Strejac v. YouthCare et al
Plaintiff: Andrei P Strejac
Defendant: YouthCare, City of Seattle and John Does
Case Number: 2:2009cv00498
Filed: April 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Notice of Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting Youthcare's 38 Motion for Summary Judgment ; case to remain open by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND RE-NOTING 51 MOTION To Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to Comply with the Court's Order re 46 Amended Complaint ; Motion noted for 10/16/2009, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Court ORDERS pltf to show cause why he should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with Local Rule 10(e)(8) and two prior orders of this Court (docket no. 28 and 35 ). Plaintiff shall respond to this order to show cause no later than five days from the date of this Order.(CL)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an amended complaint, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strejac v. YouthCare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrei P Strejac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouthCare
Represented By: Wendy E Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Represented By: Stephen Powell Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?