Kroll v. Ferguson et al
Petitioner: Lane Kenneth Kroll
Respondent: Robert Ferguson and Scott Souza
Case Number: 4:2020cv05083
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice for non-payment of the filing fee under Rule 3(a)(1), Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. The Court certifies any appeal of this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT INDICATION/CLARITY by Lane Kenneth Kroll. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
June 15, 2020 Case Management Deadline set for 6/26/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING PAYMENT OF $5.00 FILING FEE. Petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. 2 , is DENIED. Petitioner is directed to pay the filing fee within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Order or show cause by sworn affidavit why he should not be required to do so. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER WILL BE CONSTRUED AS PETITIONER'S CONSENT TO DISMISSAL OF HIS PETITION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Clay V. Haynes by Lane Kenneth Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TR, Case Administrator)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Lane Kroll to Clerk of Court dated 6/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (Attachments: #1 Incomplete Certificate Section of IFP Application) (TR, Case Administrator) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/21/2020) (TR, Case Administrator).
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (Filing fee $5 Receipt #IFP Pending.) Filed by Lane Kenneth Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kroll v. Ferguson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lane Kenneth Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?