Shawver v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Misti Shawver
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 4:2022cv05005
Filed: January 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Frances Highland on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Erin Frances Highland added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Highland, Erin)
February 25, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Misti Shawver re Kilolo Kijakazi. (Hatfield, Chad)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (KP, Law Clerk)
January 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Donovan on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Brian M Donovan added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Donovan, Brian)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas O. Rice for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Edward F. Shea no longer assigned to case. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (CV, Case Administrator)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW; Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals lacks information as to how Plaintiff provides for her basic needs. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case Management Deadline set for 2/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (MRJ, Case Administrator)
January 12, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Summons- USA, #2 Summons-USAG) (MRJ, Case Administrator)
January 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi IFP Pending Filed by Misti Shawver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Hatfield, Chad)
January 12, 2022 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Edward F. Shea assigned to case. (MRJ, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shawver v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misti Shawver
Represented By: Chad L Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Represented By: Erin Frances Highland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?