Gutierrez v. Cort et al

Plaintiff: Michael Gutierrez
Defendant: David Cort, Bob Dalton, Bruce Hoskins and Neil Sharp
Case Number: 2:2010cv01072
Filed: June 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Island
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Party; denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion to appoint a pro bono mediator withou prejudice by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(MD, mailed copy of order to pltf)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court ORDERS plaintiff to file proof of service of the summons and complaint no later than July 21, 2011. The Court DEFERS ruling on Precision's motion to dismiss, docket no. 34 , and RENOTES the 39 motion mediation on July 22, 2011. (CL) (cc: pltf)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court GRANTS defendants' motion to dismiss, docket no. 10 , and DISMISSES plaintiff's federal discrimination claims against the defendants with prejudice. The Court further GRANTS plaintiff leave to amen d his complaint consistent with this Order. Plaintiff shall file his First Amended Complaint by January 31, 2011. The Court advises plaintiff that failure to file an amended complaint by the deadline may result in dismissal of this action with prejudice.(CL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. Cort et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?