North Seattle Health Center Corp v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Ins Co
Plaintiff: North Seattle Health Center Corp
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company and Northbrook Indemnity Company
Thirdparty_defendant: Daehyun Choi, Hyun Joo Kwan, Bestway Chiropractic Clinic Corporation, DRDC Corporation, Inc. and Good Care Spine Clinic Corporation
Case Number: 2:2014cv01680
Filed: October 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart rescheduling the Show Cause Hearing for 5/18/2017 at 03:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart. The court orders Allstate to provide Mr. Choi and Ms. Kwan with notice that the 5/1/2017 hearing has been rescheduled to 5/18/2017, at 3:00 p.m. (PM) cc: pro se parties by USPS
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, as to Mr. Choi and Ms. Kwan, why the court should not hold them in civil contempt; ORDER denying Defendants' 69 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; ORDER reserving ruling as to Defendants' 66 MOTION for Contempt and re-noting motion to 5/1/2017; ORDER setting hearing for 5/1/2017 at 03:00 PM, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc pro se parties via USPS)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge James L. Robart. The court GRANTS Allstate's 49 Motion for Default Judgment, but with adjustments to Allstate's asserted damages and fees as described herein. (AD) Modified on 4/26/2016 cc pro se parties (AD).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Seattle Health Center Corp v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Ins Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Seattle Health Center Corp
Represented By: Justin G Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Represented By: Jonathan R Missen
Represented By: Kimberly Larsen Rider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Represented By: Jonathan R Missen
Represented By: Kimberly Larsen Rider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Represented By: Jonathan R Missen
Represented By: Kimberly Larsen Rider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Represented By: Jonathan R Missen
Represented By: Kimberly Larsen Rider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Northbrook Indemnity Company
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Represented By: Jonathan R Missen
Represented By: Kimberly Larsen Rider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Daehyun Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Hyun Joo Kwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Bestway Chiropractic Clinic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: DRDC Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Good Care Spine Clinic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?