Bank of America NA v. Mwaura et al

Plaintiff: Bank of America NA
Defendant: Anthony G Mwaura, Noelle W Gichohi, United National Title Company and Kathy Kubik
Case Number: 2:2013cv01726
Filed: September 27, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Bank of America NA against Anthony G. Mwaura and Noelle W. Gichohi by Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Defendants Anthony G. Mwaura and Noelle W. Gichohi) (VE)
January 26, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting BOA's 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying dfts' 28 Motion for Declaratory Judgment by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) Modified on 1/27/2016/cc Mwaura (RS).
August 14, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 20 Motion for Summary Judgment and motion to dismiss; denying as moot defendants' 24 Motion for Extension of Time by Judge Richard A Jones.(PM) cc: Mwaura and Gichohi
April 8, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court DENIES plaintiff's 9 motion to remand. (CL) (cc: pro-se dfts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America NA v. Mwaura et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Kathleen Anne Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony G Mwaura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noelle W Gichohi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United National Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Kubik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?