Wilson et al v. Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Robert Wilson and Eric McNeal
Defendant: Maxim Healthcare Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2014cv00789
Filed: May 28, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2017 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 126 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
July 11, 2017 125 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Dismissal as to Seventy-one (71) Named and Opt-in Plaintiffs; re parties' 124 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 20, 2017 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re parties' 121 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss; as to named Opt-in Plaintiffs, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 19, 2017 119 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER re parties' 117 Stipulated Motion, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
December 22, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wilson
Represented By: Adam J Berger
Represented By: Rebecca Jane Roe
Represented By: Jason T Thompson(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jesse L. Young(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric McNeal
Represented By: Adam J Berger
Represented By: Rebecca Jane Roe
Represented By: Jason T Thompson(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jesse L. Young(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxim Healthcare Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?