Doe v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Jane Doe alleged that Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. and its wholly-owned subsidiary, IMDb, breached the terms of its Subscriber Agreement and Privacy Policy by using her personal and credit card information to cross-reference public records and other sources to obtain Plaintiff's legal name, age, date of birth and other personal, confidential information, and made some of it available to the public at www.imdb.com. Prior to subscribing to IMDbPro, Plaintiff, an actress of Asian descent with an Americanized stage name, alleged that Defendant had absolutely no means by which to obtain her legal name and date of birth.

Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc and IMDB.com Inc
Case Number: 2:2011cv01709
Filed: October 13, 2011
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2012 38 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *1- 2 DAY* Jury Trial is set for 1/7/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joinder of Parties due by 3/5/2012, Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2012, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 6/11/2012, Motions due by 7/11/2012, Discovery completed by 8/10/2012, Dispositive motions due by 9/10/2012, Motions in Limine due by 12/3/2012, Pretrial Order due by 12/26/2012, Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/2/2013, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/2/2013, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
January 30, 2012 37 NOTICE striking status conference scheduled for 2/14/2012. (RM)
January 27, 2012 36 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 1-2. Filed by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, IMDB.com Inc, Plaintiff Huong Hoang.(Dozier, John)
January 12, 2012 35 NOTICE of Change of Address of Attorney John W Dozier, Jr. Filed by Plaintiff Huong Hoang. (Dozier, John) Modified Address on 1/12/2012 (DS).
January 6, 2012 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Huong Hoang.(Dozier, John)
December 23, 2011 33 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 10(A) and granting leve to amend by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
December 15, 2011 32 Featured Case ORDER re 31 Stipulation to extend deadlines relating to Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan filed by IMDB.com Inc, Amazon.com Inc by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
December 13, 2011 31 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES RELATING TO JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by parties. (Roos, Breena)
December 2, 2011 30 DECLARATION of Breena Roos filed by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, IMDB.com Inc re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 10(a) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(McDougall-Tural, Elizabeth)
December 2, 2011 29 REPLY, filed by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, IMDB.com Inc, TO RESPONSE to 12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 10(a) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A & B)(McDougall-Tural, Elizabeth)
December 2, 2011 28 REPLY, filed by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, IMDB.com Inc, TO RESPONSE to 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (McDougall-Tural, Elizabeth)
November 28, 2011 27 Second DECLARATION of John W. Dozier, Jr. filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 10(a) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Dozier, John)
November 28, 2011 26 DECLARATION of Duncan Crabtree-Ireland filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 10(a) (Dozier, John)
November 28, 2011 25 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Jane Doe, to 12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 10(a). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Dozier, John)
November 28, 2011 24 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Jane Doe, to 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). (Dozier, John)
November 22, 2011 23 REDACTION to 14 Declaration of Giancarlo Cairella, by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(MD)
November 21, 2011 22 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: John Dozier, Jr.; Def Counsel: Breena Roos; CR: Barry Fanning; Telephone Conference held on 11/21/2011 20 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Seal. Court orders redaction and sealing of specific terms until decision to proceed with anonymity is decided. Plaintiff is directed to provide redacted version. Transcript of this proceeding is sealed until further order of this Court. (RM)
November 16, 2011 21 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of John W. Dozier, Jr., by Plaintiff Jane Doe re 20 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Seal (ex parte); re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 10(a) ; (Dozier, John)
November 16, 2011 20 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Seal (ex parte); re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 10(a) ; by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/16/2011, (Dozier, John)
November 15, 2011 19 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 12/27/2011, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/13/2011, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/20/2011, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
November 14, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER by Judge John C Coughenour; This case is REASSIGNED in rotation to the Honorable Marsha J. Pechman. All future pleadings shall bear the case number C11-1709-MJP. (TF)
November 10, 2011 17 PRAECIPE to attach document re 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, IMDB.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McDougall-Tural, Elizabeth)
November 10, 2011 16 DECLARATION of Ashley A. Locke filed by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, IMDB.com Inc re 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(McDougall-Tural, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2011 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, IMDB.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/2/2011, (McDougall-Tural, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2011 14 SEALED PER COURT DECLARATION of Giancarlo Cairella filed by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, IMDB.com Inc re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 10(a) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(McDougall-Tural, Elizabeth) Modified on 11/23/2011 -Per Court Instructions - redacted version filed. (MD).
November 9, 2011 13 DECLARATION of Breena M. Roos filed by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, IMDB.com Inc re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 10(a) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(McDougall-Tural, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2011 12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 10(a) by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, IMDB.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/2/2011, (McDougall-Tural, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2011 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for IMDB.com Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1.. (McDougall-Tural, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2011 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1.. (McDougall-Tural, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2011 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Elizabeth L McDougall-Tural on behalf of Defendants Amazon.com Inc, IMDB.com Inc. (McDougall-Tural, Elizabeth)
November 3, 2011 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Caroline Little, Authorized Agent for Registered Agent of IMDB.COM, INC., on 10/18/2011, filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Dozier, John) Modified on 11/7/2011 to reflect correct service date (TF).
November 3, 2011 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Caroline Little, Authorized Agent for Registered Agent of AMAZON.COM, INC., on 10/18/2011, filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Dozier, John) Modified on 11/7/2011 to reflect correct service date (TF).
October 17, 2011 6 Featured Case ORDER re 5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John W Dozier, Jr for Jane Doe, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 17, 2011 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John W. Dozier, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Jane Doe (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2591121. (Newman, Derek)
October 14, 2011 4 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by United States District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
October 14, 2011 3 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case shall attend the conference and be fully prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at "paul_pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov" at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is hereby ordered set on TUESDAY, FEBRUARY 14, 2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before United States District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
October 14, 2011 2 Summons electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Amazon.com Inc, IMDB.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(RE)
October 14, 2011 Judge John C Coughenour added. (RE)
October 13, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Amazon.com, Inc., IMDb.com, Inc. (Receipt # 0981-2588664), filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Newman, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: John W Dozier, Jr
Represented By: Randall Moeller
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Ashley A. Locke
Represented By: Elizabeth L McDougall-Tural
Represented By: Breena Michelle Roos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMDB.com Inc
Represented By: Ashley A. Locke
Represented By: Elizabeth L McDougall-Tural
Represented By: Breena Michelle Roos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?