Evans v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Charles Williams Evans
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2010cv01842
Filed: November 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 50 Motion for Attorney's Fees, by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (SWT)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 Stipulated motion for attorneys fees by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; action is remanded to Commissioner for further proceedings by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; court affirms decision of Commissioner by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Amend. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(GB)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time; Motions terminated: 20 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief filed by Charles Williams Evans. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(GB)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting defendant's 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(GB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Williams Evans
Represented By: Elie Halpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?