Bohm et al v. Park West Gallery, Incorporated, et al
Plaintiff: Philip C Bohm and John Lee
Defendant: Park West Gallery, Incorporated, PWG Florida, Incorporated, Vista Fine Art, LLC, Albert Scaglione, John Does, Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd., Celebrity Cruises Inc., Carnival Corporation, Carnival plc, Carnival Cruise Lines and Fine Art Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv01178
Filed: September 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER - Granting in part 105 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Consolidate and Amend complaint filed by Sean Mullen, Joseph Bohm, Patricia Alleman, Donald Hatter, Bruce Alleman, Joyce Hatter, John Lee, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (Order filed in MDL 09-2076, C09-1242RSL, C09-1716RSL and C09-1717RSL)(MD)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Terminated David Schoeggl, Stephania Denton and Caryn Jorgenson. Added Stephen Rummage, Fred Burnside and Daniel Davies for Defendants Carnival Corporation, Carnival Cruie Lines and Carnival PLC, (posted in cases 9MDL-2076, CV9-1178 & CV9-1242) by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KL)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. TRIAL DATE May 2, 2011, Oral argument on pending motions scheduled for 10:00 am on December 2, 2009,Deadline for amending pleadings January 15, 2010, Deadline for joining additional parties January 15, 2010, Deadline for FRCP 26(f) conference2 January 29, 2010, Amended initial disclosures pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) February 5, 2010, Responses to amended complaint(s) due February 15, 2010, Motion for class certification due and noted on the Courts calendar for the fifth Friday thereafter August 6, 2010, Reports from expert witnesses under FRCP 26(a)(2) due October 22, 2010, All motions related to discovery must be noted on the motion calendar no later than the Friday before discovery closes, pursuant to CR 7(d ) or CR 37(a)(1)(B) Discovery completed by December 21, 2010, All dispositive motions must be filed by and noted on the motion calendar no later than the fourth Friday thereafter (see CR 7(d)(3)) January 20, 2011, Settlement conference per CR 39.1(c) (2) held no later than February 21, 2011, Mediation per CR 39.1(c)(3) held no later than March 21, 2011, All motions in limine must be filed by and noted on the motion calendar seven judicial days thereafter pursuant to CR 7(d)(2) March 23, 2011, Agr eed pretrial order due April 9, 2011, Pretrial conference to be scheduled by the Court Trial briefs, proposed voir dire questions, proposed jury instructions, and trial exhibits due April 16, 2011, Length of Trial: 3-6 days Jury. Footnote pg2 #1 Oral argument will be heard on "HSBC Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration" (Dkt. # 50 in C08-1310RSL), Holland America's "Motion to Dismiss Counts I, IV, V, VI and VII" (Dkt. # 53 in C08-1310RSL), HSBC's "Motio n to Dismiss Counts I, IV, VI and VII" (Dkt. # 54 in C08-1310RSL), and "Defendant Park West's Motion for Summary Judgment" (Dkt. # 56 in C09- 1177RSL). Park West's "Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 9(b), 12(b)(2), and 12(b)(6)" (Dkt. # 52 in C08-1310RSL), "Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel" (Dkt. # 97 in C08-1310RSL), and Royal Caribbean's "Motion to Dismiss" (Dkt. # 26 in C09-1178RSL) are hereby DENIED without prejudice. 2 The Rule 26(f) conference shall include a discussion regarding the preservation, storage, and utilization of evidence in electronic form. Order posted in the following cases - C08-1310RSL, CO9-1177RSL, CO9-1178RSL & CO9-1242RSL. (KL)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. It is hereby ordered that the "Agreed Motion to Extend Plaintiffs' Time to Respond to Defendant Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.'s and Celebrity Cruises Inc.'s Mot ion to Dismiss" is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall have until November 2, 2009, to file their opposition, or until the date otherwise specified by this Court in any case management order. The Clerk of Court is directed to renote Royal Caribbean' s motion to dismiss (MDL 09- 2076RSL, Dkt. # 16 ; C09-1178RSL, Dkt. # 26 ) to Friday, November 6, 2009. Plaintiffs' "Motion to Defer Defendants Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.'s and Celebrity Cruises Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss" (MDL 09-2076RSL, Dkt. # 21 and 23 ); C09-1178RSL, Dkt. # 32 and 34 ) is DENIED as moot. (KL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bohm et al v. Park West Gallery, Incorporated, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip C Bohm
Represented By: Steven A Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lee
Represented By: Steven A Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park West Gallery, Incorporated
Represented By: Rodger D. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PWG Florida, Incorporated
Represented By: Rodger D. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vista Fine Art, LLC
Represented By: Rodger D. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Scaglione
Represented By: Rodger D. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Represented By: Rodger D. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Cruise Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fine Art Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?