Revelry Vintners LLC v. Mackay Restaurant Management Group Inc
Plaintiff: Revelry Vintners LLC
Defendant: Mackay Restaurant Management Group Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv05110
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is scheduled for 10/13/2021 at 8:30 AM before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mackay Restaurant Management Group Inc. (Jacobson, Pkohli (Pam))
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Mackay Restaurant Management Group Inc.(Attorney Pkohli (Pam) Kaur Jacobson added to party Mackay Restaurant Management Group Inc(pty:dft))(Jacobson, Pkohli (Pam))
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE by Revelry Vintners LLC re Mackay Restaurant Management Group Inc. (Meiklejohn, Paul)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Revelry Vintners LLC. (Meiklejohn, Paul)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued to Mackay Restaurant Management Group Inc. (AY, Case Administrator)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mackay Restaurant Management Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-3842423) Jury Demand. Filed by Revelry Vintners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 AO Form 120)(Meiklejohn, Paul)
July 29, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Revelry Vintners LLC v. Mackay Restaurant Management Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Revelry Vintners LLC
Represented By: Paul T Meiklejohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mackay Restaurant Management Group Inc
Represented By: Pkohli (Pam) Kaur Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?