September 6, 2023 |
Filing
1047
ORDER re: Good Cause Exception. The Court ORDERS Defendants to continue to track good cause exceptions as it has before the revisions to RCW 10.77.068(5) went into effect and to request reductions for in-jail competency evaluation fines only where the extension was granted in full compliance with the Injunction. The Court ORDERS Defendants to provide further information concerning the 161 good cause exceptions by no later than 9/15/2023. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
August 16, 2023 |
Filing
1040
MINUTE ORDER: In addition to the topics outlined in the Order to Show Cause (Dkt. No. 1038 ), the Court would like the Parties to brief whether, notwithstanding the pending appeal, the Court and the Court Monitor have jurisdiction over the matters o rdered in Paragraph 33(i) and 33(j) of the Breach and Contempt Order (Dkt. No. 1009 at 51). The Parties must address this issue in their responses to the Order to Show Cause. Responses to this issue are in addition to, and not in lieu of, the responses that remain due under the Order to Show Cause. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
August 15, 2023 |
Filing
1038
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court issues this Order to Show Cause sua sponte in light of the pending appeal Defendants have filed. (Dkt. No. 1029 .) The Court ORDERS the Parties to file briefs responding to this Order's concerns of no more than 8 pages that shall be due by 8/30/2023. No responses or replies shall be filed unless ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
August 14, 2023 |
Filing
1034
ORDER granting Parties' 1002 Joint Motion for Approval of the Phase Three Implementation Plan. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
July 24, 2023 |
Filing
1020
ORDER granting Defendants' 1003 Motion for Waiver of Interest Due Under Docket Nos. 664 and 665 . The Court permits payments of the principal amounts due without interest. Payment should be made promptly within two weeks of etnry of this Order. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LH)
|
July 18, 2023 |
Filing
1012
ORDER for Briefing on Proposed Judgment. The Court ORDERS the following briefing schedule: (1) Defendants shall file a brief of no more than 12 pages due within 14 days of this Order; (2) Plaintiffs shall file a response brief of no more than 12 pages due 14 days after Defendants file their brief; and (3) Defendants shall file a reply brief of no more than 6 pages due 7 days after the response is filed. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
July 7, 2023 |
Filing
1009
ORDER granting in part Plaintiffs' 938 Motion for Contempt signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(IJM)
|
July 6, 2023 |
Filing
1008
ORDER granting Parties' 1006 Stipulated Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendants shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, pay to Plaintiffs' counsel the sum of $227,146.20 in fees. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MJV)
|
April 13, 2023 |
Filing
985
ORDER granting Parties' 984 Joint Motion for Extension of Quarterly Status Report Deadline. The deadline to file the Quarterly Status Report shall be extended to 5/15/2023. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
April 3, 2023 |
Filing
983
MINUTE ORDER: The Court is aware that the Parties intended to update the Court on the implementation progress of the Settlement Agreement by presenting evidence at the evidentiary hearing set for last week. (See Dkt. No. 974 at 5.) Unfortunately, t hat hearing was canceled and will be rescheduled for a later date. To ensure the Court remains informed of implementation progress, the Court ORDERS the Parties to file a Quarterly Status Report concerning the Settlement Agreement by no later than 4/28/2023. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
March 24, 2023 |
Filing
979
ORDER granting Parties' 975 Stipulated Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendants shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, pay to Plaintiffs' counsel the sum of $126,816.40 in fees and $463.73 in costs, for a grand total of $127,280.13. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
February 8, 2023 |
Filing
968
ORDER granting Parties' 966 Stipulated Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Defendants shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, pay to Plaintiffs' counsel the sum of $57,642.20 in fees. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
January 25, 2023 |
Filing
956
ORDER granting 950 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. The Court will accept the amicus brief as filed (Dkt. No. 950 -1). The Parties may file responses to the amicus brief by no later than 1/27/2023. And the Amici Counties may file a reply by no later than 2/3/2023. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
January 6, 2023 |
Filing
941
ORDER granting Parties' 940 Stipulated MOTION Seeking Additional Two Days to Respond to Plaintiffs' 938 Motion for Material Breach and Civil Contempt. The Department is granted leave to file its response on 1/11/2023. Plaintiffs' reply brief shall be filed no later than 1/16/2023. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SB)
|
December 20, 2022 |
Filing
937
ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 936 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs. The Court permits Plaintiffs to file a brief of no more than 27 pages. Defendants may file a response to Plaintiffs' substantive motion of no more than 27 pages, and Plaintiffs may file a reply of no more than 12 pages. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
October 31, 2022 |
Filing
931
ORDER granting Parties' 929 Stipulated Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Defendants shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, pay to Plaintiffs' counsel the sum of $89,106.10 in fees. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
September 22, 2022 |
Filing
926
ORDER re: Overpayment of Funds in Court's Registry. Pursuant to the Judgment dated 9/14/2022, Defendants were required to make a payment of $1,101,000.00 into the Court's Registry. Defendants instead remitted a check for $1,117,50 0.00. This resulted in an overpayment of $16,500.00. Accordingly, the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to disburse $16,500.00 in the form a check to the Department of Social and Health Services for the State of Washington to remedy this overpayment. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB) (cc: finance)
|
August 12, 2022 |
Filing
918
ORDER granting Parties' 916 Joint Stipulated MOTION to Distribute Contempt Funds. The Clerk of this Court shall disburse $200,000.00 to the Seattle Foundation for payment of their 6/29/2022 invoice number 15647. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB) (cc: finance)
|
June 21, 2022 |
Filing
910
ORDER granting Parties' 908 Stipulated Motion for Attorney Fees. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, pay to Plaintiffs' counsel the sum of $86,600.30 in fees. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
May 26, 2022 |
Filing
902
ORDER denying Defendants' 892 Motion for Additional Time. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
March 25, 2022 |
Filing
897
MINUTE ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on the Joint Request to Defer Ruling on Defendants' pending Motion for Additional Time. (Dkt. No. 896 .) Having reviewed the Joint Request, the Court hereby informs the parties that it will set a hearing on Defendants' Motion for Additional Time. (Dkt. No. 892 .) The Court GRANTS the Parties' request that the Defendants' reply be deferred until after the hearing. (Dkt. No. 896 n.1.) No reply shall be filed unless the Court so orders. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
March 17, 2022 |
Filing
891
ORDER granting Parties' 889 Stipulated Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendants shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, pay to Plaintiffs' counsel the sum of $88,019.50 in fees. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
December 14, 2021 |
Filing
877
ORDER re Parties' 875 Stipulated Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendants shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, pay to Plaintiffs' counsel the sum of $76,414.60 in fees. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
December 13, 2021 |
Filing
874
MINUTE ORDER. The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' Stipulated Motion for Attorneys' Fees. (Dkt. No. 872 .) Having reviewed the Motion and supporting materials, the Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to provide clarification as to whether the following time entries in Mr. Carney's records are duplicative and should be removed: (1) 8/16/2021 - two entries of 1:12 for "Review misdemeanor restoration data, team emails"; and (2) 8/19/2021 - two entries of :24 for "Arrest diversion s takeholder emails." If counsel believes this time should be included, counsel shall provide further explanation as to why the time entries are not duplicative. Plaintiffs must file their response to this Minute Order within 7 days of its entry. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
November 10, 2021 |
Filing
869
ORDER granting Parties' 868 Joint MOTION for Relief from Spokane Facility Reporting Obligations. The State shall be relieved from any further reporting obligations under the Court's 8/16/2021 Order at Dkt. No. 850 . Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
|
November 2, 2021 |
Filing
867
ORDER granting Parties' 865 Joint Stipulated MOTION to Distribute Contempt Funds. the Clerk of this Court shall disburse $100,000.00 to the Seattle Foundation for payment of their 10/13/2021 invoice number 15602. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB) (cc: finance)
|
October 8, 2021 |
Filing
861
ORDER granting Parties' 859 Stipulated Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendants shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, pay to Plaintiffs' counsel the sum of $121,207.20 in fees. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB) (cc: Finance)
|
September 7, 2021 |
Filing
853
ORDER granting the Parties' 852 Joint Stipulated Motion Seeking to Increase the Court Monitor's Hourly Fee. The Department shall pay the Monitor at the new hourly rate of $350, for services rendered on or after July 1, 2021, and shall continue to reimburse her for reasonable and necessary expenses incurred in the discharge of her duties and responsibilities under this Court's Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law at Dkt. No. 144 . Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(PM)
|
August 16, 2021 |
Filing
850
ORDER granting Defendants' 839 Stipulated Motion Seeking Additional Time for Construction of 16-Bed Crisis Stabilization Facility in Spokane. The Court extends the completion date of the facility to October 15, 2021. The State is ordered to provide a monthly report by the 10th day of each month (or the next judicial day) (see order for details). Within 14 days of entry of this Order, the Court further ORDERS the State to provide additional information about the increased funding to Frontier, including how much money was awarded, the terms of the award, and how long the funds are expected to sustain these diversion services. Additionally, the State must also report on whether and how these services will continue once the 16-bed facility is opened. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(PM)
|
July 26, 2021 |
Filing
846
ORDER granting the parties' 844 Stipulated Motion to Distribute Contempt Funds for Diversion Programming. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court shall disburse $22,266,172 to theSeattle Foundation to fund these diversion programs. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: finance
|
June 23, 2021 |
Filing
837
ORDER granting the Parties' 835 Stipulated Motion for Attorney Fees' and Costs. Defendants shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, pay to Plaintiffs' counsel the sum of $136,407.30 in fees. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
|
April 6, 2021 |
Filing
825
ORDER granting Parties 823 Stipulated Motion to Extend the Time to Complete Crisis Intervention Training. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Department shall be allowed one additional year to complete the 40-hour Crisis Intervention Trainings contemplated by the Contempt Settlement Agreement and Final Phase One Implementation Plan in this matter. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SR)
|
April 5, 2021 |
Filing
822
ORDER granting the Parties' 820 Stipulated Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, pay to Plaintiffs' counsel the sum of $133,512.30 in fees. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
|
February 8, 2021 |
Filing
809
ORDER granting the Parties' 807 Stipulated Motion to Distribute Contempt Funds. It is ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court shall disburse $200,000.00 to the Seattle Foundation for payment of their December 31, 2020 invoice number 1555 1. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court is authorized and directed to draw a check on the funds deposited in the registry of the Court in the principal amount of $200,000.00 minus any statutory users fees, payable to the Seattle Foundation, by check which will be mailed or delivered to same at 1601 5th Avenue, Suite 1900, Seattle, WA 98010. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(PM) cc: finance
|
December 14, 2020 |
Filing
796
ORDER granting Parties' 794 Stipulated Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Defendants shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, pay to Plaintiffs' counsel the sum of $85,232.80 in fees and $178.26 in costs. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
|
August 31, 2020 |
Filing
780
ORDER granting Parties' 778 Stipulated Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendants shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, pay to Plaintiffs' counsel the sum of $160,289.60 in fees. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LH)
|
August 20, 2020 |
Filing
776
ORDER granting Parties' 773 Stipulated Motion to File Documents Under Seal. It is hereby ordered that Inpatient Evaluation Data Report (Dkt. 775 ) filed by the Defendants shall remain under seal. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LH)
|
July 10, 2020 |
Filing
764
ORDER granting the Parties' 762 Stipulated Motion to Distribute Contempt Funds. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court shall disburse $150,000.00 to the Seattle Foundation for payment of their December 31, 2019 invoice number 15473. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(LH)(CC: Finance)
|
May 21, 2020 |
Filing
752
ORDER granting Defendants' 743 Motion Seeking Additional Time for Ward Construction at Western and Eastern State Hospitals. It is ordered that the Department shall be allowed additional time to complete the renovation of four forensic wards at Eastern and Western State Hospitals. The Department is directed to submit a report to the Court on the 1st and 15th of each month, or the next judicial day following these dates. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(PM)
|
May 8, 2020 |
Filing
745
ORDER granting parties' 740 Stipulated Motion to Distribute Contempt Funds for Diversion Programming. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court shall disburse $4,349,077 to the Seattle Foundation to fund these diversion programs. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: finance
|
April 22, 2020 |
Filing
739
ORDER granting Parties' 737 Stipulated Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall, within ten days of the date of this order, pay to Plaintiffs' counsel the sum of $302,822.70 in fees, and $2,087.46 in costs, for a total of $304,910.16. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
|
February 12, 2020 |
Filing
728
ORDER granting parties' 726 Stipulated Motion to Expend Remaining Jumpstart Funds signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
|
December 17, 2019 |
Filing
716
ORDER granting Parties' 713 Stipulated Motion to Distribute Contempt Funds for Diversion Programming. The Clerk of this Court is authorized and directed to draw a check on the funds deposited in the registry of the Court in the principal amount of $7,728,071 minus any statutory users fees, payable to the Seattle Foundation. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
|
November 22, 2019 |
Filing
711
JUDGMENT is entered against Defendants for a total of $120,750. This total is due and payable into the Registry of the Court, to be kept in the Registry until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: finance
|
November 14, 2019 |
Filing
707
ORDER granting Parties' 705 Stipulated Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Defendants shall, within ten days of the date of this order, pay to Plaintiffs' counsel the sum of $149,287.50 in attorney's fees, and $1,193.38 in costs, for a total of $150,480.88. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
|
October 31, 2019 |
Filing
704
ORDER granting Parties' 702 Joint Stipulated Motion to Distribute Contempt Funds for the final costs associated with the renovation of Building 27. It is ordered that the Clerk of this Court is authorized and directed to draw a check on the fu nds deposited in the registry of the Court in the principal amount of Five Hundred and Ninety Seven Thousand Five Hundred and Eleven Dollars and Sixty One Cents ($597,511.61) minus any statutory users fees, payable to the Seattle Foundation. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: finance
|
October 22, 2019 |
Filing
700
ORDER granting parties' 687 Stipulated Motion to Distribute Contempt Funds. It is ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court shall disburse $625,475.00 to the Seattle Foundation. The Seattle Foundation shall disburse the funds pursuant to a contracts entered into with Plaintiffs and Defendants. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: finance
|
October 1, 2019 |
Filing
697
ORDER approving Final Implementation Plan (Dkt. 679 -1). Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)
|
August 9, 2019 |
Filing
684
ORDER granting parties' 682 Stipulated Motion to Distribute Contempt Funds for Diversion Programming. The Clerk of this Court is authorized and directed to draw a check on the funds deposited in the registry of the Court in the principal amount of $5,146,333.50 minus any statutory users fees. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: finance
|
May 28, 2019 |
Filing
675
ORDER granting 673 Stipulated Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall, within ten days of the date of this order, pay to Plaintiffs' counsel the sum of $260,531.50 in attorney's fees, and $868.25 in costs, for a total of $261,339.75. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
|
April 30, 2019 |
Filing
669
ORDER granting 666 Stipulated Motion to Disburse Contempt Funds for Bed Flow Analysis. The Clerk of this Court shall disburse $214,993.02 to the TriWest Group LLC to fund the Bed Flow Analysis. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: finance
|
April 17, 2019 |
Filing
662
ORDER granting 659 Stipulated Motion to Distribute Contempt Funds for Settlement Activities - Crisis Intervention Training. The Clerk of this Court is authorized and directed to draw a check on the funds deposited in the registry of the Court in the principal amount of $82,425 minus any statutory users fees, payable to the Seattle Foundation. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: finance
|
February 21, 2019 |
Filing
652
ORDER granting 650 Stipulated Motion to Distribute Contempt Funds for Settlement Activities. The Clerk of this Court is authorized and directed to draw a check on the funds deposited in the registry of the Court in the principal amount of One Million Sixty-Four Thousand Seven Hundred and Thirty-Eight Dollars ($1,064,738) minus any statutory users fees, payable to the Seattle Foundation. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: finance
|
January 24, 2019 |
Filing
644
ORDER amending December contempt judgment re parties' 643 Motion. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)
|
January 3, 2019 |
Filing
639
ORDER granting Parties' 633 Stipulated Motion. It is ordered that the 635 report filed by the Defendants containing the name and personally identifiable protected health information of a specific class member shall be sealed. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
|
December 18, 2018 |
Filing
631
ORDER granting parties' 625 Stipulated Motion to Distribute Contempt Funds for increased costs in the renovation to Building 27. The Clerk of this Court is authorized and directed to draw a check on the funds deposited in the registry of the Court in the principal amount of Five Hundred and Nine Thousand Six Hundred and Thirty Eight Dollars ($509,638) minus any statutory users fees, payable to the Seattle Foundation. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: finance
|
December 4, 2018 |
Filing
615
ORDER granting parties' 607 Stipulated Motion to Distribute Contempt Funds. Clerk of this Court is authorized and directed to draw a check on the funds deposited in the registry of the Court in the principal amount of. $380,765.00 minus any statutory users fees. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
|
November 8, 2018 |
Filing
604
ORDER granting the parties' 602 Stipulated Motion to Distribute Contempt Funds. The Clerk of this Court shall disburse $150,000.00 to the Seattle Foundation for payment of their October 2, 2018 invoice number 15366. It is further o rdered that the Clerk of this Court is authorized and directed to draw a check on the funds deposited in the registry of the Court in the principal amount of $150,000.00 minus any statutory users fees, payable to the Seattle Foundation. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: finance
|
November 1, 2018 |
Filing
601
ORDER for Preliminary Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement re parties' 599 Stipulated Motion: Fairness Hearing set for 12/11/2018 at 10:30 AM; Written comments or objections due no later than 11/30/2018; Written notice of intent to appear due by 11/30/2018; Motion for Final Approval of Amended Agreement due no later than 11/30/2018. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)
|
October 9, 2018 |
Filing
596
ORDER granting the parties' 593 Joint Stipulated Motion to Distribute Contempt Funds for increased costs in the renovations to Building 27. The Clerk of this Court shall disburse Eight Hundred and Thirty One Thousand One Hundred and Ninety-Three Dollars ($831, 193) to the Seattle Foundation for increased costs in the renovations to Building 27, as described the Parties Joint Stipulated Motion to Distribute Contempt Funds. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: finance
|
October 4, 2018 |
Filing
595
ORDER granting parties' 591 Stipulated Motion for Attorney Fees signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
|
July 18, 2018 |
Filing
579
ORDER granting parties' 575 Stipulated Motion to Distribute Contempt Funds; authorizing and directing the Clerk to draw a check on the funds deposited in the registry of this Court. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT) (cc: Financial)
|
June 19, 2018 |
Filing
569
ORDER granting parties' 563 Stipulated Motion TO DISTRIBUTE CONTEMPT FUNDS signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
|
June 15, 2018 |
Filing
566
ORDER RE: PAYMENT OF KING COUNTRY SUPERIOR COURT INVOICE signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. By agreement of the parties and this Court, IT IS ORDERED that payment of the invoice is APPROVED; the clerk is authorized and directed to draw a check on the funds deposited in the registry of this court in the principal amount of $3,047.98, payable to King County Superior Court. (PM) cc: finance
|
March 28, 2018 |
Filing
554
ORDER granting 550 Stipulated Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Defendants shall, within ten days of the date of this order, pay to Plaintiffs' counsel the sum of $444,473,46. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
|
March 22, 2018 |
Filing
552
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 548 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
|
March 16, 2018 |
Filing
547
ORDER granting parties' 542 Stipulated Motion to Approve Facilitator signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
|
March 9, 2018 |
Filing
544
ORDER granting 540 Stipulated Motion to Distribute Contempt Funds for Diversion Programming. The Clerk of this Court shall disburse $6,922,381 to the Seattle Foundation to fund the diversion programs. It is further ordered that the Clerk of t his Court is authorized and directed to draw a check on the funds deposited in the registry of the Court in the principal amount of $6,922,381 minus any statutory users fees, payable to the Seattle Foundation. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: finance
|
February 6, 2018 |
Filing
536
MINUTE ORDER striking Plaintiffs' 452 Third Motion for Civil Contempt; striking Plaintiffs' 458 Motion for Civil Contempt Regarding YCRC, per parties' Stipulation. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
|
November 27, 2017 |
Filing
520
ORDER granting Stipulated Motion to Distribute Contempt Funds for Diversion Programming. The Clerk of this Court is authorized and directed to draw a check on the funds deposited in the registry of the Court in the principal amount of $4,556,540.50 minus any statutory users fees, payable to the Seattle Foundation. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: finance
|
October 30, 2017 |
Filing
511
ORDER re: 508 Stipulated Motion To Distribute Contempt Funds. It is ordered that the Clerk of this Court shall disburse $50,000.00 to the Seattle Foundation for payment of their September 20, 2017 invoice number 15257. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: finance
|
October 26, 2017 |
Filing
507
MINUTE ORDER. The Court, having received and reviewed the Declaration of Emily Cooper regarding the Stipulated Phase III Diversion Request for Production (Dkt. No. 499 ), indicates its approval of that document and directs the parties to proceed. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
|
October 19, 2017 |
Filing
506
ORDER on Plaintiff's 427 Second Motion for Civil Contempt: Jail-based Evaluations; Court will hold a further hearing on Tuesday, November 21, 2017 at 9 a.m. for the Director of DSHS and a representative of the Governor's Office to appear and report on the Departments progress in person, signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)
|
October 17, 2017 |
Filing
503
MINUTE ORDER re: telephone conference held 10/17/2017. The hearing scheduled for October 19, 2017 will be STRICKEN. The Court will issue an order on the Motion for Contempt re: In-Jail Evaluations (Dkt. No. 427 ); the remaining and currently undecided motions for contempt (Dkt. Nos. 452 and 458 ) will be stayed pending the outcome of the parties' negotiations. Status Report due by 11/2/2017. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
|
August 30, 2017 |
Filing
463
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 430 Third Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. The Court awards Plaintiffs their lodestar amount (minus the deductions describe supra) of $1,108,351.50 in attorney's fees; The Court also awards Plaintiffs litigation costs (subject to the reduction previously detailed) of $8270.45 for a total award of $1,116,621.95. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
|
June 9, 2017 |
Filing
421
ORDER granting 419 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Diversion Providers' Grant; time extended to 18 months; Clerk to disburse $1,126,257 to the Seattle Foundation to fund the extension of these diversion programs consistent with the previous order. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: financial deputy
|
June 5, 2017 |
Filing
418
ORDER RE: JUNE 2017 STATUS HEARING; Status Review Hearing set for 8/11/2017 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RS)
|
April 26, 2017 |
Filing
408
ORDER adopting in part 389 Stipulated Mediated Settlement Agreement by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RS)
|
April 19, 2017 |
Filing
403
ORDER ON REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL CLARIFICATION AND GUIDANCE; Defendants' proposal to be submitted to plaintiffs and Court Monitor by 5/12/17; Court Monitor and plaintiffs to submit comments to defendants by 5/19/17; by 6/2/17 parties to file with Court their plans; Status Hearing set for 6/5/2017 at 9am by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RS)
|
March 7, 2017 |
Filing
382
MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file a response to Defendants' 379 Motion for Clarification or Reconsideration. Response due 3/13/2017. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
|
February 21, 2017 |
Filing
374
ORDER EXPANDING COURT MONITOR AUTHORITY AND RESPONSIBILITIES by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RS)
|
October 13, 2016 |
Filing
332
ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman granting Plaintiffs' 310 Second Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs. The Court awards Plaintiffs their requested lodestar amount of $1,267,769.10 in attorney's fees. The Court also awards Plaintiffs their litigation costs (subject to the reductions previously detailed in the original order on attorneys' fees and not contested here) for a total costs award of $35,400.38. (PM)
|
October 6, 2016 |
Filing
329
ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman granting the parties' 321 Stipulated Motion for Extension for Compliance Deadline. The deadlines set in this Court's Order at Dkt. 303 are extended to correspond with the dates in the Parties Stipulated Motion for Extension of Deadline (Dkt. 321 ). (PM)
|
August 19, 2016 |
Filing
308
ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman denying Defendants' 288 Motion to Reconsider Injunction Regarding Timing of Services and Inpatient Evaluations. (AD)
|
August 17, 2016 |
Filing
307
ORDER ON MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER OF CIVIL CONTEMPT by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. The Court GRANTS Defendants' 298 Motion as to the transcription error in finding of fact three but DENIES the Motion on all other grounds. (PM)
|
August 15, 2016 |
Filing
303
ORDER MODIFYING PERMANENT INJUNCTION AS TO IN JAIL COMPETENCY EVALUATIONS by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (AD)
|
July 7, 2016 |
Filing
289
ORDER OF CIVIL CONTEMPT by Judge Marsha J. Pechman granting Plaintiffs' Motions for Contempt [ 240] 254 . The Court hereby holds Defendants in contempt, and imposes monetary sanctions in order to compel compliance with its orders. (PM) cc: financial deputy
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing
263
ORDER granting plaintiffs' 244 Motion for TRO by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RS)
|
April 2, 2015 |
Filing
131
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
|
December 22, 2014 |
Filing
104
ORDER granting 87 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
|