Sierra Club Inc et al v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Sierra Club, Puget Soundkeeper Alliance, RE Sources For Sustainable Communities, Columbia Riverkeeper and Friends of the Columbia Gorge Inc
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv00967
Filed: June 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting parties' 419 Stipulated Motion to Seal and Joint Motion Requesting Dispute Resolution signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. This matter comes before the Court on the parties' stipulated response to the Court's order (Dkt. No. 417 ). Based on the parties' stipulation and the Court's previous order granting Plaintiffs' motion for attorney fees (Dkt. No. 416 ), the Court AWARDS $3,151,113.61 in attorney fees and costs to Plaintiffs. (PM)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 386 Motion for Attorney Fees. Parties ordered to submit an updated accounting of attorney fees and costs within 14 days of this order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 384 CONSENT DECREE by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (RS)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 382 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 376 Motion to quash. Plaintiffs' subpoenas issued to Beveridge & Diamond, P.C. and Yarmuth Wilsdon PLLC are QUASHED. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 373 MINUTE ORDER granting 372 parties stipulated motion for leave to file their proposed consent decree. Parties have until 3/3/17 to file their proposed consent decree. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (swt)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 369 MINUTE ORDER granting 368 joint motion for extension of time to file a consent decree. Consent decree due 2/15/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour denying Plaintiffs' 197 Motion for partial summary judgment and denying Defendant's 200 Motion for summary judgment. (PM)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting Association of American Railroads' 226 Motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief. Brief to be filed within 3 days of this order. (PM)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting Plaintiff's 163 Motion for Protective Order and denying Defendant's 167 Motion to Compel. (PM)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting in part Defendant's 88 Motion for Protective Order and granting in part Plaintiff's 93 Motion to Compel, by Judge John C Coughenour.(TM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Club Inc et al v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Daniel M Galpern
Represented By: Andrea Kathryn Rodgers Harris
Represented By: Charles M Tebbutt
Represented By: Jessica L Yarnall Loarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puget Soundkeeper Alliance
Represented By: Daniel M Galpern
Represented By: Andrea Kathryn Rodgers Harris
Represented By: Charles M Tebbutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RE Sources For Sustainable Communities
Represented By: Daniel M Galpern
Represented By: Andrea Kathryn Rodgers Harris
Represented By: Charles M Tebbutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Riverkeeper
Represented By: Daniel M Galpern
Represented By: Andrea Kathryn Rodgers Harris
Represented By: Charles M Tebbutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Columbia Gorge Inc
Represented By: Daniel M Galpern
Represented By: Andrea Kathryn Rodgers Harris
Represented By: Charles M Tebbutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Denise L Ashbaugh
Represented By: Lily N Chinn
Represented By: Richard S Davis
Represented By: W. Parker Moore
Represented By: Timothy M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?