Turner v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Gideon Michael David Turner and Gideon Michael Turner
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 4:2021cv05135
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Edward F Shea
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Leisa A Wolf on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Leisa A Wolf added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Wolf, Leisa)
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Donovan on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Brian M Donovan added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Donovan, Brian)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE by Gideon Michael Turner re Kilolo Kijakazi. (Higgs, Kathryn)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals failure to list value. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Case Management Deadline set for 11/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (MRJ, Case Administrator)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Summons- USA, #2 Summons- USAG) (MRJ, Case Administrator)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi IFP Pending Filed by Gideon Michael David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Higgs, Kathryn)
October 4, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Edward F. Shea assigned to case. (MRJ, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gideon Michael David Turner
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Higgs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gideon Michael Turner
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Higgs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Represented By: Leisa A Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?