia Birkenbuel
Represented By: Karolina S Kulesza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?