Schweickert v. Hunts Point Ventures, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer P Schweickert
Defendant: Does 1-4, Chad Rudkin, Amber Du Wors, Elizabeth Rudkin, Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC, Hunts Point Ventures, Inc and John David Du Wors
Interested Party: Joyce P. Schweickert
Receiver: Cascade Capital Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv00675
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #112 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(MD)
April 30, 2015 Filing 115 REPLY, filed by Interested Party Joyce P. Schweickert, TO RESPONSE to #112 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Keane, T.)
April 27, 2015 Filing 114 RESPONSE, by Defendants Amber Du Wors, John Du Wors, to #112 MOTION for Attorney Fees . (DeVet, Pamela)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #110 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attys Joel Ard and Rylan Weytham are granted leave to withdraw as counsel for dfts Chad and Elizabeth Rudkin by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
April 15, 2015 Filing 112 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Interested Party Joyce P. Schweickert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/1/2015, (Keane, T.)
March 27, 2015 Filing 111 DECLARATION of Joel B. Ard filed by Defendants Chad Rudkin, Elizabeth Rudkin re #110 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Foster Pepper PLLC (Weythman, Rylan)
March 27, 2015 Filing 110 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Foster Pepper PLLC by Defendants Chad Rudkin, Elizabeth Rudkin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/17/2015, (Weythman, Rylan)
March 12, 2015 Filing 109 JUDGMENT BY COURT granting pltf's motion for default jgm (RS)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting pltf's #104 Motion for Default Judgment by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #103 Defendant - John Du Wors' Motion for Bill of Costs by Deputy in Charge Joe Whiteley.(JW)
February 6, 2015 Filing 106 REPLY, filed by Defendants Amber Du Wors, John Du Wors, TO RESPONSE to #103 MOTION FOR BILL OF COSTS (DeVet, Pamela)
January 20, 2015 Filing 105 DECLARATION of Reed Yurchak filed by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert re #104 MOTION for Default Judgment (Yurchak, Reed)
January 20, 2015 Filing 104 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/20/2015, (Yurchak, Reed)
January 20, 2015 MOTION(S) REFERRED to Deputy in Charge Joe Whiteley: re #103 MOTION FOR BILL OF COSTS filed by John Du Wors (LMK)
January 16, 2015 Filing 103 MOTION FOR BILL OF COSTS by Defendant John Du Wors. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/6/2015, (Franklin, Sam)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT AND STRIKING TRIAL DATE; default entered against dfts Hunts Point Ventures Inc and Hunts Point Venture Group LLC; pltf directed to file motion for default jgm against defaulting dfts within 14 days by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting John Du Wors' #80 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
December 31, 2014 Filing 100 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Receiver Cascade Capital Group LLC (Lakinski, Stephanie)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER ON MOTIONS AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE striking dft's #83 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment; denying dft's #85 Motion for Leave to File Amended motion for summary judgment; dfts to show cause within 14 days by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
December 17, 2014 Filing 98 REPLY by Interested Party Joyce P. Schweickert to #94 Declaration (non motion), #95 Notice-Other (Keane, T.)
December 16, 2014 Filing 97 NOTICE Mediation ; filed by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert. (Kimball, Mark)
December 15, 2014 Filing 96 MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Defendants Amber Du Wors, John Du Wors. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/2/2015, (DeVet, Pamela)
December 12, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE of Objection re #94 Declaration (non motion), ; filed by Defendant John Du Wors. (Franklin, Sam)
December 11, 2014 Filing 94 DECLARATION of T. Jeffrey Keane re #93 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion for Leave, Order on Motion to Quash,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Amend,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Interested Party Joyce P. Schweickert (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keane, T.)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER ON MOTIONS denying dft Du Wors' #54 Motion to Compel; denying pltf's #60 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part dft Du Wors' #61 Motion for Leave to complete dsicovery; granting pltf, Schweickert and Keane's #63 Motion to Quash; granting pltf, Schweickert and Keane's #67 Motion to Quash; granting dfts Rudkin's #27 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying pltf's #29 Motion to Amend ; striking pltf's #30 Motion to Compel by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
November 7, 2014 Filing 92 REPLY, filed by Defendant John Du Wors, TO RESPONSE to #83 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment , #80 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Franklin, Sam)
November 3, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE of Errata re #90 Declaration, ; filed by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Yurchak, Reed)
November 3, 2014 Filing 90 DECLARATION of Reed Yurchak filed by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert re #80 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Yurchak, Reed)
November 3, 2014 Filing 89 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert, to #80 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yurchak, Reed)
October 31, 2014 Filing 88 REPLY, filed by Defendant John Du Wors, TO RESPONSE to #85 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Motion for Summary Judgment and Allow Over-Length Brief (Franklin, Sam)
October 29, 2014 Filing 87 RESPONSE by Defendants Chad Rudkin, Elizabeth Rudkin re #82 Notice-Other Objection to Errata (Weythman, Rylan)
October 27, 2014 Filing 86 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert, to #85 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Motion for Summary Judgment and Allow Over-Length Brief. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yurchak, Reed)
October 22, 2014 Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Motion for Summary Judgment and Allow Over-Length Brief by Defendant John Du Wors. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/31/2014, (Franklin, Sam)
October 21, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Diana Kay Carey on behalf of Receiver Cascade Capital Group LLC. (Carey, Diana)
October 17, 2014 Filing 83 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant John Du Wors. Noting Date 11/7/2014, (Franklin, Sam)
October 15, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE of Errata re #29 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert. (Attachments: #1 Errata Second Amended Complaint Errata)(Yurchak, Reed)
October 15, 2014 Filing 81 ERRATA re #80 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant John Du Wors (Franklin, Sam)
October 14, 2014 Filing 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant John Du Wors. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sam B. Franklin, #2 Exhibit 1, 2, #3 Exhibit 3-6, #4 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/7/2014, (Franklin, Sam)
September 26, 2014 Filing 79 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert, TO RESPONSE to #67 MOTION to Quash Google and Apple Subpoenas, #63 MOTION to Quash (Yurchak, Reed)
September 26, 2014 Filing 78 REPLY, filed by Interested Party Joyce P. Schweickert, TO RESPONSE to #67 MOTION to Quash Google and Apple Subpoenas (Keane, T.)
September 26, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney T. Jeffrey Keane on behalf of Interested Party Joyce P. Schweickert. (Keane, T.)
September 22, 2014 Filing 76 DECLARATION of Sam B. Franklin filed by Defendant John Du Wors re #67 MOTION to Quash Google and Apple Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Franklin, Sam)
September 22, 2014 Filing 75 RESPONSE, by Defendant John Du Wors, to #67 MOTION to Quash Google and Apple Subpoenas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Franklin, Sam)
September 19, 2014 Filing 74 REPLY, filed by Defendants Amber Du Wors, John Du Wors, TO RESPONSE to #61 MOTION for Leave to Complete Two Discovery Events (DeVet, Pamela)
September 15, 2014 Filing 73 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert, to #61 MOTION for Leave to Complete Two Discovery Events. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yurchak, Reed)
September 15, 2014 Filing 72 RESPONSE, by Defendant John Du Wors, to #63 MOTION to Quash . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sam B. Franklin, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Proposed Order)(Franklin, Sam)
September 12, 2014 Filing 71 RESPONSE by Defendant John Du Wors re #68 Objections to Deposition Subpoena and Subpoena Duces Tecum Improperly Served Upon Mark Phillips, Notice of Non-Attendance at Deposition (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sam B. Franklin, #2 Exhibit 1-6, #3 Proposed Order)(Franklin, Sam)
September 11, 2014 Filing 70 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert, TO RESPONSE to #60 MOTION to Compel Du Wors (Yurchak, Reed)
September 11, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Brandon P. Wayman on behalf of Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert. (Wayman, Brandon)
September 11, 2014 Filing 68 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert (Yurchak, Reed)
September 9, 2014 Filing 67 MOTION to Quash Google and Apple Subpoenas by Interested Party Joyce P. Schweickert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/26/2014, (Keane, T.)
September 9, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #63 MOTION to Quash , by Interested Party Joyce P. Schweickert. (Keane, T.)
September 8, 2014 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Sam B. Franklin filed by Defendants Amber Du Wors, John Du Wors re #60 MOTION to Compel Du Wors (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-7, #2 Proposed Order)(Franklin, Sam)
September 8, 2014 Filing 64 RESPONSE, by Defendants Amber Du Wors, John Du Wors, to #60 MOTION to Compel Du Wors. (Franklin, Sam)
September 4, 2014 Filing 63 MOTION to Quash by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decl of Yurchak, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/19/2014, (Yurchak, Reed)
September 4, 2014 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Pamela J. DeVet filed by Defendants Amber Du Wors, John Du Wors re #61 MOTION for Leave to Complete Two Discovery Events (DeVet, Pamela)
September 4, 2014 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to Complete Two Discovery Events by Defendants Amber Du Wors, John Du Wors. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/19/2014, (DeVet, Pamela)
August 28, 2014 Filing 60 MOTION to Compel Du Wors by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/12/2014, (Yurchak, Reed)
July 31, 2014 Filing 59 REPLY, filed by Defendants Amber Du Wors, John Du Wors, TO RESPONSE to #54 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order updated)(DeVet, Pamela)
July 28, 2014 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Reed Yurchak filed by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert re #54 MOTION to Compel (Yurchak, Reed)
July 28, 2014 Filing 57 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert, to #54 MOTION to Compel . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yurchak, Reed)
July 15, 2014 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Pamela J. DeVet filed by Defendants Amber Du Wors, John Du Wors re #54 MOTION to Compel (DeVet, Pamela)
July 15, 2014 Filing 55 DECLARATION of A. Janay Ferguson filed by Defendants Amber Du Wors, John Du Wors re #54 MOTION to Compel (DeVet, Pamela)
July 15, 2014 Filing 54 MOTION to Compel by Defendants Amber Du Wors, John Du Wors. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/1/2014, (DeVet, Pamela)
July 15, 2014 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Pamela J DeVet on behalf of Defendants Amber Du Wors, John Du Wors. (DeVet, Pamela)
July 7, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #49 MOTION ; by Defendants Chad Rudkin, Elizabeth Rudkin. (Ard, Joel)
July 7, 2014 Attorney Pamela J DeVet for John Du Wors added; per #50 Notice-Other. (TM)
July 7, 2014 Per direction of chambers, dfts' OBJECTION RE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE #49 is changed into a motion and noted for 7/18/2014 (TM)
July 7, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Mark D Kimball on behalf of Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert. (Kimball, Mark)
July 3, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE of Joinder to Defendants Rudkin's Opposition to Notice of Limited Appearance re #49 Objections ; filed by Defendant John Du Wors. (Franklin, Sam)
July 3, 2014 Filing 49 MOTION/OBJECTIONS re #48 Notice of Appearance Opposition to Mark D. Kimball's Notice of Limited Appearance by Defendants Chad Rudkin, Elizabeth Rudkin. (Ard, Joel) Modified to change doc into Motion on 7/7/2014 (TM).
June 26, 2014 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark D Kimball on behalf of Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert. (Kimball, Mark)
April 28, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Rylan L. S. Weythman for Defendants Chad Rudkin, Elizabeth Rudkin from May 23, 2014 to June 4, 2014. (Weythman, Rylan)
April 24, 2014 Filing 46 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney A Janay Ferguson for Defendant John Du Wors. (Ferguson, A)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys. Attorney Joel B. Ard and Rylan L. S. Weythman withdrawn for dfts Hunts Point Ventures Inc and Hunts Point Venture Group LLC by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
March 6, 2014 Filing 44 Second DECLARATION of Joel B. Ard ISO FP Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for HPV and HPVG filed by Defendants Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC, Hunts Point Ventures, Inc re #34 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants Hunts Point Ventures, Inc. and Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC (Weythman, Rylan)
March 6, 2014 Filing 43 REPLY, filed by Defendants Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC, Hunts Point Ventures, Inc, TO RESPONSE to #34 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants Hunts Point Ventures, Inc. and Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC (Weythman, Rylan)
March 3, 2014 Filing 42 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert, to #34 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants Hunts Point Ventures, Inc. and Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC. (Yurchak, Reed)
February 28, 2014 Filing 41 REPLY, filed by Defendants Chad Rudkin, Elizabeth Rudkin, TO RESPONSE to #27 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Weythman, Rylan)
February 27, 2014 Filing 40 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert, TO RESPONSE to #29 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint (Yurchak, Reed)
February 27, 2014 Filing 39 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert, TO RESPONSE to #30 MOTION to Compel (Yurchak, Reed)
February 24, 2014 Filing 38 RESPONSE, by Defendants Chad Rudkin, Elizabeth Rudkin, to #29 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weythman, Rylan)
February 24, 2014 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Joel B. Ard filed by Defendants Chad Rudkin, Elizabeth Rudkin re #30 MOTION to Compel (Weythman, Rylan)
February 24, 2014 Filing 36 RESPONSE, by Defendants Chad Rudkin, Elizabeth Rudkin, to #30 MOTION to Compel . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weythman, Rylan)
February 20, 2014 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Joel B. Ard in Support of Motion of Foster Pepper PLLC for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants Hunts Point Ventures, Inc. and Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC filed by Defendants Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC, Hunts Point Ventures, Inc re #34 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants Hunts Point Ventures, Inc. and Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC (Ard, Joel)
February 20, 2014 Filing 34 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants Hunts Point Ventures, Inc. and Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC by Defendants Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC, Hunts Point Ventures, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/7/2014, (Ard, Joel)
February 19, 2014 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT filed by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert re #31 Response to Motion (Yurchak, Reed)
February 19, 2014 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Reed Yurchak filed by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert re #27 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Yurchak, Reed)
February 19, 2014 Filing 31 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert, to #27 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yurchak, Reed)
February 13, 2014 Filing 30 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) Noting Date 2/28/2014, (Yurchak, Reed)
February 13, 2014 Filing 29 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) Noting Date 2/28/2014, (Yurchak, Reed)
February 4, 2014 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Joel B. Ard filed by Defendants Chad Rudkin, Elizabeth Rudkin re #27 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Ard, Joel)
February 4, 2014 Filing 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Chad Rudkin, Elizabeth Rudkin. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/28/2014, (Ard, Joel)
November 25, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE of Automatic Stay ; filed by Defendants Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC, Hunts Point Ventures, Inc, Chad Rudkin, Elizabeth Rudkin. (Ard, Joel)
October 10, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Reed Anthony Yurchak for Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert from 10/14/2013 to 10/23/2013. (Yurchak, Reed)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *14 days*. Jury Trial is set for 1/12/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 10/11/2013, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/16/2014, Motions due by 8/15/2014, Discovery completed by 9/15/2014, Dispositive motions due by 10/14/2014, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 11/28/2014, Motions in Limine due by 12/15/2014, Pretrial Order due by 12/31/2014, Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/7/2015, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/7/2015, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
September 9, 2013 Filing 23 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 14.. (Yurchak, Reed)
September 9, 2013 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC, Hunts Point Ventures, Inc. (Ard, Joel)
September 3, 2013 Filing 21 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert.(Yurchak, Reed)
September 3, 2013 Filing 20 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant John Du Wors.(Ferguson, A)
August 20, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rylan L. S. Weythman on behalf of Defendants Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC, Hunts Point Ventures, Inc, Chad Rudkin, Elizabeth Rudkin. (Weythman, Rylan)
August 14, 2013 Filing 18 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by John Du Wors.(Ferguson, A)
August 6, 2013 Filing 17 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by Chad Rudkin, Elizabeth Rudkin.(Ard, Joel)
August 6, 2013 Filing 16 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC, Hunts Point Ventures, Inc.(Ard, Joel)
July 24, 2013 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Does, John Du Wors, Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC, Hunts Point Ventures, Inc, Chad Rudkin, Elizabeth Rudkin with JURY DEMAND, filed by Jennifer P Schweickert.(Yurchak, Reed)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Stipulated Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(TF)
July 19, 2013 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/19/2013, (Yurchak, Reed)
July 12, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney A Janay Ferguson on behalf of Defendant John Du Wors. (Ferguson, A)
July 2, 2013 Reset Deadlines: At request of parties, deadlines continued 60 days:FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/27/2013, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/3/2013, Joint Status Report due by 9/10/2013. (LC)
June 26, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sam Breazeale Franklin on behalf of Defendants Amber Du Wors, John Du Wors. (Franklin, Sam)
June 5, 2013 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Kristen Niemann on 5/16/2013, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert. (Yurchak, Reed)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 7/9/2013, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/25/2013, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/2/2013. (LC)
May 28, 2013 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER denying #5 Motion for Default as moot, by William M. McCool, Clerk of Court.(LC)
May 24, 2013 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC, Hunts Point Ventures, Inc.(Ard, Joel)
May 24, 2013 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chad Rudkin, Elizabeth Rudkin.(Ard, Joel)
May 22, 2013 Filing 5 MOTION for Default (Entry of) by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/22/2013, (Yurchak, Reed)
May 5, 2013 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Chad and Elizabeth Rudkin on 4/20/2013, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer P Schweickert. (Yurchak, Reed)
April 30, 2013 Filing 3 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC on 4/16/2013; Hunts Point Ventures, Inc on 4/16/2013 (RS)
April 16, 2013 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to defendants Amber Du Wors, John Du Wors, Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC, Hunts Point Ventures, Inc, Chad Rudkin, Elizabeth Rudkin. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MKB)
April 16, 2013 Judge Ricardo S Martinez added. (MKB)
April 15, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-3177083), filed by Jennifer P Schweickert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Yurchak, Reed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schweickert v. Hunts Point Ventures, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Joyce P. Schweickert
Represented By: Thomas J Degan, Jr
Represented By: T. Jeffrey Keane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Rudkin
Represented By: Joel B Ard
Represented By: Rylan L. S. Weythman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Du Wors
Represented By: Pamela J DeVet
Represented By: Sam Breazeale Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Rudkin
Represented By: Joel B Ard
Represented By: Rylan L. S. Weythman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunts Point Venture Group, LLC
Represented By: Joel B Ard
Represented By: Rylan L. S. Weythman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunts Point Ventures, Inc
Represented By: Joel B Ard
Represented By: Rylan L. S. Weythman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Allyson Janay Ferguson
Represented By: Pamela J DeVet
Represented By: Sam Breazeale Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer P Schweickert
Represented By: Brandon P. Wayman
Represented By: Reed Anthony Yurchak
Represented By: Mark D Kimball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Cascade Capital Group LLC
Represented By: Stephanie R Lakinski
Represented By: Diana Kay Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?