Milo & Gabby, LLC et al v. Amazon.com, Inc

Plaintiff: Milo & Gabby, LLC and Karen Keller
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc
Case Number: 2:2013cv01932
Filed: October 24, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2015 152 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION OF THE COURT by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. Court adopts the verdict of the Jury and finds that Amazon is not liable for offering to sell the alleged infringing products at issue in this matter. Judgment shall be entered in favor of Amazon. All Plaintiffs' claims against Amazon are dismissed. (PM)
October 21, 2015 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 110 Defendant's Motion in Limine by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(SSM)
September 2, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.Supplemental motion for fees and costs with documentation due by 9/16/2015. (SSM)
July 16, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part dfts' 30 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
April 11, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Part by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(MKB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milo & Gabby, LLC et al v. Amazon.com, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milo & Gabby, LLC
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Keller
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc
Represented By: Nathan C Brunette(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Brian C Park(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?