Thomas v. Miller-Stout
Petitioner: Demicko Billie Thomas
Respondent: Maggie Miller-Stout
Case Number: 2:2011cv02186
Filed: December 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO IDENTIFY PRO BONO COUNSEL: The Clerk is DIRECTED to identify counsel from the Pro Bono Panel to represent Petitioner in his habeas proceedings before the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Demicko Thomas, Prisoner ID: 991403)(PM) cc: S. Haas, appeals clerk
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 93 with the exception that the Court also approves a limited Certificate of Appealability. Petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus (Dkts. # 70 and # 70 -1), is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. **14 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Demicko Thomas, Prisoner ID: 991403) (PM)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MINUTE ORDER denying Petitioner's 118 Motion for Leave to File Amended Certificate of Appealability. Authorized signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Demicko Thomas, Prisoner ID: 991403)(PM) cc: Seattle Appeals Clerks
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE ORDER striking as moot Petitioner's 115 Motion to Extend Noting Date. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Demicko Thomas, Prisoner ID: 991403)(SWT)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE ORDER granting Petitioner's 112 MOTION For Extension of Time to Consider Habeas Petition and to re-note pending Objections. Petitioner's 108 OBJECTIONS to the 93 Report and Recommendation are RENOTED for 2/9/2018. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Demicko Thomas, Prisoner ID: 991403)(PM)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE ORDER granting in part Petitioner's 103 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Objection to Report and Recommendation. Petitioner shall be allowed to file Objections in the same length as the R&R. Accordingly, those Objections shall be no longer than 38-pages in length. The Court will not entertain any further requests for overlength Objections. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Demicko Thomas, Prisoner ID: 991403) (TH)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting Petitioner's 101 Motion to Withdraw Objections to Report and Recommendation and For Leave to File an Amended Overlength Objection to Report and Recommendation. Petitioner is granted permission to proceed pro se in this litigat ion. The 94 Objections to the Report and Recommendation are WITHDRAWN, and the government's corresponding Reply (Dkt. # 95 ) is STRICKEN AS MOOT. Amended Objections to R&R due by 11/6/2017. The pending Report and Recommendation by Judge Tsuchida (Dkt. # 93 ) is RENOTED for consideration on Friday, December 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Demicko Thomas, Prisoner ID: 991403)(PM)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting Petitioner's 98 Motion to extend the noting date; the second amended petition for writ of habeas corpus is renoted for 9/26/2017, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER striking Petitioner's 96 Pro Se Motion to Withdraw Objections and for Leave to File an Over-length Amended Objections, authorized by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT) (cc: Petitioner)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 AMENDED BRIEFING SCHEDULE ORDER; petitioner's response due 5/29/17 and respondent's reply due 6/2/17; clerk to renote habeas petition for 6/2/17 by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (RS)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 BRIEFING SCHEDULE; respondent's answer is due 6/8/17 by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Miller-Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Demicko Billie Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Maggie Miller-Stout
Represented By: John Joseph Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?