Nye v. Tapia et al
Plaintiff: Micah Nye
Defendant: Victoria Tapia, LT Daniel Hollibaugh, SGT John D Turner, Jeffrey A Uttecht and Department of Corrections
Case Number: 4:2021cv05099
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr: Scheduling Conference held on 8/26/2021. (Reported/Recorded by: Kimberly Allen) (TNC, Courtroom Deputy) **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Micah Nye, Prisoner ID: 404049)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 Joint Certificate Pursuant to Rule 26 / Rule 16 by All Defendants. (Young, Michelle) **PRINT ALL** (Micah Nye, Prisoner ID: 404049)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2021 at 08:40 AM via Teleconference before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Consent to MJ Form)(TNC, Courtroom Deputy) **6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Micah Nye, Prisoner ID: 404049)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Department of Corrections, Daniel Hollibaugh, Victoria Tapia, John D Turner, Jeffrey A Uttecht.(Young, Michelle) **PRINT ALL** (Micah Nye, Prisoner ID: 404049)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Michelle M. Young in Support of re #1 Notice of Removal by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Young, Michelle)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM re #1 Notice of Removal to Federal Court and Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Young, Michelle)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to Federal Court Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-3823834 Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Young, Michelle)
July 6, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nye v. Tapia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Tapia
Represented By: Michelle M Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT Daniel Hollibaugh
Represented By: Michelle M Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT John D Turner
Represented By: Michelle M Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A Uttecht
Represented By: Michelle M Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Represented By: Michelle M Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?