Cross v. Sinclair
Petitioner: Dayva Cross
Respondent: Stephen D. Sinclair
Case Number: 2:2014cv01092
Filed: July 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re 73 Status Report. Counsel are directed to file a joint status report every six months beginning six months from the date of this order. In addition, the court ORDERS counsel to file a joint status report within 15 days of any change in the status or procedural posture of this case of which the court should be aware. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 71 Agreed Motion for Stay and Abeyance. This matter shall be stayed pending further proceedings in the Washington Supreme Court. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 69 Joint Motion for a 45-day continuance of deadlines. Petitioner to file his motions for discovery, expansion of the record, and an evidentiary hearing by 7/17/2017; Response due 8/18/2017; Reply due 9/8/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ON ISSUES RAISED AT STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge James L. Robart. The court ORDERS the following schedule for Mr. Cross's motion for discovery, expansion of the record, and an evidentiary hearing: (1) Mr. Cross's motion is due no la ter than 9/30/2016; (2) Mr. Holbrook's response is due no later than 10/31/2016; and (3) Mr. Cross's reply is due no later than 11/14/2016. In addition, the court ORDERS Mr. Holbrook to produce transcripts of the state court proceedings at issue for September 8, 2000, February 12, 2001, and March 13, 19, and 20, 2001. In addition, the court ORDERS Mr. Holbrook to produce the court reporters original notes underlying the transcripts. Finally, if for any reason, Mr. Holbrook is unable to comply with this order within 30 days, the court ORDERS counsel for Mr. Holbrook to immediately notify the court and file a declaration stating his reasons for noncompliance. (AD)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying petitioner's 30 Motion for Stay of Proceedings by Judge James L. Robart. (AD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross v. Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dayva Cross
Represented By: Todd Maybrown(Designation CJA Appointment)
Represented By: Peter Offenbecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen D. Sinclair
Represented By: John Joseph Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?