Clark v. Golden Specialty
Plaintiff: Paul Clark
Defendant: Golden Specialty
Case Number: 2:2014cv01412
Filed: September 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 147 Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER denying defendants' 142 Motion for New Trial by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 144 Motion to Amend the Judgment to Order Reinstatement, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (AD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Golden Specialty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Specialty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Clark
Represented By: Stephani Lynne Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?