Abraham Ghorbanian v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Abraham Ghorbanian, D.D.S
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America and Does
Case Number: 2:2014cv01396
Filed: September 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying defendants' 102 Motion for Protective Order by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying defendants' 81 Motion for Spoliation Sanctions by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER on joint stipulation re completing the deposition of third party Moshen Haghighatpourr DDS following the discovery cutoff by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 77 Motion to Amend Complaint and File a Second Amended Complaint; Plaintiff shall file with the Court his Second Amended Complaint, as proposed at Dkt. # 77 -1, Ex. C, no later than three (3) business days from the date of this Order. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Ricardo S Martinez re 86 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time re Noting Date and Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Noting date on Defendants' 81 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation Including Dismissal is continued to April 14, 2017. (swt)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Compel by Chief Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(SSM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abraham Ghorbanian v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Ghorbanian, D.D.S
Represented By: Michael B Horrow
Represented By: John A Worgul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Sean P Nalty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Sean P Nalty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?