Price et al v. Shell Oil Company et al
Plaintiff: Rachel A Price, Katie M Holmstrom and Tessa V Gehardt
Defendant: Shell Oil Company and Shell Oil Products Co LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv01553
Filed: September 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Skagit
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting 266 Stipulated Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline. Court hereby grants the limited request to extend the discovery deadline to permit the parties to conduct the deposition of Cliff Blanchard on June 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 262 Motion to Enforce the Subpoena of Enoch J. Ledet; denying Mr. Ledet's 264 Motion to Quash Subpoena. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: Mr. Enoch Ledet via email
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 254 Motion for Leave to File a Fifth Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER to Consolidate re Plaintiffs' 250 Memorandum on Consolidation. The Court ORDERS that Case No. 11-1553MJP and Case No. 17-1337MJP be consolidated for trial and that all future pleadings be filed in the lead case C11-1553-MJP. A ten-day jury trial in this matter shall be set for October 28, 2019. The clerk shall issue an order resetting all case deadlines accordingly. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MINUTE ORDER setting a Status Conference for 10/30/2018 at 9:00 AM for the purpose of setting a new trial date. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MINUTE ORDER continuing jury trial. The jury trial in this matter is hereby CONTINUED from to March 26, 2018 to December 3, 2018. The proposed pretrial order is due by November 19, 2018; trial briefs, proposed voir dire, proposed jury instructions, and proposed verdict forms shall be submitted by November 26, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' request to take videotaped perpetuation depositions of witnesses Connie Gaind and Heather Zielstra. (Dkt. No. 237 at 1.) At this time, the Court will not impose the limitations Defendant requests. (See Dkt. Nos. 237 at 2, 238 at 2.) The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' request to award attorney fees. (Dkt. No. 237 at 3.) Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MINUTE ORDER re Trial Continuance. Counsel is DIRECTED to meet and confer regarding a new trial date and to propose a new date to the Court within 14 days of the issuance of this order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MINUTE ORDER. The Court hereby RESETS the date of the parties' jury trial to March 26, 2018 at 10:00 am. The Court also RESETS the pretrial deadlines as follows: 1) The proposed pretrial order is due on or before March 16, 2018. 2) Trial briefs, proposed voir dire, proposed jury instructions, and proposed verdict forms shall be submitted by March 19, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MINUTE ORDER re parties' questions to clarify the Court's June 20, 2017 order. (See Dkt. Nos. 227 , 233 , 234 .) Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER. A district court has broad discretion when considering a motion to consolidate. Washington v. Daley, 173 F.3d 1158, 1169 n.13 (9th Cir. 1999). Here, consolidation is likely to cause delay, confusion and prejudiceweighing against consolidation . See Southwest Marine, Inc. v. Triple A Mach Shop, Inc., 720 F. Supp. 805, 807 (N.D. Cal. 1984). Furthermore, the Court has already made it clear that Plaintiffs must retry their case as it stood in 2014. Plaintiff's 228 to Consolidate Cases is DENIED. The Court does not find Rule 11 sanctions appropriate here. Defendant's request for sanctions (Dkt. No. 229 ) is DENIED. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 224 Motion for leave to file motions to amend complaint and take discovery. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MINUTE ORDER re remand for new trial: Jury Trial is set for 1/29/2018 at 09:30 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Proposed retrial Order due by 1/22/2018, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs/proposed verdict forms due by 1/22/2018, Objections or responses to any pretrial filings due 1/24/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge John C Coughenour; Defendant's 94 95 motions for summary judgment are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (TF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price et al v. Shell Oil Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel A Price
Represented By: Gregory Arthur Hitzel
Represented By: Stephen A Teller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie M Holmstrom
Represented By: Gregory Arthur Hitzel
Represented By: Stephen A Teller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tessa V Gehardt
Represented By: Gregory Arthur Hitzel
Represented By: Stephen A Teller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Products Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?