Northwest Environmental Advocates v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
Plaintiff: Northwest Environmental Advocates
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 2:2014cv00196
Filed: February 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION AND ORDER on Attorneys' Fees and Costs re parties' 111 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting parties' 109 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Motion Under Rule 54(d). The time for any party to file a motion under FRCP 54(d) is extended up to and including 7/31/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting parties' 107 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion Under Rule 54(d): The time for any party to file a motion under Fed. R. Civ. P.54(d) is hereby extended up to and including 6/17/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(MW)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 102 Stipulated Motion to Set New Deadline to File Motion under Rule 54(d). The deadline is extended to 5/17/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting parties' 99 Stipulated Joint Motion to Stay Deadline to File Motion Under Rule 54(d). Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting parties' 97 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline: Time for any party to file a motion under FRCP 54(d) is extended up to 1/15/2019, signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal re parties' 93 Stipulated Motion; resolving the First and Second Claims for Relief, as well as parts of the Third and Fourth Claims for Relief, raised in the First Amended Complaint, signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting parties' 94 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Voluntary Reconsideration. This case shall be stayed pending EPA's administrative reconsideration of the referenced agency actions. Plaintiff and Defendant EPA shall file a periodic joint status report with this Court every 180 days, stating any relevant changes in the case and explaining whether the stay should continue. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 91 Joint and Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 83 . Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 82 Joint Motion to amend scheduling order signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Environmental Advocates v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Environmental Advocates
Represented By: David A Bricklin
Represented By: Bryan James Telegin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Elizabeth Boucher Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?