A H v. Shane Hellyer et al
Plaintiff: A H
Defendant: Shane Hellyer and City of Prosser
Case Number: 4:2020cv05042
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendants Joint Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 2) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Section 1983 claim is dismissed against both Shane Hellyer and the City of Prosser. This case is hereby REMANDED to the Benton County Superior Court for all further proceedings concerning the remaining state law claims (former Benton County Superior Court No. 20-2-00338-03). Defendant Shane Hellyer is terminated. The file is CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #2 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Prosser, Shane Hellyer. (Miller, Thomas)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION by Thomas P. Miller in Support re #2 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Prosser, Shane Hellyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Thomas)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by City of Prosser, Shane Hellyer. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2020 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Thomas)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3413808 Filed by City of Prosser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit)(McFarland, Michael)
March 4, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A H v. Shane Hellyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A H
Represented By: Brian George Davis
Represented By: Justine Koehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Hellyer
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Prosser
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?