United States of America v. Hoyte et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Derek Hoyte and Columbia Crest Partners, LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv02044
Filed: December 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 111 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.(TG)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 103 Motion for Leave to Amend. (TG)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER denying 83 Motion to Certify by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying 81 Motion for Reconsideration by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 65 Motion to Dismiss.(TG)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 41 Motion to Dismiss; granting 49 Motion to Amend. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint by 9/21/2011; granting 44 Motion to Amend answer by 10/5/2011. (TG)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle GRANTING Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order. Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing set for 1/5/2011 at 11:00 AM in E Courtroom before Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hoyte et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Hoyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Crest Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?