Carpenters Health & Security Trust of Western Washington et al v. HHJ Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carpenters Health & Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters of Western Washington Individual Account Pension Trust, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Western Washington and Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters
Defendant: HHJ Construction Inc
Case Number: 2:2012cv00263
Filed: February 15, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. § 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2012 Filing 15 JUDGMENT BY COURT; Judgment is entered in favor of plaintiffs and against defendant in the amount of $41,185.36. (TF)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #7 Motion for Default Judgment by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TF)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
July 5, 2012 Filing 12 Corrected RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiffs Carpenters Health & Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters of Western Washington Individual Account Pension Trust, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington, Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters. (Stoll, Mary) Modified text on 7/6/2012 (TF).
July 5, 2012 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiffs Carpenters Health & Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters of Western Washington Individual Account Pension Trust, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington, Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters. (Stoll, Mary)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due within 5 days by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
June 21, 2012 Filing 9 DECLARATION in Support of Costs and Attorney Fees re #8 Declaration,, by Plaintiffs Carpenters Health & Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters of Western Washington Individual Account Pension Trust, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington, Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Costs Incurred, #2 Exhibit B--Attorney Fees)(Stoll, Mary)
June 21, 2012 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Mary L. Stoll filed by Plaintiffs Carpenters Health & Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters of Western Washington Individual Account Pension Trust, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington, Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters re #7 MOTION for Default Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Labor Agreements, #2 Exhibit B--Trust Agreement Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C--Unfunded Reports, #4 Exhibit D--Claim Summary)(Stoll, Mary)
June 21, 2012 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Carpenters Health & Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters of Western Washington Individual Account Pension Trust, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington, Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/6/2012, (Stoll, Mary)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DEFAULT Granting Plaintiffs' #4 Motion for Default as to Defendant HHJ Contruction, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. (KERR)
March 20, 2012 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Mary L. Stoll filed by Plaintiffs Carpenters Health & Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters of Western Washington Individual Account Pension Trust, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington, Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters re #4 MOTION for Default (Stoll, Mary)
March 20, 2012 Filing 4 MOTION for Default by Plaintiffs Carpenters Health & Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters of Western Washington Individual Account Pension Trust, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington, Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/20/2012, (Stoll, Mary)
March 7, 2012 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Kevin Ireton, Project Manager, for Roger A. Hansen, Registered Agent on 2/28/2012, filed by Plaintiffs Carpenters Health & Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters of Western Washington Individual Account Pension Trust, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington, Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters. (Stoll, Mary)
February 16, 2012 Filing 2 Summons electronically Issued as to defendant(s) HHJ Construction Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(RE)
February 16, 2012 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (RE)
February 15, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Collective Bargaining Agreement against defendant(s) HHJ Construction, Inc. (Receipt # 0981-2713736), filed by Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Health & Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters of Western Washington Individual Account Pension Trust, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Western Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Errata Letter re jurisdiction, #3 Summons 1--RHansen, #4 Summons 2--SSeelye, #5 Exhibit A--Labor Agreements, #6 Exhibit B--Trust Agreements)(Stoll, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenters Health & Security Trust of Western Washington et al v. HHJ Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Health & Security Trust of Western Washington
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters of Western Washington Individual Account Pension Trust
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Western Washington
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HHJ Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?