Heinemann v. United Airlines
Plaintiff: Theodore Heinemann
Defendant: United Continental Airlines
Counter_defendant: Theodore Heinemann
Counter_claimant: United Continental Airlines
Case Number: 2:2011cv00002
Filed: January 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 JUDGMENT in favor of United Airlines against Theodore Hedley Heinemann; the matter is DISMISSED; signed by Docket Clerk M Duett at the direction of Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC) Modified on 7/7/2011 -mailed copy of judgment to pltf (MD).
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC) Modified on 6/15/2011 - mailed copy of order to pltf(MD).
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 26 34 Plaintiff's Motions to strike Defendant's arguments and to appoint counsel and a jury consultant; granting 22 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. Defendant has 14 days from the date of this order to indicate whether it intends to continue pursuing its counterclaim; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 13 Motion to Change Venue, etc. and 18 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC) Modified on 5/9/2011 -mailed copy of order to pltf(MD).
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re dismissal for failure to cooperate. Show Cause Response due by 4/4/2011; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC) Modified on 3/23/2011 -mailed copy of order to pltf(MD).
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this matter should not be dismissed for non-cooperation; Show Cause Response due by 3/28/2011. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC) Modified on 3/17/2011-mailed copy of order to pltf (MD).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heinemann v. United Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Theodore Heinemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Continental Airlines
Represented By: Caryn Geraghty Jorgensen
Represented By: David W. Howenstine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Heinemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: United Continental Airlines
Represented By: David W. Howenstine
Represented By: Caryn Geraghty Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?