Haury's Auto Body et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co. et al
Plaintiff: Haury's Auto Body, Inc doing business as Haury's Lake City Collision, Center Collision, LLC, Collision Masters, LLC, Eurotech Bodywerkes, Inc., Accurate Auto Body, Inc., Paramount Centre, Inc. and Prostar Collision, LLC
Defendant: Unitrin Auto & Home Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, First National Insurance Company of America, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Progressive Max Insurance Company and American Family Insurance Group
Case Number: 2:2014cv01723
Filed: November 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2014 NOTICE FROM USDC, FLORIDA MIDDLE DISTRICT: Case transferred from Washington Western has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 6:14-cv-06015, filed 12/03/2014.(RS)
December 2, 2014 Filing 13 MDL 2557 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 4); in re Auto Body Shop Antitrust; Middle District of Florida, Orlando; assigned to Judge Gregory A. Presnell. (RS)
December 2, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Paul M Veillon. Filed by Plaintiffs Accurate Auto Body, Inc., Center Collision, LLC, Collision Masters, LLC, Eurotech Bodywerkes, Inc., Haury's Auto Body, Inc., Paramount Centre, Inc., Prostar Collision, LLC. (Veillon, Paul) Modified Law Firm for Attorney Paul M. Veillon on 12/3/2014 (DS).
December 2, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Paul M Veillon on behalf of Plaintiffs Accurate Auto Body, Inc., Center Collision, LLC, Collision Masters, LLC, Eurotech Bodywerkes, Inc., Haury's Auto Body, Inc., Paramount Centre, Inc., Prostar Collision, LLC. (Veillon, Paul)
December 1, 2014 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Englund, Rudy)
December 1, 2014 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Englund, Rudy)
November 25, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rudy Albert Englund on behalf of Defendants State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Englund, Rudy)
November 24, 2014 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Farmers Insurance Company of Washington (Jarrett, Aric)
November 24, 2014 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay by Defendant Farmers Insurance Company of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/12/2014, (Jarrett, Aric)
November 24, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in Middle District of Florida, case number in other court MDL 2557 ; filed by Defendant Farmers Insurance Company of Washington. (Jarrett, Aric)
November 24, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Aric Hamilton Jarrett on behalf of Defendant Farmers Insurance Company of Washington. (Jarrett, Aric)
November 10, 2014 Filing 3 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs Accurate Auto Body, Inc., Center Collision, LLC, Collision Masters, LLC, Eurotech Bodywerkes, Inc., Haury's Auto Body, Inc., Paramount Centre, Inc., Prostar Collision, LLC (Moore, Joseph)
November 10, 2014 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, Notice to Filer ; filed by Plaintiffs Accurate Auto Body, Inc., Center Collision, LLC, Collision Masters, LLC, Eurotech Bodywerkes, Inc., Haury's Auto Body, Inc., Paramount Centre, Inc., Prostar Collision, LLC. (Moore, Joseph)
November 10, 2014 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1 Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/17/2014, (ST)
November 10, 2014 NOTICE TO FILER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3(a), a Civil Cover Sheet is required at the time of filing a case. Please file this by using the event Civil Cover Sheet found under Other Documents. Thank you. (ST)
November 10, 2014 NOTICE TO FILER: In the future, when opening a new case, please do not enter party names in all caps. Thank you. (ST)
November 10, 2014 Judge Richard A Jones added. (ST)
November 7, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s). (Receipt # 0981-3804247) Attorney Joseph W Moore added to party Accurate Auto Body, Inc., Center Collision, LLC, Collision Masters, LLC, Eurotech Bodywerkes, Inc., Haury's Auto Body, Paramount Centre, Inc., Prostar Collision, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Moore, Joseph) Modified on 11/10/2014 (ST).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haury's Auto Body et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unitrin Auto & Home Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Rudy Albert Englund
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company of Washington
Represented By: Aric Hamilton Jarrett
Represented By: Timothy W. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Classic Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Rudy Albert Englund
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Max Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haury's Auto Body, Inc doing business as Haury's Lake City Collision
Represented By: Joseph W Moore
Represented By: Paul M Veillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center Collision, LLC
Represented By: Joseph W Moore
Represented By: Paul M Veillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collision Masters, LLC
Represented By: Joseph W Moore
Represented By: Paul M Veillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eurotech Bodywerkes, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph W Moore
Represented By: Paul M Veillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accurate Auto Body, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy A. Bearb
Represented By: Joseph W Moore
Represented By: Paul M Veillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Centre, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph W Moore
Represented By: Paul M Veillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prostar Collision, LLC
Represented By: Joseph W Moore
Represented By: Paul M Veillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?