Intellicheck Mobilisa, Inc. v. Wizz Systems L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Intellicheck Mobilisa, Inc.
Defendant: Wizz Systems L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00366
Filed: March 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 JOINT NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE and ORDER re parties' 110 Joint Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The parties hereby jointly stipulate to the dismissal of all asserted claims and counterclaims with prejudice in the above-styled matter. Each party herein shall bear its own attorneys' fees, costs and other expenses. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice an d without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 104 Stipulated Motion to File Over-Length Brief re IDScan's motion for summary judgment to be filed by 10/27/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 JOINT STIPULATED MOTION AND ORDER for Extension of Trial Date and Other Related Dates re parties' 101 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions. Dispositive motions due by 10/27/2017. No further extensions of the Pretrial Schedule will be made. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER for extension of discovery deadline re parties' 91 Stipulated Motion ; Discovery deadline as it pertains to depositions EXTENDED to 9/22/2017, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 85 Stipulated Motion; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 7/28/2017, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 82 Stipulated Motion to extend deadline for expert witness disclosures from 6/9/2017 to 6/12/2017, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. (AD)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting in part and denying in part dft's 21 Motion to partially dismiss the amended complaint and granting leave to amend by Judge James L. Robart.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intellicheck Mobilisa, Inc. v. Wizz Systems L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellicheck Mobilisa, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore J Angelis
Represented By: Douglas Bruce Greenswag
Represented By: Benjamin Hellerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wizz Systems L.L.C.
Represented By: Stephen R Freeland
Represented By: Donald B Scaramastra
Represented By: David Yohannan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?