USA, et al v. Ecology WA Dept of, et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Karl J Schumak, Debra James, Paul E Longworth, Randy V Edin, Joanne J Kotjan, Joel B Else, Lorraine D Emley, Cheryl Hahney, Richard S Witt, Gladys L Van Boven, Margaret A Hinshaw, Teresa Josephson, Nancy G Button, Helen R Anthony, Patricia A Doorenbos, Angel A Finsrud, Frazier Family Cabin LLC, Randy Kiefer, Gerald Moore, Audrey Tcheng, Kenneth L Crawford, Linda L King, Federal National Mortgage Association, Georgia Manor Water Assoc, Jeffrey K Mock, Scott L Kinley, Gregory F Bartlett, Sherry L Brionez, Linda P Smith, Lyn Morgan-Hill, Carol A Crismond, Bernita Q Fuller, Derek C Schmidt, Craig E Bessire, Kerrison F Burleigh, Kerry L Harris, Agnes M Publicover, Jean Peterson, Larry Hester, Tony R Powell, Eugenie G Ryziuk, Michael G Smith, Raymond Deardorff, Levi L Jefferson, Sr, Hermeniheldo Almojera, Larry J Berghoff, Robert A Kandiko, Wayne Wyker, Anthony Pozsonyi, Lana Law, Sigrid J Blake, Mae E Moss, Dorothy D Drumheller, Philip E Swanson, Mary E Nace, John R Branstiter, Jan A Jorgensen, William L Freeman, Richard W Hinshaw, Frederick W Nolte, Barbara A Kendall, Robert J Miller, Kim L Alfreds, Dennis P Desjarlais, Robert C Merhaut, John L Payne, James C Stevenson, Lesli M Higginson, Rickard O Amundsen, Philip P Tcheng, Douglas D James, Donald A McLean, Robyn G Gustafson, Thomas Liedtke, Dale Williams, Teesdale Grandchilden's Trust FBO Mary E. Teesdale; Mary E. Teesdale Trustee, Belle J Priest, Julie Littleton, Patricia A Taylor, Robin L Moore, Melissa K Ruthland-Drury, Harold L Kennedy, Raymond O Hampton, Beverly A Zander, Joanne S Palmer, Arturo Tijerina, Jr, Preferred Funding LLC, Monty M Smith, Roy V Callero, Jr, Ira G Weidkamp, Janet L Scully, Ecology Department of the State of Washington, Albert G Doan, Robert Gallo, David Crist, William D Smith, Roy M Budde, Eric Knight, Larry E Demmert, Jr, Gary Haugen, Carol T Ballew, Roderick E Dunn, James L Farrar, Kimberlee S Walker, Peter Bayliss Rev Trust, Madeline Jefferson, Linda G Moore, Ferdinand Janzen, Johnny D Felix, Bonny K Jones, Stafholt Good Samaritan Center, Shirley L Brengman, Graydon L Robertson, Carol A Lane, Paul R Simplot, Gregory D Buckner, Douglas McKee, Claudia Evans, Mary Ellen Jones, Patricia A Haensly, Lester C Hillis, Nicole Han, Paul J Templeton, Mary Wilson, Rebecca A Simplot, Terry A Daughters, Ralph Jefferson, June J Leppala, Karen Boyd, Richard L Boersma, Andrea K Johnson, Janet Stockton, William D Owings, Peter A Deardorff, Corrine H Matsukawa, Linnea G Smith, Mary E Schumak, Dolores I Dinneen, Stanley D Campbell, Verle A Toby, Jr, Thomas E Brown, Daniel R Dennison, Leslie Kynaston, Kenneth G Dawson, Mary Ann Douglas, Marc S Kopeikin, James H Burgin, Clifford D Fisher, Allen K. Morse, Gary Law, Kenneth P Bogas, Douglas B Smith, Michael P Drury, Linda Frazier, Larry G Kinley, James E LeSage, Michael T Melcher, Mary A Logan, Angie Bartel, James T Harris, V Gunderson Jt, Donald E Stewart, Michael W Jacobson, Kim S Henry, Tina Brown, Lew E Fiero, Armando Brionez, Jr, Linda Amburg, Alice Parmentola, D Robert Hoover, Candace A Clay, Bernadette EA King, Carl F Roehl Trust, Kim E Wilson, Charles S Alexander, Patricia A Staurset, Brooke A Wilson, Robert J Plekker, Victor Hubbard, Asdour Gulyacoubian, Natalie Rutledge, Josephine E Bennett, Donald L Manning, John Randel, Michael R James, Dorothy C Alexander, Marion D James, Candace P Smith, Vera E Solomon, Corporation of Catholic Archbishop of Seattle, Ralph R Scott, Shirley E Jacobson, Sally R Schnobrich, Barbara J Bessire, Jennifer A Reed, Donald & H Joan Williams Rev Trust, Steven G Hicks, Martha J Witt, Humberto Del Castillo, Earl W Swartz, Allister M Hansen, Carol Bull, Marvin R Carlson, Joseph E Washington, Owen B Walker, Patricia M Mitchell, John H Hocking, Dorothy Ginnett, Lynette J. Pollard, Josef Durgo, L & C Dynasty LP, Jerome L Wilson, David A Williams, Mellisa F Kurtz, Katheleen F Zoro, Maria E Bosman, Rodney Fadden, Kathrine Munson, Alma G Haner, Graham Lindsey, Celica Quirarte, Mary J. martin, William E Haensly, Mary Moss, W V Catlow, Thomas H Roehl, Jerry V Lowe, Andre R Revey, Sr, Billy J Spinks, Ulrich Haag, Barbara L Demorest, Lorelei A Mock, C Gail Kelley, Ramona D Owings, Craig M Smith, Patrick Rahkonen, Lenore G Plassman, Brandi Curran, James E Young, Deutsche Bank National Trust, Michelle J Vendiola, David M Zander, Lyle S Hunter, Charles F Bamford, II, Ruth L Snead, Anita M Wilcox, Lucille Wood-Trost, Phyllis Boyd, Karen Snell, Kelly A Jorgeson, Linda J Lux, Glen C Hitchock, Michael L Anderson, Raquel V Toby, John E Douglas, Gilbert Drynan, Jr, Donald B Lockwood, Joanne L Freeman, Paula L Casey, Robin R Finkbonner, Ruth E Oltman, Irene C Reimer, Roger Schmidt, Leslie O Crosby Qualified, David G Plassman, Ingegerd M Carlson, Sally J Hewko, Michael L Ring, Henry M Werch, Whatcom County Fire District No 8, David L Burgess, Dorothy M Ogle, Lisa M Santana, Barbara A Mundt, Nancy Lee, Maureen M Kuzsel, Della Finkbonner, Victor C Euceda, Geena Epstein, Richard L King, Ronald Hjaltalin, Timothy J Dwyer, Christine M Larsen, Sofia M Juarez, Nancy Swan, Ronald A Eeles, Irrev Trust L Bates Lindsey, Julia Jefferson, Noah L Heartwell, Judy A Berrett, Beverly B Larsen, Howard W Van de Kieft, John A Craig, Larry G Harriman, Roger Malmberg, Equity One, Tom Yasuoka, Sarah E Webb, Kathe Kestiens, Mike Takacs, Mary M Neil, Bess Hansen, Tony R Phillips, Randy Kok, Peter A Mazzeo, Barbara A Gallagher, Kimberly J Anderson, Paul W Meckna, Janice L Christian, Martin L Wormald, Horizon Heights Owners Association, Joan E Hitchock, Ellen S Stephenson, Zibens LLC, Emily A Weaver, Rex E Houser, Sara A Duncan, Wayne L Lich and James K Temple
Not Classified By Court: Stephanie Stika
Case Number: 2:2001cv00047
Filed: January 10, 2001
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1546 ORDER regarding the billing statement of the Water Master for the period ending June 30, 2020. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $7,366.80. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LH)
July 2, 2020 REGISTRY DISBURSEMENT made on 7/2/2020 to THORSON, JOHN E in the amount of $1,689.83 re #1545 Order. (No PDF image attached) (SMG)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1545 ORDER regarding the billing statement of the Water Master for the period ending 5/31/2020. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $1,689.83. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
June 30, 2020 Objection to Federal Water Master's Recommendations Deadline re #1544 Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 7/31/2020 (MW)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1544 REPORT Annual Report 2019-2020 by Special Master John E. Thorson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Thorson, John)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1543 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #1541 Notice of Attorney Association, #1542 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Janz, Matthew)
June 23, 2020 Filing 1542 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Stephanie Duvall for Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington. (Duvall, Stephanie)
June 23, 2020 Filing 1541 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Matthew Thomas Janz on behalf of Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington. (Janz, Matthew)
June 2, 2020 REGISTRY DISBURSEMENT made on 6/2/2020 to THORSON, JOHN E in the amount of $200.00 re #1540 Order. (No PDF image attached) (SMG)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1540 ORDER regarding the billing statement of the Water Master for the period ending 4/30/2020. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $200.00.Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
May 5, 2020 REGISTRY DISBURSEMENT made on 5/5/2020 to THORSON, JOHN E in the amount of $200.00 re #1539 Order,. (No PDF image attached) (SMG)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1539 ORDER regarding the billing statement of the Water Master for the period ending 3/31/2020. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $200.00. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(MW)(cc: Finance)
March 4, 2020 REGISTRY DISBURSEMENT made on 3/4/2020 to THORSON, JOHN E in the amount of $500.00 re #1538 Order,. (No PDF image attached) (SMG)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1538 ORDER regarding the billing statement of the Water Master for the period ending 1/31/2020. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $500.00. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(MW)(cc: Finance)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1537 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Thomas J Young for Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington. (Young, Thomas)
October 4, 2019 REGISTRY DISBURSEMENT made on 10/4/2019 to John E Thorson in the amount of $403.88 re #1536 Order,. (No PDF image attached) (SMG)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1536 ORDER regarding the billing statement of the Water Master for the period ending August 31, 2019. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $403.88. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Finance)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1535 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephanie Duvall on behalf of Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington. (Duvall, Stephanie)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1534 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Robin G McPherson for Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington. (McPherson, Robin)
September 5, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re Receipt filed 9/5/19 : DISREGARD THIS FILING- filed in wrong case in error. (PS)
September 4, 2019 DISREGARD THIS FILING- filed in wrong case. RECEIPT $99,719.03 deposited into the Court Registry on 9/4/2019 (Receipt # SEA097614) (SMG) Modified on 9/5/2019 (PS).
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1533 ORDER ADOPTING AND APPROVING the Water Master's #1527 Annual Report for the Fiscal Year 2018-2019 and Recommendations for Updating the Service List Report. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: John Moss and Mary Moss via USPS)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1532 ORDER regarding the billing statement of the Water Master for the period ending June 30, 2019. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $6,761.70 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
July 26, 2019 RECEIPT $11.00 deposited into the Court Registry on 7/26/2019 (Receipt # SEA097105) (SMG)
July 24, 2019 RECEIPT $55.00 deposited into the Court Registry on 7/24/2019 (Receipt # SEA097066) (SMG)
July 24, 2019 RECEIPT $44.00 deposited into the Court Registry on 7/24/2019 (Receipt # SEA097058) (SMG)
July 23, 2019 RECEIPT $11.00 deposited into the Court Registry on 7/23/2019 (Receipt # SEA097035) (SMG)
July 19, 2019 RECEIPT $11.00 deposited into the Court Registry on 7/18/2019 (Receipt # SEA096963) (SMG)
July 18, 2019 RECEIPT $33.00 deposited into the Court Registry on 7/18/2019 (Receipt # SEA096966) (SMG)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1531 OBJECTIONS to the Federal Water Mater's #1527 Report re: Updating Service List by Defendant John B Moss. (PM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1530 OBJECTIONS to the Federal Water Master's #1527 Report re Updating Service List by Defendant Mary Moss (PM)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1529 ORDER regarding the billing statement of the Water Master for the period ending May 31, 2019. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $200.00 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 28, 2019 Objection to Federal Water Master's Recommendations Deadline re #1527 Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 8/1/2019, (SWT)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1528 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Special Master John E. Thorson re #1527 Report 2018-19 Annual Report (Thorson, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1527 REPORT 2018-19 Annual Report by Special Master John E. Thorson (Thorson, John)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1526 ORDER regarding billing statement of the Water Master for the period ending March 31, 2019. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $200.00 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1525 ORDER regarding billing statement of the Water Master for the period ending November 30, 2018. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $401.92 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1524 ORDER regarding billing statement for period ending 9/30/2018. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $100.00 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Finance)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1523 ORDER regarding billing statement for the period ending 8/31/2018. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $100.00 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Finance)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1522 ORDER re billing statement of the Water Master for the period ending June 30, 2018. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $7,949.81 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Finance) (TH)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1521 ORDER re billing statement of Water Master for period ending July 31, 2018. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $100 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Finance)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1520 ORDER adopting and approving the Water Master's #1518 Annual Report for Fiscal Year 2017-2018 and Recommendations for Updating the Service List; directing the Clerk to update the Service List in a manner consistent with R&R Attachment B. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1519 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $1,400 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. (PM) cc: finance
June 30, 2018 Objection to Federal Water Master's Recommendations Deadline re #1518 Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 8/1/2018, (SWT)
June 30, 2018 Filing 1518 REPORT Annual Report (2017-18) by Special Master John E. Thorson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of Annual Report)(Thorson, John)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1517 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $200 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. (SWT) (cc: Financial)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1516 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $200 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. (SWT) Modified on 9/7/2017 to indicate cc: Financial (SWT).
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1515 ORDER adopting and approving the Water Master's #1510 Report Annual Report for the Fiscal Year 2016-2017 and Recommendations for Updating the Service List; directing Clerk to update the Service List, with assistance from the Water Master, in a manner consistent with R&R Attachment B, as amended by this Order, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Stephanie Stika via USPS)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1514 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $5,589.60 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. (SWT) (cc: Financial)
July 14, 2017 Filing 1513 OBJECTIONS re Special Master John E. Thorson's #1510 2016-17 Annual Report, filed by Objector Stephanie Stika (SWT)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1512 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $800 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. (SWT) (cc: Financial)
June 30, 2017 Filing 1511 Objection to Federal Water Master's Recommendations Deadline re #1510 2016-17 Annual Report. NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 8/1/2017, (SWT)
June 30, 2017 Filing 1510 REPORT 2016-17 Annual Report by Special Master John E. Thorson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Thorson, John)
June 20, 2017 Filing 1509 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James S. Stroud on behalf of Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Stroud, James)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1508 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $400 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. (SWT) (cc: Financial) Modified docket text on 4/4/2017 (SWT).
March 13, 2017 Filing 1507 NOTICE of Change of Address, filed by Defendant Luella M Olsen. (address updated) (swt)
February 8, 2017 Attorney Robin G McPherson for Ecology Department of the State of Washington, added; per #1505 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. (PS)
February 8, 2017 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #1505 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel : AMENDED DOCKET TEXT TO INDICATE SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (PS)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1506 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $200 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website (RS) cc fin'l
February 3, 2017 Filing 1505 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL and SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: Attorney Travis H Burns for Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington. (McPherson, Robin) Modified on 2/8/2017 (PS).
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1504 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $600 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website(RS) cc fin'l
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1503 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $200 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website. (RS)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1502 ORDER adopting and approving the R&R #1500 ; the changes to the Service List set forth in Attachment B to the Water Master's Annual Report shall be implemented by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1501 ORDER The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $6,297.53 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. cc fin'l (RS)
June 30, 2016 #1500 Report Federal Water Master's Annual Report for FY 2015-16 NOTED on motion calendar for 8/1/2016. (AD)
June 30, 2016 Filing 1500 REPORT Federal Water Master's Annual Report for FY 2015-16; Motion to Approve Changes to Service List by Special Master John E. Thorson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Thorson, John)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1499 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $100 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website. (AD) cc: financial
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1498 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $100 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website. (AD) cc: financial
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1497 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $200 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website. (AD) cc: financial
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1496 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $901.20 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website. (AD) cc: financial
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1495 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $200.00 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website. (AD) cc: financial
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1494 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $200.00 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website.(PM) cc: financial
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1493 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations for Updating the Service List #1490 . The changes to the Service List set forth in Attachment B to the Water Master's Annual Report shall be implemented. The Clerk is DIRECTED to update the Service List, with assistance from the Water Master, in a manner consistent with R&R Attachment B. by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(PM)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1492 ORDER The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $4,992.62 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS)cc fin'l
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1491 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $2,023.28 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Clerk is directed to electronically file this Order, but need not provide conventional service, i.e., copies via mail. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website.(LMK) cc: Financial Clerk
July 1, 2015 #1490 Report Federal Water Master's Annual Report for FY 2014-15 NOTED on motion calendar for 7/31/2015. (LMK)
June 30, 2015 Filing 1490 REPORT Federal Water Master's Annual Report for FY 2014-15; Motion to Court to Approve Changes to Service List by Special Master John E. Thorson (Attachments: #1 Appendix Att A to Federal Water Master's 2015-15 Report, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of Federal Water Master's 2015-15 Report)(Thorson, John)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1489 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $200.00 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Clerk is directed to electronically file this Order, but need not provide conventional service, i.e., copies via mail. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website.(LMK) cc: Financial Clerk
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1488 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $100.00 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Clerk is directed to electronically file this Order, but need not provide conventional service, i.e., copies via mail. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website.(LMK) cc: Financial Clerk
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1487 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $603.52 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Clerk is directed to electronically file this Order, but need not provide conventional service, i.e., copies via mail. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website.(LMK) cc: Financial Clerk
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1486 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $100.00 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Clerk is directed to electronically file this Order, but need not provide conventional service, i.e., copies via mail. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website. (LMK) CC: Financial Clerk
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1485 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $200.00 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Clerk is directed to electronically file this Order, but need not provide conventional service, i.e., copies via mail. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website. (LMK) CC: Financial Clerk
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1484 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $200.00 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Clerk is directed to electronically file this Order, but need not provide conventional service, i.e., copies via mail. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website.(LMK) CC: Financial Clerk
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1483 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $200.00 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Clerk is directed to electronically file this Order, but need not provide conventional service, i.e., copies via mail. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website. (LMK) CC: Financial Clerk
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1481 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $250.49 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Clerk is directed to electronically file this Order, but need not provide conventional service, i.e., copies via mail. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website. (LMK) CC: Financial Clerk
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1480 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Water Masters request for extension of time to submit his July 2014 bill is GRANTED.The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $505.72 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859.(LMK) CC: Financial Clerk
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1479 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The R&R, docket no. #1471 , is ADOPTED and APPROVED. The changes to the Service List set forth in Attachment B to the Water Masters Annual Report shall be implemented. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website.(LMK) CC: Water Master John Thorson and mailed to Kevin and Mary Vermillion as directed in Order.
August 12, 2014 Filing 1478 OBJECTIONS re #1471 Annual Report & Recommendation re Updating the Service List filed by Kevin and Mary Vermillion. (LMK)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1477 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $5,866.99 payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website. (LMK) CC: Financial Clerk and John E. Thorson
July 9, 2014 Filing 1476 SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL by Judge Thomas S. Zilly; Report and Recommendation of the Water Master, John E. Thorson, docket no. 1467, is ADOPTED.Judgment is hereby entered against Greg Mahle and Krista Mahle, jointly and severally, as follows: in the amount of $250, in favor of and payable to the Washington State Department of Ecology, to be sent to its attorney Travis H. Burns, Assistant Attorney General, P.O. Box 40117, Olympia, WA 98504-0117.Judgment is further hereby entered against Greg Mahle and Krista Mahle, jointly and severally, as follows: in the amount of $734.84, in favor of the Water Master.The amounts set forth in this Supplemental Judgment shall bear interest at the rate of eleven-hundredths of one percent (0.11%) per annum from the date of this Supplemental Judgment until paid in full. See 28 U.S.C. 1961. Any lien associated with this Supplemental Judgment shall commence as provided in RCW 4.56.200, and shall have the effect and duration set forth in RCW 4.56.190. See Fed. Intermediate Credit Bank of Spokane v. O/S Sablefish, 111 Wn.2d 219, 758 P.2d 494(1988); see also 28 U.S.C. 1962. (RS)cc Greg and Krista Mahle, John Thorson
July 9, 2014 Filing 1475 SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE by Judge Thomas S. Zilly No opposition having been timely filed, the Report and Recommendation of the Water Master, John E. Thorson, docket no. 1466, is ADOPTED. Judgment is hereby entered against Greg Mahle and Krista Mahle, jointly and severally, as follows: in the amount of $633.24, in favor of the Water Master. The amount set forth in this Supplemental Judgment shall bear interest at the rate of eleven-hundredths of one percent (0.11%) per annum from the date of this Supplemental Judgment until paid in full. See 28 U.S.C. 1961. Any lien associated with this Supplemental Judgment shall commence as provided in RCW 4.56.200, and shall have the effect and duration set forth in RCW 4.56.190. See Fed. Intermediate Credit Bank of Spokane v. O/S Sablefish, 111 Wn.2d 219, 758 P.2d 494(1988); see also 28 U.S.C. 1962.(RS) cc Greg and Krista Mahle, John Thorson
July 9, 2014 Filing 1474 SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE by Judge Thomas S. Zilly Report and Recommendation of the Water Master, John E. Thorson, docket no. 1468, is ADOPTED. Judgment is hereby entered against Brett Randmel as follows: in the amount of $550, in favor of and payable to the Washington State Department of Ecology, to be sent to its attorney Travis H. Burns, Assistant Attorney General, P.O. Box 40117, Olympia, WA 98504-0117.Judgment is further hereby entered against Brett Randmel as follows: in the amount of $718.28, in favor of the Water Master. The amounts set forth in this Supplemental Judgment shall bear interest at the rate of eleven-hundredths of one percent (0.11%) per annum from the date of this Supplemental Judgment until paid in full. See 28 U.S.C. 1961. Any lien associated with this Supplemental Judgment shall commence as provided in RCW 4.56.200, and shall have the effect and duration set forth in RCW 4.56.190. See Fed. Intermediate Credit Bank of Spokane v. O/S Sablefish, 111 Wn.2d 219, 758 P.2d 494(1988); see also 28 U.S.C. 1962.(RS) Modified on 7/10/2014/cc Randmel, John Thorson (RS).
July 9, 2014 Filing 1473 SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE No opposition having been timely filed, the Report and Recommendation of the Water Master, John E. Thorson, docket no. 1465, is ADOPTED. Judgment is hereby entered against Thomas R. Ficca as follows: in the amount of $529.42, in favor of the Water Master and payable to the Clerk of the Court of the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. The amount set forth in this Supplemental Judgment shall bear interest at the rate of eleven-hundredths of one percent (0.11%) per annum from the date of this Supplemental Judgment until paid in full. See 28 U.S.C. 1961. Any lien associated with this Supplemental Judgment shall commence as provided in RCW 4.56.200, and shall have the effect and duration set forth in RCW 4.56.190. See Fed. Intermediate Credit Bank of Spokane v. O/S Sablefish, 111 Wn.2d 219, 758 P.2d 494(1988); see also 28 U.S.C. 1962. by Judge Thomas S. Zilly (RS)cc John Thorson, Thomas Ficca
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1472 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS)cc fin'l, John E. Thorson
June 30, 2014 Filing 1471 REPORT FEDERAL WATER MASTERS ANNUAL REPORT FOR FISCAL YEAR 2013-2014; MOTION TO COURT TO APPROVE CHANGES TO SERVICE LIST by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Att A: Federal Water Master Expenditures by Fiscal Year (2008-09 to 2013-14), #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Thorson, John)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1470 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson)(LMK)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1469 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. With respect to all future requests by the Water Master for certified abstracts of judgments, the Court hereby WAIVES the associated fees normally collected by the Clerk of the Court. The Clerk is directed to electronically file this Order, but need not provide conventional service, i.e., copies via mail. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website. (CL)
May 13, 2014 Motion calendar; re: #1468 Water Master's Report & Recommendation re: WM13-06 (Brett Randmel.) Noting Date 5/30/2014. (CL)
May 13, 2014 Motion Calendar; re: #1467 Water Master's Report & Recommendation re: WM13-05 (Greg & Krista Mahle.) Noting Date 5/30/2014. (CL)
May 13, 2014 Motion calendar re: #1466 Water Master's Report & Recommendation re: WM13-03 (Greg & Krista Mahle.) Noting Date 5/30/2014. (CL)
May 13, 2014 Motion calendar; re: #1465 Water Master's Report & Recommendation re: WM13-01 (Thomas R. Ficca.) Noting Date 5/30/2014. (CL)
May 13, 2014 Filing 1468 REPORT & RECOMMENDATION re WM13-06 (Brett Randmel) by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Thorson, John) Modified on 5/13/2014 (CL).
May 13, 2014 Filing 1467 REPORT & RECOMMENDATION re WM13-05 (Greg & Krista Mahle) by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Thorson, John) Modified on 5/13/2014 (CL).
May 13, 2014 Filing 1466 REPORT & RECOMMENDATION re WM13-03 (Greg & Krista Mahle) by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Thorson, John) Modified on 5/13/2014 (CL).
May 13, 2014 Filing 1465 REPORT & RECOMMENDATION re WM13-01 (Thomas R. Ficca) by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Thorson, John) Modified on 5/13/2014 (CL).
May 7, 2014 Filing 1464 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION of Appearance by attorney Charles N Hurt on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Hurt, Charles) Modified on 5/8/2014 (CL).
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1463 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1462 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1461 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1460 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
January 7, 2014 Filing 1459 JUDGMENT BY COURT; No opposition having been timely filed, the Report and Recommendation of the Water Master, John E. Thorson, docket no. #1454 , is ADOPTED. Judgment is hereby entered against Brett L. Randmel as follows: in the amount of $599.23, in favor of the Water Master and payable to the Clerk of the Court of the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. The amount set forth in this Supplemental Judgment shall bear interest at the rate of thirteen-hundredths of one percent (0.13%) per annum from the date of this Supplemental Judgment until paid in full. See 28 U.S.C. 1961. Any lien associated with this Supplemental Judgment shall commence as provided in RCW 4.56.200, and shall have the effect and duration set forth in RCW 4.56.190. See Fed. Intermediate Credit Bank of Spokane v. O/S Sablefish, 111 Wn.2d 219, 758 P.2d 494(1988); see also 28 U.S.C. 1962. The Clerk shall send a copy of this Supplemental Judgment to Brett Randmel at 2171 Postal Avenue, Bellingham, WA 98226-9232.(CL) (cc: B. Randmel, J. Thorson, Fin'l)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1458 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
January 2, 2014 Filing 1457 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Harry L Johnsen, III for Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Johnsen, Harry)
January 2, 2014 Filing 1456 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Harry L Johnsen, III for Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Johnsen, Harry)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1455 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
October 31, 2013 Filing 1454 REPORT re WM 13-02 (B. Randmel) by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Thorson, John)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1453 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1452 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The R&R, docket no. #1444 , is ADOPTED and APPROVED, with the following modifications: (See Order for complete details) (CL) (cc: Wm Peterson, J. Thorson)
September 16, 2013 Filing 1451 OBJECTIONS re #1444 Annual Report & Recommendation re Updating the Service List filed by William L. Peterson, c/o Parkside Properties & Finance. (CL)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1450 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The R&R, docket no. #1444 , is ADOPTED and APPROVED, with the following modifications: (See Order for complete details) (CL) (cc: objectors Thomas Hahney, John B. Moss, and Mary M. Moss, J. Thorson)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1449 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1448 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
July 29, 2013 Filing 1447 OBJECTIONS re #1444 Annual Report & Recommendation re Updating Service List filed by John B. Moss and Mary M. Moss. (Attachments: #1 Objection by Mary M. Moss) (CL)
July 22, 2013 Filing 1446 OBJECTIONS re #1444 Annual Report & Recommendation re Updating the Service List filed by T. Hahney. (CL)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1445 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
June 28, 2013 TO ALL ATTYS IN THIS CASE: please note that document # 1444 filed on 6/28/2013 is not a motion, document is a Report & Recommendation filed by the Water Master J. Thorson. (CL)
June 28, 2013 Filing 1444 ANNUAL REPORT & RECOMMENDATION re Service List by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) Noting Date 7/29/2013, (Thorson, John) PLEASE NOTE: R&R is not a motion. Modified on 6/28/2013 (CL).
June 13, 2013 Filing 1443 SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT BY COURT; No opposition having been timely filed, the Report and Recommendation of the Water Master, John E. Thorson, docket no. #1440 , is ADOPTED. Judgment is hereby entered against Brett Randmelas follows: in the amount of $450.00, payable to the Washington Department of Ecology and submitted to the Department's attorney, to-wit, Travis H. Burns, Assistant Attorney General, P.O. Box 40117, Olympia, WA 98504-0117. Additionally, judgment is hereby entered against Brett Randmel as follows: in the amount of $1,066.73, in favor of the Federal Water Master and payable tothe Clerk of the Court of the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington, 700 Stewart, Seattle, WA 98101. (CL) (cc: J. Thornson, Fin'l. B. Randmel) Modified on 6/13/2013 (CL). Modified on 6/14/2013 (TF).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1442 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1441 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
May 1, 2013 Filing 1440 REPORT re Brett Randmel (WM12-01) by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Thorson, John)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1439 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (TF)
March 27, 2013 Filing 1438 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Defendant Whatcom County of . (Watts, Randall)
March 27, 2013 Filing 1437 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Randall J Watts for Defendant Whatcom County of. (Watts, Randall)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1436 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (TF)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1435 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (TF)
February 13, 2013 Filing 1434 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Barbara A Markham for Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington. (Markham, Barbara)
February 13, 2013 Filing 1433 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Travis H Burns on behalf of Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington. (Burns, Travis)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1432 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
December 4, 2012 Filing 1431 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1415 Order addressed to Concetta Blaine and Damien Fisher. (CL)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1430 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1429 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1428 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
October 1, 2012 Filing 1427 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1415 Order addressed to Yvonne Solomon. (CL)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1426 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
August 31, 2012 Filing 1425 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1415 Order addressed to Matthew Alexander/Canada address. (CL)
August 20, 2012 Filing 1424 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1415 Order addressed to Ellen and Peter Stephenson and Robert Cameron. (CL)
August 20, 2012 Filing 1423 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1415 Order addressed to: Mee Young Back, Deutsche Bank National Trust, Debra James and Tammera Mercier, (CL)
August 16, 2012 Filing 1422 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1415 Order addressed to Larry and Luela Olsen. (Attachments: #1 mail returned addressed to Christina Ysaguirre-Boersma) (CL)
August 14, 2012 Filing 1421 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1415 Order addressed to Cheul Rho (Attachments: #1 mail returned as to Richard and Lana George) (CL)
August 14, 2012 Filing 1420 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1415 Order addressed to: Charles Baker, Chandos Mare, Stanley and Kay Campbell, David Crist, Toni C. and Matthew K. Donnelly, Wm and Helen Campbell, Frazier Family Cabin LLC, Douglas D. James, Alexander F. Kamkoff, Celica and John Quirarte, Ellen Koay, Brett Randmel, Douglas and Linda Smith. (CL)
August 14, 2012 Filing 1419 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (insufficient address) re #1415 Order addressed to Richard Schmidt. (CL)
August 14, 2012 Filing 1418 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (moved 4 yrs ago) re #1415 Order addressed to Troy Curran. (CL)
August 13, 2012 Filing 1417 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (no such street address) re #1415 Order addressed to Mary M. and John B. Moss. (CL)
August 9, 2012 Filing 1416 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1415 Order addressed to Valorie and Anthony Zamudio. (PO Box closed) (CL)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1415 ORDER re #1411 Water Master's Report to the Court on Recommendations for Updating the Service List, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL) (cc: parties)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1414 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1413 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
June 29, 2012 Filing 1412 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Special Master John E. Thorson re #1409 Report, #1411 Report, #1410 Report. (Thorson, John)
June 29, 2012 Filing 1411 REPORT Federal Water Master's Report to the Court on Recommendations for Updating the Service List by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Thorson, John)
June 29, 2012 Filing 1410 REPORT Federal Water Master's Notice of Change in Website Name and Address (URL) by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Thorson, John)
June 29, 2012 Filing 1409 REPORT Federal Water Master's Annual Report for Fiscal Year 2011-2012 by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Thorson, John)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1408 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson). (CL)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1407 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson). (CL)
April 6, 2012 Filing 1406 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1401 Judgment by Court, #1400 Judgment by Court, addressed to Christina Ysaguirre-Boersma addressed to the Shorewood Lane. (CL)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1405 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson).(CL)
March 21, 2012 Filing 1404 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1401 Judgment by Court, #1400 Judgment by Court, addressed to Christina Ysaguirre-Boersma (CL) Modified on 4/3/2012 (CL).Re-mailed to Shorewood address.
March 14, 2012 Filing 1403 JUDGMENT BY COURT; the Report and Recommendation of the Water Master, John E. Thorson, docket no. #1397 , is ADOPTED. Judgment is hereby entered against Brett L. Randmel as follows: in the amount of $512.90, in favor of the Water Master and payable to the Clerk of the Court of the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. (CL) (cc: Water Master, dft Brett L. Randmell, Fin'l)
March 14, 2012 Filing 1402 JUDGMENT BY COURT; the Report and Recommendation of the Water Master,John E. Thorson, docket no. #1396 , is ADOPTED. Judgment is hereby entered against Thomas R. Ficca as follows: in the amount of $433.54, in favor of the Water Master and payable to the Clerk of the Court of the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. (CL) (cc: Water Master, dft Thomas R. Ficca, Fin'l)
March 14, 2012 Filing 1401 JUDGMENT BY COURT; the Report and Recommendation of the Water Master,John E. Thorson, docket no. #1395 , is ADOPTED. Judgment is hereby entered against Christina M. Ysaguirre-Boersma as follows: in the amount of $433.33, in favor of the Water Master and payable to the Clerk of the Court of the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. (CL) (cc: Water Master, Christina M. dft Ysaguirre-Borsma, Fin'l)
March 14, 2012 Filing 1400 JUDGMENT BY COURT; The Report and Recommendation of the Water Master, John E. Thorson, docket no. #1394 , is ADOPTED. Judgment is hereby entered against Christina M Ysaguirre-Boersma as follows: (i) in the amount of $750.00, in favor of and payable to the State of Washington, Department of Ecology, c/o Barbara A. Munson, Assistant Attorney General, P.O. Box 40117, Olympia, WA 98504-0117; and (ii) in the amount of $1,281.02, in favor of the WaterMaster and payable to the Clerk of the Court of the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. (CL) (cc: John E. Thorson, dft Christina M Ysaguirre-Boersma. Fin'l)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1399 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson.) (CL)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1398 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson).(CL)
January 31, 2012 Filing 1397 MOTION re Report WM 11-06 In re Randmel by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Thorson, John) . Noting 2/17/2012. Modified on 2/3/2012 (CL).
January 31, 2012 Filing 1396 MOTION re Report WM 11-05 In re Ficca by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Thorson, John) . Noting date 2/17/2012. Modified on 2/3/2012 (CL).
January 31, 2012 Filing 1395 MOTION re Report WM 11-04 In re Ysaguirre-Boersma by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Thorson, John) . Noting date 2/17/2012. Modified on 2/3/2012 (CL).
January 31, 2012 Filing 1394 MOTION re: Report WM 11-01 Ecology's Appeal re Ysaguirre-Boersma by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Thorson, John). Noting date 2/17/2012. Modified on 2/3/2012 (CL).
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1393 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson). (CL)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1392 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson). (CL)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1391 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson) (CL)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1390 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson). (CL)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1389 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court ORDERS that the amount of $4,065.30 be removed from the account for Case No. 01-CV-47 and transferred to the account for Case No. 11-CV-1472.(CL) (cc: fin'l)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1388 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson). (CL)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1387 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson). (CL)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1386 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson). (CL)
June 30, 2011 Filing 1385 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Thorson, John)
June 30, 2011 Filing 1384 REPORT by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice re WM 11-03 (Updating Service List), #2 Certificate of Service Cert of Service re Annual Report & WM 11-03 Notice)(Thorson, John)
June 21, 2011 Filing 1383 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Judith K Bush for Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Bush, Judith)
June 21, 2011 Filing 1382 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Diana Rae Bob on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Bob, Diana)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1381 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson). (CL)
May 24, 2011 Filing 1380 JUDGMENT BY COURT; The Report and Recommendation of the Water Master, JohnE. Thorson, docket no. #1375 , is ADOPTED. Judgment is hereby entered against John Rusin, dba Hutzpah Holdings, LLC, as follows: in the amount of $757.47, in favor of the Water Master and payable to the Clerk of the Court of the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. (CL) (J. Rusin, E. Thorson, Fin'l)
May 24, 2011 Filing 1379 JUDGMENT BY COURT; the Report and Recommendation of the Water Master, John E. Thorson, docket no. #1376 , is ADOPTED. Judgment is hereby entered against Christina M. Ysaguirre-Boersma as follows: in the amount of $659.04, in favor of the Water Master and payable to the Clerk of the Court of the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. (CL) (cc: C Ysaguirre-Boersma, John E. Thorson, Fin'l)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1378 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS)cc fin'l, John Thorson
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1377 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson). (CL)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1376 REPORT In re WM 10-02 (Christina M. Ysaguirre-Boersma) by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Thorson, John)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1375 REPORT re WM 10-01 (John Rusin) by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Thorson, John)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1374 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson). (CL)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1373 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson). (CL)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1372 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson).(CL)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1371 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson). (CL)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1370 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly; The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $402.07, payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master. (TF)(cc: J. Thorson, Fin'l)(TF)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1369 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly; The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $509.82, payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master. (TF)(cc: J. Thorson, Fin'l) Text Modified on 10/6/2010 (TF).
September 24, 2010 Filing 1368 MINUTE ORDER by Thomas S. Zilly, United States District Judge. The Court GRANTS unopposed motion for leave to withdraw and substitution of atty, docket no. #1361 . New atty of record for dts Georgia Manor Water Association, Harnden Island View Water Association and Sunset Water Association is Philip James Buri. Atty J. Timothy Slater terminated. (CL)
September 17, 2010 Filing 1367 Letter from Barbara A Markham, Assistant Attorney General requesting certified copy of Abstract of Judgment re #1358 Supplemental Judgment. (TF) sent cert copy to B Markham via USPS
September 9, 2010 Filing 1366 NOTICE Consent of the Sunset Water Association re #1361 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Philip Buri ; filed by Defendant Sunset Water Assn. (Buri, Philip)
September 9, 2010 Filing 1365 NOTICE Consent of the Harnden Island View Water Association re #1361 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Philip Buri ; filed by Defendant Harnden Island View Water Association. (Buri, Philip)
September 9, 2010 Filing 1364 NOTICE Consent of Georgia Manor Water Association re #1361 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Philip Buri ; filed by Defendant Georgia Manor Water Assoc. (Buri, Philip)
September 9, 2010 Filing 1363 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #1361 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Philip Buri (Buri, Philip)
September 9, 2010 Filing 1362 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Philip James Buri on behalf of Defendants Georgia Manor Water Assoc, Harnden Island View Water Association, Sunset Water Assn. (Buri, Philip)
September 9, 2010 Filing 1361 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Philip Buri by Defendants Georgia Manor Water Assoc, Harnden Island View Water Association, Sunset Water Assn. Noting Date 9/24/2010, (Buri, Philip)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1360 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly; The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $250.00, payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master. (cc: J. Thorson, Fin'l) (TF)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1359 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $2,574.77, payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master. (cc: J. Thorson, Fin'l) (CL)
July 27, 2010 Filing 1358 SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CC: J. Thorson, J. Rusin, Fin'l)(CL)
July 14, 2010 Motion calendar: Water Master's Report and Recommendation to enter Supplemental Judgment re: #1356 Federal Water Master's Report. Noting Date 7/23/2010. (cc: J. Rusin)(CL)
July 8, 2010 Filing 1357 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Special Master John E. Thorson re #1356 Report re WM09-03 & WM09-06 (In re Rusin). (Thorson, John)
July 8, 2010 Filing 1356 REPORT Federal Water Master's Report re Water Master Proceedings Nos. WM09-03 & WM09-06 (John Rusin) by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Thorson, John)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1355 ORDER amending #1273 Order and Judgment dated 11/20/07 nunc pro tunc by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1354 ORDER directing clerk to disburse $400 to John Thorson, Water Master from ct registry by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS)cc fin'l
June 30, 2010 Filing 1353 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Special Master John E. Thorson re #1352 Report Federal Water Master's Annual Report 2009-2010. (Thorson, John)
June 30, 2010 Filing 1352 REPORT Federal Water Master's Annual Report 2009-2010 by Special Master John E. Thorson. (Thorson, John)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1351 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds from court registry by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc Fin'l, J Thorson) (CL)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1350 MINUTE ORDER re: attached Exhibit A), by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Any objections to Exhibit A, to be filed by 6/24/2010. (cc: John E. Thorson)(CL)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1349 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds from court registry by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc Fin'l, J Thorson) (CL)
March 31, 2010 Filing 1348 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Joanne J Kotjan re #1347 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Robinson, Amy)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1347 ORDER Granting #1343 atty Gene Knapp's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Substituting Defendants as Pro Se, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL)(cc: J. Thorson, Water Master)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1346 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds from court registry by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS) cc fin'l, J Thorson
February 8, 2010 Filing 1345 DECLARATION of Mailing filed by Defendant Joanne J Kotjan re #1343 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Robinson, Amy)
February 8, 2010 Filing 1344 DECLARATION of Joanne Kotjan filed by Defendant Joanne J Kotjan re #1343 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Robinson, Amy)
February 8, 2010 Filing 1343 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants William D Smith, Linnea G Smith, Robert N Earl, Walter A Edson, Kevin Vermillion, Mary Vermillion, Mark Weilage, Kathryn Weilage, Brian Wright, Jennifer Wright, Madsen Rev Trust Everett L & Shirley D, Luella M Olsen, Esperanza Moreno, Steven S Axtell, John G Hoffmann, Suzanne Hoffmann, Janet C Ott, Joanne J Kotjan, Robert A Kandiko, Edna P Morse, Joyce A Nielsen, Brian NM Oliver, Larry R Olsen, Michael L Ring, Bernard M Fernandez, William C Schnobrich, Lesli M Higginson, Sally R Schnobrich, Cecil C Shields, James K Temple, Leana G Tracy, Matreck C Trecker, Paul Enfield, Mary Enfield, Martha J Witt, Richard S Witt, Justin McCartney, Bel Bay Community and Water Assoc, Jack D Brooks, Lois Brooks, Stanley D Campbell, Kay L Campbell, Gerald R Boyd, Robert F Gutierrez, Eva Gutierrez, James E LeSage, Douglas B Smith, Linda P Smith, Albert Coghill, A B Coghill, Troy D Curran, Barbara L Demorest, Myron E Carr, Marilyn J Carr, Kenny Handy, Nancy E Jackson, Jerry V Lowe, Madsen Rev Trust Everett L & Shirley D, Humberto Del Castillo, Nielsen Brothers Inc, Richard E Schmidt, Dorothy D Drumheller, Nelly D Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Withdraw) Noting Date 3/12/2010, (Robinson, Amy)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1342 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson). (CL)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1341 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson). (CL)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1340 ORDER directing clerk to disburse from the Registry account by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. cc fin'l (RS)
November 19, 2009 Filing 1339 MINUTE ORDER by Thomas S. Zilly, United States District Judge. The Court treats #1338 Mr. Phelps's notice of withdrawal and substitute counsel, as a motion and the Court grants Mr. Phelps leave to withdraw, effective as of the date of this Minute Order. Atty Dave Weibel added for dft Washington Mutual Bank, atty Mark Phelps terminated. (cc: atty D. Weibel, M. Phelps) (CL)
November 5, 2009 Filing 1338 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Mark J Phelps for Defendant Washington Mutual Bank Inc. (Phelps, Mark)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1337 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $100.00, payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Clerk is directed to electronically file this Order, but need not provide conventional service, i.e., copies via mail. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website. cc: Financial & Water Master. (KL)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1336 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, John E. Thorson). (CL)
September 21, 2009 Filing 1335 MANDATE of USCA (07-36057) as to #1279 Notice of Appeal filed by Kathleen J Kennedy, David A Williams, Jeffrey Clark, Richard Dawson, Marlene Dawson, Lillian G Whitney, Kenneth G Dawson, Mildred K Clark; AFFIRMED. (Attachments: #1 Order of USCA)(LMK)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1334 ORDER of USCA (07-36057) as to #1279 Notice of Appeal filed by Kathleen J Kennedy, David A Williams, Jeffrey Clark, Richard Dawson, Marlene Dawson, Lillian G Whitney, Kenneth G Dawson, Mildred K Clark (LMK)
September 9, 2009 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #1332 Affidavit : Docket entry correction: to read Order, previously posted as affidavit (CL)
September 9, 2009 Filing 1333 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1332 Order. (Service of corrected image of Order and attachments is attached). (Attachments: #1 affidavit, #2 cover letter)(CL)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1332 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, J. Thorson). Modified on 9/9/2009 (CL).
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1331 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $474.51, payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master. The Clerk is directed to electronically file this Order, but need not provideconventional service, i.e., copies via mail. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website. cc: Financial. (KL)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1330 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Fin'l, J. Thorson). (KL)
July 2, 2009 Filing 1329 MEMORANDUM of USCA (07-36057, NOT THE MANDATE) as to #1279 Notice of Appeal filed by Kathleen J Kennedy, David A Williams, Jeffrey Clark, Richard Dawson, Marlene Dawson, Lillian G Whitney, Kenneth G Dawson, Mildred K Clark, AFFIRMED. (SA)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1328 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(cc: Fin'l, J. Thorson). (RS)
June 29, 2009 Filing 1327 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Special Master John E. Thorson re #1326 Report Federal Water Master's Annual Report 2008-2009. (Thorson, John)
June 29, 2009 Filing 1326 REPORT Federal Water Master's Annual Report 2008-2009. (Thorson, John)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1325 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: fin'l, J. Thorson). (CL)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1324 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: fin'l, J. Thorson).(CL)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1323 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: fin'l, J. Thorson). (CL) Modified on 2/5/2009 (CL).
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1322 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Having reviewed the billing statement, and having received no objections thereto, the Court hereby ORDERS: The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $2,941.47, payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859, the Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website. (CL). (cc: J. Thorson, financial) Modified on 2/5/2009 (CL).
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1321 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Fundsby Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MD, copy to Fin'l Dept)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1320 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. THIS MATTER comes before the Court upon the billing statement of the Water Master for the period ending August 31, 2008. The Court hereby ORDERS: The Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $200.00, payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master, and addressed to 376 River Road West, Plains, MT 59859. The Clerk is directed to electronically file this Order, but need not provide conventional service, i.e., copies via mail. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website. (cc: John E. Thorson, Financial).(CL)
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1319 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Clerk shall disburse from the Registry account maintained for this case a check in the amount of $1,313.12, payable to John E. Thorson, Water Master. The Water Master shall post a copy of this Order on his website. (cc: JE Thorson/Water Master, Fin'l).(CL)
August 21, 2008 Filing 1318 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1311 Order addressed to Yvonne Salomon (CL)
August 19, 2008 Filing 1317 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1311 Order addressed to Ellen W. Koay (CL)
August 18, 2008 Filing 1316 Mail Returned as Undeliverable/deceased re #1311 Order addressed to Eunice Olsen. Party removed from mailing list. (CL)
August 18, 2008 Filing 1315 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1311 Order addressed to Wm and Helen Hamilton (CL)
August 18, 2008 Filing 1314 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1311 Order addressed to Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (CL)
August 15, 2008 Filing 1313 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1311 Omnibus Order addressed to Larry A and Robyn G Gustafson (MD)
August 13, 2008 Filing 1312 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1302 Stipulation and Order, addressed to Yvonne Solomon (CL)
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1311 OMNIBUS ORDER, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: pro-se parties, John E. Thorson, Intake, Fin'l, Docket, J. Bubnis).(CL).
July 23, 2008 Filing 1310 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Thomas S. Zilly- Dep Clerk: Gail Glass, Law Clerk: Kathryn Kim; Pla Counsel: James Cooney, Harry Johnsen and Ralph Jefferson; Def Counsel: Barbara Markham for Department of Ecology - Tim Slater for Georgia Manor, Harnden Island View, and Sunset Water Ass'ns - and Eugene Knapp for Various Property Owners; CR: Barry Fanning; Status Conference held on 7/23/2008. John E. Thorson, the Water Master appointed by the Court, and Janet Bubnis and Charlotte Svendsen of the Clerks Office, were present. The Court, the Water Master, the representatives of the Clerks Office, and counsel discuss various logistical matters. The Court will enter an omnibus order concerning such matters. (GG)
July 22, 2008 Filing 1309 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1302 Stipulation and Order, addressed to Kelly & Dane Brooks (CL)
July 21, 2008 Filing 1308 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1302 Stipulation and Order, addressed to Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (CL)
July 17, 2008 Filing 1307 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1302 Stipulation and Order, addressed to David Crist (CL)
July 17, 2008 Filing 1306 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1302 Stipulation and Order, addressed to Ellen W. Koay (CL)
July 15, 2008 Filing 1305 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1295 Affidavit, #1296 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings addressed to Yvonne Solomon (CL)
July 15, 2008 Filing 1304 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1295 Affidavit, #1296 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings addressed to Reuben Rudy (CL)
July 14, 2008 Filing 1303 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1302 Stipulation and Order, addressed to Kelly and Dane Brooks. (Address updated and re-mailed). (CL)
July 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1302 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court extends the 2008 deadline for State of Washington, Department of Ecology to mail notice of annual fees pursuant to the Settlement Agreement, Section V.G. 1, from August 1, 2008 to September 1, 2008.(CL)
July 9, 2008 Filing 1301 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #1300 Stipulation and Order to Extend Deadline for Mailing Notice of Annual Fees. (Markham, Barbara)
July 9, 2008 Filing 1300 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline for Mailing Notice of Annual Fees by parties. (Markham, Barbara)
June 20, 2008 Filing 1299 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1295 Affidavit, #1296 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings addressed to Ellen W. Koay (CL)
June 20, 2008 Filing 1298 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1295 Affidavit, #1296 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings addressed to David Crist (CL)
June 18, 2008 Filing 1297 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1295 Affidavit, #1296 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings addressed to Eunice Olsen (CL)
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1296 ORDER APPOINTING WATER MASTER, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. A status conference to discuss budgeting and other logistical issues is scheduled for July 23, 2008, at 9:00 a.m. (cc: pro-se parties, Water Master, John E. Thorson. Bruce Rifkin)(CL).
June 5, 2008 Filing 1295 AFFIDAVIT of John E. Thorson under FRCP 53(b)(3)(A). (CL)
March 24, 2008 Filing 1294 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1286 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, addressed to Frazier Family Cabin, LLC (CL, )
March 20, 2008 Filing 1293 Joint MOTION to Appoint Water Master by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Resume of Philip J. Buri#2 Exhibit B: Resume of Raquel Montoya-Lewis#3 Exhibit C : Resume of John E. Thorson#4 Certificate of Service)Noting Date 4/4/2008.(Cooney, James)
March 6, 2008 Filing 1292 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1286 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, addressed to David Crist (CL, )
March 6, 2008 Filing 1291 Mail Returned as Undeliverable/deceased re #1286 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, addressed to Eunice Olsen (CL, )
March 6, 2008 Filing 1290 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1286 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, addressed to Robert D. Hoover. (re-mailed to updated address). (CL, )
March 6, 2008 Filing 1289 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1286 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, addressed to Ellen W. Koay (CL, )
March 5, 2008 Filing 1288 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1286 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, addressed to Terry W. Roal (CL, )
March 5, 2008 Filing 1287 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1286 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, addressed to David and Ruth Snead (CL, )
February 29, 2008 Filing 1286 MINUTE ORDER by Thomas S. Zilly, United States District Judge. The Court GRANTS Motion for Extension of Time to submit Water Master nominations, docket no. #1284 . Nominations of candidates for the position of Water Master shall be submitted via motion filed by March 20, 2008, and noted for the third Friday after filing and service.(CL, )
February 27, 2008 Filing 1285 RESPONSE, by Defendant Marlene Dawson, to #1284 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Names of Water Master Candidates. (CL, )
February 19, 2008 Filing 1284 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Names of Water Master Candidates by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)Noting Date 2/28/2008.(Cooney, James)
January 8, 2008 Filing 1283 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Defendants Jeffrey Clark, Mildred K Clark, Kenneth G Dawson, Richard Dawson, Marlene Dawson, David Williams, Gail Whitney, Wes Whitney, Debra Sofie, Linda Jolly, Pro se, for proceedings: None requested. (SA, )
December 26, 2007 Filing 1282 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1273 Order and Judgment, addressed to Yvonne Solomon (RS, )
December 19, 2007 Filing 1281 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (07-36057) as to #1279 Notice of Appeal filed by Kathleen J Kennedy, David A Williams, Jeffrey Clark, Richard Dawson, Marlene Dawson, Lillian G Whitney, Kenneth G Dawson, Mildred K Clark : Appellant shall notify Appellee regarding transcripts by 12/24/07; Appellee to notify Appellant regarding any additional transcripts by 01/02/08; Transcript designation due by 01/14/08; Transcript by court reporter due by 02/12/08; Appellants opening brief due by 03/31/08; Appellees response brief due by 04/29/08; Appellants optional reply brief due within 14 days of service of the response brief. (LMK, )
December 14, 2007 Filing 1280 APPEAL NOTIFICATION packet sent to US Court of Appeals re #1279 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Docket)(LMK, )
December 13, 2007 Appeal Fees received: fee in the amount of $ 455 (receipt # SEA14130) re #1279 Notice of Appeal filed by Kathleen J Kennedy, David A Williams, Jeffrey Clark, Richard Dawson, Marlene Dawson, Lillian G Whitney, Kenneth G Dawson, Mildred K Clark (LMK, )
December 13, 2007 Filing 1279 NOTICE OF APPEAL (07-36057) as to #1273 Judgment, by Defendants David A Williams, Jeffrey Clark, Mildred K Clark, Kenneth G Dawson, Kathleen J Kennedy, Richard Dawson, Marlene Dawson. (LMK, ) Modified on 12/20/2007; added CCA case number (LMK, ).
November 28, 2007 Filing 1278 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1262 Order addressed to Yvonne Solomon. (no updated address on record). (CL, )
November 28, 2007 Filing 1277 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1273 Judgment, addressed to David Crist. (no updated address on record). (CL, )
November 28, 2007 Filing 1276 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1273 Judgment, addressed to Eunice Olsen (no updated address on record). (CL, )
November 28, 2007 Filing 1275 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1273 Judgment, addressed to Ellen W. Koay (no updated address on record). (CL, )
November 26, 2007 Filing 1274 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1273 Judgment, addressed to Damien Fisher (address updated, Order re-mailed). (CL, )
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1273 ORDER AND JUDGMENT by Thomas S. Zilly, US District Judge. The Court approves the final Settlement Agreement, docket nos. #1264 -1 through #1264 -10. The Court vacates its prior Order, docket no. #779 , and Amended Order, docket no. #794 . All parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees incurred in this matter.
November 19, 2007 Filing 1272 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1262 Order addressed to Eunice Olsen (CL, )
November 16, 2007 Filing 1271 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1262 Order addressed to Randy and Anastasia Kiefer (Address updated and order re-mailed to dft). (CL, )
November 16, 2007 Filing 1270 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1262 Order addressed to Jeffrey and Mildres Clark (Address updated, order re-mailed). (CL, )
November 15, 2007 Filing 1269 NOTICE of Change of Address Filed by Defendants Craig E Bessire, Barbara J Bessire, Leeward-Northgate Water Association. (Docket updated)(CL, )
November 15, 2007 Filing 1268 RESPONSE by Plaintiff United States of America re #1262 Order -Response Re:Form of draft Order and Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cooney, James)
November 13, 2007 Filing 1267 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to David Crist. (no updated address on record). (CL, )
November 13, 2007 Filing 1265 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America. (Cooney, James)
November 13, 2007 Filing 1264 NOTICE of Filing Final Settlement Agreement ; filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement#2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B#4 Exhibit C#5 Exhibit D#6 Exhibit E#7 Exhibit F#8 Exhibit G#9 Exhibit H#10 Exhibit I)(Cooney, James)
November 9, 2007 Filing 1266 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1262 Order addressed to Ellen W. Koay. (No updated address on record). (CL, )
November 6, 2007 Filing 1263 Letter from Marlene Dawson regarding Lummi's Proposed Water Settlement. (TS, )
November 2, 2007 Noting Date Set/Reset re #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order : Re-Noting Date 11/16/2007. (TS, )
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1262 ORDER CONDITIONALLY APPROVING SETTLEMENT, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (Attachments: #1 Draft Order and Judgment)(TS, )
October 29, 2007 Filing 1261 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1248 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, #1249 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Randy and Anastasia Kiefer (TS, )
October 19, 2007 Filing 1260 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1248 Order of Dismissal, #1249 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Yvonne Solomon (TS, )
October 10, 2007 Filing 1259 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1248 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, #1249 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Charles Baker (TS, )
October 10, 2007 Filing 1258 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1248 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, #1249 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to David Crist (TS, )
October 10, 2007 Filing 1257 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1248 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, #1249 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Ellen Koay (TS, )
October 10, 2007 Filing 1256 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1248 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, #1249 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Eunice Olsen (TS, )
October 9, 2007 Filing 1255 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1248 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, #1249 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Damien Fisher (Re-mailed to new address) (CL, )
October 4, 2007 Filing 1254 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS-Summon Issued. (TS, )
October 2, 2007 Filing 1250 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) all defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cooney, James)
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1249 ORDER Granting #1240 Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint and To Add Landowner Thomas R. Ficca as a Party by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint. (TS, )
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1248 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court GRANTS the unopposed #1233 motion to dismiss parties. Defendants Randall L Stocker and Debbra A Wittig terminated. (TS, )
September 28, 2007 Filing 1247 RESPONSE, by Defendant Marlene Dawson, to #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order. (Response is missing the signature). (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5#2 Certificate of service)(CL, )
September 28, 2007 Filing 1246 RESPONSE, by Defendant Gloria Hanson, to #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order. (CL, )
September 27, 2007 Filing 1245 RESPONSE, by Defendants David A Williams, Zena M Morton, Tod Williams, to #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits#2 Certificate of service)(CL, )
September 14, 2007 Filing 1244 RESPONSE, by Defendants Shirley M Bezona, Wayne W Walker, Kimberlee S Walker, Robert D Bezona, Jeffrey Clark, Mildred K Clark, to #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order. (CL, )
September 12, 2007 Filing 1243 RESPONSE by Plaintiff United States of America re #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order -Settling Parties' Reponse to Issues Raised by Court. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Pages of Settlement Agreement#2 Revised Proposed JudgmentandOrder#3 Proposed Order Conditionally Approving Settlement#4 Certificate of Service)(Cooney, James)
September 7, 2007 Filing 1242 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1229 Decree, #1228 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment, #1230 Order to Re-Note Motion, addressed to Ellen W. Koay (CL, )
September 7, 2007 Filing 1241 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1229 Decree, #1228 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment, #1230 Order to Re-Note Motion, addressed to David Crist (CL, )
September 7, 2007 Filing 1240 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Noting Date 9/18/2007.(Cooney, James)
August 31, 2007 Filing 1239 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1229 Decree, #1228 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment, #1230 Order to Re-Note Motion, addressed to Eunice Olson (CL, )
August 31, 2007 Filing 1238 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1229 Decree, #1228 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment, #1230 Order to Re-Note Motion, addressed to Janet Stockton. (address updated and mailed to dft). (CL, )
August 29, 2007 Filing 1237 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1229 Decree, #1228 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment, #1230 Order to Re-Note Motion, addressed to Erin C. Rowniak (address updated and re-mailed). (CL, )
August 29, 2007 Filing 1236 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1218 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, Add and Terminate Parties, #1219 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief addressed to David Crist (CL, )
August 29, 2007 Filing 1235 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1208 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to David Crist (CL, )
August 28, 2007 Filing 1234 DECLARATION of Defendants Randall Stocker and Debbra Wittig filed by Defendants Randall L Stocker, Debbra A Wittig re #1233 MOTION to Dismiss Party Randall Stocker and Debbra Wittig (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
August 28, 2007 Filing 1233 MOTION to Dismiss Party Randall Stocker and Debbra Wittig by Defendants Randall L Stocker, Debbra A Wittig. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)Noting Date 9/28/2007.(Knapp, Eugene)
August 23, 2007 Filing 1232 NOTICE/acknowledgment receipt of sums and complaint filed by Defendant Reatha P. Rudy. (CL, )
August 23, 2007 Filing 1231 NOTICE of Attaching Image/Document re #1230 Order to Re-Note Motion,. (Service of image is attached). (CL, )
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1230 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court hereby RENOTES the Joint Motion to Approve Settlement, docket no. #1056 , to September 14, 2007, and directs the parties to file any related supplemental materials on or before the new noting date.(CL, )Modified on 8/23/2007 (CL, ).
August 21, 2007 Filing 1229 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Dft Paula Casey,by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1228 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court GRANTS #1227 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment as to dft Paula Casey.(CL, )
August 17, 2007 Filing 1227 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with Individual Defendant Paula Casey by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Consent Decree#2 Attachment A#3 Proposed Order #4 Certificate of Service)Noting Date 8/17/2007.(Johnsen, Harry)
August 16, 2007 Filing 1226 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1218 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, Add and Terminate Parties, #1219 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief addressed to Ellen W. Koay (CL, )
August 7, 2007 Filing 1225 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 06/26/07 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Court Reporter: B. Fanning. (LMK, )
August 6, 2007 Filing 1224 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1218 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, Add and Terminate Parties, #1219 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief addressed to Randy and Anastasia Kiefer (CL, )
August 3, 2007 Filing 1223 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1218 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, Add and Terminate Parties, #1219 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief addressed to Janet Stockton (CL, )
August 3, 2007 Filing 1222 Letter from atty James B. Cooney re settlement agreement. (CL, )
August 2, 2007 Filing 1221 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1218 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, Add and Terminate Parties, #1219 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief addressed to Charles G. Baker (CL, )
August 2, 2007 Filing 1220 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1218 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, Add and Terminate Parties, #1219 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief addressed to Eunice Olsen (CL, )
July 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1219 MINUTE ORDER denying #1143 Motion to Reinstate a Finding of the Court, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (BP). Modified text on 7/26/2007 (CL, ).
July 25, 2007 Filing 1218 Minute Order is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Thomas S. Zilly, United States District Judge. The Court GRANTS #1211 Dfts; Motion to Dismiss Parties. Dfts Claire L Carlin and Bruce D Wonder terminated. (CL, )
July 23, 2007 Filing 1217 Letter from Marlene Dawson re news releases. (CL, )
July 23, 2007 Filing 1216 Letter from Linnea G. Smith : copy of letter sent to Barbara Markham, Assistant Atty General, Olympia re proposed settlement terms. (CL, )
July 20, 2007 Filing 1215 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sms issued). (CL, )
July 16, 2007 Filing 1214 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1208 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Eunice Olson (CL, )
July 16, 2007 Filing 1213 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1208 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Ellen W. Koay (CL, )
July 16, 2007 Filing 1212 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1202 Minute Order addressed to Yvonne J. Solomon (CL, )
July 12, 2007 Filing 1211 MOTION to Dismiss Parties by Defendants Bruce D Wonder, Claire L Carlin. Noting Date 8/10/2007.(CL, ) Modified text on 7/17/2007 (CL, ).
July 12, 2007 Filing 1210 Tenth AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) all defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cooney, James)
July 9, 2007 Filing 1209 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1202 Minute Order addressed to Charles G. Baker and Chandos Maree (TS, )
July 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1208 ORDER granting #1205 Motion to Amend the Complaint to Add Landowners, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint.(CL, )
July 3, 2007 Filing 1205 MOTION to Amend Complaint to Add New Landowners by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Noting Date 7/13/2007.(Cooney, James)
July 2, 2007 Filing 1207 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1202 Minute Order addressed to Eunice Olsen (CL, )
July 2, 2007 Filing 1206 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1202 Minute Order addressed to Ellen W. Koay (CL, )
June 26, 2007 Filing 1253 RESPONSE, by Defendant David A Williams, to #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order. (CL, )
June 26, 2007 Filing 1252 RESPONSE, by Defendant Kathleen J Kennedy, to #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order. (CL, )
June 26, 2007 Filing 1251 RESPONSE, by Defendants Wayne W Walker, Kimberlee S Walker, to #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2)(CL, )
June 26, 2007 Filing 1204 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Thomas S. Zilly - Dep Clerk: Gail Glass; Pla Counsel: James Cooney, Harry Johnsen and Jane Marx; Def Counsel: Tim Slater, Gene Knapp and Barbara Markham; CR: Barry Fanning; PRO SE OBJECTORS: Marlene Dawson, Fred Larsen, Wayne and Kim Walker, David Williams, Kathy Kennedy, Peter Osvaldik, Gloria Hanson and Robert Bezona; Motion Hearing held on 6/26/2007 The Court hears from the Settling Parties on the terms and conditions of the Settlement Agreement. The Court DENIES the Settling Parties various Motions to Strike, and will consider the arguments and evidence of the Objectors to the extent they comport with the Civil Rules and the Federal Rules of Evidence. The Court DENIES the Settling Parties Motions for Summary Disposition, docket nos. #1113 & #1127 ; the Court will consider these motions together with all objections in evaluating the Settlement Agreement. The Court hears from the parties Objecting to the Settlement Agreement, and hears rebuttal arguments from the Settling Parties. The Court takes the matter under advisement. (GG, )
June 25, 2007 Filing 1203 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1197 Order on Motion to Substitute, Add and Terminate Parties, #1194 Decree, #1198 Minute Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #1196 Order, Add and Terminate Parties, #1195 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment addressed to Eunice Olsen. (no updated address on record). (CL, )
June 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1202 Minute Order re agenda for oral argument scheduled for Tuesday, June 26, 2007 at 9:00am, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
June 21, 2007 Filing 1201 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1197 Order on Motion to Substitute, Add and Terminate Parties, #1194 Decree, #1198 Minute Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #1196 Order, Add and Terminate Parties, #1195 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment addressed to Ellen W. Koay (no updated address on record). (CL, )
June 21, 2007 Filing 1200 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1197 Order on Motion to Substitute, Add and Terminate Parties, #1194 Decree, #1198 Minute Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #1196 Order, Add and Terminate Parties, #1195 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment addressed to Christina Ysaguirre-Boersma (no updated address on record). (CL, )
June 19, 2007 Filing 1199 NOTICE of Corrections to Proposed Settlement Agreement re #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order ; filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Agreement re: Corrections to Settlement Agreement#2 Corrected Exhibit C to Settlement Agreement#3 Corrected Exhibit D to Settlement Agreement#4 Certificate of Service)(Johnsen, Harry)
June 14, 2007 Filing 1198 Minute Order is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Thomas S. Zilly, United States District Judge. Due to the Courts trial calendar, the time set aside for oral argument scheduled for Tuesday, June 26, 2007 will be from 9:00 a.m. to 12:00 noon. (cl)
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1197 ORDER Granting #1183 Motion to Substitute a party, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. It is ORDERED that dft James K. Temple is hereby sustituted as party/defendant in place of Thomas K. Thrall and /or Federal National Mortgage Association.(CL, )
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1196 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. IT IS ORDERED that all claims against dft Brandi Curran are DISMISSED W/out prejudice and w/out costs to any party.
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1195 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court GRANTS #1188 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment between United States, Lummi Nation and dft Bonnie Rogers. Dft Bonnie Rogers is DISMISSED as a party to this action.(CL, )
June 14, 2007 Filing 1194 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Bonnie J. Rogers,by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Modified text on 6/18/2007 (CL, ). (certf. copy sent to Atty H. L. Johnson).
May 30, 2007 Filing 1193 NOTICE of Appearance of pro se dfts Ronald F Pollard and Lynette J. Pollard(CL, )
May 29, 2007 Filing 1192 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1174 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Yvonne J. Solomon (TS, )
May 29, 2007 Filing 1191 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1174 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Ellen W Koay (TS,)
May 29, 2007 Filing 1190 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1166 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, #1165 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, addressed to Yvonne J. Solomon (TS, )
May 24, 2007 Filing 1189 PRAECIPE to attach document (Consent Decree) re #1188 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with Individual "Pumper" Defendant Bonnie Rogers by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Johnsen, Harry)
May 24, 2007 Filing 1188 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with Individual "Pumper" Defendant Bonnie Rogers by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A (settlement agreement)#2 Proposed Order #3 Certificate of Service)Noting Date 5/24/2007.(Johnsen, Harry)
May 24, 2007 Filing 1187 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1174 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Frank Dance (Record updated and re-mailed order) (CL, )
May 17, 2007 Filing 1186 DECLARATION of Defendant Troy Curran with Regard to Parcel No. 380124 062467 0000 filed by Defendant Troy D Curran re #1185 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Brandi Curran (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
May 17, 2007 Filing 1185 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Brandi Curran by Defendant Troy D Curran. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)Noting Date 6/8/2007.(Knapp, Eugene)
May 17, 2007 Filing 1184 DECLARATION of James K. Temple filed by Defendant James K Temple re #1183 MOTION to Substitute Party (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
May 17, 2007 Filing 1183 MOTION to Substitute Party by Defendant James K Temple. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)Noting Date 6/8/2007.(Knapp, Eugene)
May 16, 2007 Filing 1182 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1166 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, #1165 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, addressed to Ellen Koay. (TS, )
May 14, 2007 Filing 1181 NOTICE ; filed by Defendant Erin C Rowniak re: no longer owns land.(CL, )
May 11, 2007 Filing 1180 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1174 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Eunice Olsen (CL, )
May 9, 2007 Filing 1179 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS. (5 sms issued). (CL, )
May 9, 2007 Filing 1178 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1174 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Brett L. Randmel (CL, )
May 8, 2007 Filing 1177 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1166 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, #1165 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, addressed to Eunice Olsen (CL, )
May 4, 2007 Filing 1176 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1166 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, #1165 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, addressed to Brett Randmel (TS, )
May 4, 2007 Filing 1175 Ninth AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) all defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cooney, James)
May 3, 2007 Filing 1173 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #1172 Response to Motion Joint Reply to Walkers' Motion for Hearing and Dismissal of Summary Judgment by Settling Parties (Dkt. 1162). (Markham, Barbara)
May 3, 2007 Filing 1172 RESPONSE, by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington, to #1162 MOTION for Hearing. (Markham, Barbara)
May 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1174 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #1170 Leave to Amend Complaint To Add Landowners As Parties. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint. by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(TS, ) Modified text on 5/4/2007 (TS, ).
May 2, 2007 Filing 1171 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1161 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, addressed to Yvonne Solomon (CL, )
May 2, 2007 Filing 1170 MOTION to Amend Complaint to Add New Landowners as Parties by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Noting Date 5/11/2007.(Cooney, James)
April 30, 2007 Filing 1168 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1161 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, addressed to Brett L. Randmel (CL, )
April 30, 2007 Filing 1167 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1161 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, Terminate Motions addressed to Ellen W. Koay (CL, )
April 30, 2007 Filing 1166 MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Thomas S. Zilly, United States District Judge. The Court schedules a hearing on Tuesday, June 26, 2007 at 9:00am to consider the Settlement Agreement proposed in the Joint Motion to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order, docket no. #1056 , together with objections to the settlement and all other pending motions.(CL, )
April 30, 2007 Filing 1165 MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Thomas S. Zilly, United States District Judge. The Court DENIES #1152 Dfts David Williams, Zena Morton and Ted Williams Joint Motion to Deny Request to Enter Land. Dfts David Williams, Zena Morton, and Ted Williams request for additional discovery is DENIED.(CL, )
April 27, 2007 Filing 1164 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1161 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, Terminate Motions addressed to Eunice Olsen (CL, )
April 26, 2007 Filing 1169 NOTICE of Change of Address Filed by Defendant Craig E Bessire. (CL, )
April 24, 2007 Filing 1163 DECLARATION of Gloria Hanson filed by Defendant Gloria Hanson re #1127 Joint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 ObjectionsJoint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 Objections, #1113 Joint MOTION for Summary Disposition of Certain Issues Raised in Objections to proposed Settlement Agreement re #1082 Objections, #1084 Response to Motion, #1101 Objections, #1102 ResponseJoint MOTION for Summary Disposition of Certain Issues Raised in Objections to proposed Settlement Agreement re #1082 Objections, #1084 Response to Motion, #1101 Objections, #1102 Response (CL, )
April 18, 2007 Filing 1162 MOTION for Hearing and Dismissal of Summary Judgment by Settling Parties, docket no. #1127 , by Defendants Wayne W Walker, Kimberlee S Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1,2,3). Noting Date 5/4/2007.(CL, )
April 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1161 ORDER granting #1136 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Gene Knapp terminated as atty for dfts Kathleen J Kennedy, Donald Weber.(CL, )
April 13, 2007 Filing 1160 Letter from Donald R Weber and Kathy K Weber re #1127 Joint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 Objections Joint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 Objections. (CL, )
April 11, 2007 Filing 1159 REQUEST by Defendant Fred C Larsen for to introduce evidence a recently found relevant document. (CL, )
April 11, 2007 Filing 1158 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America of Joint Consolidated Reply of Settling Parties to Responses to Motions for Summary Disposition of Objections to Proposed Settlement. (Cooney, James)
April 11, 2007 Filing 1157 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff United States of America, TO RESPONSE to #1113 Joint MOTION for Summary Disposition of Certain Issues Raised in Objections to proposed Settlement Agreement re #1082 Objections, #1084 Response to Motion, #1101 Objections, #1102 ResponseJoint MOTION for Summary Disposition of Certain Issues Raised in Objections to proposed Settlement Agreement re #1082 Objections, #1084 Response to Motion, #1101 Objections, #1102 Response (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Harry L. Johnsen#2 Declaration of James B. Cooney#3 Declaration of Kristin Julier#4 Declaration of Tyler Schroeder#5 Declaration of Andrew Dunn)(Cooney, James)
April 6, 2007 Filing 1156 RESPONSE, by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation, to #1143 MOTION to Reinstate a Finding of the Court. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Johnsen, Harry)
April 6, 2007 Filing 1154 RESPONSE, by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington, to #1152 MOTION to deny request to enter land to inspect. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Markham, Barbara)
April 5, 2007 Filing 1155 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1125 Order, #1126 Order addressed to Yvonee J. Solomon. (CL, )
April 4, 2007 Filing 1153 NOTICE Of Cancellation of Deposition of William Purnell ; filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Johnsen, Harry)
April 3, 2007 Filing 1152 MOTION to deny request to enter land to inspect by Defendants David A Williams, Zena M Morton. Noting Date 4/20/2007.(CL, )
March 30, 2007 Filing 1151 REPLY, filed by Defendant David A Williams, TO RESPONSE to #1127 Joint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 ObjectionsJoint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 Objections (RS, )
March 30, 2007 Filing 1150 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION of Willard D. Purnell on 04/06/2007. Filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Johnsen, Harry)
March 28, 2007 Filing 1149 RESPONSE, by Defendants C Dean Hanson, Gloria Hanson, to #1127 Joint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 ObjectionsJoint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 Objections. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(CL, )
March 28, 2007 Filing 1148 DECLARATION by Defendant Willard D Purnell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(CL, )
March 28, 2007 Filing 1147 RESPONSE, by Defendant David A Williams, to #1113 Joint MOTION for Summary Disposition of Certain Issues Raised in Objections to proposed Settlement Agreement re #1082 Objections, #1084 Response to Motion, #1101 Objections, #1102 ResponseJoint MOTION for Summary Disposition of Certain Issues Raised in Objections to proposed Settlement Agreement re #1082 Objections, #1084 Response to Motion, #1101 Objections, #1102 Response. (CL, )
March 27, 2007 Filing 1146 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1145 Response to Motion,. (Service of corrected image is attached, showing complete pleading). (CL, )
March 27, 2007 Filing 1145 RESPONSE, by Defendant Marlene Dawson, to #1113 Joint MOTION for Summary Disposition of Certain Issues Raised in Objections to proposed Settlement Agreement re #1082 Objections, #1084 Response to Motion, #1101 Objections, #1102 ResponseJoint MOTION for Summary Disposition of Certain Issues Raised in Objections to proposed Settlement Agreement re #1082 Objections, #1084 Response to Motion, #1101 Objections, #1102 Response. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits#2 certificate of service)(CL, )
March 27, 2007 Filing 1144 RESPONSE, by Defendant Marlene Dawson, to #1127 Joint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 ObjectionsJoint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 Objections. (CL, )
March 27, 2007 Filing 1143 MOTION to Reinstate a Finding of the Court by Defendant Marlene Dawson. Noting Date 4/13/2007.(CL, )
March 27, 2007 Filing 1142 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (7 sms issued). (CL, )
March 27, 2007 Filing 1141 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1125 Order, #1126 Order addressed to Ellen W. Koay (CL, )
March 27, 2007 Filing 1140 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1125 Order, #1126 Order addressed to Eunice Olsen. (CL, )
March 26, 2007 Filing 1139 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1125 Order, #1126 Order addressed to Brett L. Randmel. (CL, )
March 21, 2007 Filing 1138 RESPONSE, by Defendant Chuck R Mccord, to #1127 Joint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 ObjectionsJoint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 Objections. (CL, )
March 20, 2007 Filing 1137 DECLARATION of and Memorandum of Gene Knapp in Support of Withdrawal filed by Defendants Donald Weber, Kathleen K Weber, Kathleen J Kennedy re #1136 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and to Substitute Defendants Pro Se (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
March 20, 2007 Filing 1136 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and to Substitute Defendants Pro Se by Defendants Donald Weber, Kathleen K Weber, Kathleen J Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)Noting Date 4/13/2007.(Knapp, Eugene)
March 20, 2007 Filing 1135 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America re #1134 Amended Complaint. (Cooney, James)
March 20, 2007 Filing 1134 Eighth AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) all defendants, filed by United States of America.(Cooney, James)
March 19, 2007 Filing 1133 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #1130 Declaration,, #1129 Declaration,, #1131 Declaration,, #1128 Response, #1127 Joint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 ObjectionsJoint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 Objections, #1132 Declaration,,. (Markham, Barbara)
March 19, 2007 Filing 1132 DECLARATION of Kris Heintz filed by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #1127 Joint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 ObjectionsJoint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 Objections (Markham, Barbara)
March 19, 2007 Filing 1131 DECLARATION of Linnea Smith filed by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #1127 Joint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 ObjectionsJoint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 Objections (Markham, Barbara)
March 19, 2007 Filing 1130 DECLARATION of Andrew B. Dunn filed by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #1127 Joint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 ObjectionsJoint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 Objections (Markham, Barbara)
March 19, 2007 Filing 1129 DECLARATION of Harry L. Johnsen filed by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #1127 Joint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 ObjectionsJoint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 Objections (Markham, Barbara)
March 19, 2007 Filing 1128 RESPONSE by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #1101 Objections. (Markham, Barbara)
March 19, 2007 Filing 1127 Joint MOTION Summary Disposition of Issues Regarding 350 Gallons Per Day Limitation Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement re #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement, #1101 Objections by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington. Noting Date 5/3/2007.(Markham, Barbara)
March 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF PARTIES, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. IT IS ORDERED that George Schmidt, Roger Schmidt and Julie Strand are substituted as parties/dfts in place of the deceased Richard Schmidt.(CL, )
March 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1125 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court GRANTS #1116 MOTION to Amend Seventh Amended Complaint to add Landowners as Parties filed by United States of America. (CL, )
March 14, 2007 Filing 1124 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1115 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, addressed to Yvonne Solomon. (CL, )
March 13, 2007 Filing 1123 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1115 Order on Motion to Remove Names from Settlement Agreement, addressed to Ellen Koay. (CL, ) Modified on 3/14/2007 (CL, ).
March 13, 2007 Filing 1122 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1115 Order on Motion to Remove Names from Settlement Agreement, addressed to Eunice Olsen. (CL, ) Modified on 3/14/2007 (CL, ).
March 6, 2007 Filing 1121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #1119 Request, #1120 Request, #1118 Request. (Markham, Barbara)
March 6, 2007 Filing 1120 REQUEST to David A. Williams by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington for Permission to Enter on Land to Inspect. (Markham, Barbara)
March 6, 2007 Filing 1119 REQUEST to Tod Williams by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington for Permission to Enter on Land to Inspect. (Markham, Barbara)
March 6, 2007 Filing 1118 REQUEST to Zena Morton by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington for Permission to Enter on Land to Inspect. (Markham, Barbara)
March 5, 2007 Filing 1117 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1115 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, addressed to Brett Randmel. (CL, )
March 2, 2007 Noting Date Set: #1113 Joint MOTION for Summary Disposition of Certain Issues Raised in Objections to proposed Settlement Agreement re #1082 Objections, #1084 Response to Motion, #1101 Objections, #1102 ResponseJoint MOTION for Summary Disposition of Certain Issues Raised in Objections to proposed Settlement Agreement re #1082 Objections, #1084 Response to Motion, #1101 Objections, #1102 Response. Noting Date 4/12/2007. (CL, )
March 2, 2007 Filing 1116 MOTION to Amend Seventh Amended Complaint by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Noting Date 3/13/2007.(Cooney, James)
March 1, 2007 Filing 1115 MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Thomas S. Zilly, United States District Judge. The Court GRANTS #1099 Wayne and Kimberlee Walker's Motion to Remove Names from Settlement Agreement Based on New Information. (CL, ) Modified text on 3/1/2007 (CL, ).
February 27, 2007 Filing 1114 ERRATA re #1113 Joint MOTION for Summary Disposition of Certain Issues Raised in Objections to proposed Settlement Agreement re #1082 Objections, #1084 Response to Motion, #1101 Objections, #1102 ResponseJoint MOTION for Summary Disposition of Certain Issues Raised in Objections to proposed Settlement Agreement re #1082 Objections, #1084 Response to Motion, #1101 Objections, #1102 Response by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Page 1 of Joint Motion for Summary Disposition of Certain Issues Raised in Objections to Settlement Agreement)(Cooney, James)
February 26, 2007 Filing 1113 Joint MOTION for Summary Disposition of Certain Issues Raised in Objections to proposed Settlement Agreement re #1082 Objections, #1084 Response to Motion, #1101 Objections, #1102 Response by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James B Cooney#2 Certificate of Service)(Cooney, James)
February 26, 2007 Filing 1112 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, CORRECT PLEADING FILED UNDER DOCKET no. #1113 . RESPONSE by Plaintiff United States of America re #1082 Objections, #1084 Response to Motion, #1101 Objections, #1102 Response. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James B. Cooney#2 Certificate of Service)(Cooney, James) Modified text on 2/26/2007 (CL, ). Modified on 2/26/2007 (CL, ).
February 20, 2007 Filing 1111 RESPONSE by Defendants Whatcom County of, Ecology Department of the State of Washington, Plaintiffs United States of America, Lummi Nation, Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation re #1081 Objections of Bonnie Rogers. (Markham, Barbara)
February 20, 2007 Filing 1110 RESPONSE, by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation, to #1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement. (Johnsen, Harry)
February 16, 2007 Filing 1109 NOTICE by Plaintiff United States of America re #1105 Notice to Take Deposition Cancellation of Kathleen Kennedy and Don Weber (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Johnsen, Harry)
February 14, 2007 Filing 1108 DECLARATION of George Schmidt filed by Defendant George Schmidt re #1107 MOTION to Substitute Parties (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
February 14, 2007 Filing 1107 MOTION to Substitute Parties by Defendant George Schmidt. Noting Date 3/9/2007. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
February 8, 2007 Filing 1106 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America. (Cooney, James)
February 8, 2007 Filing 1105 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kathy Kennedy and Don Weber on 2/21/07 by Plaintiff United States of America.(Cooney, James)
February 8, 2007 Filing 1104 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Marlene and Richard Dawson on 2/21/07 by Plaintiff United States of America.(Cooney, James)
February 7, 2007 Filing 1103 Letter from Kathy Kennedy, Don Weber re #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order. (CL, )
February 6, 2007 Filing 1102 RESPONSE by Defendant Chuck R Mccord re #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order. (CL, )
February 6, 2007 Filing 1101 OBJECTIONS to #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order by Defendant Marlene Dawson. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(CL, )
February 6, 2007 Filing 1100 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Wayne & Kimberlee Walker on 02/14/2007 by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation.(Johnsen, Harry)
February 2, 2007 Filing 1099 MOTION to remove names from settlement agreement by Defendants Wayne W Walker, Kimberlee S Walker. Noting Date 2/23/2007. (CL, )
January 31, 2007 Filing 1098 NOTICE of mailing address as to dfts Anthony and Valorie Zamudio. (CL, )
January 30, 2007 Filing 1097 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America re #1087 Notice to Take Deposition, #1093 Notice to Take Deposition, #1092 Notice to Take Deposition, #1094 Notice to Take Deposition, #1089 Notice to Take Deposition, #1096 Notice to Take Deposition, #1088 Notice to Take Deposition, #1091 Notice to Take Deposition, #1090 Notice to Take Deposition, #1095 Notice to Take Deposition, #1086 Notice to Take Deposition. (Cooney, James)
January 30, 2007 Filing 1096 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David Williams on 2/13/2007 by Plaintiff United States of America.(Cooney, James)
January 30, 2007 Filing 1095 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Willard D. Purnell on 2/14/2007 by Plaintiff United States of America.(Cooney, James)
January 30, 2007 Filing 1094 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Marlene and Richard Dawson on 2/14/2007 by Plaintiff United States of America.(Cooney, James)
January 30, 2007 Filing 1093 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ken and Ann Dawson on 2/14/2007 by Plaintiff United States of America.(Cooney, James)
January 30, 2007 Filing 1092 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Zena Morton on 2/13/2007 by Plaintiff United States of America.(Cooney, James)
January 30, 2007 Filing 1091 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tod Williams on 2/13/2007 by Plaintiff United States of America.(Cooney, James)
January 30, 2007 Filing 1090 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mike and Debby Sofie on 2/13/2007 by Plaintiff United States of America.(Cooney, James)
January 30, 2007 Filing 1089 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Wes and Lillian Whitney on 2/13/2007 by Plaintiff United States of America.(Cooney, James)
January 30, 2007 Filing 1088 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dale and Angie Bartel on 2/13/2007 by Plaintiff United States of America.(Cooney, James)
January 30, 2007 Filing 1087 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jeff and Kay Clark on 2/13/2007 by Plaintiff United States of America.(Cooney, James)
January 30, 2007 Filing 1086 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert and Shirley Bezona on 02/13/2007 by Plaintiff United States of America.(Cooney, James)
January 22, 2007 Filing 1085 RESPONSE, by Defendant Fred C Larsen, to #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order. (CL, )
January 17, 2007 Filing 1084 RESPONSE, by Defendant Gloria Hanson, to #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit#2 Certificate of service)(CL, )
January 16, 2007 Filing 1083 Letter from Dfts Kathy Kennedy and Don Weber re settlement agreement. (CL, )
January 12, 2007 Filing 1082 OBJECTIONS to #1068 Order on Motion for Order by Defendant David A Williams. (CL, )
January 12, 2007 Filing 1081 OBJECTIONS to #1068 Order on Motion for Order by Defendant Bonnie J Rogers. (CL, )
December 15, 2006 Filing 1080 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America. (Cooney, James)
December 15, 2006 Filing 1079 EXHIBIT (additional Signature Page of Settlement Agreement) re #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order by Plaintiff United States of America. (Cooney, James)
December 15, 2006 Filing 1078 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff United States of America, TO RESPONSE to #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order (Cooney, James)
December 13, 2006 Filing 1077 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1067 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #1068 Order on Motion for Order addressed to Terry W. Roal (CL, )
December 6, 2006 Filing 1076 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1067 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #1068 Order on Motion for Order, #1066 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Eunice Olsen (CL, )
December 6, 2006 Filing 1075 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America. (Cooney, James)
December 4, 2006 Filing 1073 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1067 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #1068 Order on Motion for Order, #1066 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Larry A and Robyn G. Gustafson (CL, )
December 1, 2006 Filing 1074 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs United States of America, Lummi Nation. (25- Sms issued (CL, )
December 1, 2006 Filing 1072 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1067 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #1068 Order on Motion for Order, #1066 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Brett L Randmel (CL, )
December 1, 2006 Filing 1071 REPLY, filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation, TO RESPONSE to #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order (Johnsen, Harry)
November 29, 2006 Filing 1070 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1059 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, #1055 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party addressed to Yvonne J. Solomon (CL, )
November 22, 2006 Filing 1069 Seventh AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) all defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cooney, James)
November 21, 2006 Noting Date Set/Reset re #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order: Noting Date 4/27/2007, pursuant to Order, docket no #1068 .(BP)
November 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 1068 ORDER granting #1057 Motion for Order Setting Forth Process to Consider Joint Motion to Approve Settlement and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(BP)
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 ORDER granting #1061 Motion to rejoin five dfts who were dismissed in error, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Dfts Charles G. Baker, Chandos Maree, Stacy Neal, David Ware and Joseph E. Washington reinstated.(CL, )
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 1066 ORDER granting #1060 Pltf's Motion to Amend the Complaint, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint. (CL, )
November 20, 2006 Filing 1065 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1055 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party addressed to Nechemjah Cohen. (CL, )
November 16, 2006 Filing 1064 RESPONSE, by Defendants Robert D Bezona, Clifford W Whitney, Lillian G Whitney, to #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits#2 Certificate of service)(CL, )
November 16, 2006 Filing 1063 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1059 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, #1055 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party addressed to Brett Randmel (CL, )
November 14, 2006 Filing 1062 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1059 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, #1055 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party addressed to Eunice Olsen. (CL, )
November 8, 2006 Filing 1061 Joint MOTION for Rejoinder of 5 Defendants Dismissed in Error by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. Noting Date 11/24/2006. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnsen, Harry)
November 7, 2006 Filing 1060 MOTION to Amend #1010 Amended Complaint to add parties by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 11/17/2006. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooney, James)
November 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 1059 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court GRANTS #1054 Joint Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(CL, )
November 2, 2006 Filing 1058 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America re #1057 Joint MOTION for Order to Adopt Special Process for Consideration of Settlement, #1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order, #1054 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Cooney, James)
November 2, 2006 Filing 1057 Joint MOTION for Order to Adopt Special Process for Consideration of Settlement by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 11/13/2006. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion (LCR Administrative Order)#2 Proposed Order)(Cooney, James)
November 2, 2006 Filing 1056 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Proposed Judgment and Order by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 11/24/2006. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gene Knapp#2 Declaration of Ann Newton Stark#3 Settlement Agreement#4 Exhibit A to Settlement Agreement#5 Exhibit B to Settlement Agreement#6 Exhibit C to Settlement Agreement#7 Exhibit D to Settlement Agreement#8 Exhibit E to Settlement Agreement#9 Exhibit F to Settlement Agreement#10 Exhibit G to Settlement Agreement#11 Exhibit H to Settlement Agreement#12 Proposed Order #13 Exhibit A to Proposed Order (Legal Description of Case Area and Map))(Cooney, James)
November 2, 2006 Filing 1054 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 11/2/2006. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooney, James)
October 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court DISMISSES all claims against dft Linda Huizenga.(CL, )
October 16, 2006 Filing 1053 REQUEST by Defendant Fred C Larsen for Relief. (Attachments: #1 exhibits)(CL, )
October 16, 2006 Filing 1052 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re Set/Reset Hearings addressed to Terry W. Roal (CL, )
October 9, 2006 Filing 1051 DECLARATION of Robert Huizenga filed by Defendant Robert Huizenga re #1050 MOTION to Dismiss Party Linda Huizenga (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
October 9, 2006 Filing 1050 MOTION to Dismiss Party Linda Huizenga by Defendants Linda Huizenga, Robert Huizenga. Noting Date 11/3/2006. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
October 9, 2006 Filing 1049 NOTICE by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell of Firm Name Change (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
September 19, 2006 Filing 1048 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1031 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment addressed to Eunice Olsen (CL, )
September 14, 2006 Filing 1047 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1031 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment addressed to Brett Randmel (CL, )
September 6, 2006 Filing 1046 Letter from Linda and Jack Jolly re: water and sewer jurisdiction. (Attachments: #1 exhibits)(CL, )
September 6, 2006 Filing 1045 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Chong K and Young C. Yu, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
September 6, 2006 Filing 1044 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Estate of Richard Warbus, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
September 6, 2006 Filing 1043 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Whatcom County Fire District No. 8, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
September 6, 2006 Filing 1042 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Susan E. Phair, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
September 6, 2006 Filing 1041 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Adrienne T. Hunter, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, ) Text/Modified on 9/6/2006 (CL, ).
September 6, 2006 Filing 1040 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Ronald L. Horn, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
September 6, 2006 Filing 1039 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Gorotia D. Edwards, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
September 6, 2006 Filing 1038 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Diane Cook, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
September 6, 2006 Filing 1037 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and the Corporation of the Catholic Archbishop of Seattle, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
September 6, 2006 Filing 1036 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Raymond D. and Cecilia A. Beck, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
September 6, 2006 Filing 1035 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Levi L. Sr., and Julia A. Jefferson, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
September 6, 2006 Filing 1034 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and John W. Friday, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
September 6, 2006 Filing 1033 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and David L. Nock, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
September 6, 2006 Filing 1032 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Douglas McKee, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 ORDER approving 14 Consent Decress with individual owner defendants and dismissing certain parties defendant, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, ) Modified on 9/6/2006 (CL, ). (14 cc of consent decress mailed to atty H. Johnson).
August 21, 2006 Filing 1030 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eugene H. Knapp, Jr on behalf of Defendant Brandi Curran (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
August 16, 2006 Filing 1029 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey J Arntzen on behalf of Defendant Flemming P Hansen (CL, )
August 11, 2006 Filing 1028 PRAECIPE to attach document re #1027 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 14 Individual Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 McKee Consent Decree#2 Nock Consent Decree#3 Friday Consent Decree#4 Jefferson (Levi, Sr. & Juli) Consent Decree#5 Beck Consent Decree#6 Catholic Archbishop Consent Decree#7 Cook Consent Decree#8 Edwards Consent Decree#9 Horn Consent Decree#10 Hunter Consent Decree#11 Phair Consent Decree#12 Warbus Consent Decree#13 Whatcom Fire Dist. # 8 Consent Decree#14 Yu Consent Decree)(Johnsen, Harry)
August 11, 2006 Filing 1027 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 14 Individual Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. Noting Date 8/25/2006. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A#2 Attachment C#3 Attachment C#4 Attachment D#5 Proposed Order #6 Certificate of Service)(Johnsen, Harry)
August 8, 2006 Filing 1026 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 1019 Status Conference, addressed to Clifford Fisher (address updated: re-mailed) (CL, )
August 4, 2006 Filing 1025 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 1019 Status Conference, addressed to Timothy and Amy I Bucking (CL, )
August 3, 2006 Filing 1024 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1011 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, #1009 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Timothy & Amy Buecking (CL, )
August 1, 2006 Filing 1023 OBJECTIONS by property owners/defendants John B Moss, Mary Moss. (CL, ) Modified on 8/2/2006 (CL, ).
August 1, 2006 Filing 1022 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1011 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, #1009 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Richard and Lana George (LT, )
August 1, 2006 Filing 1021 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 1019 Minute Entry re Status Conference, addressed to Brett L. Randmel (LT, )
July 31, 2006 Filing 1020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1011 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, #1009 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Brett l. Randmel (CL, )
July 26, 2006 Filing 1018 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (unclaimed) re #962 Certificate of Service, addressed to Terry W. Roal (CL, )
July 25, 2006 Filing 1019 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Thomas S. Zilly - Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: James Cooney, Harry Johnsen; Def Counsel: Gene Knapp, Tim Slater, Barbara Markham; CR: Joe Roth; Status Conference held on 7/25/2006. Pro Se participants: Marlene Dawson, Wes Whitney, Robert Bezona, Mike Bezona, Kim Walker. The Court hears from counsel and individual defendants re settlement. Another hearing will be scheduled once a settlement proposal has been submitted to the Court for review. Briefs may be filed in support of the settlement proposal. Counsel will coordinate with the clerk to notify all parties of the proposed settlement and any hearing to consider the reasonableness of the proposed settlement. (CC, )
July 25, 2006 Filing 1017 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (4 sms issued). (CL, )
July 24, 2006 Filing 1016 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re Set/Reset Hearings re in-court status conference set for Tuesday, JULY 25, 2006 addressed to Terri Thomas (LT, )
July 24, 2006 Filing 1015 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re Set/Reset Hearings re in-court status conference set for Tuesday, JULY 25, 2006 addressed to David L. Nock (LT, )
July 24, 2006 Filing 1014 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Richard and Lana George re Set/Reset Hearings re in-court status conference set for Tuesday, JULY 25, 2006 (LT, )
July 24, 2006 Filing 1013 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re set/reset hearing re 7/25/2006 in-court status conference addressed to Amanda Peters (LT, )
July 21, 2006 Filing 1012 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re Set/Reset Hearings addressed to Timothy and Amy Buecking (CL, )
July 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 ORDER granting #995 Motion to Dismiss Parties by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.( Dfts., Cynthia Buttrick, Jerry Miller and Rebecca Miller terminated).(CL, )
July 21, 2006 Filing 1010 Sixth AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) all defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cooney, James)
July 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 ORDER granting #1001 Pltf's Motion to Amend by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Counsel is directed to e-file their Fifth Amended Complaint. (CL, )
July 19, 2006 Filing 1008 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nancy M Neal on behalf of Defendant Frank L Moser (Neal, Nancy)
July 19, 2006 Filing 1007 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nancy M Neal on behalf of Defendant Frank L Moser (Neal, Nancy)
July 14, 2006 Filing 1006 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff United States of America, Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. ((3) sms issued). (CL, )
July 13, 2006 Filing 1005 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re Set/Reset Hearings addressed to Brett Randmel (CL, )
July 12, 2006 Filing 1004 NOTICE by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell Notice of Firm Name Change (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
July 3, 2006 Filing 1003 Mail Returned as Undeliverable Order approving 20 consent decrees addressed to Terri Thomas (RS, )
June 30, 2006 Filing 1002 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #971 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment addressed to Amanda Peters, Thomas & Yvonne Solomon (LT, )
June 30, 2006 Filing 1001 MOTION to Amend Complaint to Add New Landowners by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 7/12/2006. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooney, James)
June 30, 2006 Filing 1000 NOTICE by Plaintiff United States of America of Filing of Waivers of Service and Affidavits of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waivers#2 Exhibit Waivers#3 Exhibit Waivers#4 Exhibit Affidavits of Service#5 Exhibit Affidavits of Service)(Cooney, James)
June 29, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings: An in-court status conference set for Tuesday, JULY 25, 2006 at 10:30 a.m. before Hon. Thomas S. Zilly. (CC, )
June 27, 2006 Filing 998 Mail Returned as Undeliverable/unclaimed re #994 Mail Returned addressed to Matthew Alexander (corrected summons). (CL, )
June 26, 2006 Filing 997 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #971 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment addressed to David Nock (CL, )
June 26, 2006 Filing 996 Mail Returned as Undeliverable/unclaimed (as to corrected sums) addressed to J&K Inc. (CL, ) Modified on 6/26/2006 (CL, ).
June 22, 2006 Filing 995 MOTION to Dismiss Parties by Defendants Cynthia S Buttrick, Jerry Miller, Rebecca Miller, Nancy Deaver. Noting Date 7/14/2006. (CL, )
June 20, 2006 Filing 994 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #950 Amended Complaint addressed to Matthew Alexander (mail unclaimed) (CL, )
June 19, 2006 Filing 993 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #971 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment addressed to Richard and Lana George (CL, )
June 19, 2006 Filing 992 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #971 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment addressed to Brett L Randmel (CL, )
June 15, 2006 Filing 991 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Terry Roal re [953} Order granting leave to amend complaint. (CL, )
June 14, 2006 Filing 975 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dfts Kenneth J. Seal and Barbara J. Farnsworth by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 999 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Charles A. Scott by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 990 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Armando G. Brionez by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 989 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Carolee George by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 988 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Michelle A. George by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 987 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Judith A. Hottowe by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 986 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dfts Gerald I. and Linda G. James by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 985 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dfts David H. and Juanita I. Jefferson by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 984 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Richard P. and Heather L. Jefferson by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 983 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Andrea K. Johnson by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 982 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Jay R. Martin by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.. (CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 981 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dfts Ralph R. and Angel R. Scott by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 980 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Victor D. Solomon by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 979 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Amanda P. Thomas by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 978 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Kathleen Williams by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 977 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dfts Charles S. and Lorraine E. North by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 976 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dfts Robert and Monica Schneider by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 974 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dfts Michael M. and Michelle J. Vendiola by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 973 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dfts Larry J. and Beverly M. White by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 972 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Andy F. Kamkoff by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
June 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 971 ORDER granting #959 Pltf's Motion to Approve (20) Consent Decrees by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
June 8, 2006 Filing 970 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #958 Certificate of Service addressed to Terry W. Roal (CL, )
June 2, 2006 Filing 969 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #956 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Terri Thomas. (CL, )
June 2, 2006 Filing 968 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #956 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to David Nock. (CL, )
June 2, 2006 Filing 967 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #956 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Amanda Peters. (CL, )
June 1, 2006 Filing 966 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jacob L. Smith, Jr on behalf of Defendant Mabel D Stauffer (CL, )
May 30, 2006 Filing 965 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #956 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Richard and Lana George. (no updated address on record). (CL, )
May 30, 2006 Filing 964 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #956 Order on Motion to Amend addressed to Brett L. Randmel (no updated address on record). (CL, )
May 30, 2006 Filing 963 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff United States of America. Sms issued. (CL, )
May 30, 2006 Filing 962 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/by certified mail by Plaintiff United States of America re #950 Fourth Amended Complaint mailed to dfts: Terry Roal, Matthew Alexander, Flemming P. Hansen and J& K Inc. (mailing of amended summons, amended: to show 20 days) (CL, )
May 26, 2006 Filing 961 PRAECIPE to attach document (CONSENT DECREES) re #959 Interlocutory MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 20 Individual Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 SCOTT (Charles) CONSENT DECREE#2 SCOTT (Ralp & Angel) CONSENT DECREE#3 SOLOMON CONSENT DECREE#4 THOMAS CONSENT DECREE#5 WILLIAMS CONSENT DECREE#6 NORTH CONSENT DECREE#7 SCHNEIDER CONSENT DECREE#8 SEAL & FARNSWORTH CONSENT DECREE#9 VENDIOLA CONSENT DECREE#10 WHITE CONSENT DECREE)(Johnsen, Harry)
May 26, 2006 Filing 960 PRAECIPE to attach document CONSENT DECREES re #959 Interlocutory MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 20 Individual Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Brionez Consent Decree#2 GEORGE (Carolee) CONSENT DECREE#3 GEORGE (Michelle) CONSENT DECREE#4 HOTTOWE CONSENT DECREE#5 JAMES (G.I. & Linda) CONSENT DECREE#6 JEFFERSON (David & Juanita) CONSENT DECREE#7 JEFFERSON (Richard & Heather) CONSENT DECREE#8 JOHNSON CONSENT DECREE#9 KAMKOFF CONSENT DECREE#10 MARTIN CONSENT DECREE)(Johnsen, Harry)
May 26, 2006 Filing 959 Interlocutory MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 20 Individual Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. Noting Date 6/9/2006. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A#2 Attachment B#3 Attachment C#4 Certificate of Service #5 Proposed Order)(Johnsen, Harry)
May 24, 2006 Filing 958 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/by certified mail by Plaintiff United States of America re #950 Fourth Amended Complaint mailed to dfts: Terry Roal, Matthew Alexander, Flemming P. Hansen and J& K Inc.. (CL, )
May 24, 2006 Filing 957 Fifth AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) all defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cooney, James)
May 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 956 ORDER granting #953 United States's Motion to Amend Complaint. Counsel is directed to e-file their Fifth Amended Complaint. (CL, )
May 17, 2006 Filing 955 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff United States of America. (12-Sms issued) (CL, ) Modified on 5/18/2006 (CL, ).
May 12, 2006 Filing 954 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONSES (and issued) by Plaintiff United States of America. (LT, )
May 4, 2006 Filing 953 MOTION to Amend #950 Amended Complaint to add parties by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 5/15/2006. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooney, James)
April 11, 2006 Filing 952 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #923 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment, addressed to Frank Dance (no updated address on record) (CL, )
April 11, 2006 Filing 951 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Lummi Nation. Summ(es) issued. (CL, )
April 7, 2006 Filing 950 Fourth AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) all defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cooney, James)
April 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 949 ORDER granting #947 Motion to Amend. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint. by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (14 new dfts added to this case).(CL, )
April 3, 2006 Filing 947 MOTION to Amend #907 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 4/12/2006. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooney, James)
March 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 948 ORDER of Dismissal by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court DISMISSES dft John Randel without prejudice and w/out cost to any party.(CL, )
March 30, 2006 Filing 946 MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Thomas S. Zilly, United States District Judge. Pursuant to the Joint Motion to Strike the Trial Date, docket no. #945 , the Court STRIKES the trial date and all pretrial deadlines. (CL, )
March 29, 2006 Filing 945 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Date or, in the alternative, to Strike Trial Date by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 4/14/2006. (Cooney, James)
March 20, 2006 Filing 944 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dfts Jennifer l Bruce and Suzane L Jones by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 943 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Vela K (Julius) Kamkoff by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 942 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dfts Carl D and Carol A Lane by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 941 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Hermineh Lousararian by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 940 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Stanley Martin Jr., by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 939 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Barbara Mundt by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 938 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Terry L. Phair by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 937 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Qwest Inc., by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 936 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Whatcom County Public Works by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 935 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dfts Tasha R and Sandra A Aus by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 934 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Carol Bull by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 933 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Paula L Casey by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 932 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Schaara Chase by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 931 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dfts Frank A and Geraldine M Cordero by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 930 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dfts John E and Mary Ann Douglas by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 929 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dfts Michael P. Drury and Melissa K. Rutland-Drury by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 928 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dfts Leonard C. and Sara A. Duncan by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 927 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft John G. Gregor by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 926 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dft Adrienne T. Hunter by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 925 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dfts Gerald I and Linda G. James by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 924 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and dfts Jeff and Amanda Annis by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
March 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 923 ORDER BY Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court APPROVES 20 Consent Decrees with individual Fisherman's Cove Defendants and One Pumper Defendant Consent Decree, and Dismisses certain parties dfts.(CL, ) Modified on 3/21/2006 (CL,) (20 certf. copies of individual Consent Decrees docket nos. 923 through 944, mailed to Atty H. Johnson)
March 20, 2006 Filing 922 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #916 Order on Motion to Continue addressed to Ricky and Wendy Swedelious. (no updated address on record). (CL, )
March 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 921 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Atty Gene Knapp terminated.(CL, )
March 17, 2006 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #920 Proposed Order (Unsigned): Clarified docket text to indicate this is the Stipulation and Proposed Order for Withdrawal. (ECS, )
March 16, 2006 Filing 920 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY RE: JOANNE FREEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene) Modified/Clarified text on 3/17/2006 (ECS, ).
March 16, 2006 Filing 919 PRAECIPE to attach document (Consent Decrees) re #917 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 20 Fisherman's Cove Defendant and One Pumper Defendant by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Jones and Bruce Consent Decree#2 Kamkoff Consent Decree#3 Lane Consent Decree#4 Lousararian Consent Decree#5 Martin Consent Decree#6 Mundt Consent Decree#7 Phair Consent Decree#8 Qwest Consent Decree#9 Whatcom County Consent Decree#10 Annis Consent Decree)(Johnsen, Harry)
March 16, 2006 Filing 918 PRAECIPE to attach document (Consent Decrees) re #917 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 20 Fisherman's Cove Defendant and One Pumper Defendant by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Aus Consent Decree#2 Bull Consent Decree#3 Casey Consent Decree#4 Chase Consent Decree#5 Cordero Consent Decree#6 Douglas Consent Decree#7 Drury Consent Decree#8 Duncan Consent Decree#9 Gregor Consent Decree#10 Hunter Consent Decree#11 James Consent Decree)(Johnsen, Harry)
March 16, 2006 Filing 917 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 20 Fisherman's Cove Defendant and One Pumper Defendant by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. Noting Date 3/31/2006. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A#2 Attachment B#3 Attachment C#4 Attachment D#5 Certificate of Service #6 Proposed Order)(Johnsen, Harry)
March 6, 2006 Reset Deadlines: Bench Trial continued to 6/1/2006 before Hon. Thomas S. Zilly, as per Order, docket no. #916 .(CL, )
March 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 916 ORDER granting #905 Motion to Continue trial date by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial date continued to 6/1/06.(CL, )
March 3, 2006 Filing 915 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #879 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment,, #861 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment addressed to Phillip Elgin (no update address on record). (CL, )
March 2, 2006 Filing 914 RESPONSE, by Defendant Marlene Dawson, to #905 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Reset Trial. (CL, )
March 2, 2006 Filing 913 DECLARATION of Defendant Jonn Randel filed by Defendant John Randel re #912 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Jonn Randel (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
March 2, 2006 Filing 912 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Jonn Randel by Defendant John Randel. Noting Date 3/31/2006. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
February 28, 2006 Filing 911 AFFIDAVIT OF SUMMONS and Third Amended Complaint upon Equity One on 2/23/06. (CL, )
February 28, 2006 Filing 910 AFFIDAVIT OF SUMMONS and Third Amended Complaint upon Paul J. Crain on 2/23/06. (CL, )
February 28, 2006 Filing 909 AFFIDAVIT OF SUMMONS and Third Amended Complaint returnupon April Finkbonner on 2/24/06. (CL, )
February 28, 2006 Filing 908 AFFIDAVIT OF SUMMONS and Third Amended Complaint upon Wells Fargo Bank, Minnesota on 2/23/06 (CL, )
February 22, 2006 Filing 907 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) all defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cooney, James)
February 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 906 ORDER granting #904 Motion to Amend. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(LT, )
February 14, 2006 Filing 905 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Reset Trial by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. Noting Date 3/3/2006. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service #2 Proposed Order)(Johnsen, Harry)
February 8, 2006 Filing 904 MOTION to Amend #97 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 2/17/2006. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint#2 Exhibit Declaration of Kristin Julier#3 Proposed Order)(Cooney, James)
January 31, 2006 Filing 903 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #859 Order Dismissing Party, #879 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment, addressed to Don Williams. Re-mailed to updated address in Florida). (CL, )
January 31, 2006 Filing 902 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #879 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment,, #861 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment addressed to Rory K and Wendy Swedelious (No updated address on record) (CL, )
January 27, 2006 Filing 901 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs United States of America, Lummi Nation. (46 sms issued). (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 900 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Lisa Dzyban and David Morison, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 899 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Howard W. and Gwendolyn A. Vanderkieft, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 898 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Gary W. Seaman and Marvin R. Carlson, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 897 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Earl and Christine Rose, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 896 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Carolyn L. O'Donnell, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 895 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Kim M. Mezo, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 894 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and McClellan Family Real Estate LLC, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 893 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Charles B and Margaret E. Lutz, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 892 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and David R. and Cherry M. Krueger, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 891 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Stephen D. Jones, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 890 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Gordon H. and Mary Ellen Jones Family Trust, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 889 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and the Family Johnson Family Trust, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 888 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Dalmiro B. Farias and Donna L. Hazleton, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 887 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Gertrude O. Glasco, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 886 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Charles W. and Dawn D. Eggert, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 885 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Ruby Drake, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 884 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Frances E. Dennison and G.J. Dennison, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 883 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Terry and Joeen K. Daughters, y by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 882 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and John A. and Barbara J. Craig Revocable Trust, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 881 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Ronald W. and Maria E. Bosman signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly(CL, ).
January 23, 2006 Filing 880 CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Mary L.F. Andrus signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, ) Modified on 1/25/2006 (CL, ).
January 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 879 ORDER granting #852 Joint Motion to Approve (20) Consent Judgments by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, ) Modified on 1/24/2006 (CL, ). (20 certf. copies of individual Consent Decrees docket nos. #880 through [900, mailed to Atty H. Johnson) Modified on 1/25/2006 (CL, ).
January 20, 2006 Filing 878 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff. (11) sms issued.(CL, )
January 11, 2006 Filing 877 NOTICE by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #855 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel Revised (Isaki, Lucy)
January 9, 2006 Filing 876 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Linda Rambo by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 875 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Terry C. and Diana M. O'Hara by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 874 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Chuck R. and Roberta L. McCord by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 873 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Lich Trust by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 872 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Shawnee Kinley by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 871 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Jesse I. and Kelly R. Ellenz, Paul R. and Rebecca A. Simplot, and Frederick J. and Barbara K. Kennedy by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 870 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Frederick J. and Barbara K. Kennedy by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 869 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Jewel W. Hendryx and Della M. Hendryx by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 868 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Lawrence M. Harrigan Trust by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 867 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Jesse L. and Kelly R. Ellenz by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 866 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and The Caryl A. Drain Revocable Trust by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 865 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Joseph A. and Cheri J. DePaulo by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 864 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Lowell A. and Joani L. Cooper by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 863 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Barbara J. Bessire by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 862 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and James B. Ballif by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
January 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 861 ORDER granting #846 Motion to Approve Consent Decrees with Individual Horizon Heights Association Defendants and One Gooseberry Point Association Defendant, and Dismissing Certain Parties Defendant, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(LT, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 860 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and the Bank of America N.A. by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 859 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Emily Weaver by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 858 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and William and Aileen Steeves by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 857 CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Paula and Rebecca Simplot by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 856 CONSENT DECREE between US, the Lummi Nation and the Schumak Family Trust by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
January 5, 2006 Filing 855 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington. Lucy Isaki is substituted as counsel for Defendant. Attorney Lucy Isaki terminated. (Isaki, Lucy)
January 5, 2006 Filing 854 PRAECIPE to attach document (Consent Decrees) re #852 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 21 Individual Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Jones Consent Decree#2 Krueger Consent Decree#3 Lutz Consent Decree#4 McClellan Family Real Estate LLC Consent Decree#5 Mezo Consent Decree#6 O'Donnell Consent Decree#7 Rose Consent Decree#8 Seaman Carlson Consent Decree#9 Vandekeift Trust Consent Decree#10 Dzyban Morison Consent Decree)(Johnsen, Harry)
January 5, 2006 Filing 853 PRAECIPE to attach document (Consent Decrees) re #852 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 21 Individual Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 1 - Andrus Consent Decree#2 2 - Bosman Consent Decree#3 3- Craig Revocable Trust Consent Decree#4 4 - Daughters Consent Decree#5 5 - Dennison Consent Decree#6 6 - Drake Consent Decree#7 7 - Eggert Consent Decree#8 8 - Glasco Consent Decree#9 9 - Farias Hazelton Consent Decree#10 10 - Johnson Family Trust Consent Decree#11 11- Jones Family Trust Consent Decree)(Johnsen, Harry)
January 5, 2006 Filing 852 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 21 Individual Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. Noting Date 1/20/2006. (Attachments: #1 Attachments A through D#2 Certificate of Service #3 Proposed Order)(Johnsen, Harry)
January 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 851 ORDER granting #836 Motion to withdraw as atty and to substitute dft Brett Randmel as pro se by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
December 20, 2005 Filing 850 PRAECIPE to attach document (Proposed Order) re #846 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 19 Horizon Hills Defendants and One Gooseberry Point Defendant by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Johnsen, Harry)
December 20, 2005 Filing 849 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation re #847 Praecipe to attach Document,,, #848 Praecipe to attach Document,,, #846 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 19 Horizon Hills Defendants and One Gooseberry Point Defendant. (Johnsen, Harry)
December 20, 2005 Filing 848 PRAECIPE to attach document (consent decrees) re #846 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 19 Horizon Hills Defendants and One Gooseberry Point Defendant by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Kinley Consent Decree#2 Lich Trust Consent Decree#3 McCord Consent Decree#4 O'Hara Consent Decree#5 Rambo Consent Decree#6 Schumak Consent Decree#7 Simplot Consent Decree#8 Steeves Consent Decree#9 Weaver Consent Decree#10 Bank of America Consent Decree)(Johnsen, Harry)
December 20, 2005 Filing 847 PRAECIPE to attach document (consent decrees) re #846 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 19 Horizon Hills Defendants and One Gooseberry Point Defendant by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Baliff Consent Decree#2 Bessire Consent Decree#3 Cooper Consent Decree#4 DePaulo Consent Decree#5 Drain Revocable Trust Consent Decree#6 Ellenz Consent Decree#7 Harrigan Trust Consent Decree#8 Hendryx Consent Decree#9 Kennedy Consent Decree#10 Kennedy Simplot Ellenz Consent Decree)(Johnsen, Harry)
December 20, 2005 Filing 846 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 19 Horizon Hills Defendants and One Gooseberry Point Defendant by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. Noting Date 1/6/2006. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A#2 Attachment B#3 Attachment C#4 Attachment D)(Johnsen, Harry)
December 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 845 ORDER of Dismissal by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Claims against dfts Nicholas P. Webb and Sarah E. Webb are dismissed without prejudice and without cost to any party.(CL, )
December 13, 2005 Filing 844 NOTICE by Defendant Betty M Ewing, re: dft no longer owns property on the Lummi Reservation. (CL, )
December 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 843 ORDER of Partial Dismissal by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. As to dfts Larry and Luella Olsen all claims involving the real estate described in this order are dismissed without prejudice and without cost to any party. (CL, )
December 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 842 ORDER granting #827 Dfts' Motion to Dismiss Party by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Dfts. Wm D. Smith and Linnea G. Smith are partially dismissed without prejudice and without costs to any party. These parties remain dfts as to other parcels they own within the case area.(CL, )
December 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 841 ORDER granting #825 Motion to Dismiss Parties by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Dfts Gerald and Robin Moore dismissed without prejudice and without cost to any party.(CL, )
December 5, 2005 Filing 840 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Brett L Randmel re #838 Declaration,, #839 Declaration,, #837 Declaration, #836 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Attorneys and to Substitute Defendant Randmel as Pro Se. (Knapp, Eugene)
December 5, 2005 Filing 839 DECLARATION of Sue Hoffmann in Support of Withdrawal filed by Defendant Brett L Randmel re #836 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Attorneys and to Substitute Defendant Randmel as Pro Se (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
December 5, 2005 Filing 838 DECLARATION of Teresa Penley in Support of Withdrawal filed by Defendant Brett L Randmel re #836 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Attorneys and to Substitute Defendant Randmel as Pro Se (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
December 5, 2005 Filing 837 DECLARATION of Gene Knapp in Support of Withdrawal filed by Defendant Brett L Randmel re #836 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Attorneys and to Substitute Defendant Randmel as Pro Se (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
December 5, 2005 Filing 836 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Attorneys and to Substitute Defendant Randmel as Pro Se by Defendant Brett L Randmel. Noting Date 12/30/2005. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
November 28, 2005 Filing 835 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #831 Order on Motion to Continue addressed to Beverly and Larry White. (address updated and re-mailed) (CL, )
November 21, 2005 Filing 834 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #831 Order on Motion to Continue addressed to Carol Bull (re-mailed to updated address) (CL, )
November 18, 2005 Filing 833 DECLARATION of Defendants Webb filed by Defendants Sarah E Webb, Nicholas P Webb re #832 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Nocholas and Sarah Webb (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
November 18, 2005 Filing 832 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Nocholas and Sarah Webb by Defendants Sarah E Webb, Nicholas P Webb. Noting Date 12/16/2005. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
November 14, 2005 Reset Trial Date and Related Deadlines: Bench Trial is set for 5/1/2006 before Hon. Thomas S. Zilly, as per Order docket no. #831 . (CL, )
November 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ORDER granting #823 Motion to Continue Trial Date by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial date is continued to 5/1/06.(CL, )
November 10, 2005 Filing 830 DECLARATION of Defendants Larry R. Olsen and Luella M. Olsen with Regard to a Parcel - Tax No. 370102 352222 0000 filed by Defendants Luella M Olsen, Larry R Olsen re #829 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Larry R. Olsen and Luella M. Olsen with Regard to a Parcel - Tax No. 370102 352222 0000 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
November 10, 2005 Filing 829 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Larry R. Olsen and Luella M. Olsen with Regard to a Parcel - Tax No. 370102 352222 0000 by Defendants Luella M Olsen, Larry R Olsen. Noting Date 12/9/2005. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
November 7, 2005 Filing 828 DECLARATION of Defendants William D. Smith and Linnea G. Smith with Regard to a Parcel - Tax No. 3801344200920000 filed by Defendants William D Smith, Linnea G Smith re #827 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants William D. Smith and Linnea G. Smith with Regard to a Parcel - Tax No. 3801344200920000 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
November 7, 2005 Filing 827 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants William D. Smith and Linnea G. Smith with Regard to a Parcel - Tax No. 3801344200920000 by Defendants William D Smith, Linnea G Smith. Noting Date 12/2/2005. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
November 3, 2005 Filing 826 DECLARATION of Defendants Moore filed by Defendants Robin L Moore, Gerald Moore re #825 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants Gerald and Robin Moore (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
November 3, 2005 Filing 825 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants Gerald and Robin Moore by Defendants Robin L Moore, Gerald Moore. Noting Date 12/2/2005. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
October 28, 2005 Filing 824 MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Thomas S. Zilly. The Court GRANTS #818 Dfts Horst Kosel and Carolla Kosel's Motion to Dismiss. Dfts Horst and Carolla Kosel are dismissed from this lawsuit.(CL, )
October 25, 2005 Filing 823 Amended MOTION to Continue and Reset Trial Date by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 11/11/2005. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooney, James)
October 24, 2005 ***Motion terminated as per docket no. #822 re: #809 MOTION to Amend #332 Order Scheduling Order filed by United States of America,. (CL, )
October 24, 2005 Filing 822 NOTICE by Plaintiff United States of America re #809 MOTION to Amend #332 Order,,,, Scheduling Order,,, to Withdraw Motion from Court's Calendar, to be renoted after Court sets new trial date (Cooney, James)
October 24, 2005 Filing 821 Joint MOTION to Continue and Reset Trial Date by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooney, James)
October 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 820 ORDER of Dismissal by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Dft Patrica Haensly is DISMISSED without prejudice and without cost to any party.(CL, )
October 4, 2005 Filing 819 NOTICE by Plaintiff United States of America that the following is RE-NOTED: #809 MOTION to Amend #332 Order,,,, Scheduling Order,,, Noting Date 11/4/2005. (Cooney, James)
September 30, 2005 Filing 818 AMENDMENT to #816 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendants Horst J Kosel, Carolla Kosel. (Knapp, Eugene)
September 30, 2005 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #816 MOTION to Dismiss Party: Noted that Motion has not been filed; counsel will re-file. (HBR, )
September 30, 2005 Filing 817 DECLARATION of Defendants Kosel filed by Defendants Horst J Kosel, Carolla Kosel re #816 MOTION to Dismiss Party (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
September 30, 2005 Filing 816 E-FILING ERROR; COUNSEL WILL RE-FILE MAIN DOCUMENT MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendants Horst J Kosel, Carolla Kosel. Noting Date 10/28/2005. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene) Modified on 9/30/2005 (HBR, ).
September 20, 2005 Filing 815 DECLARATION of Gene Knapp in Opposition filed by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell re #809 MOTION to Amend #332 Order,,,, Scheduling Order,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - F#2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
September 20, 2005 Filing 814 RESPONSE, by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell, to #809 MOTION to Amend #332 Order,,,, Scheduling Order,,,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
September 16, 2005 Filing 812 NOTICE by Plaintiff United States of America that the following is RE-NOTED: #809 MOTION to Amend #332 Order,,,, Scheduling Order,,, Noting Date 10/14/2005. (Cooney, James)
September 15, 2005 Filing 813 Letter from David Williams. (CL, )
September 12, 2005 Filing 811 DECLARATION of Patricia A. Haensly filed by Defendant Patricia A Haensly re #810 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Patricia A. Haensly (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
September 12, 2005 Filing 810 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Patricia A. Haensly by Defendant Patricia A Haensly. Noting Date 10/7/2005. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
September 1, 2005 NOTICE - The Court strikes the status conference scheduled Wednesday, September 7, 2005. The Court directs the parties to advise the clerk the outcome of the mediation. (CC, )
August 30, 2005 Filing 809 MOTION to Amend #332 Order,,,, Scheduling Order,,, by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 9/30/2005. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Ross Waples#2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Taylor#3 Proposed Order)(Cooney, James)
August 29, 2005 Filing 808 MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Thomas S. Zilly. The Court schedules a Status Conference for 9/7/2005 at 02:00 PM before Hon. Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
August 22, 2005 Filing 807 NOTICE by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington Notice of Mediation Meetings (Markham, Barbara)
August 3, 2005 Filing 806 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #804 Order, #803 Order addressed to Rory & Wendy Swedelious. (no updated address on record). (CL, )
August 1, 2005 Filing 805 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #804 Order, #803 Order addressed to Cynthia Buttrick (no updated address on record). (CL, )
July 26, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 804 ORDER of Partial Dismissal of dfts Larry and Luella Olsen by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
July 26, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 803 ORDER of Dismissal by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Dfts Scott & Teresa Bartl are hereby dismissed from this case.(CL, )
July 20, 2005 Filing 802 NOTICE by Plaintiff United States of America that parties have selected a mediator (Cooney, James)
July 19, 2005 Filing 801 MOTION to Dismiss Party (Scott & Teresa Bartl) by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. Noting Date 7/19/2005. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Special Appearance#3 Certificate of Service)(Johnsen, Harry)
July 13, 2005 Filing 800 Letter from Gene Knapp and J. Timothy Slater re #799 Letter, 796 Status Conference,,, Confirming Proposed Mediators. (Knapp, Eugene)
July 13, 2005 Filing 799 Letter from Thomas J. Young re 796 Status Conference,,, List of Potential Mediators. (Young, Thomas)
July 8, 2005 Filing 798 NOTICE of Change of Address by dft Gretchen Lux. (CL, )
July 1, 2005 Filing 797 NOTICE by Plaintiff United States of America re 796 Status Conference,,, of potential mediator names (Miskinis, Steven)
June 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 795 ORDER granting #784 MOTION to Withdraw Gary Strauss as Attorney filed by Pacific NW Bell, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
June 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 794 AMENDED ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
June 21, 2005 Filing 796 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Thomas S. Zilly - Dep Clerk: KC; Pla Counsel: Jim Cooney, Harry Johnson, Jane Marx, Cabell Breckinridge; Def Counsel: Barbara Markham, Tom Young,Lucy Isaki, Gene Knapp, Tim Slater. Pro Se Marlene Dawson, Robert Bezona; Status Conference held on 6/21/2005. The Court denies the motion to reconsider, docket no. 788. The Court directs the parties to mediate the case by October 31,2005. The court trial shall last approximately 2-3 weeks. TRIAL is scheduled to begin FEBRUARY 6, 2006. The Court directs the plaintiff to provide the defense with a list of 5 potential mediators within 10 days. The defense is directed to respond within 10 days. The Court directs all parties to select a mediator within 30 days of this date. (CC, )
June 21, 2005 Filing 793 DECLARATION of Defendants Larry R. Olsen and Luella M. Olsen with Regard to a Fifty Acre (Approximately) Parcel-Tax No. 3701022011810000 (Past Tax No. 370102202204000) filed by Defendants Luella M Olsen, Larry R Olsen re #792 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Larry R. Olsen and Luella M. Olsen with Regard to a Fifty Acre (Approximately) Parcel-Tax No. 3701022011810000 (Previously Tax No. 3701022022040000) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
June 21, 2005 Filing 792 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Larry R. Olsen and Luella M. Olsen with Regard to a Fifty Acre (Approximately) Parcel-Tax No. 3701022011810000 (Previously Tax No. 3701022022040000) by Defendants Luella M Olsen, Larry R Olsen. Noting Date 7/15/2005. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
June 16, 2005 Filing 791 RESPONSE, by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington, to #780 MOTION for Reconsideration re #779 Order on Legal Issues. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Markham, Barbara)
June 16, 2005 Filing 790 DECLARATION of Thomas J. Young filed by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #781 MOTION for Reconsideration re #779 Order on Legal Issues (Markham, Barbara)
June 16, 2005 Filing 789 RESPONSE, by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington, to #781 MOTION for Reconsideration re #779 Order on Legal Issues. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Markham, Barbara)
June 16, 2005 Filing 788 MOTION for Reconsideration and to reinstate pro se Dawson's documents by Defendant Marlene Dawson. Noting Date 6/16/2005. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(CL, )
June 16, 2005 Filing 787 RESPONSE, by Defendants Shirley M Bezona, Dale Bartel, Angie Bartel, Wayne W Walker, Kimberlee S Walker, Robert D Bezona, Clifford W Whitney, Lillian G Whitney, Jeffrey Clark, Kay Clark, Kenneth G Dawson, Anna J Dawson, Richard Dawson, Marlene Dawson, to #781 MOTION for Reconsideration re #779 Order on Legal Issues. (CL, )
June 16, 2005 Filing 786 RESPONSE, by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell, to #780 MOTION for Reconsideration re #779 Order on Legal Issues, #781 MOTION for Reconsideration re #779 Order on Legal Issues. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
June 10, 2005 Filing 785 DECLARATION of Gary Jan Strauss filed by Defendant Pacific NW Bell re #784 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Strauss, Gary)
June 10, 2005 Filing 784 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Pacific NW Bell. Noting Date 6/27/2005. (Strauss, Gary)
June 8, 2005 Filing 783 MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Thomas S. Zilly. The Court RE-NOTES #780 , #781 Pltfs' Motions for Reconsideration for 6/16/05.Response ddl 6/16/05.(CL, )
June 7, 2005 Filing 782 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America re #781 MOTION for Reconsideration re #779 Order on Legal Issues. (Cooney, James)
June 7, 2005 Filing 781 MOTION for Reconsideration re #779 Order on Legal Issues by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 6/7/2005. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit)(Cooney, James) Modified on 6/9/2005 (DM, ).
June 7, 2005 Filing 780 MOTION for Reconsideration re #779 Order on Legal Issues by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. Noting Date 6/7/2005. (Attachments: #1 Part I of Exhibit A#2 Exhibit A - part II)(Johnsen, Harry)
May 24, 2005 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for Tuesday, 6/21/2005 @2:00 PM before Hon. Thomas S. Zilly. (GG, )
May 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 779 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Clerk is directed to schedule a status conference within 20 days of this Order to schedule a trial date.(CL, )
April 19, 2005 Filing 778 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Thomas S. Zilly - Dep Clerk: Gail Glass; Pla Counsel: James Cooney, Harry Johnsen and Jane Marx; Def Counsel: Tim Slater, Gene Knapp, Barbara markham, Tom Young and Lucy Isakia; Pro Se: Marlene Dawson and Robert D. Benozona CR: Joe Roth; Motion Hearing held on 4/19/2005 The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the Motion to Strike by Homeowner Defendants and Water Association Defendants, docket number 749. The Court hears oral argument from counsel on the parties' pending cross motions for summary judgment, docket numbers 718, 723, 726, and 732. The Court takes the matter under advisement. Following the issuance of an Order in this matter, the Court will contact counsel to schedule a status conference. (GG, )
April 15, 2005 Filing 777 RESPONSE TO ISSUES by Defendants Shirley M Bezona, Dale Bartel, Angie Bartel, Michael G Bezona, Kim D Bezona, Wayne W Walker, Kimberlee S Walker, Robert D Bezona, Clifford W Whitney, Lillian G Whitney, Jeffrey Clark, Kenneth G Dawson, Anna J Dawson, Richard Dawson, Marlene Dawson. (Attachments: #1 proposed order for partial summary jgm)(CL, )
April 11, 2005 Filing 776 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States., The Lummi Nation and Henry V. James, Sr., and Flor James by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
April 11, 2005 Filing 775 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States., The Lummi Nation and Michael R. and Nancy A. James by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
April 11, 2005 Filing 774 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States., The Lummi Nation and Linda A. Ward and Andy F. Kamkoff by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
April 11, 2005 Filing 773 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States., The Lummi Nation and Larry J. Berghoff by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
April 11, 2005 Filing 772 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States., The Lummi Nation and Rodney and Lea Ann Fadden by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
April 11, 2005 Filing 771 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States., The Lummi Nation, and Victor Hubbard, Diane Brainard by Judge Thomas S. Zilly..(CL, )
April 11, 2005 Filing 770 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Michael D. Johnson by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
April 11, 2005 Filing 769 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation, Thomas F. and Kathleen L. Richardson by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
April 11, 2005 Filing 768 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., The Lummi Nation, Tim Tran and Phuc Thai by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
April 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 767 ORDER approving 6 Consent Decress with individual Pumper Dfts by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
April 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 766 ORDER approving 3 Consent Decrees by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
April 1, 2005 Filing 765 PRAECIPE to attach document (Consent Decrees) re #764 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 3 Individual Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 James (Henry & Flor)#2 James (Michael & Nancy)#3 Ward Kamkoff Consent Decree)(Johnsen, Harry)
April 1, 2005 Filing 764 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 3 Individual Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. Noting Date 4/15/2005. (Attachments: #1 Attachments A, B & C#2 Proposed Order#3 Certificate of Service)(Johnsen, Harry)
April 1, 2005 Filing 763 PRAECIPE to attach document (Consent Decrees) re #762 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with Six Individual "Pumper" Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Berghoff Consent Decree#2 Fadden Consent Decree#3 Brainard Hubbard Consent Decree#4 Johnson (Michael) Consent Decree#5 Richardson Consent Decree#6 Tran Thai Consent Decree)(Johnsen, Harry)
April 1, 2005 Filing 762 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with Six Individual "Pumper" Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. Noting Date 4/15/2005. (Attachments: #1 Attachments A and B#2 Proposed Order#3 Certificate of Service)(Johnsen, Harry)
March 30, 2005 Filing 761 NOTICE by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell of 3-29-05 Decision (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
March 25, 2005 Filing 760 DECLARATION of Ann Stark filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation re #723 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Behalf of Individual Homeowner Defendants Represented by Gene Knapp and Defendant Water Associations Represented by J. Timothy Slater and ISSUES BRIEF, #726 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Page 3 of Declaration#2 Page 4 of Declaration)(Johnsen, Harry)
March 25, 2005 Filing 759 DECLARATION of Vela Kamkoff filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation re #723 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Behalf of Individual Homeowner Defendants Represented by Gene Knapp and Defendant Water Associations Represented by J. Timothy Slater and ISSUES BRIEF, #726 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Johnsen, Harry)
March 25, 2005 Filing 758 DECLARATION of Dr. Chris Friday filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation re #723 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Behalf of Individual Homeowner Defendants Represented by Gene Knapp and Defendant Water Associations Represented by J. Timothy Slater and ISSUES BRIEF, #726 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Part II of Declaration)(Johnsen, Harry)
March 25, 2005 Filing 757 DECLARATION of Harry L. Johnsen filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation re #723 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Behalf of Individual Homeowner Defendants Represented by Gene Knapp and Defendant Water Associations Represented by J. Timothy Slater and ISSUES BRIEF, #726 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Part II of Declaration#2 Part III of Declaration)(Johnsen, Harry)
March 25, 2005 Filing 756 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #752 Response to Motion, #753 Declaration,, #755 Praecipe-Other. (Markham, Barbara)
March 25, 2005 Filing 755 PRAECIPE re #726 MOTION for Summary Judgment Barbara Markham by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 [Amended] Proposed Order)(Markham, Barbara)
March 25, 2005 Filing 754 RESPONSE, by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation, to #723 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Behalf of Individual Homeowner Defendants Represented by Gene Knapp and Defendant Water Associations Represented by J. Timothy Slater and ISSUES BRIEF, #726 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Johnsen, Harry)
March 25, 2005 Filing 753 Second DECLARATION of Thomas J. Young filed by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #726 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Attach 1 Dep of Kent Richards#2 Attach 2 Greene Dep#3 Attach 3 Trial Exhibit A65#4 Attach 4 Exhibit 60#5 Attach 5 Mesghinna Dep#6 Attach 6 Exhibit 82#7 Attach 7 Friday Report)(Markham, Barbara)
March 25, 2005 Filing 752 RESPONSE, by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington, to #732 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Markham, Barbara)
March 25, 2005 Filing 751 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff United States of America, to #723 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Behalf of Individual Homeowner Defendants Represented by Gene Knapp and Defendant Water Associations Represented by J. Timothy Slater and ISSUES BRIEF, #726 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James B. Cooney#2 Declaration of Gretchen Greene#3 Certificate of Service)(Cooney, James)
March 24, 2005 Filing 750 DECLARATION of GENE KNAPP (NO. 2) IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' REPLY filed by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell re #749 MOTION TO STRIKE re #718 Brief, #732 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #720 Declaration, #721 Declaration, #733 Declaration ; REPLY BRIEF OF HOMEOWNER DEFENDANTS AND DEFENDANT WATER ASSOCIATIONS (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
March 24, 2005 Filing 749 MOTION TO STRIKE re #718 Brief, #732 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #720 Declaration, #721 Declaration, #733 Declaration ; REPLY BRIEF OF HOMEOWNER DEFENDANTS AND DEFENDANT WATER ASSOCIATIONS by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell. Noting Date 4/18/2005. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
March 17, 2005 Filing 748 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., The Lummi Nation and Richard E. and Alice N. Wales by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 747 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., The Lummi Nation and Jerome J. and Anna K. Vandenbroucke by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 746 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., The Lummi Nation and William L. Freeman and Carolyn M. Robbins by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 745 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., The Lummi Nation and Richard R. and Cheryl C. Nolte by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 744 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., The Lummi Nation and Frederick W. Nolte III and Richard R. Nolte by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 743 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., The Lummi Nation and Frederick W. Nolte III and Jerre K. Nolte by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 742 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., The Lummi Nation and John and Kathrine Munson by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 741 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., The Lummi Nation and Larry G and Gloria A. Harriman by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 740 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., The Lummi Nation, Donald H. and Lucille L. Curtis by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 739 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., The Lummi Nation and Robert F. Costello by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 738 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., The Lummi Nation and Karen Boyd by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 737 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., The Lummi Nation, Colleen and Kevin Berg and Karen Snell by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 736 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., The Lummi Nation, Craig Abrahamson and Patricia A. Doorenbos by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 14, 2005 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #728 Declaration: Edited text to reflect that these are the exhibits and not a new delcaration. (ECS, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 735 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America re #732 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Cooney, James)
March 11, 2005 Filing 734 EXHIBIT A :Solicitor's 1995 M Opinion re #732 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff United States of America. (Cooney, James)
March 11, 2005 Filing 733 DECLARATION of Christopher Friday re #732 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1exhibit 1 #2exhibit 2 #3exhibit 3 #4exhibit 4)(Cooney, James) Modified on 3/14/2005 to name attachments(RS, ).
March 11, 2005 Filing 732 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 4/18/2005. (Attachments: #1proposed order)(Cooney, James) Modified on 3/14/2005 to name attachment(RS, ).
March 11, 2005 Filing 731 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #728 Declaration, #729 Declaration, #730 Declaration, #726 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #727 Declaration. (Markham, Barbara)
March 11, 2005 Filing 730 DECLARATION of John R. Smith filed by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #726 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Markham, Barbara)
March 11, 2005 Filing 729 DECLARATION of Dr. Donald B. Pittenger filed by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #726 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Markham, Barbara)
March 11, 2005 Filing 728 EXHIBITS to DECLARATION of Thomas J. Young filed by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #726 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Markham, Barbara) Modified on 3/14/2005 to edit docket text (ECS, ).
March 11, 2005 Filing 727 DECLARATION of Thomas J. Young filed by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #726 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1exhibit)(Markham, Barbara) Modified on 3/14/2005 to name attachment(RS, ).
March 11, 2005 Filing 726 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington. Noting Date 4/18/2005. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Markham, Barbara)
March 11, 2005 Filing 725 DECLARATION of J. TIMOTHY SLATER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: ISSUES IDENTIFIED AT THE FEBRUARY 18, 2005, HEARING filed by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell re #723 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Behalf of Individual Homeowner Defendants Represented by Gene Knapp and Defendant Water Associations Represented by J. Timothy Slater and ISSUES BRIEF (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - L#2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
March 11, 2005 Filing 724 DECLARATION of GENE KNAPP IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: ISSUES IDENTIFIED AT THE FEBRUARY 18, 2005, HEARING filed by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell re #723 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Behalf of Individual Homeowner Defendants Represented by Gene Knapp and Defendant Water Associations Represented by J. Timothy Slater and ISSUES BRIEF (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to 8#2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
March 11, 2005 Filing 723 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Behalf of Individual Homeowner Defendants Represented by Gene Knapp and Defendant Water Associations Represented by J. Timothy Slater and ISSUES BRIEF by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell. Noting Date 4/18/2005. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
March 11, 2005 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification: Wrong event used; counsel to re-file as Motion to facilitate linking susequent filings. (HBR, )
March 11, 2005 Filing 722 FILED USING INCORRECT EVENT, COUNSEL TO RE-FILE. ISSUES BRIEF AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF INDIVIDUAL HOMEOWNER DEFENDANTS REPRESENTED BY GENE KNAPP AND DEFENDANT WATER ASSOCIATIONS REPRESENTED BY J. TIMOTHY SLATER by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene) Modified on 3/11/2005 (HBR, ).
March 11, 2005 Filing 721 DECLARATION of Wold Mesghinna re #718 Brief on Legal Issues by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Johnsen, Harry)
March 11, 2005 Filing 720 DECLARATION of Paul Hamai re #718 Brief on Legal Issues by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Johnsen, Harry)
March 11, 2005 Filing 719 DECLARATION of Harry L. Johnsen in Support of Brief on Legal Issues re #718 Brief on Legal Issues by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Johnsen, Harry)
March 11, 2005 Filing 718 BRIEF re: Legal Issues by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Attachments A & B#2 Table of Authorities#3 Certificate of Service)(Johnsen, Harry)
March 9, 2005 Filing 717 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and David M. Zander by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
March 9, 2005 Filing 716 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Wylde Family Living Trust by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
March 9, 2005 Filing 715 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Lucille Wood-Trost by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
March 9, 2005 Filing 714 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Richard Wood by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
March 9, 2005 Filing 713 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Dale Williams and Linda (Lux) Williams by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
March 9, 2005 Filing 712 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Scott A. Wicklund by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 711 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Loseph E. Washington and Mariea L. Jones by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 710 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Ronald C. and Esther J. Ware by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 709 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and David A. and Ann M. Ware by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 708 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Owen B. and Janet A. Walker by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 707 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Anne E. Wales by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 706 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Rodney G. and Jennifer Taylor by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 705 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Jerry L. and Lois E. Summers by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 704 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and James R. and Linda M. Stiles by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 703 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Susan (Mead) Sowers by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 702 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Steven S. Jr. and Alicia A. Solomon by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 701 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Dee A. Powell by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 700 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Tony R. Phillipsby Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 699 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and David E. Peterson Trust by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 698 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Erin Rowniak by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 697 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation, and William D and Linnea G Smith by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MD )
March 4, 2005 Filing 696 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Allen C and Kristeen M. Peterson by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 695 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Diane L. Perry by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 694 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation, and William V and Patricia L Schacht by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MD )
March 4, 2005 Filing 693 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Joyce A. Pearson by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 692 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation, and Ismael A and Lisa M Santana by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MD )
March 4, 2005 Filing 691 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and John L. and Margaret A. Payne by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 690 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Joanne S. Palmer by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 689 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation, and Wayne Rasmussen by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MD )
March 4, 2005 Filing 688 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Edith M. Paegle by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 687 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Graydon and Carol Robertson by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 686 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Leonard L. and Barbara A. Padget by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 685 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Donald C. and Shirley Ridpath by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 684 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation, and Lowell G and Nancy Radder by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MD )
March 4, 2005 Filing 683 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Joshua B. and Natasha Lydolph by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 682 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation, and Lebarson W Price by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MD )
March 4, 2005 Filing 681 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Jess L. Lowery by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 680 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation, and Pacific Homes/Homequest, Inc by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MD )
March 4, 2005 Filing 679 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Mary A. Logan by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 678 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Ronald M. and Libby C. Lester by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 677 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation, and Charles F and Ruth E Oltman by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MD )
March 4, 2005 Filing 676 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and James K. and June J. Leppala by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 675 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Carl F. Nordeng by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 674 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Ruth Larson by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 673 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation, and Northcoast Builders Inc. and Cryptical Envelopment, Inc. by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MD )
March 4, 2005 Filing 672 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Diana S. Newell by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 671 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Carl D. and Carol A. Lane by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 670 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Stacy Neal by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 669 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Donald W. Klatt and Candace P. Smith by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 668 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Dirk W. Muntean by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 667 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Michael Meier by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MD )
March 4, 2005 Filing 666 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Fred J. and Ophelia C. Morgan by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 665 Judgment/Consent Decree between the United States, The Lumni Nation and Helan King, Executor of the Estate of Elna Lavelle by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 664 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Gregory A. Moore by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 663 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Corrine H Matsukawa by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MD )
March 4, 2005 Filing 662 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Robert J. and Ann Miller by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 661 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation, and Michael L. Martin and Judith M Scott by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MD )
March 4, 2005 Filing 660 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Dean D. and Catherine R. Donnelly trustees of the Dean and Catherine Donnelly living trust by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 659 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Dennis L. Hoofnagle by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 658 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Paul W. Kaiser by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 657 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Teresa Josephson and Brad Schuetze by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 656 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Jan A. Jorgensen by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 655 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Kenneth R. and Bonny K. Jones by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 654 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Stevem C. Johnson by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 653 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Davida A. and Venessa V. James by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 652 Judgment/Consent Decree between the US., the Lummi Nation and Michael W. Jacobson by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 651 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the US., the Lummi Nation and Kenneth D and Sherry L. (Brionez) Huston by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 650 JUDGMENT/Consent Decree between the US. the Lummi Nation and Robert E. Howell by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 649 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and David E. Hopkins by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 648 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and John H. and Lucena A. Hocking by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 647 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Jessica E. Hobbs by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 646 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Glen C. and Joan E. Hitchcock by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 645 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Carla A. Hillaire by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 644 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Steven G. and Karen M. Hicks by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 643 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between US, the Lummi Nation and Wayne Hetland by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, ) Modified on 3/7/2005 as document is identical to previously filed order - doc 642 (RS, ).
March 4, 2005 Filing 642 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Wayne A. Hetland by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 641 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Glenn and Virginia Hermanson by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 640 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the US, the Lummi Nation and Malcolm V. Haner by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 639 JUDGMENT/CONSENT JUDGMENT between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and James L. Farrar and Nancy A. Trotto by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 638 JUDGMENT/CONSENT JUDGMENT between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Joy H. Ellis Revocable Trust by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 637 JUDGMENT/CONSENT JUDGMENT between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Randy V. Edin by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 636 JUDGMENT/CONSENT JUDGMENT between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Thomas Dunn by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 635 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, the Lummi Nation and Marcia Deveraux-Amour by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MD )
March 4, 2005 Filing 634 JUDGMENT/CONSENT JUDGMENT between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and John E. and Mary Ann Douglas by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 633 JUDGMENT/CONSENT JUDGMENT between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Roger J. and Donalda L. Donnelly by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LMS, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 632 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Velda P Deveraux by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MD )
March 4, 2005 Filing 631 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and John Groom by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 630 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between The United States, The Lummi Nation and Dennis P Desjarlais by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MD )
March 4, 2005 Filing 629 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Bernard A. Graupe by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 628 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Mark Glaser and Margaret A. Somerville, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 627 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Jon T. Gergen, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 626 CONSENT DECREE/JUDGMENT between the United States, The Lummi Nation and John R. Denby III by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MD, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 625 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Erik D. Forssen by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 624 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Joseph B. and Carla J. Fleckenstein, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 623 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Kevin K. and Angel A. Finsrud, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 622 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Johnny D. Felix and Melissa Y. John by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 621 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Michael D. Davis by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 620 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Gerry and Barbara Clow, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 619 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Chong S. Chancellor, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 618 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Jack M. and Paula L. Casey, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 617 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Paula L. Casey, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 616 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Michael G. Burrill, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 615 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and David L. and Darlene J. Burgess, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 614 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Roy M. Budde, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 613 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and John H. Brunson and Lucille Wood-Trost, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 612 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Karen and Matthew Brunner, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 611 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Thomas E. Brown, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 610 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Armando Brionez, Jr., by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 609 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Linda Brannan, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 608 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Dani I. and Melissa A. Bou-Reslan, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 607 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Charles G. Baker and Chandos Maree, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 606 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Charles V. Baker and Lisa M. Burns, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 605 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Susan Elizabeth Bainter, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 604 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation, and Susan E. Bailey, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LT, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 603 JUDGMENT/CONSENT DECREE between the United States, The Lummi Nation and Jeff Annis by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CL, )
February 22, 2005 Filing 602 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Thomas S. Zilly - Dep Clerk: Gail Glass; Pla Counsel: James Cooney, Harry Johnsen, Jane Marx, and Cabell Breckinridge; Def Counsel: J. Timothy Slaater; CR: Sue Palmerton; Motion Hearing held on 2/18/2005 AThe Court and counsel discuss the posture of the case and pending motions. The Court hears oral argument on pending motions. The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the motion to admit deposition excerpts, docket number 492. The Court DENIES the motion to exclude witness Chris Friday, docket no. 497, but DEFERS until trial the scope witness Friday's testimony. The Court DENIES the motion to exclude the SEAWAT model, docket no. 500. The Court DENIES the motion to strike affirmative defense or for partial summary judgment, docket nos. 503 & 504. The Court DENIES the motion in limine to limit expert testimony, docket no. 505. The Court DENIES the motion in limine to exclude witness Green, docket no. 509. The Court DENIES the motion for leave to file pretrial motions, docket no. 593. The Court strikes as frivolous Defendant's argument that there is no federal treaty-reserved water right on the Lummi Reservation because of the trust status of land parcels on the Lummi Reservation. See Order, docket no. 304, at 16. The Court directs counsel to meet and confer this afternoon to discuss further legal issues and other stated matters. At the conclusion of the conference the court met informally with all parties. The Court ORDERS additional Summary Judgment briefing on various legal issues. Plaintiff United States, Plaintiff Lummi Nation, Defendant Homeowners & Defendant Water ssociations, and Defendant Ecology, shall each submit opening briefs by March 11, 2005, not to exceed 40 pages, plus not more than 100 pages for declarations. Reply briefing, not to exceed 15 pages, shall be due March 25, 2005. The Court SCHEDULES Oral Argument on Summary Judgment issues for April 18, 2005, at 9:00 AM. (GG, ) Modified on 2/22/2005 (GG, ).
February 15, 2005 Filing 601 REPLY, filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation, TO RESPONSE to #593 MOTION to Grant Leave to File Pretrial Motions (Johnsen, Harry)
February 14, 2005 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #596 Declaration, : linked to correct event #503 Motion for Summary Judgment (KN, )
February 11, 2005 Filing 600 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #599 Declaration, #597 Notice-Other, #598 Response to Motion. (Markham, Barbara)
February 11, 2005 Filing 599 DECLARATION of Thomas J. Young filed by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington re #593 MOTION to Grant Leave to File Pretrial Motions (Markham, Barbara)
February 11, 2005 Filing 598 RESPONSE, by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington, to #593 MOTION to Grant Leave to File Pretrial Motions. (Markham, Barbara)
February 11, 2005 Filing 597 NOTICE by Defendant Ecology Department of the State of Washington Notice of Filing Ecology's Proposal for Trial Presentation (Markham, Barbara)
February 10, 2005 Filing 596 DECLARATION of GENE KNAPP IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES' MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell re #593 MOTION to Grant Leave to File Pretrial Motions #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene) Modified on 2/14/2005, LINKED TO CORRECT EVENT (KN, ).
February 8, 2005 Filing 595 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America. (Cooney, James)
February 7, 2005 Filing 594 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #593 MOTION to Grant Leave to File Pretrial Motions, by Plaintiff United States of America. (Cooney, James) Modified text and linked to Dkt. #593 on 2/8/2005 (AF, ).
February 7, 2005 Filing 593 MOTION to Grant Leave to File Pretrial Motions by Plaintiff United States of America, Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. Noting Date 2/16/2005. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order#2 Motion to Strike Certain Defenses and to Exclude Evidence#3 Motion to Strike Defenses and to Exclude Evidence Relating to Water Sources Other than Groundwater on the Lummi Peninsula#4 Cooney Declaration#5 Exhibits Pages 1-25#6 Exhibits Pages 26-47#7 Exhibits Pages 48-69#8 Proposed Order)(Cooney, James)
February 3, 2005 Filing 591 REPLY, filed by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell, TO RESPONSE to #497 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Chris Friday as an Expert Witness (by Water Association Defendants/J. Timonthy Slater and) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
February 2, 2005 Filing 592 MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Thomas S. Zilly. The Court GRANTS AND DENIES IN PART #581 Dfts' Motion to re-use depositions at trial . (CL, )
January 31, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ORDER GRANTING 127 CONSENT DECREES with Individual Gooseberry and Pumper Dfts by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(CL, )
January 28, 2005 Filing 589 PRAECIPE re #568 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 13 Pumper Defendants, #569 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 117 Individual Gooseberry Defendants -- PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING CONSENT DECREES by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Johnsen, Harry)
January 28, 2005 Filing 588 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell re #587 Praecipe to attach Document Proposed Order No. 2. (Knapp, Eugene)
January 28, 2005 Filing 587 PRAECIPE to attach document (PRAECIPE) Proposed Order No. 2 re #584 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Eugene)
January 26, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER granting #577 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.Attorney James Martin Johnson terminated. (CL, )
January 19, 2005 Filing 585 DECLARATION of TERESA A. PENLEY filed by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell re #581 MOTION RE USE OF DEPOSITIONS AT TRIAL (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
January 19, 2005 Filing 584 REPLY, filed by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell, TO RESPONSE to #581 MOTION RE USE OF DEPOSITIONS AT TRIAL (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
January 18, 2005 Docket text for #569 modified on 1/18/2005 per filer's request to correct typo in number of Individual Gooseberry Defts (DM, )
January 14, 2005 Filing 583 DECLARATION of Harry Johnsen filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation re #581 MOTION RE USE OF DEPOSITIONS AT TRIAL (Johnsen, Harry)
January 14, 2005 Filing 582 RESPONSE, by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation, to #581 MOTION RE USE OF DEPOSITIONS AT TRIAL. (Johnsen, Harry)
December 30, 2004 Filing 581 MOTION RE USE OF DEPOSITIONS AT TRIAL by Defendants Nicole Autry, Steven S Axtell. Noting Date 1/21/2005. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)(Knapp, Eugene)
December 27, 2004 Filing 580 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #576 Order addressed to Zena Morton. (re-mailed to updated address). (CL, )
December 16, 2004 Filing 579 AFFIDAVIT of James M Johnson filed by Defendants Sunset Water Assn, Harnden Island View Water Association, Georgia Manor Water Assoc re #577 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James M. Johnson CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Johnson, James)
December 16, 2004 Filing 578 DECLARATION of James M Johnson filed by Defendants Sunset Water Assn, Harnden Island View Water Association, Georgia Manor Water Assoc re #577 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James M. Johnson (Johnson, James)
December 16, 2004 Filing 577 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James M. Johnson by Defendants Sunset Water Assn, Harnden Island View Water Association, Georgia Manor Water Assoc. Noting Date 1/7/2005. (Proposed Order attached to end of motion) (Johnson, James) Modified text on 12/17/2004 (AF, ).
December 10, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court dismisses all claims against dfts David Stricker and Rachel Stricker. (CL, )
December 8, 2004 Filing 575 PRAECIPE to attach document (Consent Decrees) re #569 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 117 Individual Gooseberry Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Santana Consent Decree#2 Schacht Consent Decree#3 Smith Consent Decree#4 Solomon Consent Decree#5 Sowers Consent Decree#6 Stiles Consent Decree#7 Summers Consent Decree#8 Taylor Consent Decree#9 Wales Consent Decree#10 Walker Consent Decree#11 Ware (David & Ann) Consent Decree#12 Ware (Ronald & Esther) Consent Decree#13 Washington & Jones Consent Decree#14 Wicklund Consent Decree#15 Williams Consent Decree#16 Wood Consent Decree#17 Wood-Trost Consent Decree#18 Wylde Family Trust Consent Decree#19 Zander Consent Decree)(Johnsen, Harry)
December 8, 2004 Filing 574 PRAECIPE to attach document (Consent Decrees) re #569 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 117 Individual Gooseberry Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Northcoast Builders & Cryptical Envelopment Consent Decree#2 Oltman Consent Decree#3 Pacific Homes & Homequest Consent Decree#4 Padget Consent Decree#5 Paegle Consent Decree#6 Palmer Consent Decree#7 Payne Consent Decree#8 Pearson Consent Decree#9 Perry Consent Decree#10 Peterson Consent Decree#11 Peterson Trust Consent Decree#12 Phillips Consent Decree#13 Powell Consent Decree#14 Price Consent Decree#15 Radder Consent Decree#16 Rasmussen Consent Decree#17 Ridpath Consent Decree#18 Robertson Consent Decree#19 Rowniak Consent Decree)(Johnsen, Harry)
December 7, 2004 Filing 573 PRAECIPE to attach document (Praecipe to Attach Consent Decrees) re #569 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 117 Individual Gooseberry Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Lavelle Estate Consent Decree#2 Klatt & Smith Consent Decree#3 Lane Consent Decree#4 Larson Consent Decree#5 Leppala Consent Decree#6 Lester Consent Decree#7 Logan Consent Decree#8 Lowery Consent Decree#9 Lydolph Consent Decree#10 Martin & Scott Consent Decree#11 Matsukawa Consent Decree#12 Meier Consent Decree#13 Miller Consent Decree#14 Moore Consent Decree#15 Morgan Consent Decree#16 Muntean Consent Decree#17 Neal Consent Decree#18 Newell Consent Decree#19 Nordeng Consent Decree)(Johnsen, Harry)
December 7, 2004 Filing 572 PRAECIPE to attach document (Praecipe to Attach Consent Decrees) re #569 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 117 Individual Gooseberry Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Haner Consent Decree#2 Hermanson Consent Decree#3 Hetland Consent Decree#4 Hicks Consent Decree#5 Hillaire Consent Decree#6 Hitchcock Consent Decree#7 Hobbs Consent Decree#8 Hocking Consent Decree#9 Hoofnagle Consent Decree#10 Hopkins Consent Decree#11 Howell Consent Decree#12 Huston & Brionez Consent Decree#13 Jacobson Consent Decree#14 James Consent Decree#15 Johnson Consent Decree#16 Jones Consent Decree#17 Jorgenson Consent Decree#18 Josephson & Schuetze Consent Decree#19 Kaiser Consent Decree)(Johnsen, Harry)
December 7, 2004 Filing 571 PRAECIPE to attach document (Praecipe to Attach Consent Decrees) re #569 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 117 Individual Gooseberry Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Dendby Consent Decree#2 Desjarlais Consent Decree#3 Deveraux (Velda) Consent Decree#4 Deveraux-Amour (Marcia) Consent Decree#5 Donnelly (Dean & Catherine) Consent Decree#6 Donnelly (Roger and Donalda) Consent Decree#7 Douglas Consent Decree#8 Dunn Consent Decree#9 Edin Consent Decree#10 Ellis Trust Consent Decree#11 Farrar & Trotto Consent Decree#12 Felix & John Consent Decree#13 Finsrud Consent Decree#14 Fleckenstein Consent Decree#15 Forssen Consent Decree#16 Gergen Consent Decree#17 Glaser & Somerville Consent Decree#18 Graupe Consent Decree#19 Groom Consent Decree)(Johnsen, Harry) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2005 (CL, ).
December 7, 2004 Filing 570 PRAECIPE to attach document (Praecipe to Attach Consent Decrees) re #569 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 117 Individual Gooseberry Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. (Attachments: #1 Annis Consent Decree#2 Bailey Consent Decree#3 Bainter Consent Decree#4 Baker & Burns Consent Decree#5 Baker & Maree Consent Decree#6 Bou-Reslan Consent Decree#7 Brannan Consent Decree#8 Brionez Consent Decree#9 Brown Consent Decree#10 Brunner Consent Decree#11 Brunson & Wood-Trost Consent Decree#12 Budde Consent Decree#13 Burgess Consent Decree#14 Burrill Consent Decree#15 Casey (Paula) Consent Decree#16 Casey (Paula & Jack) Consent Decree#17 Chancellor Consent Decree#18 Clow Consent Decree#19 Davis Consent Decree)(Johnsen, Harry)
December 7, 2004 Filing 569 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 117 114 Individual Gooseberry Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. Noting Date 12/24/2004. (Attachments: #1 Attachments A & B (Consent Decrees filed separately))(Johnsen, Harry) Docket text modified on 1/18/2005 per filer's request to correct typo in number of Individual Gooseberry Defts (DM, ).
December 7, 2004 Filing 568 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment with 13 Pumper Defendants by Intervenor Plaintiff Lummi Nation. Noting Date 12/24/2004. (Attachments: #1 Part I of Attachment A#2 Part II of Attachment A#3 Attachment B#4 Abrahamson Consent Decree#5 Berg Snell Consent Decree#6 Boyd Consent Decree#7 Costello Consent Decree#8 Curtis Consent Decree#9 Harriman Consent Decree#10 Munson Consent Decree#11 Nolte (Frederick & Jerre) Consent Decree#12 Nolte (Frederick & Richard) Consent Decree#13 Nolte (Richard & Cheryl) Consent Decree#14 Robbins Freeman Consent Decree#15 Vandenbroucke Consent Decree#16 Wales Consent Decree)(Johnsen, Harry)
November 23, 2004 Filing 567 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendant David L Stricker. Noting Date 12/10/2004. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(CL, )
November 22, 2004 Filing 566 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #560 Order addressed to Zena Morton (no updated address on record). (CL, )
November 22, 2004 Filing 565 MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Thomas S. Zilly. The Court DENIES #555 Dft David William's Motion for Temporary Relief from the Interruption of Water Supply to his home.(CL, )
November 18, 2004 Filing 564 REPLY, filed by Defendant David A Williams, TO RESPONSE to #561 MOTION for Extension of Time (CL, )
November 10, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 563 MINUTE ORDER #561 The Court GRANTS Defendant Williams' Motion to Extend the Noting Date, docket no. 561. Defendant's Motion for Temporary Relief from Interruption of Water Supply, docket no. 555, is RENOTED for November 19, 2004. Defendant Williams' Reply shall be filed by November 18, 2004. by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CH)