Coinlab, Inc v. Mt. Gox KK et al
Plaintiff: Coinlab Inc
Defendant: Mt Gox KK and Tibanne KK
Case Number: 2:2013cv00777
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 154 STATUS REPORT on Progress of Defendant's Bankruptcy Proceedings by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc, Counter Defendant Coinlab Inc (Sargent, Edgar)
December 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/16/2020. (RM)
December 13, 2019 Filing 153 STATUS REPORT On Progress of Defendants' Bankruptcy Proceedings by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc, Counter Defendant Coinlab Inc (Sargent, Edgar)
August 15, 2019 Filing 152 STATUS REPORT On Progress of Defendants' Bankruptcy Proceedings by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc, Counter Defendant Coinlab Inc (Sargent, Edgar)
August 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/16/2019, (RM)
April 12, 2019 Filing 151 STATUS REPORT On Progress of Defendants' Bankruptcy Proceedings by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc, Counter Defendant Coinlab Inc (Sargent, Edgar)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MINUTE ORDER: It has come to the Court's attention that the Standing Order, Dkt. No. #137 , refers to the local rules for the Western District of Pennsylvania in the second paragraph on the first page of the order. This is an error. The relevant language should read: "These practice standards supplement the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington." Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) Copy to Tibanne KK
December 13, 2018 Filing 149 STATUS REPORT On Progress of Defendants Bankruptcy Proceedings by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sargent, Edgar)
August 15, 2018 Filing 148 STATUS REPORT on Progress of Defendants' Bankruptcy Proceedings by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sargent, Edgar)
August 1, 2018 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Melanie L Mayer on behalf of Defendant Mt Gox KK, Counter Claimant Mt Gox KK. (Mayer, Melanie)
August 1, 2018 Filing 146 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Annasara Purcell for Defendant Mt Gox KK, Counter Claimant Mt Gox KK. (Mayer, Melanie)
April 17, 2018 Filing 145 STATUS REPORT on Progress of Defendants' Bankruptcy Proceedings by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc (Sargent, Edgar)
December 18, 2017 Filing 144 STATUS REPORT on Progress of Defendants' Bankruptcy Proceedings by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc (Sargent, Edgar)
August 30, 2017 Filing 143 STATUS REPORT on Progress of Defendants' Bankruptcy Proceedings by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc (Sargent, Edgar)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MINUTE ORDER directing parties to file a status report in accordance with stay order by no later than September 5, 2017. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (PM) Modified on 8/29/2017: copy sent to Tibanne KK via the U.S. Mail (PM).
April 27, 2017 Filing 141 STATUS REPORT on Progress of Defendants' Bankruptcy Proceedings by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc (Townsend, Roger)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTE ORDER directing parties to file a status report by 5/5/17 by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RS) Modified on 4/27/2017/cc Tibanne KK (RS).
January 18, 2017 Filing 139 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Bradley T. Meissner for Defendant Mt Gox KK, Counter Claimant Mt Gox KK. (Purcell, Annasara)
January 18, 2017 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Annasara Purcell on behalf of Defendant Mt Gox KK, Counter Claimant Mt Gox KK. (Purcell, Annasara)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STANDING ORDER CIVIL CASES by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) Copy to Tibanne KK.
September 27, 2016 Filing 136 STATUS REPORT on Progress of Tibanne Bankruptcy Proceedings by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc (Sargent, Edgar)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C13-00777BJR. Cc to BJR. by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM) Copy to Tibanne KK.
July 19, 2016 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bradley T. Meissner on behalf of Defendant Mt Gox KK, Counter Claimant Mt Gox KK. (Meissner, Bradley)
July 19, 2016 Filing 133 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Brian D Buckley for Defendant Mt Gox KK, Counter Claimant Mt Gox KK. (Buckley, Brian)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MINUTE ORDER notifying the parties that on 9/1/2016, this case will be reassigned to Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)Copy mailed to Tibanne KK.
May 23, 2016 Filing 131 STATUS REPORT on Progress of MtGox and Tibanne's Bankruptcy Proceedings by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc (Sargent, Edgar)
February 1, 2016 Filing 130 STATUS REPORT on Progress of Tibanne Bankruptcy Proceedings by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc (Sargent, Edgar)
October 5, 2015 Filing 129 STATUS REPORT on Progress of Defendants' Bankruptcy Proceedings by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc (Townsend, Roger)
July 14, 2015 Filing 128 STATUS REPORT on Progress of Tibannes Bankruptcy Proceedings by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc (Sargent, Edgar)
March 20, 2015 Filing 127 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #123 Order Staying Case addressed to Tibanne KK (MD)
March 3, 2015 Filing 126 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #120 Order to Show Cause, addressed to Tibanne KK (MD)
February 24, 2015 Filing 125 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #117 Minute Order addressed to Tibanne KK (MD)
February 9, 2015 Filing 124 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #113 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, addressed to Tibanne KK (MD)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER STAYING CASE - The Parties are ORDERED to file a status report on the progress of Tibannes bankruptcy proceedings every 120 days from the date of this Order, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD, cc to Deft Tibanne KK)
February 5, 2015 Filing 122 NOTICE of Written Order From Bankruptcy Court re #121 Notice-Other ; filed by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sargent, Edgar)
February 4, 2015 Filing 121 NOTICE OF CHAPTER 15 PROCEEDING AND CONSENT TO ENTRY OF STAY re #62 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Stay, Case Stayed ; filed by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sargent, Edgar)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this case against Tibanne KK should not be stayed pending resolution of the foreign bankruptcy proceedings. Plaintiff should submit briefing of no more than six (6) pages, on or before February 5th, 2015, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD, cc to Deft Tibanne KK)
February 2, 2015 Filing 119 NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Townsend, Roger)
January 30, 2015 Filing 118 DECLARATION Confirming Service of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order on Defendnat Tibanne KK of Roger Townsend by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Townsend, Roger)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MINUTE ORDER - re: #114 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Coinlab Inc., by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD, cc to Deft Tibanne KK)
January 29, 2015 Filing 116 DECLARATION of Peter Vessenes filed by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc re #114 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Townsend, Roger)
January 29, 2015 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Roger Townsend filed by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc re #114 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Townsend, Roger)
January 29, 2015 Filing 114 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/29/2015, (Townsend, Roger)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #110 Defendant Tibanne KK's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric N Macey; Kevin Edward Regan; Lance D. Reich; Richard G Douglass and Amanda Hinkley terminated, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD, mailed copy of order to Deft Tibanne KK)
December 10, 2014 Filing 112 DECLARATION of Lance D. Reich filed by Counter Claimant Tibanne KK, Defendant Tibanne KK re #110 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Reich, Lance)
December 10, 2014 Filing 111 DECLARATION of Eric N. Macey filed by Counter Claimant Tibanne KK, Defendant Tibanne KK re #110 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Reich, Lance)
December 10, 2014 Filing 110 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Counter Claimant Tibanne KK, Defendant Tibanne KK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/26/2014, (Reich, Lance)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *2-10 DAY* Jury Trial is set for 7/20/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joinder of Parties due by 1/2/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 1/12/2015, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/22/2014, Motions due by 1/21/2015, Discovery completed by 2/20/2015, Defendant Tibanne is encouraged to file a summary judgment motion on what it has identified as a potential threshold issue, whether Coinlab was legally able to provide the services contemplated in the subject agreement. Dispositive motions due by 3/23/2015, Motions in Limine due by 6/15/2015, Pretrial Order due by 7/8/2015, Trial briefs to be submitted by 7/8/2015, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 7/8/2015, Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2015 at 03:30 PM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
November 14, 2014 Filing 108 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: plf: 10; def 2-4. (Townsend, Roger)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTE ORDER: The parties are directed to file an updated Joint Status Report no later than 11/14/2014. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #97 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Stay, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
September 19, 2014 Filing 105 DECLARATION of Plaintiff's Counsel filed by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc, Counter Defendant Coinlab Inc re #97 MOTION for Relief from Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Transcript), #2 Exhibit B (Transcript), #3 Exhibit C (Press Interview))(Townsend, Roger)
September 19, 2014 Filing 104 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc, Counter Defendant Coinlab Inc, TO RESPONSE to #97 MOTION for Relief from Stay (Townsend, Roger)
September 16, 2014 Filing 103 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Kristin Malone for Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Sargent, Edgar)
September 15, 2014 Filing 102 DECLARATION of Mark Karpeles filed by Defendant Tibanne KK re #97 MOTION for Relief from Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Reich, Lance)
September 15, 2014 Filing 101 RESPONSE, by Defendant Tibanne KK, to #97 MOTION for Relief from Stay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Reich, Lance)
September 15, 2014 Filing 100 RESPONSE, by Defendant Mt Gox KK, Counter Claimant Mt Gox KK, to #97 MOTION for Relief from Stay. (Buckley, Brian)
September 4, 2014 Filing 99 DECLARATION of Christopher Koss filed by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc re #97 MOTION for Relief from Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Townsend, Roger)
September 4, 2014 Filing 98 DECLARATION of Roger Townsend filed by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc re #97 MOTION for Relief from Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Townsend, Roger)
September 4, 2014 Filing 97 MOTION for Relief from Stay by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/19/2014, (Townsend, Roger)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MINUTE ORDER - Counsel for Tibbanne has alerted the Court to some confusion regarding its order (Dkt. No. 91). The Court issues this minute order to provide clarification regarding that order, which stated, The Court extends the previously entered TRO (Dkt. No. 75) until the Court rules on the motion for a TRO (Dkt. No. 88.) Plaintiff withdrew its motion for a TRO on August 20, 2014. Consequently, there was no motion for the Court to rule on and the previously entered TRO (Dkt. No. 75) has lapsed, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
August 28, 2014 Filing 95 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Buckley, Brian)
August 26, 2014 Filing 94 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 8/14/2014 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Debbie Zurn, debbie_zurn@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8504. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2014, (DZ)
August 20, 2014 Filing 92 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #88 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Malone, Kristin)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman re Plaintiff's #88 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . The Court calls for a reply from Plaintiff to Defendant Tibannes response to the motion (Dkt. No. 90). The reply must be filed by noon on August 20, 2014 Pacific Time.(LMK) Modified Date on 8/19/2014 (LMK).
August 19, 2014 Filing 90 RESPONSE, by Counter Claimant Tibanne KK, Defendant Tibanne KK, to #88 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Regan, Kevin)
August 18, 2014 Filing 89 DECLARATION of Roger M. Townsend filed by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc re #88 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Townsend, Roger)
August 18, 2014 Filing 88 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/18/2014, (Townsend, Roger)
August 15, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kevin Edward Regan on behalf of Defendant Tibanne KK. (Regan, Kevin)
August 14, 2014 Filing 86 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: Roger Townsend, Jane Pearson; Def Counsel: Lance Reich; CR: Debbie Zurn; Show Cause Hearing held on 8/14/2014. Plaintiff withdrew its motion for default and will move to lift the stay to continue the TRO or convert to preliminary injunction. (RM)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER re #82 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eric N Macey for Tibanne KK, by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)). (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re #80 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Amanda Hinkley for Tibanne KK, by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)). (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re #79 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Richard G Douglass for Tibanne KK, by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)).(No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
August 11, 2014 Filing 93 Letter from Eric N. Macey w/attachments (MD)
August 11, 2014 Filing 82 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Amanda M. Hinkley Eric N. Macey FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Tibanne KK (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3699992 (Reich, Lance) Modified PHV Applicant's Name on 8/12/2014 (DS).
August 11, 2014 Filing 81 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc, to #77 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing. (Townsend, Roger)
August 11, 2014 Filing 80 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard G. Douglas Amanda M. Hinkley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Tibanne KK (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3699973 (Reich, Lance) Modified PHV Applicant's Name on 8/12/2014 (DS).
August 11, 2014 Filing 79 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eric N. Macey Richard G. Douglass FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Tibanne KK (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3699950 (Reich, Lance) Modified PHV Applicant's Name on 8/12/2014 (DS).
August 11, 2014 Filing 78 PRAECIPE to attach document (Declaration of Service) re #77 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing by Defendant Tibanne KK (Reich, Lance)
August 11, 2014 Filing 77 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing by Defendant Tibanne KK. Noting Date 8/11/2014, (Reich, Lance)
August 11, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lance D. Reich on behalf of Defendant Tibanne KK. (Reich, Lance)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Show Cause Hearing set for 8/12/2014 at 9:30 AM is continued to 8/14/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #74 Plaintiff's Motion to extend the TRO. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/12/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD) Modified on 8/5/2014 - CC to Tibanne KK Tibanne (MD).
August 4, 2014 Filing 74 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and to Lift Stay to Permit Motion for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/4/2014, (Townsend, Roger)
August 4, 2014 Filing 73 DECLARATION of Roger Townsend RE: #74 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and to Lift Stay to Permit Motion for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Townsend, Roger) Document related to correct Motion. Modified on 8/4/2014 (JKMK).
August 4, 2014 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #73 Declaration, : This document related to correct Motion #74 (JKMK)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Bond for Temporary Restraining Order BOND in the amount of $5,000.00, Bond No. SJ7709, from CBIC Insurance Company. posted by Coinlab Inc, signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. re #69 Order on Motion for TRO. (MD)
July 25, 2014 Filing 71 TRO BOND in the amount of $5,000, Bond No. SJ7709, from V. Spino Bonding Service. posted by Coinlab Inc re #69 Order on Motion for TRO,. (Townsend, Roger)
July 23, 2014 Filing 70 NOTICE of Stay and Suggestion of Bankruptcy ; filed by Defendant Mt Gox KK, Counter Claimant Mt Gox KK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Buckley, Brian)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #65 Motion for Relief from Stay and Temporary Restraining Order by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. The Temporary Restraining Order shall expire 14 days after the signature date below, unless, within such time, for good cause shown, the Order is extended, or unless, Defendant Tibanne KK consents that it should be extended for a longer period of time.(LMK)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Stipulation and Order for withdrawal and substitution of counsel for Defendant/Couterclaimant Mt. Gox KK; by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. #63 Stipulation (RM)
July 22, 2014 Attorney Louis David Peterson terminated; (RM)
July 22, 2014 Attorney Daniel G Valles terminated; (RM)
July 21, 2014 Filing 67 PRAECIPE to attach document (Exhibit 3 - Greene v MTGOX TRO) re #66 Declaration by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-Greene v. MTGOX TRO)(Townsend, Roger)
July 21, 2014 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Roger Townsend filed by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc re #65 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Relief from Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Article, #2 Exhibit 2 Excel Spreadsheet)(Townsend, Roger)
July 21, 2014 Filing 65 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Relief from Stay by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Relief from Stay and TRO) Noting Date 7/21/2014, (Townsend, Roger)
July 21, 2014 Filing 64 MOTION Default by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order of Default) Noting Date 7/21/2014, (Townsend, Roger)
May 29, 2014 Filing 63 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel for Defendant/Counterclaimant Mt. Gox KK by parties. (Buckley, Brian)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER - granting #41 Defendants' Motion to Stay; Case stayed. Striking #38 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD, mailed copy of order to deft Tibanne KK)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER - no attorney has appeared in this matter as new counsel for Tibanne and it appears to be represented by Mark Karpeles. Karpelese cannot represent the corporation as a pro se litigant. Corporations and other legally cognizable entities cannot represent themselves in federal court Local Civil Rule 83.2(b)(3). Defendant Tibanne must obtain an attorney admitted to practice in this District within 30 days from the entry of this order or face sanctions, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD, mailed copy of order to deft Tibanne KK)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying #47 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal. The Court DENIES the motion and orders the clerk to unseal Exhibits 3, 4, 5, 6 of the Kristin Malone Declaration (Dkt. No. 49), by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (Exhibits Unsealed)(MD) Modified on 4/30/2014 -mailed copy to deft Tibanne KK(MD).
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re #52 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Exhibit 11 Attached to the Declaration of Tod L. Gamlen in Support of MtGox KK's Motion to Stay Entire Action and Proposed Order filed by Mt Gox KK, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD, mailed copy of order to Tibanne KK)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #44 Agreed Motion to Continue the expert disclosure deadline, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD) Modified on 4/10/2014-mailed copy of order to Tibanne KK (MD).
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Louis David Peterson; Daniel G Valles; Tod L Gamlen and Joseph B. Genster terminated; by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD, mailed copy of order to Pro Se Deft Tibanne KK)
April 4, 2014 Filing 56 RESPONSE, by Defendant Mt Gox KK, Counter Claimant Mt Gox KK, to #47 MOTION to Seal . (Gamlen, Tod)
April 4, 2014 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Tod L. Gamlen in Support of Mt. Gox KK's Reply filed by Defendant Mt Gox KK, Counter Claimant Mt Gox KK re #41 MOTION to Stay Entire Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13)(Gamlen, Tod)
April 4, 2014 Filing 54 REPLY, filed by Defendant Mt Gox KK, Counter Claimant Mt Gox KK, TO RESPONSE to #41 MOTION to Stay Entire Action (Gamlen, Tod)
April 3, 2014 Filing 53 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc, TO RESPONSE to #38 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Townsend, #2 Declaration of Kristin Malone, #3 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of Kristin Malone, #4 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of Kristin Malone, #5 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of Kristin Malone, #6 Exhibit 4 to Decl. of Kristin Malone, #7 Exhibit 5 to Decl. of Kristin Malone, #8 Exhibit 6 to Decl. of Kristin Malone, #9 Exhibit 7 to Decl. of Kristin Malone, #10 Exhibit 8 to Decl. of Kristin Malone)(Malone, Kristin)
April 3, 2014 Filing 52 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Seal Exhibit 11 Attached to the Declaration of Tod L. Gamlen in Support of MtGox KK's Motion to Stay Entire Action and Proposed Order by Defendant Mt Gox KK, Counter Claimant Mt Gox KK. Noting Date 4/3/2014, (Gamlen, Tod) Modified on 4/4/2014 (MD).
April 2, 2014 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Counter Claimant Tibanne KK, Defendant Tibanne KK re #39 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Tibanne KK as to Tod L. Gamlen and Daniel Valles of Baker & McKenzie LLP and Louis D. Peterson and Joseph B. Genster of Hillis, Clark Martin & Peterson PS . (Gamlen, Tod)
April 1, 2014 Filing 50 PRAECIPE to attach document to Substitute Exhibit 11 Attached to the Declaration of Tod L. Gamlen in Support of Mt. Gox KK's Motion to Stay Entire Action Per LCR 7(m) re #42 Declaration, by Defendant Mt Gox KK, Counter Claimant Mt Gox KK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11)(Gamlen, Tod)
April 1, 2014 Noting Date Set/Reset re #47 MOTION to Seal : In accordance with the local rules, the noting date is reset. Noting Date 4/11/2014. (SH)
March 31, 2014 Filing 49 UNREDACTED SEALED/ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY ENTIRE ACTION #47 MOTION to Seal , #41 MOTION to Stay Entire Action, by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc - PER ORDER DATED 4/15/14 ALL EXHIBITS 3,4,5,6 ARE UNSEALED - (Attachments: #1 Ex. 3 to Decl. of Kristin Malone, #2 Ex. 4 to Decl. of Kristin Malone, #3 Ex. 5 to Decl. of Kristin Malone, #4 Ex. 6 to Decl. of Kristin Malone)(Godfrey-Eccles, Lindsey) Modified on 4/15/2014 (MD). Modified on 4/15/2014 (MD).
March 31, 2014 Filing 48 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc, to #41 MOTION to Stay Entire Action. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristin Malone, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 5 - Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 6 - Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 7)(Godfrey-Eccles, Lindsey)
March 31, 2014 Filing 47 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/31/2014, (Godfrey-Eccles, Lindsey)
March 31, 2014 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Tod L. Gamlen in Opposition to Plaintiff CoinLab's Motion to Compel filed by Defendant Tibanne KK re #38 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gamlen, Tod)
March 31, 2014 Filing 45 RESPONSE, by Defendant Tibanne KK, to #38 MOTION to Compel . (Gamlen, Tod)
March 28, 2014 Filing 44 Agreed MOTION to Continue EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINE by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sargent, Edgar)
March 20, 2014 Filing 43 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #41 MOTION to Stay Entire Action, by Counter Claimant Tibanne KK, Defendant Tibanne KK. (Gamlen, Tod)
March 20, 2014 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Tod L. Gamlen filed by Defendant Mt Gox KK, Counter Claimant Mt Gox KK re #41 MOTION to Stay Entire Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5A, #6 Exhibit 5B, #7 Exhibit 5C, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 SEALED PER COUNSEL Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12)(Gamlen, Tod) Modified on 4/1/2014 (MD).
March 20, 2014 Filing 41 MOTION to Stay Entire Action by Defendant Mt Gox KK, Counter Claimant Mt Gox KK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/4/2014, (Gamlen, Tod)
March 20, 2014 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Tod L. Gamlen filed by Counter Claimant Tibanne KK, Defendant Tibanne KK re #39 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Tibanne KK as to Tod L. Gamlen and Daniel Valles of Baker & McKenzie LLP and Louis D. Peterson and Joseph B. Genster of Hillis, Clark Martin & Peterson PS (Gamlen, Tod)
March 20, 2014 Filing 39 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Tibanne KK as to Tod L. Gamlen and Daniel Valles of Baker & McKenzie LLP and Louis D. Peterson and Joseph B. Genster of Hillis, Clark Martin & Peterson PS by Counter Claimant Tibanne KK, Defendant Tibanne KK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/4/2014, (Gamlen, Tod)
March 20, 2014 Filing 38 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF ROGER M. TOWNSEND, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6) Noting Date 4/4/2014, (Malone, Kristin)
March 18, 2014 Filing 37 NOTICE Corrected Notice of Bankruptcy Filing and Related Stay re #36 Notice-Other ; filed by Defendant Mt Gox KK, Counter Claimant Mt Gox KK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Peterson, Louis)
March 18, 2014 Filing 36 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing and Temporary Stay ; filed by Defendant Mt Gox KK, Counter Claimant Mt Gox KK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Peterson, Louis)
March 14, 2014 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristin Malone on behalf of Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Malone, Kristin)
March 11, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy AND TEMPORARY STAY by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sargent, Edgar)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Amend Stipulated Protective Order, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
January 7, 2014 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Defendants Unopposed Motion to Amend Stipulated Protective Order (Dkt. No. 26) by Defendants Mt Gox KK, Tibanne KK, Counter Claimants Mt Gox KK, Tibanne KK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/17/2014, (Peterson, Louis)
December 9, 2013 Filing 31 ANSWER to #29 Amended Complaint Answer to First Amended Complaint by Mt Gox KK, Tibanne KK.(Peterson, Louis)
December 9, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Roger M Townsend. Filed by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Townsend, Roger) Modified Address on 12/13/2013 (DS).
November 25, 2013 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Coinlab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Godfrey, Lindsey)
November 25, 2013 Filing 28 STIPULATION RE FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT by parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Godfrey, Lindsey)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Stipulated Motion regarding nonwaiver of privilege by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - Motions terminated: #25 Joint Stipulated MOTION Protective Order filed by Mt Gox KK, Tibanne KK, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
November 8, 2013 Filing 25 Joint Stipulated MOTION Protective Order by Defendants Mt Gox KK, Tibanne KK, Counter Claimants Mt Gox KK, Tibanne KK. Noting Date 11/8/2013, (Peterson, Louis)
November 8, 2013 Filing 24 Joint Stipulated MOTION and Order Regarding Nonwaiver of Privilege by Defendants Mt Gox KK, Tibanne KK, Counter Claimants Mt Gox KK, Tibanne KK. Noting Date 11/8/2013, (Peterson, Louis)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *10 DAY* Jury Trial is set for 11/3/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joinder of Parties due by 11/14/2013, Amended Pleadings due by 11/25/2013, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/7/2014, Motions due by 5/7/2014, Discovery completed by 6/6/2014, Dispositive motions due by 7/7/2014, Motions in Limine due by 9/29/2014, Pretrial Order due by 10/22/2014, Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/22/2014, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/22/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2014 at 02:30 PM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
October 10, 2013 Filing 22 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 10.. (Townsend, Roger)
October 4, 2013 Filing 21 PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER to #18 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Coinlab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Sargent, Edgar)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Stipulated Motion to extend date for submission of joint status report and discovery plan and related FRCP 26 dates. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/26/2013, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/3/2013, Joint Status Report due by 10/10/2013, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Stipulated Motion extending time to respond to complaint by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
September 10, 2013 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Coinlab Inc by Mt Gox KK, Tibanne KK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1)(Peterson, Louis)
August 30, 2013 Filing 17 Joint Stipulated MOTION and Order Extending Date for Submission of Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan and Related FRCP 26 Dates by Defendants Mt Gox KK, Tibanne KK. Noting Date 8/30/2013, (Peterson, Louis)
August 26, 2013 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION and Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendants Mt Gox KK, Tibanne KK. Noting Date 8/26/2013, (Peterson, Louis)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel G Valles for Mt Gox KK, and for Tibanne KK, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Tod L Gamlen for Mt Gox KK, and for Tibanne KK, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
August 26, 2013 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Mt. Gox Co., Ltd. for Mt Gox KK. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mt Gox KK, Tibanne KK. (Peterson, Louis)
August 26, 2013 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Tibanne Co., Ltd. for Mt Gox KK, Tibanne KK. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mt Gox KK, Tibanne KK. (Peterson, Louis)
August 26, 2013 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel G. Valles FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Mt Gox KK, Tibanne KK (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3323729. (Peterson, Louis)
August 26, 2013 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tod L. Gamlen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Mt Gox KK, Tibanne KK (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3323726. (Peterson, Louis)
August 26, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Louis David Peterson on behalf of Defendants Mt Gox KK, Tibanne KK. (Peterson, Louis)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: At the request of Plaintiff, to allow additional time for service, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 9/20/2013. All other FRCP 26-related deadlines are adjusted accordingly. Failure to adhere to these deadlines may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman (RM)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 7/15/2013, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/1/2013, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/8/2013, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
May 6, 2013 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Plaintiff Coinlab Inc. (Townsend, Roger)
May 3, 2013 Filing 5 Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) Mt Gox KK, Tibanne KK. (Attachments: #1 Summons- Tibanne KK)(RE)
May 3, 2013 NOTICE TO FILER: DOCUMENTS NOT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT: In the future please remember the Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet and the all Summons(es) should be attachments to your Complaint. Thank you.(RE)
May 3, 2013 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1 Plaintiff(s) Coinlab, Inc. must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/10/2013. (RE)
May 3, 2013 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (RE)
May 2, 2013 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Tibanne KK by Plaintiff Coinlab, Inc. (Townsend, Roger)
May 2, 2013 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Mt. Gox KK by Plaintiff Coinlab, Inc. (Townsend, Roger)
May 2, 2013 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Coinlab, Inc.. (Townsend, Roger)
May 2, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Mt. Gox KK, Tibanne KKC (Receipt # 0981-3195860), filed by Coinlab, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Townsend, Roger) Modified on 5/2/2013 (DJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coinlab, Inc v. Mt. Gox KK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coinlab Inc
Represented By: Kristin Malone
Represented By: Lindsey Godfrey Eccles
Represented By: Roger M Townsend
Represented By: Floyd G Short
Represented By: Edgar Guy Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt Gox KK
Represented By: Joseph B. Genster
Represented By: Tod L Gamlen
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Melanie L Mayer
Represented By: Annasara Purcell
Represented By: Louis David Peterson
Represented By: Daniel G Valles
Represented By: Bradley T. Meissner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tibanne KK
Represented By: Joseph B. Genster
Represented By: Kevin Edward Regan
Represented By: Tod L Gamlen
Represented By: Lance D Reich
Represented By: Eric N Macey
Represented By: Richard G Douglass
Represented By: Amanda Hinkley
Represented By: Louis David Peterson
Represented By: Daniel G Valles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?