Cox et al v. Continental Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Kathryn Cox, Beverly Hawley, Richard Hawley, William Mark Smith, Nadine Smith, Cheryl Grant, Jill Ortiz, Thomas Prigmore, Satoko Prigmore, Robert Walla, Kristine Walla, Daryl Stuart, Laurel Stuart, Douglas Sundby, Cyndi Sundby, Chris Stuart, Megan Walla, Thomas Huber, David Huber, Daniel O'Neal, Patricia O'Neal, Dale Hollingsworth, Ruth Hollingsworth, Sarah Hollingsworth, Nicole Tiedeman, Derry Tiedeman, Tracy Zickuhr, Sandy Zickuhr and Zoe Zickuhr
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv02288
Filed: December 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 98 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 109 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE - striking 99 101 Motion for Summary Judgment; striking 105 Defendant's Motion to strike. The Court therefore STRIKES both motions and gives Plaintiffs leave to file a consolidated motion within the page limits within ten (10) days of this Order, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying 68 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Continental Casualty Company, & 70 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Patricia O'Neal, Laurel Stuart, Nadine Smith, Nicole Tiedeman, Satoko Prigmore, Derry Tiedeman, Sarah Hollingsworth, Tracy Zickuhr, Chris Stuart, Thomas Prigmore, Sandy Zickuhr, Dale Hollingsworth, Robert Walla, Kathryn Cox, Cheryl Grant, Kristine Walla, David Huber, Zoe Zickuhr, Ruth Hollingsworth, Thomas Huber, Jill Ortiz, Richard Hawley, Daniel O'Neal, Megan Walla, Douglas Sundby, Cyndi Sundby, Daryl Stuart, William Mark Smith, Beverly Hawley regarding 56 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Compel; by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Denying 65 Continental's motion to depose Dr. Duyzend in Seattle, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; denying 37 41 48 Motion to Compel, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox et al v. Continental Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Cox
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Hawley
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hawley
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mark Smith
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadine Smith
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Grant
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Ortiz
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Prigmore
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Satoko Prigmore
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Walla
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Walla
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Stuart
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurel Stuart
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Sundby
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyndi Sundby
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Stuart
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Walla
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Huber
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Huber
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel O'Neal
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia O'Neal
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Hollingsworth
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Hollingsworth
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Hollingsworth
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Tiedeman
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derry Tiedeman
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Zickuhr
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Zickuhr
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoe Zickuhr
Represented By: Mallory C Allen
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Stephanie Scheier Andersen
Represented By: Andres C Healy
Represented By: Stephen E Morrissey
Represented By: Justin A Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?