Cricket Communications, Inc. v. Hipcricket, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cricket Communications, Inc., .
Defendant: Hipcricket, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Richard P Sybert
Counter Defendant: Cricket Communications, Inc., .
Case Number: 2:2008cv00908
Filed: June 4, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MINUTE ORDER STRIKING Def's Motion to Strike; signed by Docket Clerk M Duett at the direction of Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying 77 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Counterclaim: signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting 87 Motion to Compel: Defendant to produce privilege log within 10 days of the date of this order; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MINUTE ORDER re 107 MOTION for Leave to File Discovery Motion filed by Cricket Communications, Inc.; the motion for leave to file is GRANTED and the noting date for the motion to compel remains set as 2/13/09. Signed by Docket Clerk M Duett at the direction of Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cricket Communications, Inc. v. Hipcricket, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cricket Communications, Inc., .
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hipcricket, Inc.
Represented By: Richard P Sybert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Richard P Sybert
Represented By: Richard P Sybert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Cricket Communications, Inc., .
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?