Quest Integrity USA, LLC v. A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC
Plaintiff: Quest Integrity USA, LLC
Defendant: A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv01971
Filed: December 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Filing 247 MANDATE of the Federal Circuit (18-1002) as to #235 Notice of Appeal filed by Quest Integrity USA, LLC. The parties jointly move to voluntarily dismiss the above-captioned appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), with each side bearing its own fees and costs. Upon consideration thereof, IT IS ORDERED THAT: The motion is granted. (GT)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER granting parties' #244 Joint Motion to Vacate and Dismiss; vacating #230 Summary Judgment Order, and #233 Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b). This action, including all claims and counterclaims, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (SWT)
April 29, 2019 Filing 245 PRAECIPE re #244 Joint MOTION to Vacate #230 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #233 Judgment and Dismiss by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendants Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Grady, Douglas)
April 25, 2019 Filing 244 Joint MOTION to Vacate #230 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #233 Judgment and Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/25/2019, (Grady, Douglas)
April 16, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per #243 Order of the FEDERAL CIRCUIT and #242 Order on Motion to Vacate (TH)
April 16, 2019 Case reopened/ remanded per #243 ORDER of the FEDERAL CIRCUIT (CDA)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER of the FEDERAL CIRCUIT (NOT THE MANDATE 18-1002 ) as to #235 Notice of Appeal filed by Quest Integrity USA, LLC. The parties jointly move to remand this matter for the limited purposes of allowing the district court to vacate the summary judgment order and the final judgment and dis-miss the action with prejudice. Upon consideration thereof, IT IS ORDERED THAT: (1) The motion is granted. (2) The parties shall file a joint status report within 30 days of the date of this Order. (CDA)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #241 Motion to Vacate and Dismiss. The Court vacate the Summary Judgment and Final Judgment Orders and dismiss the action, if the Federal Circuit remands for that purpose. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
February 15, 2019 Filing 241 JOINT MOTION to Vacate and Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/15/2019, (Grady, Douglas)
February 11, 2019 Filing 240 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Intero Integrity Services B.V., Other Affiliate Intero Integrity Services US LLC for A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC (Terwilliger, Molly)
October 22, 2018 ***Add/Terminate Attorneys: The parties' #239 Stipulated MOTION for the Termination of One Law Office and the Appearance of a New Law Office is granted. The law office of Foster Pepper PLLC and the following seven current or former Foster Pepper PLLC attorneys of record are terminated from the representation of Quest Integrity USA LLC: (1) Richard Thomas Black; (2) Madeline Dupar Hepler; (3) Benjamin J Hodges; (4) Emily Rose Kelly; (5) Cristofer Ivan Leffler; (6) John Ray Nelson; and (7) John Paul Zahner. The law office of Baker & Hostetler LLP and its attorney Douglas Anderson Grady (formerly of Foster Pepper PLLC) shall be the sole representative of Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (VE)
October 19, 2018 Filing 239 Stipulated MOTION for the Termination of One Law Office, and the Appearance of a New Law Office, filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendants Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLCS Stipulated Motion for the Termination of One Law Office, and the Appearance of a New Law Office) Noting Date 10/19/2018, (Grady, Douglas)
October 15, 2018 Filing 238 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Douglas Anderson Grady. Filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendants Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Grady, Douglas) Changed Firm Contact Info for Attorney Douglas Grady on 10/16/2018 (DS).
March 2, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re Appeal Notification Form, #237 Appeal Number from USCA, : docket entries were stricken as they were incorrectly filed/noted in this case. (CDA)
March 1, 2018 Filing 237 PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR/INCORRECT CASE NOTICE OF DOCKETING from the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit - Case Number 18-1634 for #235 Notice of Appeal filed by Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (CDA) Modified on 3/2/2018 to strike as this was filed in wrong case (CDA). Modified on 3/2/2018 (CDA).
February 28, 2018 PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR/INCORRECT CASE APPEAL NOTIFICATION packet sent to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #235 Notice of Appeal (CDA) Modified on 3/2/2018 to strike as this was filed in wrong case (CDA).
October 2, 2017 Filing 236 NOTICE OF DOCKETING from US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (18-1002) re #235 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (CDA)
September 29, 2017 APPEAL NOTIFICATION documents transmitted to the FEDERAL CIRCUIT re #235 Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit. (CDA)
September 20, 2017 Filing 235 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Federal Circuit re #230 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #233 Judgment by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. Filing Fee $505, Receipt number 0981-5024668. (Grady, Douglas)
September 5, 2017 Filing 234 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. E-mailed to the US Patent Office. (SWT)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 (VACATED per #246 Order) FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 54(b) by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS) Modified docket text on 5/10/2019 (SWT).
August 15, 2017 Filing 232 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER (Final Judgment) Pursuant to Rule 54(b) by parties (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terwilliger, Molly)
August 7, 2017 Filing 231 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Terwilliger, Molly)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 (VACATED per #246 Order) ORDER denying as moot A.Hak's #215 Motion to Compel; granting A.Hak's #226 Motion for Summary Judgment; parties to submit JSR within 7 days signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) Modified docket text on 5/10/2019 (SWT).
June 16, 2017 Filing 229 REPLY, filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #226 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Collateral Estoppel (Terwilliger, Molly)
June 12, 2017 Filing 228 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC, to #226 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Collateral Estoppel. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grady, Douglas)
May 25, 2017 Filing 227 DECLARATION of Jeffrey J. Phillips filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #226 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Collateral Estoppel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Terwilliger, Molly)
May 25, 2017 Filing 226 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Collateral Estoppel, filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/16/2017, (Terwilliger, Molly)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER on status reports by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS)
April 25, 2017 Filing 224 STATUS REPORT AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC (Terwilliger, Molly)
April 25, 2017 Filing 223 BRIEF Setting Forth Quests Position As To The Current State Of This Matter And Proposal To Stay by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Hodges, Benjamin)
March 3, 2017 Filing 222 DECLARATION of Sesha Kalapatapu filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #215 MOTION to Compel (Terwilliger, Molly)
March 3, 2017 Filing 221 REPLY, filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #215 MOTION to Compel (Terwilliger, Molly)
March 1, 2017 Filing 220 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Diana S Breaux on behalf of Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Breaux, Diana)
February 27, 2017 Filing 219 DECLARATION of Ben Hodges re #218 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendants Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Hodges, Benjamin)
February 27, 2017 Filing 218 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendants Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Quest Integrity USA, LLC, to #215 MOTION to Compel . (Hodges, Benjamin)
February 21, 2017 Filing 217 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Cristofer Ivan Leffler for Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendants Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Leffler, Cristofer)
February 10, 2017 Filing 216 DECLARATION of Molly A. Terwilliger filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #215 MOTION to Compel (Terwilliger, Molly)
February 10, 2017 Filing 215 MOTION to Compel , filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/3/2017, (Terwilliger, Molly)
February 10, 2017 Filing 214 RESPONSIVE BRIEF (Plaintiff's Responsive Claim Construction Brief) re #203 Brief - Opening by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Grady, Douglas)
February 10, 2017 Filing 213 RESPONSIVE BRIEF (Defendant's Responsive Claim Construction Brief) re #204 Brief - Opening by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Terwilliger, Molly)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting #197 Defendant's Motion to Seal by Judge Richard A Jones.(SSM)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting #206 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal by Judge Richard A Jones. Quest shall publicly file redacted versions of the pleadings.(SSM)
January 24, 2017 Filing 210 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney John Paul Zahner for Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendants Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Zahner, John)
January 20, 2017 Filing 209 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit D to Hepler Declaration by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #206 MOTION to Seal Claim Construction Exhibits, #204 Brief - Opening, #205 Declaration (non motion), (Grady, Douglas)
January 20, 2017 Filing 208 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit C to Hepler Declaration by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #206 MOTION to Seal Claim Construction Exhibits, #204 Brief - Opening, #205 Declaration (non motion), (Grady, Douglas)
January 20, 2017 Filing 207 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit B to Hepler Declaration by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #206 MOTION to Seal Claim Construction Exhibits, #204 Brief - Opening, #205 Declaration (non motion), (Grady, Douglas)
January 20, 2017 Filing 206 MOTION to Seal Claim Construction Exhibits, filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ben Hodges, #2 Exhibit B - Redacted, #3 Exhibit C - Redacted, #4 Exhibit D - Redacted, #5 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/20/2017, (Grady, Douglas)
January 20, 2017 Filing 205 DECLARATION of Madeline D. Hepler re #204 Brief - Opening by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit B, C, D, #6 Exhibit E)(Grady, Douglas)
January 20, 2017 Filing 204 OPENING BRIEF (Claim Construction) by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Grady, Douglas)
January 20, 2017 Filing 203 OPENING BRIEF (Defendant's Opening Claim Construction Brief) by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - F)(Terwilliger, Molly)
January 13, 2017 Filing 202 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendants Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Quest Integrity USA, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #194 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Second Amended Counterclaims) (Grady, Douglas)
January 13, 2017 Filing 201 STATEMENT Joint Claim Construction And Prehearing Statement by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendants Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hodges, Benjamin)
January 13, 2017 Filing 200 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Emily Rose Kelly for Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendants Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Kelly, Emily)
January 13, 2017 Filing 199 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Madeline Dupar Hepler on behalf of Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendants Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Hepler, Madeline)
January 11, 2017 Filing 198 UNREDACTED SEALED #196 Response to Motion, by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC (Terwilliger, Molly)
January 11, 2017 Filing 197 MOTION to Seal , filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/20/2017, (Terwilliger, Molly)
January 9, 2017 Filing 196 RESPONSE, by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, to #194 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Second Amended Counterclaims). Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terwilliger, Molly)
December 7, 2016 Noting Date Set/Reset re #194 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Second Amended Counterclaims) : Noting Date 1/13/2017, (RS)
December 6, 2016 Filing 195 NOTICE OF MOTION RENOTED re #194 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Second Amended Counterclaims), #192 Stipulated MOTION to Extend the Deadline to Answer/Respond to the Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims ; filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Hodges, Benjamin)
December 1, 2016 Filing 194 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Second Amended Counterclaims) by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/23/2016, (Grady, Douglas)
November 17, 2016 Pursuant to the parties' #192 Stipulated MOTION to Extend the Deadline to Answer/Respond to the Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims, the deadline for Quest Integrity USA, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the Defendant's #189 Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims is extended to 12/1/2016. Defendant's opposition, if any, is due no earlier than 1/9/2017, and Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due 1/13/2017. Any noting dates set by any parties shall not be inconsistent with this briefing schedule. (VE)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones granting Plaintiff's #168 Motion to Retain Confidentiality. (AD)
November 10, 2016 Filing 192 Stipulated MOTION to Extend the Deadline to Answer/Respond to the Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/10/2016, (Hodges, Benjamin)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting Defendant's #187 Motion for Permission to File Documents Under Seal by Judge Richard A Jones. (AD)
October 27, 2016 Filing 190 UNREDACTED SEALED #189 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC (Terwilliger, Molly)
October 27, 2016 Filing 189 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (SECOND AMENDED ANSWER) with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC by A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC.(Terwilliger, Molly)
October 27, 2016 Filing 188 DECLARATION of Sesha Kalapatapu filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #187 MOTION to Seal (Terwilliger, Molly)
October 27, 2016 Filing 187 MOTION to Seal by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/4/2016, (Terwilliger, Molly)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Quest's #142 Motion to A. Hak Industrial Services US LLC's first amended counterclaims, dismissing without prejudice A. Hak's Walker Process claims and granting A. Hak leave to amend its counterclaims within 14 days by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting Defendant's #162 Unopposed Motion to Seal Exhibits C and D to the Declaration of Jeffrey J. Phillips, by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM)
September 27, 2016 Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Cristofer Ivan Leffler on behalf of Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Leffler, Cristofer)
September 26, 2016 Filing 183 AMENDED CASE SCHEDULE entered upon the authority of Judge Richard A. Jones. Pursuant to the Court's #182 order entered this date, the parties shall comply with the following amended case schedule: Expert Witness Reports on Markman Issues due 12/23/2016, Rebuttal Expert Witness Reports on Markman Issues due 1/6/2017, Preliminary Claim Chart due 1/13/2017, Joint Claim Chart and Prehearing Statement due 1/13/2017, Parties to File Simultaneous Opening Markman Briefs by 1/20/2017, Parties to File Simultaneous Responsive Markman Briefs by 2/10/2017. Markman Hearing to be set by the Court. The Court will set a trial date and further corresponding pretrial deadlines after issuance of its claim construction ruling. (VE)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting plaintiff's #151 Motion for relief from certain deadlines; denying as moot defendant's #154 Motion defendant's to strike amended infringement contentions served without leave of court; granting plaintiff's #155 Motion for leave to amend initial infringement contentions by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
September 26, 2016 ***Motions terminated: #178 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed by Quest Integrity USA, LLC and #179 MOTION for Status Conference filed by Quest Integrity USA, LLC are terminated as MOOT. (VE)
September 23, 2016 Filing 181 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #178 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief ISO Quest's Motion for Relief from Certain Deadlines (Dkt. # 151); Motion to Amend Quests Infringement Contentions Dkt. #155), #179 MOTION for Status Conference re #151 MOTION for Relief from Certain Deadlines (Grady, Douglas)
September 22, 2016 Filing 180 RESPONSE, by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, to #178 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief ISO Quest's Motion for Relief from Certain Deadlines (Dkt. # 151); Motion to Amend Quests Infringement Contentions Dkt. #155), #179 MOTION for Status Conference re #151 MOTION for Relief from Certain Deadlines . (Terwilliger, Molly)
September 21, 2016 Filing 179 EX PARTE MOTION for Status Conference re #151 MOTION for Relief from Certain Deadlines by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. Noting Date 9/21/2016, (Grady, Douglas) Modified text on 9/22/2016 (RS).
September 20, 2016 Filing 178 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief ISO Quest's Motion for Relief from Certain Deadlines (Dkt. # 151); Motion to Amend Quests Infringement Contentions Dkt. #155) by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/20/2016, (Grady, Douglas)
September 16, 2016 Filing 177 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit C to the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #162 Unopposed MOTION to Seal (Grady, Douglas)
September 16, 2016 Filing 176 STATEMENT Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E)(Grady, Douglas)
August 26, 2016 Filing 175 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #168 MOTION To Retain Confidentiality (Grady, Douglas)
August 22, 2016 Filing 174 DECLARATION of Sesha Kalapatapu filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #168 MOTION To Retain Confidentiality (Terwilliger, Molly)
August 22, 2016 Filing 173 RESPONSE, by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, to #168 MOTION To Retain Confidentiality . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terwilliger, Molly)
August 12, 2016 Filing 172 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #155 MOTION for Leave to Amend Initial Infringement Contention (Grady, Douglas)
August 12, 2016 Filing 171 REPLY, filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #154 MOTION Strike Amended Infringement Contentions Served Without Leave of Court (Terwilliger, Molly)
August 12, 2016 Filing 170 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER (Supplemental Stipulated Protective Order Re Source Code) by parties re #90 Protective Order (Terwilliger, Molly)
August 11, 2016 Filing 169 DECLARATION of Douglas A. Grady filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #168 MOTION To Retain Confidentiality (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Grady, Douglas)
August 11, 2016 Filing 168 MOTION To Retain Confidentiality by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/26/2016, (Grady, Douglas)
August 8, 2016 Filing 167 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit D to Declaration of Jeffrey J. Phillips (Dkt. 165) by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #162 Unopposed MOTION to Seal (Terwilliger, Molly)
August 8, 2016 Filing 166 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit C to Declaration of Jeffrey J. Phillips (Dkt. 165) by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #162 Unopposed MOTION to Seal (Terwilliger, Molly)
August 8, 2016 Filing 165 DECLARATION of Jeffrey J. Phillips filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #155 MOTION for Leave to Amend Initial Infringement Contention (Terwilliger, Molly)
August 8, 2016 Filing 164 RESPONSE, by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, to #155 MOTION for Leave to Amend Initial Infringement Contention. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terwilliger, Molly)
August 8, 2016 Filing 163 DECLARATION of Adrian Chavez filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #162 Unopposed MOTION to Seal (Terwilliger, Molly)
August 8, 2016 Filing 162 Unopposed MOTION to Seal by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/19/2016, (Terwilliger, Molly)
August 8, 2016 Filing 161 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC, to #154 MOTION Strike Amended Infringement Contentions Served Without Leave of Court . (Grady, Douglas)
July 29, 2016 Filing 160 DECLARATION of Douglas A Grady filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #151 MOTION for Relief from Certain Deadlines (Grady, Douglas)
July 29, 2016 Filing 159 DECLARATION of Roderick Chalmers Hoynck Van Papendrecht filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #151 MOTION for Relief from Certain Deadlines (Grady, Douglas)
July 29, 2016 Filing 158 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #151 MOTION for Relief from Certain Deadlines (Grady, Douglas)
July 29, 2016 Noting Date Reset: #154 MOTION to Strike Amended Infringement Contentions Served Without Leave of Court is renoted for 8/12/2016, pursuant to LCR 7(d)(3). (VE)
July 28, 2016 Filing 157 DECLARATION of Douglas A Grady filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #155 MOTION for Leave to Amend Initial Infringement Contention (Grady, Douglas)
July 28, 2016 Filing 156 DECLARATION of Dr Shukri Souri filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #155 MOTION for Leave to Amend Initial Infringement Contention (Grady, Douglas)
July 28, 2016 Filing 155 MOTION for Leave to Amend Initial Infringement Contention by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/12/2016, (Grady, Douglas)
July 28, 2016 Filing 154 MOTION Strike Amended Infringement Contentions Served Without Leave of Court by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/5/2016, (Terwilliger, Molly)
July 27, 2016 Filing 153 DECLARATION of Sesha Kalapatapu filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #151 MOTION for Relief from Certain Deadlines (Terwilliger, Molly)
July 27, 2016 Filing 152 RESPONSE, by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, to #151 MOTION for Relief from Certain Deadlines. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terwilliger, Molly)
July 21, 2016 Filing 151 MOTION for Relief from Certain Deadlines by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Douglas A. Grady Esq., #3 Exhibit A, B, C, D) Noting Date 7/29/2016, (Grady, Douglas)
July 21, 2016 Filing 150 NOTICE of Quests Service of Infringement Contentions Asserting 25 New Patent Claims Following Quests Review of A.Haks Executable Code ; filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Grady, Douglas)
July 21, 2016 Filing 149 NOTICE of Concurrent Proceedings ; filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Grady, Douglas)
June 28, 2016 Filing 148 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #146 MOTION to Compel ; by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Terwilliger, Molly)
June 23, 2016 Filing 147 DECLARATION of Molly A. Terwilliger filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #146 MOTION to Compel (Terwilliger, Molly)
June 23, 2016 Filing 146 MOTION to Compel by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/8/2016, (Terwilliger, Molly)
June 17, 2016 Filing 145 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #142 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS] (Grady, Douglas)
June 13, 2016 Filing 143 RESPONSE, by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, to #142 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS]. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terwilliger, Molly)
June 7, 2016 Filing 144 LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE from M. Top-Sarneel addressed to Judge Jones (RS)
May 20, 2016 Filing 142 PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS] by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/17/2016, (Grady, Douglas) Modified on 5/23/2016 (RS).
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #139 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Judge Richard A. Jones. Attorney Sara Kelly is permitted to withdraw as attorney of record for Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US. (VE)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #126 Unopposed MOTION to Seal by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
May 6, 2016 Filing 139 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/6/2016, (Kelly, Sara)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #133 Stipulated MOTION to Extend the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Judge Richard A. Jones. Quest shall answer or otherwise respond to the Defendant's Amended Answer and Counterclaim by 5/20/2016. (VE)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #132 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time To Extend Deadlines for Markman Briefing by Judge Richard A. Jones. Expert Witness Reports on Markman issues due 07/29/2016, Rebuttal Expert Witness Reports on Markman issuesdue 08/26/2016, Joint Claim Chart and Prehearing Statement due 09/16/2016, Preliminary Claim Chart due 09/16/2016, Opening Markman Briefs due 09/30/2016, Responsive Markman Briefs due 10/14/2016. (VE)
May 5, 2016 Filing 136 Letter Rogatory issued by Judge Richard A. Jones. Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Convention of 18 March 1970 on the Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters. (VE)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #131 Stipulated MOTION For Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
May 4, 2016 Filing 134 SEALED DOCUMENT Response to Defendant's Motion to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #90 Protective Order, #126 Unopposed MOTION to Seal , #127 Declaration (Hodges, Benjamin)
May 4, 2016 Filing 133 Stipulated MOTION to Extend the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/4/2016, (Hodges, Benjamin)
April 29, 2016 Filing 132 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time To Extend Deadlines for Markman Briefing by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/29/2016, (Hodges, Benjamin)
April 29, 2016 Filing 131 Stipulated MOTION For Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for International Judicial Assistance - Taking Evidence Abroad, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/29/2016, (Hodges, Benjamin)
April 25, 2016 Filing 130 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Molly A Terwilliger. Filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Terwilliger, Molly) Modified Address of Molly A Terwilliger on 4/26/2016 (DS).
April 22, 2016 Filing 129 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint for Patent Infringement with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC by A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Kelly, Sara)
April 22, 2016 Filing 128 SEALED DOCUMENT First Amended Answer and Counterclaims of A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC to Complaint for Patent Infringement by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #126 Unopposed MOTION to Seal , #127 Declaration (Kelly, Sara)
April 22, 2016 Filing 127 DECLARATION of Sesha Kalapatapu filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #126 Unopposed MOTION to Seal (Kelly, Sara)
April 22, 2016 Filing 126 Unopposed MOTION to Seal by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/6/2016, (Kelly, Sara)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting defendant's #112 Motion for leave to amend their answer within 14 days by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Richard A. Jones. Having now ruled on Plaintiff's #93 Motion to Compel, the Court enters the following amended case schedule: Expert Witness Reports on Markman Issues due 4/29/2016; Rebuttal Expert Witness Reports on Markman Issues due 5/30/2016, Preliminary Claim Chart due 6/13/2016, Joint Claim Chart and Prehearing Statement due 6/13/2016, Parties to File Simultaneous Opening Markman Briefs by 6/27/2016, Parties to File Simultaneous Responsive Markman Briefs by 7/11/2016, Markman Hearing to be set by the Court. The Court will set a trial date and further corresponding pretrial deadlines after issuance of its claim construction ruling. (VE)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's #93 Motion to Compel Production of defendant's Source Code and a Sample Device; A.Hak is ordered to produce the requested executable code and sample device within 7 days of this Order; if any relevant source code is in A.Hak's possession or control, it must also be produced within 7 days of this Order; plaintiff's request for attorneys fees and costs is denied; plaintiff's #104 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief is granted, by Judge Richard A Jones. (AD)
February 12, 2016 Filing 122 DECLARATION of Sesha Kalapatapu in Support of Reply Brief on Motion for Leave filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #112 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Terwilliger, Molly)
February 12, 2016 Filing 121 REPLY, filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #112 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim (Terwilliger, Molly)
February 8, 2016 Filing 120 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC, to #112 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim. Oral Argument Requested. (Grady, Douglas)
February 3, 2016 Filing 119 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #116 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Contempt ; by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Grady, Douglas)
February 3, 2016 Filing 118 NOTICE of Intent to Oppose Motion for Contempt and Temporary Restraining Order re #116 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Contempt ; filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Terwilliger, Molly)
February 2, 2016 Filing 117 DECLARATION of Douglas A. Grady In Support of Quest's Motion for Contempt and for a Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #116 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Contempt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Grady, Douglas)
February 2, 2016 Filing 116 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Contempt by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/2/2016, (Grady, Douglas)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting plaintiff's #109 Motion for relief from certain deadlines by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
January 29, 2016 Filing 114 DECLARATION of Dr. Srinivasan Jagannathan (Exponent) filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #109 MOTION from two February 1, 2016 claim construction deadlines (Hodges, Benjamin)
January 29, 2016 Filing 113 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #109 MOTION from two February 1, 2016 claim construction deadlines (Hodges, Benjamin)
January 28, 2016 Filing 112 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/12/2016, (Terwilliger, Molly)
January 27, 2016 Filing 111 DECLARATION of Sesha Kalapatapu filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #109 MOTION from two February 1, 2016 claim construction deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6 to Kalapatapu Declaration)(Terwilliger, Molly)
January 27, 2016 Filing 110 RESPONSE, by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, to #109 MOTION from two February 1, 2016 claim construction deadlines . (Terwilliger, Molly)
January 21, 2016 Filing 109 MOTION from two February 1, 2016 claim construction deadlines by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/29/2016, (Hodges, Benjamin)
January 15, 2016 Filing 108 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #104 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel (Grady, Douglas)
January 11, 2016 Filing 107 RESPONSE, by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, to #104 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel. (Terwilliger, Molly)
December 23, 2015 Filing 106 SUPPLEMENT re #93 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Source Code, Executable Code and Sample Product by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grady, Douglas)
December 23, 2015 Filing 105 DECLARATION of Benjamin Hodges in Support of Quest's Motion for Leave to file a Supplemental Brief filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #104 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Complaint A)(Grady, Douglas)
December 23, 2015 Filing 104 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/15/2016, (Grady, Douglas)
December 8, 2015 Filing 103 NOTICE/MDL ORDER DENYING TRANSFER to MDL 2671 in re Quest Integrity USA (RS)
October 2, 2015 Filing 102 DECLARATION of Benjamin Hodges In Support Of Motion To Compel The Production Of Defendants Source Code And A Sample Device filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #93 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Grady, Douglas)
October 2, 2015 Filing 101 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #93 MOTION to Compel (Grady, Douglas)
September 28, 2015 Filing 100 DECLARATION of Adrian Chavez in Support of Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #93 MOTION to Compel (Terwilliger, Molly)
September 28, 2015 Filing 99 DECLARATION of Sesha Kalapatapu filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #93 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Terwilliger, Molly)
September 28, 2015 Filing 98 RESPONSE, by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, to #93 MOTION to Compel . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terwilliger, Molly)
September 18, 2015 Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BEFORE MDL PANEL re MDL 2671 in re Quest Integrity USA (RS)
September 17, 2015 Filing 97 NOTICE/CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT FOR MDL PANEL re MDL 2671 (RS)
September 17, 2015 Filing 95 EXHIBIT re #94 Declaration, by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G)(Grady, Douglas)
September 17, 2015 Filing 94 DECLARATION of Benjamin Hodges in Support of Quest's Motion to Compel the Production of Defendant's Source Code and a Sample Device filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #93 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Grady, Douglas)
September 17, 2015 Filing 93 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/2/2015, (Grady, Douglas)
September 11, 2015 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sara Kelly on behalf of Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Kelly, Sara)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
September 10, 2015 Filing 91 NOTICE/MOTION for expedited consideration filed before MDL Panel re MDL 2671 in re Quest Integrity USA (RS)
September 2, 2015 Filing 89 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 REDLINE - Model Stipulated Protective Order) Noting Date 9/2/2015, (Grady, Douglas)
August 28, 2015 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin J Hodges on behalf of Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Hodges, Benjamin)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Richard A. Jones. Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions by 9/30/2015, Deadline for joining of additional parties is 9/30/2015, Non-Infringement and Invalidity Contentions due 10/30/2015, Exchange of Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction by 11/19/2015, Exchange of Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence by 12/18/2015, Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement due 2/1/2016, Claim Construction Expert Disclosures due 2/1/2016, Completion of Claim Construction Discovery by 3/22/2016, Opening Markman Briefs due 3/28/2016, Responsive Markman Briefs due 4/12/2016, Tutorial to be set by the Court (if necessary), Markman Hearing to be set by the Court. The Court will set a trial date and further corresponding pretrial deadlines after issuance of its claim construction ruling. (VE)
August 24, 2015 Filing 86 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 10. (Grady, Douglas)
August 18, 2015 Filing 85 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney John Ray Nelson for Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Nelson, John)
August 12, 2015 Filing 84 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motions to Seal, and Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Leonard Bond NOTED on motion calendar; ; by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Grady, Douglas)
July 24, 2015 Filing 83 SEALED DOCUMENT Praecipe by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #81 Order, Terminate Motions,, #47 MOTION to Seal Unopposed, #53 Declaration,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Replacement Exhibit 5-filed under seal)(Terwilliger, Molly)
July 24, 2015 Filing 82 PRAECIPE to attach document (exhibits) re #53 Declaration,,,,,, by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Replacement Exhibit 5-redacted, #2 Replacement Exhibit 6)(Terwilliger, Molly)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Richard A. Jones. For purely administrative purposes, the court consolidates the pending motions into a single motion calendar. The pending motions (Dkt. # #36 , #42 , #47 and #65 ) are terminated, and a motion calendar is created for 5/15/2015, to correspond to the noting date of the last of those motions. (VE)
July 23, 2015 Motion Calendar: Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motions to Seal, and Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Leonard Bond is NOTED on the court's motion calendar. Noting Date is 5/15/2015. (VE)
July 23, 2015 In response to Defendant's counsel's letter #77 , Defendants may file a praecipe consisting solely of the deposition excerpts at issue and specific instructions as to which exhibits those excerpts will replace. (VE)
June 15, 2015 Filing 80 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Terwilliger, Molly)
May 15, 2015 Filing 79 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #65 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Leonard Bond (Grady, Douglas)
May 15, 2015 Filing 78 DECLARATION of Richard Roberts In Support Of Quests Motion For Permission To File Documents Under Seal (PI Opposition) filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #36 MOTION to Seal (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - The Bond Declaration, #2 Appendix B - The Compton Declaration, #3 Appendix C - The Kalpatapu Declaration)(Grady, Douglas)
May 14, 2015 Filing 77 Letter from Molly A. Terwilliger re #48 Sealed Document, seeking Court's guidance (Terwilliger, Molly)
May 11, 2015 Filing 76 RESPONSE, by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, to #65 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Leonard Bond. (Terwilliger, Molly)
May 5, 2015 Filing 75 SURREPLY filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Terwilliger, Molly)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying #64 Stipulated Motion to substitute an amended version of Dr. Bond's declaration by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
April 29, 2015 Filing 73 NOTICE of Intent to File Surreply ; filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Terwilliger, Molly)
April 28, 2015 Filing 72 Supplemental DECLARATION of Caligiuri, et al filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #36 MOTION to Seal , #42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Zahner, John)
April 28, 2015 Filing 71 UNREDACTED SEALED #67 Declaration,,, by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Grady, Douglas)
April 28, 2015 Filing 70 UNREDACTED SEALED #67 Declaration,,, by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Grady, Douglas)
April 28, 2015 Filing 69 UNREDACTED SEALED #67 Declaration,,, by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Grady, Douglas)
April 28, 2015 Filing 68 UNREDACTED SEALED #67 Declaration,,, by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Grady, Douglas)
April 28, 2015 Filing 67 DECLARATION of Richard Roberts In Support Of Quests Motion For Permission To File Documents Under Seal (Pi Reply) filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #36 MOTION to Seal , #42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B - Carter Declaration (Redacted), #3 Exhibit C - Roberts Declaration (Redacted), #4 Exhibit D - Grady Declaration (Redacted))(Grady, Douglas)
April 28, 2015 Filing 66 DECLARATION of John P. Zahner filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #65 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Leonard Bond (Grady, Douglas)
April 28, 2015 Filing 65 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Leonard Bond by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/15/2015, (Grady, Douglas)
April 28, 2015 Filing 64 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Amended Declaration of Leonard Bond by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amended Bond Declaration, #2 Exhibits 37-43 to Amended Bond Declaration, #3 Exhibits 44-49 to Amended Bond Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/28/2015, (Terwilliger, Molly)
April 20, 2015 ***Motion terminated: #63 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff's Reply and Defendant's Sur-Reply re Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Quest Integrity USA, LLC. Plaintiff may submit its reply brief in support of its motion for preliminary injunction (Dkt. #42 ) on April 28. To the extent that a surreply is permissible under the court's rules, Defendant may file it no later than May 5. (VE)
April 16, 2015 Filing 63 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff's Reply and Defendant's Sur-Reply re Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. Noting Date 4/16/2015, (Nelson, John)
April 16, 2015 Filing 62 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #60 MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to file Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction ; by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Nelson, John)
April 10, 2015 Filing 61 DECLARATION of John Ray Nelson filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #60 MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to file Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email String)(Nelson, John)
April 10, 2015 Filing 60 MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to file Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/24/2015, (Nelson, John)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER the court orders the parties that any request to seal or unseal a document in this case must be made to the undersigned judge by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS)
March 23, 2015 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #53 Declaration of Leonard Bond : Exhibits 5,6,18,18a,18b have been sealed per counsel as they contain sensitive information (RS)
March 20, 2015 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Sesha Kalapatapu filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Terwilliger, Molly)
March 20, 2015 Filing 57 ERRATA re #56 Declaration,,,, of Jeff Compton by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Errata Correct Exhibit 28 for Compton declaration)(Terwilliger, Molly)
March 20, 2015 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Jeff Compton filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3A, #4 Exhibit 3B, #5 Exhibit 3C, #6 Exhibit 3D, #7 Exhibit 4A, #8 Exhibit 4B, #9 Exhibit 4C, #10 Exhibit 4D, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 5A, #13 Exhibit 6, #14 Exhibit 7, #15 Exhibit 8, #16 Exhibit 9, #17 Exhibit 10, #18 Exhibit 11, #19 Exhibit 12, #20 Exhibit 13, #21 Exhibit 14, #22 Exhibit 15, #23 Exhibit 16, #24 Exhibit 17, pt 1, #25 Exhibit 17, pt 2, #26 Exhibit 17, pt 3, #27 Exhibit 17, pt 4, #28 Exhibit 17, pt 5, #29 Exhibit 18, #30 Exhibit 19, #31 Exhibit 20, #32 Exhibit 21, #33 Exhibit 22, #34 Exhibit 23, #35 Exhibit 24, #36 Exhibit 25, #37 Exhibit 26, #38 Exhibit 27, #39 Exhibit 28, #40 Exhibit 29, #41 Exhibit 30, #42 Exhibit 31, #43 Exhibit 32, #44 Exhibit 33, #45 Exhibit 34, #46 Exhibit 35, #47 Exhibit 36, #48 Exhibit 37, #49 Exhibit 38, #50 Exhibit 39)(Terwilliger, Molly)
March 20, 2015 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Molly A. Terwilliger in Support of Defendant's Motion for Permission to File Documents Under Seal filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #47 MOTION to Seal Unopposed (Terwilliger, Molly)
March 20, 2015 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Steven Morrison filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Terwilliger, Molly)
March 20, 2015 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Leonard Bond filed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, pt 1, #4 Ex 3, pt 2, #5 Ex 3, pt 3, #6 Ex 3, pt 4, #7 Ex 3, pt 5, #8 Ex 3, pt 6, #9 Exhibit 4a, #10 Exhibit 4b, #11 SEALED Exhibit 5, #12 SEALED Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 9a, #17 Ex 10-cover sheet, #18 Ex 11-cover sheet, #19 Ex 12a-cover sheet, #20 Ex 12b-cover sheet, #21 Ex 13-cover sheet, #22 Ex 14-cover sheet, #23 Ex 15-cover sheet, #24 Exhibit 16, #25 Ex 17-cover sheet, #26 SEALED Exhibit 18, #27 SEALED Exhibit 18a, #28 SEALED Exhibit 18b, #29 Exhibit 19, #30 Exhibit 20, #31 Exhibit 21, pt 1, #32 Exhibit 21, pt 2, #33 Exhibit 21, pt 3, #34 Exhibit 21, pt 4, #35 Exhibit 21, pt 5, #36 Exhibit 21, pt 6, #37 Exhibit 21, pt 7, #38 Exhibit 21, pt 8, #39 Exhibit 21, pt 9, #40 Exhibit 21, pt 10, #41 Exhibit 21, pt 11, #42 Exhibit 22, #43 Exhibit 23, #44 Exhibit 24, #45 Exhibit 25, #46 Exhibit 26, #47 Exhibit 27, #48 Exhibit 28, #49 Exhibit 29-cover sheet, #50 Exhibit 30, #51 Exhibit 31, #52 Exhibit 32, #53 Exhibit 33, #54 Exhibit 34, #55 Exhibit 35, #56 Exhibit 36)(Terwilliger, Molly) Modified on 3/23/2015 to reflect that certain exhibits are sealed per filer (RS).
March 20, 2015 Filing 52 RESPONSE, by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, to #42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terwilliger, Molly)
March 20, 2015 Filing 51 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Sesha Kalapatapu by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #47 MOTION to Seal Unopposed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Terwilliger, Molly)
March 20, 2015 Filing 50 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Jeff Compton by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #47 MOTION to Seal Unopposed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit 12, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 14, #6 Exhibit 16, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 22, #10 Exhibit 23, #11 Exhibit 24, #12 Exhibit 25, #13 Exhibit 26, #14 Exhibit 28, #15 Exhibit 29, #16 Exhibit 30, #17 Exhibit 31, #18 Exhibit 32, #19 Exhibit 33, #20 Exhibit 34, #21 Exhibit 35, #22 Exhibit 36, #23 Exhibit 37, #24 Exhibit 38, #25 Exhibit 39)(Terwilliger, Molly)
March 20, 2015 Filing 49 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Leonard Bond by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #47 MOTION to Seal Unopposed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 12 a, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 12 b, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 29)(Terwilliger, Molly)
March 20, 2015 Filing 48 SEALED DOCUMENT Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC re #47 MOTION to Seal Unopposed (Terwilliger, Molly)
March 20, 2015 Filing 47 MOTION to Seal Unopposed by Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/3/2015, (Terwilliger, Molly)
February 27, 2015 The court acknowledges the parties' stipulation #46 regarding briefing and discovery for Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #42 . No court action is necessary. (VE)
February 25, 2015 Filing 46 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by parties (Grady, Douglas)
February 20, 2015 Filing 45 ANSWER to #28 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of A. Hak Industrial Services US, LLC by Quest Integrity USA, LLC.(Grady, Douglas)
February 13, 2015 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Neil Ruegsegger filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Exhibit E-G, #3 Exhibit H-I)(Grady, Douglas)
February 13, 2015 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Robert D.Caligiuri and Srinivasan Jagannathan filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I, #2 Exhibit J-N)(Grady, Douglas)
February 13, 2015 Filing 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/8/2015, (Grady, Douglas)
February 12, 2015 Filing 41 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Andrew Carter In Support of Quest Integrity's Motion For Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #36 MOTION to Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-25, #2 Exhibit 26-56, #3 Exhibit 57-61, #4 Exhibit 62-80)(Grady, Douglas)
February 12, 2015 Filing 40 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Richard D. Roberts In Support of Quest Integrity's Motion For Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #36 MOTION to Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Exhibit C-P)(Grady, Douglas)
February 12, 2015 Filing 39 SEALED DOCUMENT Opening Brief In Support of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #36 MOTION to Seal (Grady, Douglas)
February 12, 2015 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Douglas A. Grady filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #36 MOTION to Seal (Grady, Douglas)
February 12, 2015 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Robert De Lorenzo filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #36 MOTION to Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Preliminary Injunction Brief with Redactions, #2 Exhibit B - Carter Declaration (Redacted) - PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION, #3 Carter Exhibits 1-29 (Redacted), #4 Carter Exhibits 30-56 (Redacted), #5 Carter Exhibits 57-60 (Redacted), #6 Carter Exhibits 61-66 (Redacted), #7 Carter Exhibits 67-80 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit C - Declaration of Richard Roberts, #9 Roberts Exhibits A-B (Redacted), #10 Roberts Exhibits C-P (Redacted))(Grady, Douglas)
February 12, 2015 Filing 36 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC, Counter Defendant Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/20/2015, (Grady, Douglas)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STANDING ORDER FOR PATENT CASES by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/12/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/19/2015, Joint Status Report due by 3/26/2015, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
February 2, 2015 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC (Terwilliger, Molly)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re #30 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeffrey J Phillips for A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, and for A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)).(No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re #29 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sesha Kalapatapu for A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, and for A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)).(No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
January 30, 2015 Filing 30 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeffrey J. Phillips FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3893639 (Terwilliger, Molly)
January 30, 2015 Filing 29 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sesha Kalapatapu FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC, Counter Claimant A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3893622 (Terwilliger, Molly)
January 30, 2015 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Patent Infringement with JURY DEMAND Attorney Molly A Terwilliger added to party A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC by A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC.(Terwilliger, Molly)
January 21, 2015 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to James Roberts on 1/9/2015, filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Grady, Douglas)
January 20, 2015 Filing 26 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #12 MOTION to Seal [RENOTED] ; by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Grady, Douglas)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER terminating #10 Motion to Seal by Judge Richard A Jones. The court TERMINATES the first of Plaintiff's duplicative motions to seal. The court orders Plaintiff to either withdraw its remaining motions by January 20, or to provide courtesy copies of all documents it has yet to provide. (VE)
January 9, 2015 Filing 24 REDACTION to #14 Sealed Document [OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION] by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Grady, Douglas)
January 9, 2015 Filing 23 REDACTION to #17 Sealed Document [Declaration of Robert D. Caligiuri and Srinivasan Jagannathan] by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit J-K, #4 Exhibit L-N)(Grady, Douglas)
January 9, 2015 Filing 22 REDACTION to #19 Sealed Document [Declaration of Richard D. Roberts] by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-P)(Grady, Douglas)
January 9, 2015 Filing 21 REDACTION to #18 Sealed Document, [Declaration of Neil Ruegsegger] by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- I)(Grady, Douglas)
January 9, 2015 Filing 20 REDACTION to #16 Sealed Document [Declaration of Andrew W. Carter] by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-14, #2 Exhibit 15-18, #3 Exhibit 19-23, #4 Exhibit 24-30, #5 Exhibit 31-49, #6 Exhibit 50-53, #7 Exhibit 54-58, #8 Exhibit 59-64, #9 Exhibit 65-80)(Grady, Douglas)
January 9, 2015 Filing 19 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Richard D. Roberts by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #12 MOTION to Seal [RENOTED] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-P)(Grady, Douglas)
January 9, 2015 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Neil Ruegsegger by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #12 MOTION to Seal [RENOTED] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Exhibit E- H, #3 Exhibit I)(Grady, Douglas)
January 9, 2015 Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Robert D. Caligiuri and Srinivasan Jagannathan by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #12 MOTION to Seal [RENOTED] (Grady, Douglas)
January 9, 2015 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Andrew Carter by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #12 MOTION to Seal [RENOTED] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-56, #2 Exhibit 57-80)(Grady, Douglas)
January 9, 2015 Filing 15 Amended Summons Issued as to defendant(s) A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (LMK)
January 9, 2015 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC re #12 MOTION to Seal [RENOTED] (Grady, Douglas)
January 9, 2015 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction) Noting Date 2/6/2015, (Grady, Douglas)
January 9, 2015 Filing 12 MOTION to Seal [RENOTED] by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Motion to Seal) Noting Date 1/23/2015, (Grady, Douglas)
January 9, 2015 Filing 11 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS AMENDED by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons Amended)(Grady, Douglas)
January 8, 2015 Filing 10 MOTION to Seal File Documents Under Seal by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/16/2015, (Grady, Douglas)
January 8, 2015 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to defendant(s) A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (LMK)
January 8, 2015 Filing 8 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Amended Summons by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons Amended Summons)(Zahner, John)
January 8, 2015 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on CT Corp for A.HAK Industrial Services US LLC on 1/8/2015, filed by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Zahner, John)
January 7, 2015 Attorney Emily Rose Kelly for Quest Integrity USA, LLC added per #5 Notice of Appearance. (LMK)
January 6, 2015 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Grady, Douglas)
January 6, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Paul Zahner on behalf of Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC. (Zahner, John)
December 30, 2014 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent. E-mailed to the US Patent Office. (Attachments: #1 Report filed by Counsel) (DJ)
December 30, 2014 Filing 3 Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC. (DJ)
December 30, 2014 Filing 2 REPORT to the Commissioner of Patents & Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,542,874 B2 by Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA LLC (Grady, Douglas)
December 30, 2014 NOTICE to Filer re #1 Complaint. The Complaint was improperly signed by Emily Rose Kelly and John Paul Zahner. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 11 and LCR 5(d), signatures must comply with Section III(L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures, which states, "An electronically filed pleading or other document which requires an attorney's signature must have the signer's name printed or typed on the line and under all signature lines." Since the abovenamed attorneys did not sign the Complaint, their names have been removed from the docket. Thank you.(DJ)
December 30, 2014 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1 Plaintiff(s) Quest Integrity USA, LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/6/2015.(DJ)
December 30, 2014 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (DJ)
December 29, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against defendant(s) AHAK Industrial Services US LLC (Receipt # 0981-3856853) Attorney Douglas Anderson Grady added to party Quest Integrity USA LLC(pty:pla), filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Grady, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quest Integrity USA, LLC v. A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quest Integrity USA, LLC
Represented By: John Ray Nelson
Represented By: Douglas Anderson Grady
Represented By: Emily Rose Kelly
Represented By: Cristofer Ivan Leffler
Represented By: Richard Thomas Black
Represented By: Madeline Dupar Hepler
Represented By: Benjamin J Hodges
Represented By: John Paul Zahner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.Hak Industrial Services US, LLC
Represented By: Diana S Breaux
Represented By: Sara Kelly
Represented By: Sesha Kalapatapu
Represented By: Jeffrey J Phillips
Represented By: Molly A Terwilliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?