International Franchise Association, Inc. et al v. City of Seattle, et al
Plaintiff: International Franchise Association, Inc., Charles Stempler, Katherine Lyons, Mark Lyons, Michael Park and Ronald Oh
Defendant: City of Seattle and Fred Podesta
Case Number: 2:2014cv00848
Filed: June 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Richard A. Jones denying 37 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.(VE)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 35 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Judge Richard A Jones.(LMK)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER regarding pltfs' 16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Franchise Association, Inc. et al v. City of Seattle, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Franchise Association, Inc.
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Paul D Clement(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Viet D Dinh(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David Groesbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Stempler
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Paul D Clement(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Viet D Dinh(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David Groesbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Lyons
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Paul D Clement(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Viet D Dinh(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David Groesbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Lyons
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Paul D Clement(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Viet D Dinh(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David Groesbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Park
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Paul D Clement(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Viet D Dinh(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David Groesbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Oh
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Paul D Clement(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Viet D Dinh(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David Groesbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Represented By: Parker C Folse, III
Represented By: Drew Derrick Hansen
Represented By: Gregory Colin Narver
Represented By: Justin A Nelson
Represented By: Edgar Guy Sargent
Represented By: John B Schochet
Represented By: Gary T Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Podesta
Represented By: Parker C Folse, III
Represented By: Drew Derrick Hansen
Represented By: Gregory Colin Narver
Represented By: Justin A Nelson
Represented By: Edgar Guy Sargent
Represented By: John B Schochet
Represented By: Gary T Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?