New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC dba AT&T Mobility v. City of Walla Walla
Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC doing business as AT&T Mobility and New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as AT&T Mobility
Defendant: City of Walla Walla
Intervenor Defendant: Barbara Knudson and Everett Knudson
Case Number: 4:2023cv05162
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 332 TELECOMMUNICATIONS ACT
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 BENCH TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for January 26, 2024 is STRICKEN. Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2024 at 01:30 PM in Yakima Courtroom 203. Bench Trial set for 11/12/2024 at 09:00 AM in Richland Courtroom 189. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LTR, Case Administrator)
January 19, 2024 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC. (Bone, Thomas)
January 18, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Raymond P. Bolaos. Filing fee $200, receipt number 4480678 by New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Bone, Thomas)
January 16, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Intervene by Barbara Knudson, Everett Knudson. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Barbara Knudson in Support of Motion to Intervene)(Bricklin, David)
December 29, 2023 Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2024 at 09:30 AM by Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
December 26, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Walla Walla.(Donaldson, Tim)
December 6, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC re City of Walla Walla. (Bone, Thomas)
December 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tim J Donaldson on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Tim J Donaldson added to party City of Walla Walla(pty:dft))(Donaldson, Tim)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Walla Walla. (LTR, Case Administrator)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC dba AT&T Mobility. (Bone, Thomas)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Request for Expedited Review against City of Walla Walla ( Filing fee $ 405; Receipt # AWAEDC-4431291) Filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC dba AT&T Mobility. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bone, Thomas)
December 1, 2023 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC dba AT&T Mobility v. City of Walla Walla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC doing business as AT&T Mobility
Represented By: Thomas J Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as AT&T Mobility
Represented By: Thomas J Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Walla Walla
Represented By: Tim J Donaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Barbara Knudson
Represented By: Zachary Knox Griefen
Represented By: David A Bricklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Everett Knudson
Represented By: Zachary Knox Griefen
Represented By: David A Bricklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?