Interval Licensing LLC v. AOL, Inc. et al Featured Case

A patent lawsuit by Paul Allen's company against eBay, Google, Facebook, Yahoo, Netflix, AOL, YouTube, and Staples.

Plaintiff: Interval Licensing LLC
Defendant: YouTube LLC, Yahoo! Inc, Facebook Inc, eBay Inc, Google Inc, AOL Inc, Apple Inc, Staples Inc, Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc and OfficeMax Inc
Interested Party: Golan Levin, Philippe Piernot and Paul Freiberger
Case Number: 2:2010cv01385
Filed: August 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Clallam
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER re #399 Stipulation and Joint Motion to Dismiss. All claims presented by Interval against Defendants shall be dismissed with prejudice. Any counterclaims asserted by Defendants against Interval shall be dismissed as moot and without prejudice; and Interval and Defendants each shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
November 2, 2018 Filing 399 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Joint Motion to Dismiss and (Proposed) Order by parties (Berry, Matthew)
October 18, 2018 Filing 398 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Shannon M Jost. Filed by Counter Claimants Google Inc, YouTube LLC, YouTube LLC, Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Jost, Shannon) Change Firm Association on 10/18/2018 (DS).
October 10, 2018 Filing 397 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney J Christopher Carraway on behalf of Defendant OfficeMax Inc. (Carraway, J)
August 8, 2018 Filing 396 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Francis Ho for Defendant Yahoo! Inc. (Walters, Mark)
June 25, 2018 Filing 395 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Wendi R. Schepler for Counter Claimants Google Inc, YouTube LLC, YouTube LLC, Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Jost, Shannon)
February 15, 2018 Filing 394 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Clayton Thompson and Yakov Zolotorev for Defendant Apple Inc. (Roller, Jeremy)
February 2, 2018 Filing 393 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Nelson, Justin)
January 25, 2018 Filing 392 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Aaron Chase for Counter Claimants Google Inc, YouTube LLC, YouTube LLC, Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Jost, Shannon)
January 22, 2018 Filing 391 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Shannon M Jost. Filed by Counter Claimants Google Inc, YouTube LLC, YouTube LLC, Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Jost, Shannon) Modified Address on 1/22/2018 (DS).
January 22, 2018 Filing 390 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Warren S. Heit for Counter Claimants Google Inc, YouTube LLC, YouTube LLC, Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Jost, Shannon)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 389 MINUTE ORDER: The parties are directed to file an updated status report no later than 2/2/2018. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
March 28, 2017 Filing 388 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Shannon M Jost. Filed by Counter Claimants Google Inc, YouTube LLC, YouTube LLC, Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Jost, Shannon) Modified address on 3/29/2017 (DS).
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 387 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C10-1385BJR. Cc to BJR. by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER CONTINUING STAY AND STATUS REPORT REQUIREMENT, DIRECTING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; this case is stayed and parties ordered to continue submitting recurrent status updates; The Clerk is directed to enter final judgment in favor of Defendants AOL, Inc., Apple, Inc., Google, Inc., and Yahoo!, Inc., in Case Nos. C13-263 MJP, C13-264 MJP, C13-265MJP and C13-266MJP by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RS)
July 19, 2016 Filing 384 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #381 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,, Set Deadlines, [Proposed Stipulated] Final Judgment (Nelson, Justin)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 383 MINUTE ORDER notifying the parties that on 9/1/2016, this case will be reassigned to Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
July 8, 2016 Filing 382 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Nelson, Justin)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman granting Defendants' #372 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Parties directed to file an updated joint status report advising the Court in writing as to how this case will proceed in light of this ruling no later than 21 days of this order.(PM)
April 15, 2016 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #380 Notice of Appearance : clarified text to reflect that Mr. Fortney is substituting for Ms. Terwilliger. (PM)
April 15, 2016 Attorney Molly A Terwilliger terminated per #380 Notice of Appearance & Substitution of Counsel. (PM)
April 14, 2016 Filing 380 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steven O Fortney and substitution for attorney Molly A. Terwilliger on behalf of Defendant AOL Inc. (Fortney, Steven) Modified on 4/15/2016 to clarify that Mr. Fortney is substituting for Ms. Terwilliger (PM).
March 3, 2016 Filing 379 REPLY, filed by Defendant Google Inc, TO RESPONSE to #372 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101 (Jost, Shannon)
February 9, 2016 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #377 Response to Motion: Please disregard, filed in error. See dkt. #378 . (AD)
February 8, 2016 Filing 378 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC, to #372 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101. Oral Argument Requested. (Heim, Michael)
February 8, 2016 Filing 377 PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR, see dkt. #378 . RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC, to #372 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101. (Heim, Michael) Modified on 2/9/2016 (AD).
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Marsha J. Pechman re Defendants' #372 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101. Plaintiff's response due 2/8/2016; Defendants' reply due 3/3/2016. (PM)
January 27, 2016 Filing 375 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Briefing Schedule by parties re #371 Minute Order, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon)
December 16, 2015 Filing 374 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #372 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101 (Jost, Shannon)
December 16, 2015 Filing 373 DECLARATION of Shannon Jost filed by Defendants AOL Inc, Apple Inc, Google Inc, Yahoo! Inc re #372 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jost, Shannon)
December 16, 2015 Filing 372 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101 by Defendants AOL Inc, Apple Inc, Google Inc, Yahoo! Inc. Noting Date 2/12/2016, (Jost, Shannon)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 371 MINUTE ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for a motion for judgment on the pleadings. Defendants' opening brief due 12/16/2015. Plaintiff's responsive brief due 1/29/2016. Defendants' reply brief due 2/12/2016; by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
November 4, 2015 Filing 370 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: n/a. (Berry, Matthew)
November 4, 2015 Filing 369 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Google, Inc. for YouTube LLC, YouTube LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by YouTube LLC (Jost, Shannon)
November 4, 2015 Filing 368 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet, Inc. for Google Inc, Google Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Google Inc (Jost, Shannon)
September 18, 2015 Filing 367 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Nathan J. Davis for Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Heim, Michael)
July 8, 2015 Filing 366 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Justin A Nelson. Filed by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Nelson, Justin) Modified Firm Address on 7/9/2015 (DS).
July 1, 2015 Filing 365 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Niraj P. Patel for Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Davis, Nathan)
June 30, 2015 Filing 364 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for AOL Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by AOL Inc (Terwilliger, Molly)
June 17, 2015 Filing 363 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: n/a. (Walters, Mark)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 362 MINUTE ORDER: After review of the joint status report filed on 2/20/2015, the parties are ORDERED to file an updated status report 30 days after the Supreme Court has ruled, or if no petition for writ of certiorari is filed, 30 days after the time to file the petition has expired. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
February 20, 2015 Filing 361 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 0. (Nelson, Justin)
February 20, 2015 Filing 360 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shane P. Cramer on behalf of Defendants eBay Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, Netflix Inc. (Cramer, Shane)
February 20, 2015 Filing 359 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Christopher T Wion for Defendants eBay Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, Netflix Inc. (Harrigan, Arthur)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 358 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the MANDATE from the Federal Circuit filed 12/29/2014 (Case No. C13-263MJP, Dkt. No. 12), the parties are directed to file an updated joint status report no later than 2/20/2015. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
January 9, 2015 Filing 357 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Steven W Fogg. Filed by Defendant OfficeMax Inc. (Fogg, Steven) Modified Firm and Address of PHV Attorney Douglas S. Rupert on 1/9/2015 (DS).
December 17, 2014 Filing 356 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: Disputed. (Nelson, Justin)
June 17, 2014 Filing 355 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Reexaminations of the Patents-In-Suit by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Nelson, Justin)
January 3, 2014 Filing 354 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Mark P Walters. Filed by Defendant Yahoo! Inc. (Walters, Mark) Modified Address and Email for Mark P. Walters on 1/6/2014 (DS).
December 27, 2013 Filing 353 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Dario A Machleidt for Defendant Yahoo! Inc. (Walters, Mark)
December 17, 2013 Filing 352 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Walters, Mark)
July 1, 2013 Filing 351 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Eric W. Ow for Defendant Yahoo! Inc. (Walters, Mark)
June 17, 2013 Filing 350 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Walters, Mark)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting (348) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mark Liang; George A Riley; Xin-Yi Zhou; David S. Almeling and Brian M. Berliner terminated in case 2:10-cv-01385-MJP; granting (74) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mark Liang; George A Riley; Xin-Yi Zhou; David S. Almeling and Brian M. Berliner terminated in case 2:11-cv-00708-MJP; granting (11) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mark Liang; George A Riley; Xin-Yi Zhou; David S. Almeling and Brian M. Berliner terminated in case 2:13-cv-00264-MJP; by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
April 5, 2013 Filing 348 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (O'Melveny & Myers LLP) by Counter Claimant Apple Inc, Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/26/2013, (Roller, Jeremy)
March 27, 2013 Filing 347 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel Gregory F. Wesner ; filed by Defendant AOL Inc. (Wesner, Gregory)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 346 MINUTE ORDER - re: Court's Order on Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Sever Claims and filing of certain documents in the severed cases. (Dkt No. 345 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) (1 in 2:13-cv-00265-MJP) Order, (1 in 2:13-cv-00263-MJP) Order, (1 in 2:13-cv-00264-MJP) Order on Motion to Sever, (1 in 2:13-cv-00266-MJP), by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (Minute Order filed in C10-1385MJP; C13-263MJP, C13-264MJP; C13-265MJP and C13-166MJP)(MD)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER ON INTERVAL'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SEVER CLAIMS AND ENTER FINAL JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY AND NON-INFRINGEMENT RE: (343) Motion to Sever in case 2:10-cv-01385-MJP; granting (71) Motion to Sever in case 2:11-cv-00708-MJP; granting (64) Motion to Sever in case 2:11-cv-00711-MJP; granting (60) Motion to Sever in case 2:11-cv-00716-MJP, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (Order filed in C10-1385MJP; C11-708MJP; C11-711MJP and C11-716MJP)(MD)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING MOTIONS RELATED TO DISCOVERY ISSUES by Judge Marsha J. Pechman; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for filing motions related to discovery issues in the 314/652 Track be extended from 1/31/2013, to 2/14/2013, and the deadline for hearings on motions related to discovery issues in the 314/652 Track be extended from 2/15/2013, to 3/1/2013. (This Order relates to cases 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 2:11-cv-00708-MJP, 2:11-cv-00711-MJP, 2:11-cv-00716-MJP)(TF)
February 4, 2013 Filing 343 MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Sever INTERVAL'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SEVER CLAIMS AND ENTER FINAL JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY AND NON-INFRINGEMENT by Plaintiffs Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Interval's Stip to Entry of Final Judgment of Invalidity & Non-Infringement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defs' Contingent Stip of Dismissal) Noting Date 2/4/2013, (Nelson, Justin) Modified text on 2/5/2013 (MD).
January 31, 2013 Filing 342 Stipulated MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING MOTIONS RELATED TO DISCOVERY ISSUES by Defendants Google Inc, Apple Inc, Yahoo! Inc, Plaintiffs Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/31/2013, (Nelson, Justin)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 341 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman; The Court finds that the terms "unobtrusive manner" and "does not distract a user" are indefinite, and that the claims containing these terms are therefore invalid under 35 U.S.C. 112 2. The Court adopts Plaintiff's proposed construction of terms 1, 2, 6, 7, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, and 15. The Court adopts Defendants' proposed construction of terms 3, 5, 8, and 14. (TF)
December 27, 2012 Filing 340 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing held on 12/12/2012 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Kari McGrath by telephone at 206-370-8509 or by e-mail at kari_mcgrath@wawd.uscourts.gov.Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2013, (KM)
December 27, 2012 Filing 339 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Tutorial held on 12/10/2012 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Kari McGrath by telephone at 206-370-8509 or by e-mail at kari_mcgrath@wawd.uscourts.gov.Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2013, (KM)
December 17, 2012 Filing 338 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Patent Reexaminations by Defendant Yahoo! Inc. (Walters, Mark)
December 13, 2012 Filing 337 NOTICE Regarding List Of Disputed Terms That Would Be Moot If Claim Term 3 Is Found To Be Indefinite ; filed by Defendant Yahoo! Inc. (Walters, Mark)
December 12, 2012 Filing 336 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: Justin Nelson, Max Tribble, Michael Heim, Nathan Davis, Matthew Berry, Andres Healy, Davina Inslee, David Stewart; Def Counsel: Kevin McGann, David Alberti, Matthew Kreeger, Gerald Ivey, Cortney Alexander, Shannon Jost, Warren Heit, Carmen Lo, Eric Ow, Mark Walters, Robert Burns, Molly Terwilliger; CR: Kari McGrath; Markman Hearing held on 12/12/2012. Oral argument presented on the issue of indefiniteness and on construction of the claim terms. Court will issue opinion by 12/21/2012. (RM)
December 10, 2012 Filing 335 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: Justin Nelson, Michael Heim, Max Tribble, Nathan Davis, Matthew Berry, David Stewart, Davina Inslee; Def Counsel: Shannon Jost, Kevin McGann, Warren Heit, Carmen Lo, Mark Walters, Matthew Kreeger, Eric Ow, Molly Terwilliger, Gerald Ivey, Robert Burns, Cortney Alexander, Jeremy Roller, David Alberti, Yakov Zolotorev; CR: Kari McGrath; Tutorial Hearing held on 12/10/2012. Tutorial presentation to Court. Markman hearing remains set for 12/12/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
December 10, 2012 Filing 334 NOTICE REGARDING CONSTRUCTION FOR TERM 1 ("SELECTIVELY DISPLAY") AND FOR TERM 3 ("UNOBTRUSIVE MANNER") ; filed by Plaintiffs Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Counter Defendant Interval Licensing LLC. (Nelson, Justin)
December 7, 2012 Filing 333 PRAECIPE to attach document to Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement re (277 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) Statement, by Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(Jost, Shannon)
December 7, 2012 Filing 332 STATEMENT Joint Submission Regarding Proposed Order of Argument for Claim Construction Hearing by Defendant Google Inc. (Jost, Shannon)
December 4, 2012 Filing 331 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority ; filed by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Notice of Suppl Authority)(Healy, Andres)
December 4, 2012 Filing 330 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andres C Healy on behalf of Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Healy, Andres)
December 4, 2012 Filing 329 PRAECIPE re #277 Statement, CORRECTED Ex. C-1 to Praecipe to Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-1 Amended [CORRECTED])(Davis, Nathan)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting #284 Defendant's Motion for Leave to amend invalidity contentions by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
November 30, 2012 Filing 327 PRAECIPE re #277 Statement, Jt Claim Construction & Prehearing Statement by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C1 Amended, #2 Exhibit D1 Amended, #3 Exhibit 1 Amended)(Davis, Nathan)
November 6, 2012 Filing 326 NOTICE of rescheduled hearings: Tutorial Hearing is rescheduled for 12/10/2012 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Markman Hearing is rescheduled for 12/12/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER re (322 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Clayton Thompson for Apple Inc,and for Apple Inc, case No. 11-cv-00708, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER re (321 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Marc C Belloli for Apple Inc, and for Apple Inc, case No. 11-cv-00708, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER re (320 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth Day for Apple Inc, and for Apple Inc, Case 2:11-cv-00708, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 30, 2012 Filing 322 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Clayton Thompson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Apple Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2999058. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration)(Roller, Jeremy)
October 30, 2012 Filing 321 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Marc Belloli FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Apple Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2999052. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration)(Roller, Jeremy)
October 30, 2012 Filing 320 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth Day FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Apple Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2999041. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration)(Roller, Jeremy)
October 30, 2012 Filing 319 NOTICE of rescheduled hearings: Tutorial Hearing set for 11/28/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Markman Hearing set for 11/30/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER re (314 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Yakov Zolotorev for Apple Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER re (313 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David L Alberti for Apple Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 26, 2012 Filing 316 DECLARATION of Mark Walters in Support of Apple's, Google's, AOL's, and Yahoo!'s Responsive Claim Construction Brief ('652 and '314 Patents Track) re #315 Response (non motion), by Defendant Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Walters, Mark)
October 26, 2012 Filing 315 RESPONSE by Defendant Yahoo! Inc re #300 Brief - Opening Apple's, Google's, AOL's, and Yahoo!'s Responsive Claim Construction Brief ('652 and '314 Patents Track). (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Walters, Mark)
October 26, 2012 Filing 314 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Yakov Zolotorev FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Apple Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2995836. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration)(Roller, Jeremy)
October 26, 2012 Filing 313 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David Alberti FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Apple Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2995830. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration)(Roller, Jeremy)
October 26, 2012 Filing 312 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Jeremy E Roller on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Roller, Jeremy)
October 26, 2012 Filing 311 RESPONSIVE BRIEF Interval's Responsive Claim Construction Brief ('652 and '314 Patents Track) by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Davis, Nathan)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER re (308 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mark Liang for Apple Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 22, 2012 Filing 309 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Neil L. Yang for Defendant Apple Inc. (Roller, Jeremy)
October 22, 2012 Filing 308 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mark Liang FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Apple Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2989545. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Roller, Jeremy)
October 12, 2012 Filing 307 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Apple Inc re Defs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions. (Roller, Jeremy)
October 12, 2012 Filing 306 DECLARATION of Mark Liang filed by Defendant Apple Inc re #284 MOTION for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions (Roller, Jeremy)
October 12, 2012 Filing 305 REPLY, filed by Defendant Apple Inc, TO RESPONSE to #284 MOTION for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions (Roller, Jeremy)
October 12, 2012 Filing 304 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: Matthew Berry, Justin Nelson, Davina Inslee; Def Counsel: Cortney Alexander, Molly Terwilliger, Mark Walters; and James Eakin CR: Danae Hovland; Motion Hearing held on 10/12/2012 regarding #294 MOTION for Protective Order Tri-Party Rule 37 Submission filed by Paul Freiberger, Philippe Piernot, Interval Licensing LLC, Golan Levin, AOL Inc. Oral argument. Court denies motion for the reasons stated on the record. (RM)
October 9, 2012 Filing 303 DECLARATION of Bruce Maggs re (301 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) Brief - Opening by Defendant Google Inc. (Jost, Shannon)
October 9, 2012 Filing 302 DECLARATION of Shannon M. Jost of Shannon M. Jost re (301 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) Brief - Opening by Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Jost, Shannon)
October 9, 2012 Filing 301 OPENING BRIEF Defendants' Opening Brief in Support of Proposed Claim Constructions ('652/'314 Track) by Defendant Google Inc. (Jost, Shannon)
October 9, 2012 Filing 300 OPENING BRIEF Local Patent Rule 134(a) Opening Claim Construction Brief ('652 and '314 Patents Track) by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Davis, Nathan)
October 9, 2012 Filing 299 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant AOL Inc, Interested Parties Paul Freiberger, Golan Levin, Philippe Piernot, Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC re #295 Declaration, #296 Declaration, #298 Declaration, #294 MOTION for Protective Order Tri-Party Rule 37 Submission, #297 Declaration, . (Thomas, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2012 Filing 298 DECLARATION of Cortney S. Alexander filed by Defendant AOL Inc, Interested Parties Paul Freiberger, Golan Levin, Philippe Piernot, Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC re #294 MOTION for Protective Order Tri-Party Rule 37 Submission (Thomas, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2012 Filing 297 DECLARATION of Matthew Berry filed by Defendant AOL Inc, Interested Parties Paul Freiberger, Golan Levin, Philippe Piernot, Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC re #294 MOTION for Protective Order Tri-Party Rule 37 Submission (Thomas, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2012 Filing 296 DECLARATION of Mark P. Walters filed by Defendant AOL Inc, Interested Parties Paul Freiberger, Golan Levin, Philippe Piernot, Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC re #294 MOTION for Protective Order Tri-Party Rule 37 Submission (Thomas, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2012 Filing 295 DECLARATION of James E. Eakin filed by Defendant AOL Inc, Interested Parties Paul Freiberger, Golan Levin, Philippe Piernot, Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC re #294 MOTION for Protective Order Tri-Party Rule 37 Submission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs A-G and K)(Thomas, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2012 Filing 294 MOTION for Protective Order Tri-Party Rule 37 Submission by Defendant AOL Inc, Interested Parties Paul Freiberger, Golan Levin, Philippe Piernot, Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/9/2012, (Thomas, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2012 Filing 293 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC, to #284 MOTION for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nick Patel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order)(Patel, Niraj)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting (291) Joint Motion to adjust Claim Construction Briefing Schedule (Track 314-652) in case 2:10-cv-01385-MJP. Opening claim construction briefs due 10/9/2012, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (Order posted in Case Numbers C10-1385MJP, C11-708MJP, C11-711MJP and C11-716MJP)(MD)
October 1, 2012 Filing 291 MOTION Joint Request to Adjust Claim Construction Briefing Schedule by Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/1/2012, (Jost, Shannon)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER on LR 37 submission - granting (281) Joint Motion to Compel in case 2:10-cv-01385-MJP; granting (33) Motion to Compel in case 2:11-cv-00708-MJP; granting (34) Motion to Compel in case 2:11-cv-00711-MJP; granting (32) Motion to Compel in case 2:11-cv-00716-MJP, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (Order Posted in Lead and related cases C10-1385MJP, C11-708MJP, C11-711MJP, C11-716MJP)(MD)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting (275)Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to amend it's Supplemental Infringement Contentions in case 2:10-cv-01385-MJP; granting (29) Motion for Leave in case 2:11-cv-00708-MJP, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (Order filed in both C10-1385MJP and related case C11-708MJP)(MD)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER re (287 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert A. Bullwinkel for Interval Licensing LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 27, 2012 Filing 287 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert A. Bullwinkel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2961374. (Berry, Matthew)
September 24, 2012 Filing 286 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Apple Inc re #284 MOTION for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions . (Roller, Jeremy)
September 24, 2012 Filing 285 DECLARATION of Mark Liang filed by Defendant Apple Inc re #284 MOTION for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhs A - C, #2 Exhibit Exhs D - G1, #3 Exhibit Exhs G2 - I1, #4 Exhibit Exhs I2 - J)(Roller, Jeremy)
September 24, 2012 Filing 284 MOTION for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/12/2012, (Roller, Jeremy)
September 20, 2012 Filing 283 DECLARATION of Douglas Wilson filed by Defendants Google Inc, Google Inc re (281 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 34 in 2:11-cv-00711-MJP, 32 in 2:11-cv-00716-MJP, 33 in 2:11-cv-00708-MJP) Joint MOTION to Compel LR 37 Submission Re Expert Deposition (Jost, Shannon)
September 20, 2012 Filing 282 DECLARATION of Shannon M. Jost filed by Defendants Google Inc, Google Inc re (281 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 34 in 2:11-cv-00711-MJP, 32 in 2:11-cv-00716-MJP, 33 in 2:11-cv-00708-MJP) Joint MOTION to Compel LR 37 Submission Re Expert Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon)
September 20, 2012 Filing 281 Joint MOTION to Compel LR 37 Submission Re Expert Deposition by Defendant Google Inc. Noting Date 9/20/2012, (Jost, Shannon)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER re (278 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James E. Eakin for Paul Freiberger, Golan Levin, and for Philippe Piernot, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 17, 2012 Filing 279 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey I Tilden on behalf of Interested Parties Paul Freiberger, Golan Levin, Philippe Piernot. (Tilden, Jeffrey)
September 17, 2012 Filing 278 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James E. Eakin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Interested Parties Golan Levin, Paul Freiberger, Philippe Piernot (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2948604. (Thomas, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2012 Filing 277 STATEMENT re Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '652 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '314 Patent, #3 Exhibit C1 - '652 Intrinsic Evidence, #4 Exhibit D1 - '314 Intrinsic Evidence, #5 Exhibit 1 - Joint Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit 2 - Interval's Infringement Contentions, #7 Exhibit 3 - Defendants' Invalidity Contentions)(Wilson, Douglas)
September 4, 2012 Filing 276 STATEMENT re #275 MOTION for Leave to Amend its Supplemental Infringement Contentions by Defendant Apple Inc. (Roller, Jeremy)
August 23, 2012 Filing 275 MOTION for Leave to Amend its Supplemental Infringement Contentions by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nick P. Patel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/7/2012, (Patel, Niraj)
August 23, 2012 ***Motion terminated: #274 MOTION for Leave to Amend its Supplemental Infringement Contentions filed by Interval Licensing LLC. (Per filing atty, motion filed in error, will refile motion) (CL)
August 23, 2012 Noting Date Set/Reset re (274 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) MOTION for Leave to Amend its Supplemental Infringement Contentions : Noting Date 9/7/2012, (IM)
August 22, 2012 Filing 274 FILED IN ERROR, ATTY WILL REFILE MOTION. MOTION for Leave to Amend its Supplemental Infringement Contentions by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nick P. Patel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order)(Patel, Niraj) Modified text on 8/23/2012 (CL).
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER re (272 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew Behncke for Interval Licensing LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
August 15, 2012 Filing 272 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew Behncke FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2914063. (Berry, Matthew)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 271 SCHEDULING ORDER Jury Trial is set for 10/15/2013 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/29/2013, Motions due by 1/31/2013, Dispositive motions due by 6/7/2013, Motions in Limine due by 8/23/2013, Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2013 at 02:30 PM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 4/26/2013, Settlement conference to be held by 7/19/2013, Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/20/2013, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 9/20/2013, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RS)
July 10, 2012 Filing 270 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties Filed by Defendants Google Inc, Apple Inc, Yahoo! Inc, AOL Inc, Plaintiffs Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC.(Nelson, Justin)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting pltf's (261) Motion to Lift Stay in case 2:10-cv-01385-MJP in case 2:11-cv-00708-MJP in case 2:11-cv-00709-MJP in case 2:11-cv-00710-MJP in case 2:11-cv-00711-MJP in case 2:11-cv-00712-MJP in case 2:11-cv-00713-MJP in case 2:11-cv-00714-MJP in case 2:11-cv-00715-MJP in case 2:11-cv-00716-MJP in case 2:11-cv-00717-MJP Joint Status Report due within 15 days; no status conference necessary until after the parties meet and confer by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RS)
June 18, 2012 Filing 268 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Sudhir Pala for Defendant Facebook Inc. (Keefe, Heidi)
June 18, 2012 Filing 267 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1.. (Keefe, Heidi)
June 18, 2012 Filing 266 Joint STATUS REPORT Update re Status of Reexaminations of Patents-In-Suit by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Nelson, Justin)
May 11, 2012 Filing 265 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC, TO RESPONSE to (19 in 2:11-cv-00708-MJP, 21 in 2:11-cv-00711-MJP, 261 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 20 in 2:11-cv-00716-MJP) MOTION to Lift Stay on 314/652 Patent Track and Request for Status Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Berry, Matthew)
May 7, 2012 Filing 264 DECLARATION of Shannon M. Jost filed by Defendant Google Inc re #261 MOTION to Lift Stay on 314/652 Patent Track and Request for Status Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Jost, Shannon)
May 7, 2012 Filing 263 RESPONSE, by Defendant Google Inc, to #261 MOTION to Lift Stay on 314/652 Patent Track and Request for Status Conference. Oral Argument Requested. (Jost, Shannon)
April 17, 2012 Filing 262 NOTICE of Completion of Reexamination on Patent No. 6,034,652 ; filed by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Berry, Matthew)
April 17, 2012 Filing 261 MOTION to Lift Stay on 314/652 Patent Track and Request for Status Conference by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5) Noting Date 5/11/2012, (Berry, Matthew)
December 16, 2011 Filing 260 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Nelson, Justin)
November 30, 2011 Filing 259 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney John Handy for Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Jost, Shannon)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's (254) Motion for Reconsideration, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. ( Order posted in C10-1385MJP and all related actions) (CL)
July 6, 2011 Filing 257 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, TO RESPONSE to (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Nelson, Justin)
July 5, 2011 Filing 256 RESPONSE RE #254 MOTION for Reconsideration, by Defendants AOL Inc, Apple Inc, Facebook Inc, Google Inc, Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, OfficeMax Inc, Staples Inc, Yahoo! Inc, YouTube LLC, eBay Inc, (Jost, Shannon) Modified on 7/5/2011: added link to motion (HBR).
July 5, 2011 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification: added link to Response to Motion for Reconsideration in each case. (HBR)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MINUTE ORDER - The Court invites the Defendants to file a joint response of no more than four pages that shall be due by Tuesday, July 5, 2011. (Dkt. No. 254) Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (Minute Order posted in C10-1385MJP and all related actions)(MD)
June 24, 2011 Filing 254 MOTION for Reconsideration re (13 in 2:11-cv-00717-MJP, 13 in 2:11-cv-00717-MJP, 13 in 2:11-cv-00708-MJP, 13 in 2:11-cv-00708-MJP, 253 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 253 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 11 in 2:11-cv-00713-MJP, 11 in 2:11-cv-00713-MJP, 11 in 2:11-cv-00710-MJP, 11 in 2:11-cv-00710-MJP, 10 in 2:11-cv-00714-MJP, 10 in 2:11-cv-00714-MJP, 15 in 2:11-cv-00711-MJP, 15 in 2:11-cv-00711-MJP, 11 in 2:11-cv-00712-MJP, 11 in 2:11-cv-00712-MJP, 11 in 2:11-cv-00715-MJP, 11 in 2:11-cv-00715-MJP, 11 in 2:11-cv-00709-MJP, 11 in 2:11-cv-00709-MJP, 14 in 2:11-cv-00716-MJP, 14 in 2:11-cv-00716-MJP) Order on Motion to Stay, Case Stayed,,,, by Plaintiffs Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting (245) Motion to Stay; Case stayed. in case 2:10-cv-01385-MJP; Case stayed. in case 2:11-cv-00708-MJP; Case stayed. in case 2:11-cv-00709-MJP; Case stayed. in case 2:11-cv-00710-MJP; Case stayed. in case 2:11-cv-00711-MJP; Case stayed. in case 2:11-cv-00712-MJP; Case stayed. in case 2:11-cv-00713-MJP; Case stayed. in case 2:11-cv-00714-MJP; Case stayed. in case 2:11-cv-00715-MJP; Case stayed. in case 2:11-cv-00716-MJP; Case stayed. in case 2:11-cv-00717-MJP by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(IM)
June 16, 2011 Filing 252 DECLARATION in Support of Interval Licensing LLC's Opening Claim Construction Brief ('652 and '314 Patents Track) of Nathan J. Davis re (11 in 2:11-cv-00708-MJP, 11 in 2:11-cv-00708-MJP, 11 in 2:11-cv-00708-MJP, 11 in 2:11-cv-00708-MJP, 251 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 251 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 251 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 251 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 13 in 2:11-cv-00711-MJP, 13 in 2:11-cv-00711-MJP, 13 in 2:11-cv-00711-MJP, 13 in 2:11-cv-00711-MJP, 12 in 2:11-cv-00716-MJP, 12 in 2:11-cv-00716-MJP, 12 in 2:11-cv-00716-MJP, 12 in 2:11-cv-00716-MJP) Brief,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Berry, Matthew)
June 16, 2011 Filing 251 Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC's Local Patent Rule 134(a) Opening Claim Construction BRIEF ('652 and '314 Patents Track) by Plaintiffs Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC, Interval Licensing LLC. (Berry, Matthew)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER re (249 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Niraj P. Patel for Interval Licensing LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
June 16, 2011 Filing 249 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Niraj P. Patel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2463853. (Berry, Matthew)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 248 SCHEDULING ORDER: Disclosures of Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions 2/26/2011, Deadline to Join Parties 3/11/2011, Terms Selected for Claims Construction 3/18/2011, Claim Construction Expert Report Deadline 4/4/2011, Claim Construction Expert Rebuttal Reports 5/2/2011, Preliminary Claim Chart 5/2/2011, Joint Claim Chart and Prehearing Statement 5/27/2011, Opening Briefs on Claim Construction 6/16/2011, Response Briefs on Claim Construction 7/8/2011, Markman Hearing 7/22/2011 at 9:00 AM, Close of Fact Discovery 11/11/2011, Opening Expert Reports on all issues 12/5/2011, Rebuttal Expert Reports Due 1/6/2012, Joint Status Report to address trial issues 1/6/2012, Complete all Expert Discovery by 1/25/2012, Dispositive Motion Deadline 2/10/2012, Settlement Conference per Local Rule CR 39.1(c)(2) held no later than 4/19/2012, Mediation per Local Rule CR 39.1(c)(3) held no later than 5/14/2012, All Motions in Limine must be filed by and noted on the motion calendar no later than the second Friday thereafter 5/14/2012, Agreed Pretrial Order due 6/6/2012, Trial Briefs, Proposed Voir Dire Questions, Proposed Jury Instructions, and Trial Exhibits for both Tracks due 6/13/2012, Pretrial Conference for 507 and 682 Patent Track 6/8/2012 at 1:30 PM, Trial Date on 507 and 682 Patents 6/18/2012 at 9:00 AM, Pretrial Conference for 314 and 652 Patent Track 7/6/2012 at 1:30 PM, Trial Date on 314 and 652 Patents 7/16/2012 at 9:00 AM, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD) (Order Posted in Lead case and all consolidated actions)
June 7, 2011 Filing 247 DECLARATION of Gregory F. Wesner filed by Defendant Yahoo! Inc re #245 MOTION to Stay re #244 MOTION to Stay re #199 Declaration, Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination (Corrected) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 - part 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4 - part 1, #6 Exhibit 4 - part 2)(Walters, Mark)
June 7, 2011 Filing 246 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC, to #245 MOTION to Stay re #244 MOTION to Stay re #199 Declaration, Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination (Corrected). (Nelson, Justin)
June 7, 2011 Filing 245 MOTION to Stay re #244 MOTION to Stay re #199 Declaration, Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination (Corrected) by Defendant Yahoo! Inc. Noting Date 6/7/2011, (Walters, Mark)
June 7, 2011 Filing 244 MOTION to Stay re #199 Declaration, Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination by Defendant Yahoo! Inc. Noting Date 6/7/2011, (Walters, Mark)
June 7, 2011 ***Motion terminated: 244 MOTION to Stay re 199 Declaration, Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination filed by Yahoo! Inc. (See Corrected Motion to Stay - dkt. no. 245) (MD)
June 7, 2011 ***Motion terminated: #244 MOTION to Stay re #199 Declaration, Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination filed by Yahoo! Inc. (See Corrected Motion to Stay - dkt. no. 245) (MD)
June 6, 2011 Filing 243 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Petitions for Reexamination on behalf of all parties by Defendant Yahoo! Inc. (Machleidt, Dario)
June 3, 2011 Filing 242 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gregory F Wesner on behalf of Defendant Yahoo! Inc, Counter Claimant Yahoo! Inc. (Wesner, Gregory)
June 2, 2011 Filing 241 PRAECIPE re (240 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 240 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 240 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 240 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 240 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 240 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 240 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 240 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 240 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 240 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP, 240 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) Statement,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit A-1, #5 Exhibit B-1, #6 Exhibit C-1, #7 Exhibit D-1)(Berry, Matthew)
May 27, 2011 Filing 240 STATEMENT re Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit A-1, #6 Exhibit B-1, #7 Exhibit C-1, #8 Exhibit D-1, #9 Exhibit 1, #10 Exhibit 2, #11 Exhibit 3, #12 Exhibit 4, #13 Exhibit 5, #14 Exhibit 6)(Berry, Matthew)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting (236) Stipulated Motion to serve amended infringement contentions in case 2:10-cv-01385-MJP and in case 2:11-cv-00711-MJP by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting (235) Stipulated Motion to serve amended infringement contentions in case 2:10-cv-01385-MJP and 2:11-cv-00717-MJP by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting #234 Stipulated Motion to serve amended infringement contentions and amended non-infringement contentions by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
May 26, 2011 Filing 236 Stipulated MOTION to Serve Amended Infringement Contentions by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/26/2011, (Sargent, Edgar)
May 26, 2011 Filing 235 Stipulated MOTION to Serve Amended Infringement Contentions by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/26/2011, (Sargent, Edgar)
May 26, 2011 Filing 234 Stipulated MOTION to Serve Amended Infringement Contentions and Noninfringement Contentions by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/26/2011, (Sargent, Edgar)
May 24, 2011 Filing 233 Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of all parties by Defendant Yahoo! Inc. (Walters, Mark)
May 16, 2011 Filing 232 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Cleveland, Kristin)
May 12, 2011 Filing 231 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 4/25/2011 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Barry Fanning by telephone at 206-370-8507. . Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2011, (JS)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER re #226 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Xin-Yi Zhou for Apple Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER re #197 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Oleg Elkhunovich for Interval Licensing LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
May 2, 2011 Filing 226 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Xin-Yi (Vincent) Zhou FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Apple Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2414537. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration)(Roller, Jeremy)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER GRANTING SEVERANCE, CONSOLIDATING CASES AND DENYING REQUEST FOR STAY; Clerk directed to open 10 new cases, pltf to refile its amended complaint in each new case and pay the filing fee, each dft to answer within 5 days. Status conf set for 7/22/11; telephonic conf scheduled; JSR due within 15 days by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RS)
April 25, 2011 Filing 230 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: Justin Nelson, Matthew Berry, Davina Inslee; Def Counsel: Gerald Ivy, Matthew Kreeger, John Vandenbers, Brian Berliner, Molly Terwilliger, Elizabeth Stameshkin, Mark Walters, Shannon Jost, John Letchinger, Kevin McGann; CR: Barry Fanning; Motion Hearing held on 4/25/2011 (192 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) MOTION to Sever or Dismiss for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 20 & 21 filed by Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, Netflix Inc, eBay Inc, (215 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) MOTION to Dismiss or Sever for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 20 and 21 filed by Google Inc, YouTube LLC, (193 in 2:10-cv-01385-MJP) MOTION to Sever filed by Yahoo! Inc. Oral argument presented. Court grants motion to sever, denies motion to dismiss and denies motion to stay. See Order (Dkt. No. 229) for written ruling expanding on the Court's oral rulings.
April 25, 2011 Filing 225 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of its Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motions to Sever re #200 Response to Motion ; filed by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Nelson, Justin)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER re #223 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Douglas R. Wilson for Interval Licensing LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
April 18, 2011 Filing 223 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Douglas R. Wilson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2400500. (Nelson, Justin)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER re: #221 Agreed Motion and for Protective Order regarding the disclosure and use discovery materials by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
April 13, 2011 Filing 221 Agreed MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order re the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. Noting Date 4/13/2011, (Berry, Matthew) Modified text on 4/14/2011 (MD).
April 12, 2011 Filing 220 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #193 MOTION to Sever, by Defendant AOL Inc. (Terwilliger, Molly)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting #210 Stipulated Motion to serve amended infringement contentions by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MINUTE ORDER - The Court will permit Google, YouTube, Apple, and Facebook to join in the pending motions to sever and renew their previously filed motions, to the extent requested. The Court will permit these Defendants to present argument at the hearing scheduled for April 25, 2011. The Court will not grant any further time for argument,and the Defendants seeking joinder/renewal have not asked for additional time, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
April 8, 2011 Filing 217 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #193 MOTION to Sever, by Defendant Facebook Inc. (Keefe, Heidi)
April 8, 2011 Filing 216 NOTICE REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER re #193 MOTION to Sever ; filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Roller, Jeremy)
April 6, 2011 Filing 215 MOTION to Dismiss or Sever for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 20 and 21 by Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/25/2011, (Jost, Shannon)
April 6, 2011 Filing 214 NOTICE of Hearing #192 MOTION to Sever or Dismiss for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 20 & 21, #193 MOTION to Sever : ORAL ARGUMENT/Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Defendants' are allowed 20 minutes total for argument and Plaintiff has 20 minutes. (RM)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER re #212 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sudhir Pala for Facebook Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
April 4, 2011 Filing 212 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sudhir Pala FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Facebook Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2385366. (Durbin, Christopher)
April 1, 2011 Filing 211 REPLY, filed by Defendant Yahoo! Inc, TO RESPONSE to #198 Joint MOTION to Stay by all Defendants filed (Walters, Mark)
April 1, 2011 Filing 210 Stipulated MOTION to Serve Amended Infringement Contentions by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sargent, Edgar)
March 29, 2011 Filing 209 PRAECIPE to attach document (signed signature page) to the Declaration of Davina Inslee re #208 Declaration by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 signature page)(Sargent, Edgar)
March 28, 2011 Filing 208 DECLARATION of Davina Inslee filed by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC re #198 Joint MOTION to Stay by all Defendants filed (Sargent, Edgar)
March 28, 2011 Filing 207 DECLARATION of Edgar Sargent filed by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC re #198 Joint MOTION to Stay by all Defendants filed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sargent, Edgar)
March 28, 2011 Filing 206 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC, to #198 Joint MOTION to Stay by all Defendants filed. (Sargent, Edgar)
March 25, 2011 Filing 205 REPLY, filed by Defendant Yahoo! Inc, TO RESPONSE to #193 MOTION to Sever (Machleidt, Dario)
March 25, 2011 Filing 204 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Christen M.R. Dubois for Defendant Facebook Inc. (Durbin, Christopher)
March 24, 2011 Filing 203 REPLY, filed by Defendants Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, eBay Inc, TO RESPONSE to #192 MOTION to Sever or Dismiss for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 20 & 21 (Vandenberg, John)
March 23, 2011 Filing 202 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Aneelah Afzali for Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Jost, Shannon)
March 21, 2011 Filing 201 DECLARATION of Edgar Sargent filed by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC re #192 MOTION to Sever or Dismiss for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 20 & 21, #193 MOTION to Sever (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Sargent, Edgar)
March 21, 2011 Filing 200 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC, to #192 MOTION to Sever or Dismiss for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 20 & 21, #193 MOTION to Sever. (Sargent, Edgar)
March 17, 2011 Filing 199 DECLARATION of Mark P. Walters filed by Defendant Yahoo! Inc re #198 Joint MOTION to Stay by all Defendants filed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H - 1, #9 Exhibit H - 2, #10 Exhibit H - 3, #11 Exhibit H - 4, #12 Exhibit H - 5, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J)(Walters, Mark)
March 17, 2011 Filing 198 Joint MOTION to Stay by all Defendants filed by Defendant Yahoo! Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/1/2011, (Walters, Mark)
March 16, 2011 Filing 197 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Oleg Elkhunovich FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2364889. (Nelson, Justin)
March 15, 2011 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Theresa Wang on behalf of Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Wang, Theresa)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #184 #185 #187 Motions for Reconsideration by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
March 4, 2011 Filing 194 NOTICE Regarding Late Meet and Confer re #192 MOTION to Sever or Dismiss for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 20 & 21 ; filed by Defendants Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, eBay Inc. (Vandenberg, John)
March 3, 2011 Filing 193 MOTION to Sever by Defendant Yahoo! Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Sever) Noting Date 3/25/2011, (Walters, Mark)
March 3, 2011 Filing 192 MOTION to Sever or Dismiss for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 20 & 21 by Defendants Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, eBay Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/25/2011, (Vandenberg, John)
March 2, 2011 Filing 191 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #187 MOTION for Reconsideration re #178 Order, Set/Reset Trial Date and Related Deadlines,,,,,,,,,, and Clarification, by Defendant OfficeMax Inc. (Baumgardner, Kevin)
March 2, 2011 Filing 190 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #187 MOTION for Reconsideration re #178 Order, Set/Reset Trial Date and Related Deadlines,,,,,,,,,, and Clarification, by Defendant Apple Inc. (Roller, Jeremy)
March 2, 2011 Filing 189 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #187 MOTION for Reconsideration re #178 Order, Set/Reset Trial Date and Related Deadlines,,,,,,,,,, and Clarification, by Defendant Yahoo! Inc. (Walters, Mark)
March 2, 2011 Filing 188 DECLARATION of Shannon M. Jost filed by Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC re #187 MOTION for Reconsideration re #178 Order, Set/Reset Trial Date and Related Deadlines,,,,,,,,,, and Clarification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jost, Shannon)
March 2, 2011 Filing 187 MOTION for Reconsideration re #178 Order, Set/Reset Trial Date and Related Deadlines,,,,,,,,,, and Clarification by Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/2/2011, (Jost, Shannon)
March 2, 2011 Filing 186 DECLARATION of Arie Pellikaan filed by Defendants Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, eBay Inc re #184 MOTION for Reconsideration re #178 Order, Set/Reset Trial Date and Related Deadlines,,,,,,,,,, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION, RECONSIDERATION, AND MODIFICATION OF THE FEB. 16, 2011, SCHEDULING ORDER MOTION for Reconsideration re #178 Order, Set/Reset Trial Date and Related Deadlines,,,,,,,,,, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION, RECONSIDERATION, AND MODIFICATION OF THE FEB. 16, 2011, SCHEDULING ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Vandenberg, John)
March 2, 2011 Filing 185 MOTION for Reconsideration RE: #178 SCHEDUELING ORDER of Court's February 16, 2011 Scheduling Order by Defendant Facebook Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/2/2011, (Durbin, Christopher)This Motion relates to the Schedueling Order. Modified on 3/2/2011 (VB).
March 2, 2011 Filing 184 MOTION for Reconsideration re #178 Order, Set/Reset Trial Date and Related Deadlines,,,,,,,,,, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION, RECONSIDERATION, AND MODIFICATION OF THE FEB. 16, 2011, SCHEDULING ORDER by Defendants Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, eBay Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/2/2011, (Vandenberg, John)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 AGREED E-DISCOVERY PROTOCOL AND ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 182 AGREED DEPOSITION PROTOCOL AND ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
March 2, 2011 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #185 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's February 16, 2011 Scheduling Order :Per Counsel, this Motion for Reconsideration relates to Document #178 Scheduling Order (VB)
March 2, 2011 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 185 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's February 16, 2011 Scheduling Order :Per Counsel, this Motion for Reconsideration relates to Document 178 Scheduling Order (VB)
February 28, 2011 Filing 181 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER ESTABLISHING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY PROTOCOL by parties. (Walters, Mark)
February 28, 2011 Filing 180 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER ESTABLISHING DEPOSITION PROTOCOL by parties. (Walters, Mark)
February 16, 2011 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appointment of Whip ; filed by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Nelson, Justin)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 SCHEDULING ORDER - Disclosures of Preliminary Invalidity and Non- Infringement Contentions 2/26/2011; Deadline to Join Parties 3/11/2011; Terms Selected for Claims Construction 3/18/2011; Claim Construction Expert Report Deadline4/4/2011; Claim Construction Expert Rebuttal Reports 5/2/2011; Preliminary Claim Chart 5/2/2011; Joint Claim Chart and Prehearing Statement5/27/2011 ;Opening Briefs on Claim Construction 6/16/2011; Response Briefs on Claim Construction 7/8/2011; Markman Hearing 7/22/2011 at 9:00 AM; Close of Fact Discovery 11/11/2011; Opening Expert Reports on all issues11/28/2011; Rebuttal Expert Reports Due 12/30/2011; Complete all Expert Discovery by 1/13/2012; Dispositive Motion Deadline 2/10/2012; Settlement Conference per Local Rule CR 39.1(c)(2) held no later than 4/19/2012; Mediation per Local Rule CR 39.1(c)(3) held no later than 5/14/2012; All Motions in Limine must be filed by and noted on the motion calendar no later than the second Friday thereafter 5/14/2012; Agreed Pretrial Order due6/6/2012; Trial Briefs, Proposed Voir Dire Questions, Proposed Jury Instructions, and Trial Exhibits for both Tracks due 6/13/2012; Pretrial Conference for 507 and 682 Patent Track 6/8/2012 at 1:30 PM; Trial Date on 507 and 682 Patents 6/18/2012 at 9:00 AM; Pretrial Conference for 314 and 652 Patent 7/6/2012 at 1:30 PM; Trial Date on 314 and 652 Patents7/16/2012 at 9:00 AM by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
February 7, 2011 Filing 177 ANSWER to #163 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim made by Yahoo! by Interval Licensing LLC.(Berry, Matthew)
February 7, 2011 Filing 176 ANSWER to #165 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim made by Staples by Interval Licensing LLC.(Berry, Matthew)
February 7, 2011 Filing 175 ANSWER to #164 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim made by Office Depot by Interval Licensing LLC.(Berry, Matthew)
February 7, 2011 Filing 174 ANSWER to #162 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim made by Netflix by Interval Licensing LLC.(Berry, Matthew)
February 7, 2011 Filing 173 ANSWER to #158 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim made by Google by Interval Licensing LLC.(Berry, Matthew)
February 7, 2011 Filing 172 ANSWER to #166 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim made by Facebook by Interval Licensing LLC.(Berry, Matthew)
February 7, 2011 Filing 171 ANSWER to #161 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim made by eBay by Interval Licensing LLC.(Berry, Matthew)
February 7, 2011 Filing 170 ANSWER to #160 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim made by Apple by Interval Licensing LLC.(Berry, Matthew)
February 7, 2011 Filing 169 Interval Licensing's ANSWER to #157 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim made by YouTube, LLC by Interval Licensing LLC.(Berry, Matthew)
February 7, 2011 Filing 168 ANSWER to #159 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of AOL by Interval Licensing LLC.(Berry, Matthew)
January 14, 2011 Filing 167 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cleveland, Kristin)
January 14, 2011 Filing 166 ANSWER to #153 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC by Facebook Inc.(Durbin, Christopher)
January 14, 2011 Filing 165 ANSWER to #153 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC by Staples Inc.(Hamm, Klaus)
January 14, 2011 Filing 164 ANSWER to #153 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC by Office Depot Inc.(Hamm, Klaus)
January 14, 2011 Filing 163 ANSWER to #153 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC by Yahoo! Inc.(Walters, Mark)
January 14, 2011 Filing 162 ANSWER to #153 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC by Netflix Inc.(Hamm, Klaus)
January 14, 2011 Filing 161 ANSWER to #153 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC by eBay Inc.(Hamm, Klaus)
January 14, 2011 Filing 160 ANSWER to #153 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC by Apple Inc.(Roller, Jeremy)
January 14, 2011 Filing 159 ANSWER to #153 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC by AOL Inc.(Terwilliger, Molly)
January 14, 2011 Filing 158 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC by Google Inc. YouTube LLC.(Jost, Shannon) Modified on 1/14/2011 (VB). Per Counsel, this doument filed by Google Inc. only.
January 14, 2011 Filing 157 ANSWER to #153 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC by Google Inc, YouTube LLC.(Jost, Shannon) Per Counsel, this doument was filed by YouTube LLC only. Modified on 1/14/2011 (VB).
January 14, 2011 Filing 156 ANSWER to #153 Amended Complaint, by OfficeMax Inc.(Fogg, Steven)
January 14, 2011 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 157 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, 158 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim : DOCKET TEXT CORRECTED ON BOTH DOCUMENTS 157 AND 158 TO REFLECT THE CORRECT FILING PARTY. (VB)
January 14, 2011 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #157 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, #158 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim : DOCKET TEXT CORRECTED ON BOTH DOCUMENTS #157 AND #158 TO REFLECT THE CORRECT FILING PARTY. (VB)
January 13, 2011 Filing 155 STIPULATION by parties. (Hamm, Klaus)
December 28, 2010 Filing 154 NOTICE of Service: Disclosure of asserted claims and infringement contentions filed by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (MD)
December 28, 2010 Filing 153 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against defendant(s) AOL Inc, Apple Inc, Facebook Inc, Google Inc, Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, OfficeMax Inc, Staples Inc, Yahoo! Inc, YouTube LLC, eBay Inc with JURY DEMAND, filed by Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(MD)
December 21, 2010 Filing 152 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on 12/13/2010 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Barry Fanning by telephone at 206-370-8507. . Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2011, (LMK)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #150 Stipulated Motion for withdrawal and substitution of counsel for Deft OL, Inc. Attorney Molly A Terwilliger for AOL Inc added. Attorney Aneelah Afzali, Scott A.W. Johnson and Shannon M Jost terminated, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
December 14, 2010 Filing 150 Stipulated MOTION For Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by Defendant AOL Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/14/2010, (Jost, Shannon)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER MEMORIALIZING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court RESERVES RULING on the pending motions for severance. Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2011, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
December 14, 2010 ***Motion terminated: #91 MOTION to Dismiss Joinder in Defs Google Inc. and YouTube's Motion to Dismiss or Sever for Misjoinder filed by Facebook Inc, #81 MOTION to Dismiss or Sever Pursuant to FRCP 20 & 21 filed by Apple Inc, #63 MOTION to Dismiss Party or Sever for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 20 and 21 filed by Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (IM)
December 14, 2010 ***Motion terminated: 91 MOTION to Dismiss Joinder in Defs Google Inc. and YouTube's Motion to Dismiss or Sever for Misjoinder filed by Facebook Inc, 81 MOTION to Dismiss or Sever Pursuant to FRCP 20 & 21 filed by Apple Inc, 63 MOTION to Dismiss Party or Sever for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 20 and 21 filed by Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (IM)
December 13, 2010 Filing 148 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: Justin Nelson, Edgar Sargent, Matthew Berry; Def Counsel: Gerald Ivey, Christopher Carraway, Kristin Cleveland, Christen M.R. Dubois, Heidi Keefe, David Almeling, Jeremy Roller, Mark Walters, Dario Machleidt, Kevin McGann, Shannon Jost; CR: Barry Fanning; Status Conference held on 12/13/2010. Amended complaint and infringement contentions due 12/28/2010. Joint status report due 1/14/2011. (RM)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS RE: #62 #80 #92 Motion to Dismiss. The Court GRANTS the motion to dismiss and gives Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint by no later than 12/28/2010, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
December 1, 2010 Filing 146 NOTICE of Rescheduled Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER re #142 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeffrey S Love for Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, and eBay Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER re #141 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Derrick W. Toddy for Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, and eBay Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
November 19, 2010 Filing 143 REPLY by Defendant AOL Inc to #90 Notice of Joinder in Google's Motion to Dismiss. (Jost, Shannon)
November 19, 2010 Filing 142 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeffrey S. Love FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, eBay Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2252619. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Cleveland, Kristin)
November 19, 2010 Filing 141 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Derrick W. Toddy FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, eBay Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2252588. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Cleveland, Kristin)
November 17, 2010 Filing 140 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 11/23/2010 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
November 12, 2010 Filing 139 REPLY, filed by Defendants Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, eBay Inc, TO RESPONSE to #62 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) (Cleveland, Kristin)
November 12, 2010 Filing 138 REPLY, filed by Defendant Yahoo! Inc, TO RESPONSE to #62 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) (Walters, Mark)
November 12, 2010 Filing 137 REPLY, filed by Defendants Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, eBay Inc, TO RESPONSE to #63 MOTION to Dismiss Party or Sever for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 20 and 21 (Cleveland, Kristin)
November 12, 2010 Filing 136 REPLY, filed by Defendant Yahoo! Inc, TO RESPONSE to #63 MOTION to Dismiss Party or Sever for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 20 and 21 (Walters, Mark)
November 12, 2010 Filing 135 REPLY, filed by Defendant OfficeMax Inc, TO RESPONSE to #62 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) (Fogg, Steven)
November 12, 2010 Filing 134 REPLY, filed by Defendant Facebook Inc, TO RESPONSE to #63 MOTION to Dismiss Party or Sever for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 20 and 21 (Durbin, Christopher)
November 12, 2010 Filing 133 REPLY, filed by Defendant Facebook Inc, TO RESPONSE to #62 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) (Durbin, Christopher)
November 12, 2010 Filing 132 REPLY, filed by Defendant Apple Inc, TO RESPONSE to #81 MOTION to Dismiss or Sever Pursuant to FRCP 20 & 21 (Wilsdon, Scott)
November 12, 2010 Filing 131 REPLY, filed by Defendant Apple Inc, TO RESPONSE to #80 MOTION to Dismiss (Wilsdon, Scott)
November 12, 2010 Filing 130 REPLY, filed by Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC, TO RESPONSE to #62 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) (Jost, Shannon)
November 12, 2010 Filing 129 REPLY, filed by Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC, TO RESPONSE to #63 MOTION to Dismiss Party or Sever for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 20 and 21 (Jost, Shannon)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER re #126 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Klaus H Hamm for Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, and for eBay Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER re #125 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristin L Cleveland for Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, and for eBay Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
November 11, 2010 Filing 126 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Klaus H. Hamm FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, eBay Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2243897. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Carraway, J)
November 11, 2010 Filing 125 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristin L. Cleveland FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, eBay Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2243892. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Carraway, J)
November 8, 2010 Filing 124 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 7-10.. (Nelson, Justin)
November 8, 2010 Filing 123 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC, to #62 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6). Oral Argument Requested. (Sargent, Edgar)
November 8, 2010 Filing 122 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC, to #63 MOTION to Dismiss Party or Sever for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 20 and 21. Oral Argument Requested. (Sargent, Edgar)
November 5, 2010 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Edgar Guy Sargent on behalf of Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. (Sargent, Edgar)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER denying #119 Stipulated Motion by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(IM)
November 1, 2010 Filing 119 Agreed Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time for Service of Initial Disclosures by Defendant Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/1/2010, (Walters, Mark)
November 1, 2010 Filing 118 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion re #117 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ; filed by Defendant Yahoo! Inc. (Walters, Mark)
November 1, 2010 Filing 117 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Defendant Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/1/2010, (Walters, Mark)
November 1, 2010 ***Motion terminated: 117 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Yahoo! Inc. (IM)
November 1, 2010 ***Motion terminated: #117 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Yahoo! Inc. (IM)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER re #113 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS attorney Wendi R. Schepler for Google Inc, and for YouTube LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER re #110 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elliott C. Cook for AOL Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER re #109 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert L. Burns for AOL Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 26, 2010 Filing 113 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Wendi R. Schepler FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2226844. (Jost, Shannon)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER re #108 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gerald F. Ivey for AOL Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER re #107 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Cortney S. Alexander for AOL Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 26, 2010 Attorney Christopher T Wion for eBay Inc added per 106 Notice of Association. (KN)
October 26, 2010 Attorney Christopher T Wion for eBay Inc added per #106 Notice of Association. (KN)
October 25, 2010 Filing 110 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elliot C. Cook FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant AOL Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2225900. (Afzali, Aneelah)
October 25, 2010 Filing 109 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert L. Burns FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant AOL Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2225891. (Afzali, Aneelah)
October 25, 2010 Filing 108 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gerald F. Ivey FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant AOL Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2225888. (Afzali, Aneelah)
October 25, 2010 Filing 107 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Cortney S. Alexander FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant AOL Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2225882. (Afzali, Aneelah)
October 25, 2010 Filing 106 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr on behalf of Defendants Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, eBay Inc. (Harrigan, Arthur)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER re #98 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mark R. Weinstein for Facebook Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER re #97 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth L. Stameshkin for Facebook Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER re #96 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael G Rhodes for Facebook Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER re #95 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Heidi L. Keefe for Facebook Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER re #94 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christen M.R. Dubois for Facebook Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 22, 2010 Filing 100 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by Yahoo! Inc Filed by Defendant Yahoo! Inc.(Walters, Mark)
October 22, 2010 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Facebook Inc re #96 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #95 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #94 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #98 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #97 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Durbin, Christopher)
October 22, 2010 Filing 98 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY MARK R. WEINSTEIN FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Facebook Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2224713. (Durbin, Christopher)
October 22, 2010 Filing 97 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY ELIZABETH L. STAMESHKIN FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Facebook Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2224709. (Durbin, Christopher)
October 22, 2010 Filing 96 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL G. RHODES FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Facebook Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2224703. (Durbin, Christopher)
October 22, 2010 Filing 95 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY HEIDI L. KEEFE FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Facebook Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2224693. (Durbin, Christopher)
October 22, 2010 Filing 94 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christen M.R. Dubois FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Facebook Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2224669. (Durbin, Christopher)
October 22, 2010 Filing 93 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by Facebook Inc Filed by Defendant Facebook Inc.(Durbin, Christopher)
October 22, 2010 Filing 92 MOTION to Dismiss Joinder in Defs Google Inc. and YouTube's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Defendant Facebook Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/12/2010, (Durbin, Christopher)
October 22, 2010 Filing 91 MOTION to Dismiss Joinder in Defs Google Inc. and YouTube's Motion to Dismiss or Sever for Misjoinder by Defendant Facebook Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/12/2010, (Durbin, Christopher)
October 22, 2010 Filing 90 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #62 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6), by Defendants AOL Inc, Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Afzali, Aneelah)
October 22, 2010 Filing 89 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by AOL Inc, Google Inc, YouTube LLC Filed by Defendants AOL Inc, Google Inc, YouTube LLC.(Afzali, Aneelah)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER on #79 Agreed Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney Edward J Bennett and Michael D Hunsinger as Counsel for deft Office Depot Inc by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(TF)
October 22, 2010 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Aneelah Afzali on behalf of Defendant AOL Inc. (Afzali, Aneelah)
October 21, 2010 Filing 86 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #63 MOTION to Dismiss Party or Sever for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 20 and 21, by Defendant Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Walters, Mark)
October 21, 2010 Filing 85 DECLARATION of Kevin Kramer filed by Defendant Yahoo! Inc re #62 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit)(Walters, Mark)
October 21, 2010 Filing 84 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #62 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6), by Defendant Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walters, Mark)
October 21, 2010 Filing 83 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #63 MOTION to Dismiss Party or Sever for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 20 and 21, by Defendants Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, eBay Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carraway, J)
October 21, 2010 Filing 82 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #62 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6), by Defendants Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, eBay Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carraway, J)
October 21, 2010 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss or Sever Pursuant to FRCP 20 & 21 by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/12/2010, (Roller, Jeremy)
October 21, 2010 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/12/2010, (Roller, Jeremy)
October 21, 2010 Filing 79 Agreed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Edward J. Bennett and Michael D. Hunsinger by Defendant Office Depot Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/21/2010, (Carraway, J)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re #76 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Douglas S. Rupert for OfficeMax Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re #75 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John S Letchinger for OfficeMax Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 21, 2010 Filing 76 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Douglas S. Rupert FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant OfficeMax Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2222573. (Attachments: #1 Supplement ECF Agreement)(Baumgardner, Kevin)
October 21, 2010 Filing 75 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John S. Letchinger FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant OfficeMax Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2222571. (Attachments: #1 Supplement ECF Agreement)(Baumgardner, Kevin)
October 20, 2010 Filing 74 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #62 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6), by Defendant OfficeMax Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant OfficeMax's Joinder in Defendants Google Inc. and YouTube, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief Can Be Granted)(Baumgardner, Kevin)
October 20, 2010 Filing 73 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by Office Depot Inc identifying Other Affiliate Alliance Bernstein, L.P. for Office Depot Inc. Filed by Defendants Office Depot Inc, Alliance Bernstein, L.P..(Carraway, J)
October 19, 2010 Filing 72 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by Apple Inc Filed by Defendant Apple Inc.(Roller, Jeremy)
October 19, 2010 Filing 71 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by eBay Inc Filed by Defendant eBay Inc.(Carraway, J)
October 19, 2010 Filing 70 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Kevin C Baumgardner on behalf of Defendant OfficeMax Inc. (Baumgardner, Kevin)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re #60 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Neil L. Yang for Apple Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re #59 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney George A Riley for Apple Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER re #58 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian M. Berliner for Apple Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re #57 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David S. Almeling for Apple Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 19, 2010 Filing 65 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #63 MOTION to Dismiss Party or Sever for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 20 and 21. Filed by Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. Noting Date 11/12/2010, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon)
October 19, 2010 Filing 64 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #62 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6). Filed by Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. Noting Date 11/12/2010, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon)
October 18, 2010 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss Party or Sever for Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 20 and 21 by Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/5/2010, (Jost, Shannon)
October 18, 2010 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) by Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/5/2010, (Jost, Shannon)
October 18, 2010 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John D Vandenberg on behalf of Defendants Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, eBay Inc. (Vandenberg, John)
October 18, 2010 Filing 60 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Neil L. Yang FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Apple Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2218993. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Roller, Jeremy)
October 18, 2010 Filing 59 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY George A. Riley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Apple Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2218986. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Roller, Jeremy)
October 18, 2010 Filing 58 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian M. Berliner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Apple Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2218978. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Roller, Jeremy)
October 18, 2010 Filing 57 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David S. Almeling FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Apple Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2218969. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Roller, Jeremy)
October 18, 2010 Filing 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by Staples Inc Filed by Defendant Staples Inc.(Carraway, J)
October 18, 2010 Filing 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by Netflix Inc Filed by Defendant Netflix Inc.(Carraway, J)
October 18, 2010 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Scott T Wilsdon on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Wilsdon, Scott)
October 18, 2010 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney J Christopher Carraway on behalf of Defendants Netflix Inc, Office Depot Inc, Staples Inc, eBay Inc. (Carraway, J)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re #46 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eric W. Ow for Yahoo! Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re #45 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew I Kreeger for Yahoo! Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re #44 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael A Jacobs for Yahoo! Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re #43 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Richard S.J. Hung for Yahoo! Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re #42 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Francis Ho for Yahoo! Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re #40 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Aaron Chase for Google Inc, and for YouTube LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 7, 2010 Filing 46 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eric W. Ow FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Yahoo! Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2209642. (Walters, Mark)
October 7, 2010 Filing 45 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew I. Keeger FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Yahoo! Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2209637. (Walters, Mark)
October 7, 2010 Filing 44 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael Jacobs FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Yahoo! Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2209631. (Walters, Mark)
October 7, 2010 Filing 43 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard S.J. Hung FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Yahoo! Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2209622. (Walters, Mark)
October 7, 2010 Filing 42 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Francis Ho FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Yahoo! Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2209615. (Walters, Mark)
October 7, 2010 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark P Walters on behalf of Defendant Yahoo! Inc. (Walters, Mark)
October 7, 2010 Filing 40 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Aaron Chase FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2209342. (Jost, Shannon)
October 7, 2010 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1.. (Jost, Shannon)
October 7, 2010 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1.. (Jost, Shannon)
October 5, 2010 Attorney Scott A.W. Johnson,Aneelah Afzali for Google Inc,Scott A.W. Johnson,Aneelah Afzali for YouTube LLC added per 29 Notice of Appearance. (KN)
October 5, 2010 Attorney Scott A.W. Johnson,Aneelah Afzali for Google Inc,Scott A.W. Johnson,Aneelah Afzali for YouTube LLC added per #29 Notice of Appearance. (KN)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re #33 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Dimitrios T. Drivas for Google Inc, and for YouTube LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re #32 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John Handy for Google Inc, and for YouTube LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #31 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Warren S. Heit for Google Inc, and for YouTube LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re #30 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kevin X. McGann for Google Inc, and for YouTube LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 4, 2010 Filing 33 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Dimitrios T. Drivas FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2204511. (Jost, Shannon)
October 4, 2010 Filing 32 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John Handy FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2204504. (Jost, Shannon)
October 4, 2010 Filing 31 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Warren S. Heit FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2204497. (Jost, Shannon)
October 4, 2010 Filing 30 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kevin X. McGann FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2204432. (Jost, Shannon)
October 4, 2010 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shannon M Jost on behalf of Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Jost, Shannon)
September 30, 2010 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by Office Depot Inc Filed by Defendant Office Depot Inc.(Hunsinger, Michael)
September 27, 2010 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by OfficeMax Inc identifying Other Affiliate Fidelity Management & Research Company, Other Affiliate Fidelity Value Fund, Other Affiliate FIL Limited, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Other Affiliate FMR LLC, Other Affiliate Edward C. Johnson for OfficeMax Inc. Filed by Defendants OfficeMax Inc, Fidelity Management & Research Company, Fidelity Value Fund, FIL Limited, Evercore Trust Company, N.A., FMR LLC, Edward C. Johnson.(Baumgardner, Kevin)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STANDING ORDER FOR PATENT CASES by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 11/8/2010, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/25/2010, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/1/2010, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Stipulated Motion to extend time to respond to complaint to October 22, 2010 by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
September 20, 2010 Filing 23 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order Extending OfficeMax's Time to Respond to Complaint by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. Noting Date 9/20/2010, (Berry, Matthew)
September 20, 2010 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steven W Fogg on behalf of Defendant OfficeMax Inc. (Fogg, Steven)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #18 Stipulation filed by Office Depot Inc ; Defendant Office Depot must respond to Plaintiff's complaint by October 22, 2010 by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (IM)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #19 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Edward J. Bennett for Office Depot Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 17, 2010 Filing 19 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Edward J. Bennett FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Office Depot Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2187853. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Hunsinger, Michael)
September 16, 2010 Filing 18 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint for Defendant Office Depot by parties. (Hunsinger, Michael)
September 15, 2010 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael D Hunsinger on behalf of Defendant Office Depot Inc. (Hunsinger, Michael)
September 14, 2010 Filing 16 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant AOL Inc on 8/30/2010; Apple Inc on 8/30/2010; Facebook Inc on 8/30/2010; Google Inc on 8/30/2010; Netflix Inc on 8/30/2010; Office Depot Inc on 8/30/2010; OfficeMax Inc on 8/30/2010; Staples Inc on 8/30/2010; Yahoo! Inc on 8/30/2010; eBay Inc on 8/30/2010 (MD)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Stipulated Motion extending time to respond to complaint by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
September 10, 2010 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC. Noting Date 9/10/2010, (Berry, Matthew)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Attorney Max L. Tribble for Interval Licensing LLC, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael F. Heim for Interval Licensing LLC, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eric J. Enger for Interval Licensing LLC, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
August 30, 2010 Filing 12 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. E-mailed to the US Patent Office. (Attachments: #1 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120)) (RE)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nathan J. Davis for Interval Licensing LLC, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
August 30, 2010 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Max L. Tribble, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2170744. (Nelson, Justin)
August 30, 2010 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael F. Heim FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2170720. (Nelson, Justin)
August 30, 2010 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eric Enger FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2170707. (Nelson, Justin)
August 30, 2010 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nate Davis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2170677. (Nelson, Justin)
August 30, 2010 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to all Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(MKB)
August 30, 2010 Filing 3 Notice to counsel Max Tribble, Jr., Michael Heim, Eric Enger and Nathan Davis advising of pro hac vice and ECF registration requirements. (MKB)
August 30, 2010 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (MKB)
August 30, 2010 NOTICE to Filer of Deficiency: Pursuant to our local rules, Civil Rule 3(a), all civil action complaints in which jurisdiction is invoked in whole or in part under 28 U.S.C. 1338 (regarding patents, trademarks and copyrights) shall be accompanied by the required notice to the Patent and Trademark Office (Form AO120) or the required notice to the Register of Copyrights (Form AO121). Please complete the appropriate form and email it back to the new cases box at newcases.seattle@wawd.uscourts.gov. Please include in the subject line the name and number of the case and the name of the document attached. This form will then be posted to the case docket and a copy sent to the appropriate entity. (MKB)
August 30, 2010 NOTICE to Filer: In the future please order the parties on the docket as they appear on the Complaint. In addition to creating a docket that is a true reflection of the Complaint caption it also helps eliminate dropping parties as happened here with defendant Google, Inc. The docket has now been properly ordered and defendant Google, Inc. has been added.(MKB)
August 30, 2010 NOTICE to Filer of Deficiency: Pursuant to our local rules, Civil Rule 3(a), all civil action complaints in which jurisdiction is invoked in whole or in part under 28 U.S.C. § 1338 (regarding patents, trademarks and copyrights) shall be accompanied by the required notice to the Patent and Trademark Office (Form AO120) or the required notice to the Register of Copyrights (Form AO121). Please complete the appropriate form and email it back to the new cases box at newcases.seattle@wawd.uscourts.gov. Please include in the subject line the name and number of the case and the name of the document attached. This form will then be posted to the case docket and a copy sent to the appropriate entity. (MKB)
August 27, 2010 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by Interval Licensing LLC Filed by Plaintiff Interval Licensing LLC.(Nelson, Justin)
August 27, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against defendant(s) All Defendants, filed by Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons AOL Inc., #8 Summons eBay, Inc., #9 Summons Netflix, Inc., #10 Summons Staples, Inc., #11 Summons Youtube, LLC, #12 Summons Facebook, Inc., #13 Summons Office Depot, Inc., #14 Summons Google, Inc., #15 Summons Officemax, Inc., #16 Summons Yahoo! Inc., #17 Summons Apple, Inc.)(Nelson, Justin) (Receipt #: SEA036208).
August 27, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against defendant(s) All Defendants, filed by Interval Licensing LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons AOL Inc., # 8 Summons eBay, Inc., # 9 Summons Netflix, Inc., # 10 Summons Staples, Inc., # 11 Summons Youtube, LLC, # 12 Summons Facebook, Inc., # 13 Summons Office Depot, Inc., # 14 Summons Google, Inc., # 15 Summons Officemax, Inc., # 16 Summons Yahoo! Inc., # 17 Summons Apple, Inc.)(Nelson, Justin) (Receipt #: SEA036208).
August 27, 2010 Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number: SEA036208. (DJ)
August 27, 2010 Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number: SEA036208. (DJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Interval Licensing LLC v. AOL, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Represented By: Scott A.W. Johnson
Represented By: Kevin X. McGann
Represented By: Dimitrios T. Drivas
Represented By: Theresa Wang
Represented By: Aaron Chase
Represented By: Wendi R. Schepler
Represented By: Warren S. Heit
Represented By: John Handy
Represented By: Shannon M Jost
Represented By: Aneelah Afzali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc
Represented By: Gregory F Wesner
Represented By: Mark P Walters
Represented By: Francis Ho
Represented By: Eric W. Ow
Represented By: Richard S.J. Hung
Represented By: Michael A Jacobs
Represented By: Matthew I Kreeger
Represented By: Dario A Machleidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc
Represented By: Christen M.R. Dubois
Represented By: Sudhir Pala
Represented By: Mark R. Weinstein
Represented By: Christopher B. Durbin
Represented By: Michael G Rhodes
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Stameshkin
Represented By: Heidi L. Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay Inc
Represented By: Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr.
Represented By: Klaus H Hamm
Represented By: John D Vandenberg
Represented By: Derrick W. Toddy
Represented By: Christopher T Wion
Represented By: Kristin L Cleveland
Represented By: Shane Patrick Cramer
Represented By: J Christopher Carraway
Represented By: Jeffrey S Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Represented By: Scott A.W. Johnson
Represented By: Kevin X. McGann
Represented By: Dimitrios T. Drivas
Represented By: Theresa Wang
Represented By: Aaron Chase
Represented By: Wendi R. Schepler
Represented By: Warren S. Heit
Represented By: John Handy
Represented By: Shannon M Jost
Represented By: Aneelah Afzali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AOL Inc
Represented By: Elliott C. Cook
Represented By: Robert L. Burns
Represented By: Cortney S. Alexander
Represented By: Molly A Terwilliger
Represented By: Gerald F. Ivey
Represented By: Shannon M Jost
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Represented By: Aneelah Afzali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth Day
Represented By: Mark Liang
Represented By: Clayton Thompson
Represented By: David L Alberti
Represented By: David S. Almeling
Represented By: Xin-Yi Zhou
Represented By: Neil L. Yang
Represented By: Marc C Belloli
Represented By: Yakov Zolotorev
Represented By: Brian M. Berliner
Represented By: Scott T Wilsdon
Represented By: George A Riley
Represented By: Jeremy E Roller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staples Inc
Represented By: Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr.
Represented By: Klaus H Hamm
Represented By: John D Vandenberg
Represented By: Derrick W. Toddy
Represented By: Kristin L Cleveland
Represented By: Shane Patrick Cramer
Represented By: J Christopher Carraway
Represented By: Jeffrey S Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix Inc
Represented By: Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr.
Represented By: Klaus H Hamm
Represented By: John D Vandenberg
Represented By: Derrick W. Toddy
Represented By: Kristin L Cleveland
Represented By: Shane Patrick Cramer
Represented By: J Christopher Carraway
Represented By: Jeffrey S Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot Inc
Represented By: Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr.
Represented By: Klaus H Hamm
Represented By: Edward J. Bennett
Represented By: John D Vandenberg
Represented By: Derrick W. Toddy
Represented By: Kristin L Cleveland
Represented By: Michael D Hunsinger
Represented By: Shane Patrick Cramer
Represented By: J Christopher Carraway
Represented By: Jeffrey S Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OfficeMax Inc
Represented By: Kevin C Baumgardner
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: John S Letchinger
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Neumeyer
Represented By: Douglas S. Rupert
Represented By: J Christopher Carraway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Golan Levin
Represented By: Jeffrey I Tilden
Represented By: Jeffrey M Thomas
Represented By: James E. Eakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Philippe Piernot
Represented By: Jeffrey I Tilden
Represented By: Jeffrey M Thomas
Represented By: James E. Eakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Paul Freiberger
Represented By: Jeffrey I Tilden
Represented By: Jeffrey M Thomas
Represented By: James E. Eakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interval Licensing LLC
Represented By: Eric J. Enger
Represented By: Andres C Healy
Represented By: Robert A. Bullwinkel
Represented By: Edgar Guy Sargent
Represented By: Douglas R. Wilson
Represented By: Michael F. Heim
Represented By: Oleg Elkhunovich
Represented By: Max L. Tribble
Represented By: Justin A Nelson
Represented By: Matthew R Berry
Represented By: Matthew Behncke
Represented By: Niraj P. Patel
Represented By: Nathan J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?