United States of America v. Impulse Media Group Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that defendant Impulse Media Group Inc. initiated the transmission, to protected computers, of commercial email messages that include sexually oriented material, but did not warn the recipient that such messages were sexually explicit as required under the CAN-SPAM Act, did not offer recipients the means to opt-out of future messages, did not include the sender\'s valid physical postal address, and included sexually oriented material within the initially viewable content of the message.

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Impulse Media Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2005cv01285
Filed: July 20, 2005
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2008 104 Featured Case ORDER denying dft's 95 Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
August 15, 2008 103 DECLARATION of Kevan L. Morgan filed by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc re 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act (Apgood, Robert)
August 15, 2008 102 Second DECLARATION of Spencer D. Freeman filed by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc re 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act (Apgood, Robert)
August 15, 2008 101 Second DECLARATION of Robert S. Apgood filed by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc re 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act (Apgood, Robert)
August 15, 2008 100 REPLY, filed by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc, TO RESPONSE to 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act (Apgood, Robert)
August 11, 2008 99 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff United States of America, to 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act. (Steger, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2008 98 DECLARATION of Spencer D. Freeman filed by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc re 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Itemization of Fees and Costs)(Apgood, Robert)
July 30, 2008 97 DECLARATION of Robert S. Apgood filed by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc re 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Itemization of Fees and Costs)(Apgood, Robert)
July 30, 2008 96 DECLARATION of Seth Schermerhorn filed by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc re 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act (Apgood, Robert)
July 30, 2008 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc. Noting Date 8/15/2008 (Apgood, Robert)
May 30, 2008 Exhibits returned to counsel. (KERR)
May 1, 2008 94 JUDGMENT BY JURY finding in favor of defendant Impulse Media Group Inc (RS, )
May 1, 2008 93 Featured Case ORDER denying plaintiff's 90 Motion for Permanent Injunction by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS, )
April 10, 2008 92 RESPONSE, by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc, to 90 MOTION for Permanent Injunction. (Freeman, Spencer)
April 4, 2008 91 WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST by court (RS, )
April 4, 2008 90 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8)Noting Date 4/11/2008.(Steger, Jeffrey)
March 28, 2008 89 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE/JURY VERDICT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED; The Jury finds in favor of defendant. (CL, )
March 26, 2008 85 Featured Case ORDER injunctive relief claim due 4/4/08; response due 4/11/08 by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS, )
March 24, 2008 88 JURY VERDICT (Redacted)(TS, )
March 24, 2008 87 Court's Instructions to the Jury (TS, )
March 24, 2008 86 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Robert S. Lasnik - Dep Clerk: Kerry Simonds; Pla Counsel: Jeff Steger and Lauren Hash; Def Counsel: Robert Apgood and Spencer Freeman; CR: Barry Fanning; Time of Hearing: 8:30 a.m.; Courtroom: 15106; Jury Trial completed on 3/24/2008. The Court instructs the jury. Counsel present closing arguments. At 11:15 a.m. the jury retires to deliberate. At 3:00 p.m. the jury notifies the Court that they have reached a verdict. The jury finds in favor of defendant. The jury is thanked and excused. Court is adjourned. (KERR, )
March 21, 2008 84 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Robert S. Lasnik - Dep Clerk: Kerry Simonds; Pla Counsel: Jeff Steger and Lauren Hash; Def Counsel: Robert Apgood and Spencer Freeman; CR: Barry Fanning; Time of Hearing: 9:30 a.m.; Courtroom: 15106; Third Day of Jury Trial held on 3/21/2008. The testimony of Allyson Himelfarb resumes and concludes. The government rests. Defendants witness Seth Schermerhorn is sworn and testifies. The defendant rests. The jury is excused until Monday, March 24, 2008 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant moves to strike the test of Allyson Himelfarb and moves to dismiss. After hearing the arguments of counsel, the Court denies the motions. The Court and counsel discuss jury instructions. Court is adjourned until Monday, March 24, 2008 at 8:30 a.m. (KERR, )
March 21, 2008 83 Jury Peremptory Challenges (RS, )
March 20, 2008 82 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Robert S. Lasnik - Dep Clerk: Kerry Simonds; Pla Counsel: Jeff Steger and Lauren Hash; Def Counsel: Robert Apgood and Spencer Freeman; CR: Barry Fanning; Time of Hearing: 8:45 a.m.; Courtroom: 15106; Second Day of Jury Trial held on 3/20/2008. Plaintiff's witnesses Seth Schermerhorn and Allyson Himelfarb are sworn and testify. The deposition testimony of Josh Mackey is read into the record. Exhibits 416, 431-434, 427-430, 417, 435, 424 (redacted), 425 (redacted), 419, 440, 447, 19-86, 88-97, 87, 98-102, 104-164, 172-209, 165-170, 211-299, 300-330, 331-372, 373-379 and 381-386 are admitted into evidence. Court is adjourned until Friday, March 21, 2008 at 9:30 a.m. (KERR, )
March 19, 2008 81 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Robert S. Lasnik - Dep Clerk: Kerry Simonds; Pla Counsel: Jeff Steger and Lauren Hash; Def Counsel: Robert Apgood and Spencer Freeman; CR: Barry Fanning; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 15106;Jury Trial begun on 3/19/2008. The Court and counsel discuss pretrial matters. The jury is empaneled. Counsel present opening statements. Plaintiff's witnesses David Vetter and Chad Bundy are sworn and testify. Exhibits 1-18, 103, 171, 210, 380, 387-413, 441, 443, 445, 446, 442, 444, 450-452 and 454-456 are admitted into evidence. The Court reserves ruling on exhibits 19-102, 104-170, 172-209, 211-379, 381-386. The jury is excused. The Court rules on the deposition testimony of Josh Mackey. Jury Trial continued to 3/20/2008 at 8:40 AM before Hon Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR, )
March 18, 2008 80 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael James Boyle on behalf of Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc. (Boyle, Michael)
March 18, 2008 79 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Robert S. Lasnik - Dep Clerk: Kerry Simonds; Pla Counsel: Jeff Steger and Lauren Hash; Def Counsel: Robert Apgood and Spencer Freeman; CR: Barry Fanning; Time of Hearing: 3:15 p.m.; Courtroom: 15106; Pretrial Conference held on 3/18/2008. (KERR, )
March 18, 2008 78 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Spencer D Freeman on behalf of Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc. (Freeman, Spencer)
March 14, 2008 77 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Robert S. Lasnik - Dep Clerk: N/A; Pla Counsel: Lauren Hash and Jeff Steger; Def Counsel: Robert Apgood; CR: Laurene Kelly; Time of Hearing: 8:30 a.m.; Telephone Conference held on 3/14/2008. Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2008 at 3:00 PM before Hon Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR, )
March 12, 2008 76 Featured Case ORDER Denying 57 Dft's Motion for Dismiss, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(CL, )
March 10, 2008 75 MINUTE ORDER Telephone Conference set for 3/14/2008 at 8:30 AM before Hon Robert S. Lasnik.(KERR, )
March 5, 2008 74 TRIAL BRIEF by Plaintiff United States of America. (Hash, Lauren)
March 5, 2008 73 Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiff United States of America, Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc (Disputed Instructions and Verdict Form) (Steger, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2008 72 Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiff United States of America, Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc (Steger, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2008 71 Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff United States of America, Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc. (Steger, Jeffrey)
February 29, 2008 70 REPLY, filed by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc, TO RESPONSE to 56 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Apgood, Robert)
February 29, 2008 69 Proposed Voir Dire by Plaintiff United States of America. (Steger, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2008 68 RESPONSE by Plaintiff United States of America re 66 Proposed Jury Instructions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Lauren E. Hash# 2 Exhibit 2)(Hash, Lauren)
February 27, 2008 67 Proposed Voir Dire by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc. (Apgood, Robert)
February 27, 2008 66 Proposed Jury Instructions by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc and Proposed Verdict Form (Apgood, Robert)
February 27, 2008 65 TRIAL BRIEF by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc. (Apgood, Robert)
February 17, 2008 64 Second DECLARATION of Robert S. Apgood filed by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc re 57 MOTION for Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, Local Rule CR 16 and Local Rule GR 3 (Apgood, Robert)
February 17, 2008 63 REPLY, filed by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc, TO RESPONSE to 57 MOTION for Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, Local Rule CR 16 and Local Rule GR 3 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Plaintiff's Statement of Facts)(Apgood, Robert)
February 15, 2008 62 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff United States of America, to 56 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. (Hash, Lauren)
February 14, 2008 61 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Robert S. Lasnik - Dep Clerk: N/A; Pla Counsel: Lauren Hash; Def Counsel: Robert Apgood; CR: N/A; Time of Hearing: 11:15 a.m.; Telephone Conference held on 2/14/2008. Jury Trial is reset for 3/18/2008 at 9:00 AM before Hon Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR, )
February 6, 2008 60 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff United States of America, to 57 MOTION for Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, Local Rule CR 16 and Local Rule GR 3. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Lauren E. Hash# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4 Declaration of Jeffrey Steger# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6)(Hash, Lauren)
February 5, 2008 59 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING 57 MOTION for Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, Local Rule CR 16 and Local Rule GR 3 ; Noting Date 2/29/2008.(KERR, )
February 4, 2008 58 DECLARATION of Robert S. Apgood filed by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc re 57 MOTION for Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, Local Rule CR 16 and Local Rule GR 3 (Apgood, Robert)
February 4, 2008 57 MOTION for Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, Local Rule CR 16 and Local Rule GR 3 by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Noting Date 2/13/2008.(Apgood, Robert)
February 4, 2008 56 MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion)Noting Date 2/29/2008.(Apgood, Robert)
January 31, 2008 55 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Robert S Apgood for Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc from 02/05/2008 to 02/13/2008. (Apgood, Robert)
January 31, 2008 54 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Robert S Apgood for Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc from 02/18/2008 to 02/26/2008. (Apgood, Robert)
January 31, 2008 53 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Robert S Apgood for Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc from 02/05/2008 to 02/08/2008. (Apgood, Robert)
November 28, 2007 52 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 5 days. Jury Trial is set for 3/3/2008 before Hon Robert S. Lasnik.,Motions in Limine due by 2/4/2008,Pretrial Order due by 2/20/2008,Trial briefs to be submitted by 2/27/2008,Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 2/27/2008 by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS, )
November 14, 2007 51 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James P. Donohue - Settlement Conference held on 11/14/2007. Court and counsel continue discussions from 10/25/07. (PV, )
October 22, 2007 50 Featured Case ORDER granting 45 Motion by FTC that they be excused from LR 39.1 requirement by Judge James P. Donohue.(RS, )
October 18, 2007 49 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff United States of America, TO RESPONSE to 45 MOTION for Relief Request Regarding Attendance at Court Ordered Settlement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8)(Hash, Lauren)
October 15, 2007 48 RESPONSE, by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc, to 45 MOTION for Relief Request Regarding Attendance at Court Ordered Settlement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Apgood, Robert)
October 14, 2007 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 46 Response to Motion, : THIS DOCUMENT WAS FILED IN ERROR. THE CORRECT RESPONSE WAS FILED AS DOCUMENT # 48. DISREGARD THIS FILING. (VB, )
October 14, 2007 47 DECLARATION of Robert S. Apgood filed by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc re 45 MOTION for Relief Request Regarding Attendance at Court Ordered Settlement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - EMail request by Plaintiff for Defendant to agree to filing of Plaintiff's Request Regarding Attendance unopposed# 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order Plaintiff provided when seeking Defendant's agreement to allow to be filed unopposed# 3 Exhibit C - EMail messages between counsel clarifying terms in proposed motion# 4 Exhibit D - EMail from Defendant's counsel to Plaintiff's counsel declining to agree to filing of motion as unopposed)(Apgood, Robert)
October 14, 2007 46 THIS DOCUMENT WAS FILED IN ERROR. THE CORRECT RESPONSE WAS FILED AS DOCUMENT # 48. DISREGARD THIS FILING.RESPONSE, by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc, to 45 MOTION for Relief Request Regarding Attendance at Court Ordered Settlement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Apgood, Robert) Modified on 10/15/2007 (VB, ).
October 11, 2007 45 MOTION for Relief Request Regarding Attendance at Court Ordered Settlement by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Noting Date 10/22/2007.(Hash, Lauren)
October 5, 2007 44 Featured Case ORDER granting 43 Motion to Amend Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS, )
October 3, 2007 43 Agreed MOTION to Amend 39 Minute Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates,,by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 10/3/2007.(Steger, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2007 42 Featured Case ORDER APPOINTING US MAGISTRATE JUDGE JAMES P. DONOHUE AS SETTLEMENT JUDGE; by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. cc: PV(RS, )
September 7, 2007 41 Agreed MOTION for designation of a mediator by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Noting Date 9/7/2007.(Hash, Lauren)
July 27, 2007 40 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Robert S Apgood for Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc from 07/30/2007 to 08/10/2007. (Apgood, Robert)
June 14, 2007 39 Featured Case AMENDED MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 5 Days. Jury Trial is set for 1/7/2008 at 09:00 AM before Hon Robert S. Lasnik, Settlement conference to be held by 9/8/2007, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 10/8/2007, Motions in Limine due by 12/10/2007, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 12/26/2007, Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/2/2008, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/2/2008, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TS, )
June 8, 2007 38 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; denying 17 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 23 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS, )
March 5, 2007 37 NOTICE of Filing in a Related Proceeding ; filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hash, Lauren)
January 23, 2007 36 NOTICE by Plaintiff United States of America of filings in United States v. Cyberheat. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Order for additional briefing on Summary Judgment Motions# 2 Exhibit 2 Submission Regarding Proposed Order for Permanent Injunction by United States# 3 Exhibit 3 Proposed Order for Permanent Injunction by United States# 4 Exhibit 4 Memorandum in Response to Plaintiff?s Proposed Injunctive Relief by Defendant Cyberheat# 5 Exhibit 5 Reply in Support of Proposed Injunctive Relief by United States# 6 Exhibit 6 Revised Proposed Order for Permanent Injunction by United States)(Hash, Lauren)
October 18, 2006 35 Featured Case ORDER granting 34 Joint Motion for Extension of Pretrial Order Deadlines by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(LT, )
October 16, 2006 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time on Pretrial Order Deadlines by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 10/16/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hash, Lauren)
September 29, 2006 33 REPLY, filed by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc, TO RESPONSE to 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Apgood, Robert)
September 29, 2006 32 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff United States of America, TO RESPONSE to 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 24# 2 Exhibit 25# 3 Exhibit 26)(Hash, Lauren)
September 25, 2006 31 DECLARATION of Robert S. Apgood filed by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in another case# 2 Exhibit B - Himelfarb Declaration in another case# 3 Exhibit C - Exhibit N to Himelfarb Declaration# 4 Exhibit D - Statement of Facts for MSJ in another case# 5 Exhibit E - Vetter Declaration in another case# 6 Exhibit F - Bundy Declaration in another case# 7 Exhibit G - Defendant's Opposition to MSJ in another case# 8 Exhibit H - Defendant's MSJ in another case# 9 Exhibit I - Vivas Declaration in another case# 10 Exhibit J - Plaintiff's Response in Opoosition to MSJ in another case)(Apgood, Robert)
September 25, 2006 30 DECLARATION of Seth Schermerhorn filed by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Apgood, Robert)
September 25, 2006 29 RESPONSE, by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc, to 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Apgood, Robert)
September 25, 2006 28 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 23 to United States' Response to 23 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff United States of America re 26 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Hash, Lauren) Modified to create link on 9/26/2006 (DM, ).
September 25, 2006 27 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff United States of America, to 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 21# 2 Exhibit 22)(Hash, Lauren)
September 22, 2006 26 Featured Case ORDER granting govt's 25 Motion for leave to file an exhibit under seal by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS, )
September 20, 2006 25 Agreed MOTION Leave to File an Exhibit Under Seal by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 9/20/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hash, Lauren)
September 5, 2006 24 DECLARATION of Seth Schermerhorn filed by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Webmaster Home Page# 2 Exhibit B - Web Master Join Page# 3 Exhibit C - Terms and Conditions)(Apgood, Robert)
September 5, 2006 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc. Noting Date 9/29/2006. (Apgood, Robert)
September 5, 2006 22 NOTICE of Filing CD-ROM, Exhibit 15 to Plaintiff's MSJ in paper form with the Clerk's Office by Plaintiff United States of America (Hash, Lauren)
September 5, 2006 21 NOTICE of Filing CD-ROM, Exhibit 14 to Plaintiff's MSJ in paper form with the Clerk's Office by Plaintiff United States of America (Hash, Lauren)
September 5, 2006 20 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 13 to 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff United States of America re 16 Order on Stipulated Motion. (Hash, Lauren) Modified on 9/6/2006: added link to docket #17 (HBR).
September 5, 2006 19 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 12 to 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff United States of America re 16 Order on Stipulated Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(Hash, Lauren) Modified on 9/6/2006: added link to docket #17 (HBR).
September 5, 2006 18 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 11 to 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff United States of America re 16 Order on Stipulated Motion. (Hash, Lauren) Modified on 9/6/2006: added link to docket #17 (HBR).
September 5, 2006 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 9/29/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit 16# 13 Exhibit 17# 14 Exhibit 18# 15 Exhibit 19# 16 Exhibit 20)(Hash, Lauren)
August 30, 2006 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Stipulated Motion to File Overlength Briefs and Documents Under Seal by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(LT, )
August 29, 2006 15 Stipulated MOTION to File Overlength Briefs and Documents Under Seal by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 8/29/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hash, Lauren)
May 22, 2006 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lauren E Hash on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Hash, Lauren)
May 19, 2006 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Deepoi Deol. (RS, )
December 29, 2005 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc upon Plaintiff of Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Documents. (Apgood, Robert)
December 29, 2005 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc upon Plaintiff of Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Interrogatory Answers. (Apgood, Robert)
December 16, 2005 10 Featured Case STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS, )
December 15, 2005 9 Agreed Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by United States of America and by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc. Noting Date 12/15/2005. (Apgood, Robert)
November 22, 2005 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc of Defendant's First Set of Requests for Admission Propounded to Plaintiff USA. (Apgood, Robert)
November 10, 2005 IMPORTANT NOTICE regarding courtesy copies for Judge Lasnik's chambers; when the aggregate submittal to the court (i.e., the motion, any declarations and exhibits, the proposed order, and the certificate of service) exceeds 50 pages in length, a paper copy of the documents (with tabs or other organizing aids as necessary) shall be delivered to the Clerk's Office for chambers BY 10:30 A.M. THE MORNING AFTER FILING. The chambers copy must be clearly marked with the words "Courtesy Copy of Electronic Filing for Chambers." (KERR, )
October 28, 2005 7 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 5 days. Jury Trial is set for 12/4/2006 at 09:00 AM before Hon Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 11/25/2005; Amended Pleadings due by 6/7/2006; Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 6/7/2006; Discovery completed by 8/6/2006; Dispositive motions due by 9/5/2006; Settlement conference to be held by 10/5/2006; 39.1 mediation to be completed by 11/4/2006; Motions in Limine due by 11/6/2006; Pretrial Order due by 11/22/2006; Trial briefs to be submitted by 11/29/2006; Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 11/29/2006; (KERR, )
October 26, 2005 6 JOINT STATUS REPORT and Discovery Plan filed by all parties. Est. Trial Days: five by Plaintiffs United States of America, United States of America.(Steger, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2005 5 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 11/4/2005; by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR, )
September 19, 2005 4 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and Prayer for Relief with JURY DEMAND by Impulse Media Group Inc.(Apgood, Robert)
September 19, 2005 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert S Apgood on behalf of Defendant Impulse Media Group Inc (Apgood, Robert)
August 29, 2005 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Civil Penalties, Permanent Injunction, and Other Equitable Relief against defendant(s) United States of America, filed by United States of America.(Kipnis, Brian)
July 20, 2005 1 COMPLAINT FOR CIVIL PENALTIES, PERMANENT INJUNCTION, AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF against defendant(s) Impulse Media Group Inc (Summons(es) not issued) (Receipt #: Fee waived), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Impulse Media Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jeffrey Steger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impulse Media Group Inc
Represented By: Robert S Apgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?