Dorsey v. United States of America

Petitioner: Devaughn Dorsey
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2014cv00938
Filed: June 24, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Petitioner's 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel; the Court appoints the Federal Public Defender to represent petition in the § 2255 proceeding, signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (SWT) (cc: Petitioner via USPS; Federal Defender via ad hoc)
January 23, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING MOTION to US Magistrate Judge Brian A. Tsuchida: Plaintiff's 30 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
January 10, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re government's 29 Motion to Stay Briefing Schedule; Briefing schedule as to petitioner's 2255 motion and motions to supplement and amend (dkts. 4 , 9 , 11 , 18 , 22 , 23 , 24 , 27 , and 28 ), is stayed, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Petitioner via USPS)
December 20, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Petitioner's 21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Arturo Menendez terminated. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(TH) (cc: Petitioner via U.S. Mail)
November 21, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESTORING CASE AND DIRECTING THE UNITED STATES TO ANSWER § 2255 PETITION signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. United States' Answer due within 45 days of this Order. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorsey v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Devaughn Dorsey
Represented By: Arturo Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Todd Greenberg
Represented By: Jill Otake
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?