Nichols v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Lindsay Nichols
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 4:2021cv05160
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lindsay Nichols re Kilolo Kijakazi. (Hatfield, Chad)
January 25, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Andsager on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Diana Andsager added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Andsager, Diana)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (KP, Law Clerk)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Donovan on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Brian M Donovan added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Donovan, Brian)
December 28, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING - Filing Fee due by 1/11/2022. (LMR, Case Administrator)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons Issued as to Attorney General)(LMR, Case Administrator)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi IFP Pending Filed by Lindsay Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Hatfield, Chad)
December 28, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (LMR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Nichols
Represented By: Chad L Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Diana Andsager
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?