Solis v. Lantern Light Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Hilda L Solis, Ray Martinez Advanced Information Systems and Ray Martinez
Defendant: Lantern Light Corporation, DirecTV LLC and Ramon Martinez
Case Number: 2:2012cv01406
Filed: August 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting The Washington Wage Claim Project's 172 Motion to Unseal Documents. Clerk shall immediately UNSEAL the following documents: 116 , 117 , 118 , 119 , 130 , 131 , 143 , 144 , 147 , 148 . Document 120 shall remain unde r seal, however, in two (2) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file public, unredacted copies of Exhibits AA, EE, FF and GG to the Declaration of Joseph Lake in this matter and file redacted, public versions of Exhibits CC and DD to t he Declaration of Joseph Lake. Intervenor shall provide a copy of this Order to Plaintiff in order to facilitatethe filing of the Exhibits noted in paragraph 3. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) Modified on 5/17/2017 copy to Ramon Martinez via the USPS (PM).
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 CONSENT JUDGMENT AND ORDER granting 166 Joint Motion to Approve Consent Judgment as to defts Lantern Light Corp d/b/a Advanced Information Systems and Ramon Martinez, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) Modified on 10/15/2015 cc: Ramon Martinez (PM).
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting pltf's 121 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying dfts' 126 Motion for Summary Judgment; this matter shall proceed on the merits of the claims by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) Modified on 5/29/2015/cc Martinez (RS).
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS by Judge Ricardo S Martinez; DIRECTV's 41 Motion to Compel is DENIED; Plaintiff's 55 Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; DIRECTV's 63 Motion for Protective Order is DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART; DIRECTV's 69 Motion for Protective Order is DENIED (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (LMK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solis v. Lantern Light Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda L Solis
Represented By: Bruce Lee Brown
Represented By: Joseph M. Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Martinez Advanced Information Systems
Represented By: Jennifer H.Y. Liu
Represented By: Aaron Kazuo Owada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Martinez
Represented By: Jennifer H.Y. Liu
Represented By: Aaron Kazuo Owada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lantern Light Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DirecTV LLC
Represented By: Sieu K. Che
Represented By: Joel Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?