Burbrink v. Campbell et al
Plaintiff: Burbrink and Judith Burbrink
Defendant: Campbell, Phyllis J. Campbell, Michelle M. Ebanks, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., Jeanne P. Jackson, Robert G. Miller, Blake W. Nordstrom, Erik B. Nordstrom, Peter E. Nordstrom, Philip G. Satre, Brad Smith, Felecia D. Thornton, B. Kevin Turner, Robert D. Walter, Alison A. Winter, Hangar Three LLC, JWB Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc., JD Plane, LLC, JW Ltd., M&B Beaver LLC, TB Plane, LLC, 247N, LLC, SDJ, LLC and Nordstrom, Inc
Case Number: 2:2015cv00377
Filed: March 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MANDATE of USCA (15-35842) as to #94 Notice of Appeal filed by Judith Burbrink. The judgment of this Court, entered May 03, 2018, takes effect this date.This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. AFFIRMED. (SG)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM of USCA (NOT THE MANDATE 15-35842) as to #94 Notice of Appeal filed by Judith Burbrink. AFFIRMED (CDA)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER of USCA (15-35842) as to #94 Notice of Appeal filed by Judith Burbrink (CDA)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 9/22/2015 before Judge John C. Coughenour.Parties have ten (10) business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nickoline Drury, nickoline_drury@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8508. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2016, (ND)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (15-35842) as to #94 Notice of Appeal filed by Judith Burbrink: Appellants optional reply brief due within 14 days of service of the response brief. (RE)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE OF APPEAL (15-35842) to Ninth Circuit re #91 Judgment by Court, #90 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Judith Burbrink. Filing Fee $505, Receipt number 0981-4210285. (Ta, Hung) Modified on 10/29/2015 to add CCA#. (RE)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER denying plaintiff's #92 Motion for Reconsideration by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (AD)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION for Reconsideration re #91 Judgment by Court, #90 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Judith Burbrink. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/2/2015, (Ta, Hung)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 JUDGMENT BY COURT Nominal dft's Rule 23.1 motion to dismiss is granted (RS)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting Nominal dft's #76 Rule 23.1 Motion to Dismiss by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour; CRD: Paul Pierson; Plaintiff's Counsel: Hung Ta & Roger Sachar; Defense Counsel: Robert Varian, Daniel Dunne, Douglas Greene & Todd Scott; Court Reporter: Nicki Drury; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 16206;Motion Hearing was held on 9/22/2015 re defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Failure to State a Claim. The Court invited counsel to present their respective arguments and took the motions under submission. A written order will follow. (PP)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT AND RENOTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour to 9/22/15 at 9:00 a.m. (PP)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour; CRD: Paul Pierson; Plaintiff's Counsel: Hung Ta, Roger Sachar and Bradley Moore; Defense Counsel: Douglas Greene, Robert Varian and M.Todd Scott; CR: Debbie Zurn; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 16206; Session #: 2.Status Conference was held on 8/18/2015 and the Court orders counsel to appear for oral argument on the parties' motions to dismiss on 9/22/2015 at 9:00 AM.(PP)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REPLY by Defendant Nordstrom, Inc. to #77 Request for Judicial Notice (Varian, Robert)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REPLY, filed by Defendants Phyllis J. Campbell, Michelle M. Ebanks, Enrique Hernandez, Jr, Jeanne P. Jackson, Robert G. Miller, Philip G. Satre, Brad Smith, Felecia D. Thornton, B. Kevin Turner, Robert D. Walter, Alison A. Winter, TO RESPONSE to #78 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Varian, Robert)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REPLY, filed by Defendant Nordstrom, Inc., TO RESPONSE to #76 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Make Demand (Varian, Robert)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REPLY, filed by Defendants 247N, LLC, Hangar Three LLC, JD Plane, LLC, JW Ltd., JWB Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc., M&B Beaver LLC, Blake W. Nordstrom, Erik B. Nordstrom, Peter E. Nordstrom, SDJ, LLC, TB Plane, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #75 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Greene, Douglas)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. The Status Conference is continued to 8/18/2015 at 09:00 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(LMK)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Judith Burbrink, to #75 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #78 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #76 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Make Demand. (Ta, Hung)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OBJECTIONS re #77 Request for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Judith Burbrink (Kim, JooYun)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE DATE by parties (Varian, Robert)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Phyllis J. Campbell, Michelle M. Ebanks, Enrique Hernandez, Jr, Jeanne P. Jackson, Robert G. Miller, Philip G. Satre, Brad Smith, Felecia D. Thornton, B. Kevin Turner, Robert D. Walter, Alison A. Winter. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Outside Director's Motion to Dismiss) Noting Date 7/13/2015, (Varian, Robert)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 REQUEST for Judicial Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Q to Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit R - U to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit V - BB to Request for Judicial Notice)(Varian, Robert)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Make Demand by Defendant Nordstrom, Inc.. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Nordstrom Inc's Rule 23.1 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Make a Demand) Noting Date 7/13/2015, (Varian, Robert)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants 247N, LLC, Hangar Three LLC, JD Plane, LLC, JW Ltd., JWB Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc., M&B Beaver LLC, Blake W. Nordstrom, Erik B. Nordstrom, Peter E. Nordstrom, SDJ, LLC, TB Plane, LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) Noting Date 7/13/2015, (Greene, Douglas)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David S Keenan on behalf of Defendants Phyllis J. Campbell, Michelle M. Ebanks, Enrique Hernandez, Jr, Jeanne P. Jackson, Robert G. Miller, Philip G. Satre, Brad Smith, Felecia D. Thornton, B. Kevin Turner, Robert D. Walter, Alison A. Winter. (Keenan, David)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel J Dunne, Jr on behalf of Defendants Phyllis J. Campbell, Michelle M. Ebanks, Enrique Hernandez, Jr, Jeanne P. Jackson, Robert G. Miller, Philip G. Satre, Brad Smith, Felecia D. Thornton, B. Kevin Turner, Robert D. Walter, Alison A. Winter. (Dunne, Daniel)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney M Todd Scott on behalf of Defendants Phyllis J. Campbell, Michelle M. Ebanks, Enrique Hernandez, Jr, Jeanne P. Jackson, Robert G. Miller, Philip G. Satre, Brad Smith, Felecia D. Thornton, B. Kevin Turner, Robert D. Walter, Alison A. Winter. (Scott, M)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert P Varian on behalf of Defendants Phyllis J. Campbell, Michelle M. Ebanks, Enrique Hernandez, Jr, Jeanne P. Jackson, Robert G. Miller, Philip G. Satre, Brad Smith, Felecia D. Thornton, B. Kevin Turner, Robert D. Walter, Alison A. Winter. (Varian, Robert)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Claire Loebs Davis Douglas W Greene on behalf of Defendants 247N, LLC, Hangar Three LLC, JD Plane, LLC, JW Ltd., JWB Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc., M&B Beaver LLC, Blake W. Nordstrom, Erik B. Nordstrom, Peter E. Nordstrom, SDJ, LLC, TB Plane, LLC. (Davis, Claire) Modified on 5/19/2015 (VB).
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Claire Loebs Davis on behalf of Defendants 247N, LLC, Hangar Three LLC, JD Plane, LLC, JW Ltd., JWB Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc., M&B Beaver LLC, Blake W. Nordstrom, Erik B. Nordstrom, Peter E. Nordstrom, SDJ, LLC, TB Plane, LLC. (Davis, Claire)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by 247N, LLC, Hangar Three LLC, JD Plane, LLC, JW Ltd., JWB Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc., M&B Beaver LLC, Blake W. Nordstrom, SDJ, LLC, TB Plane, LLC (Greene, Douglas)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by 247N, LLC, Hangar Three LLC, JD Plane, LLC, JW Ltd., JWB Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc., M&B Beaver LLC, Blake W. Nordstrom, SDJ, LLC, TB Plane, LLC (Greene, Douglas)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by 247N, LLC, Hangar Three LLC, JD Plane, LLC, JW Ltd., JWB Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc., M&B Beaver LLC, Blake W. Nordstrom, SDJ, LLC, TB Plane, LLC (Greene, Douglas)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by 247N, LLC, Hangar Three LLC, JD Plane, LLC, JW Ltd., JWB Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc., M&B Beaver LLC, Blake W. Nordstrom, SDJ, LLC, TB Plane, LLC (Greene, Douglas)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by 247N, LLC, Hangar Three LLC, JD Plane, LLC, JW Ltd., JWB Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc., M&B Beaver LLC, Blake W. Nordstrom, SDJ, LLC, TB Plane, LLC (Greene, Douglas)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by 247N, LLC, Hangar Three LLC, JD Plane, LLC, JW Ltd., JWB Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc., M&B Beaver LLC, Blake W. Nordstrom, SDJ, LLC, TB Plane, LLC (Greene, Douglas)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by 247N, LLC, Hangar Three LLC, JD Plane, LLC, JW Ltd., JWB Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc., M&B Beaver LLC, Blake W. Nordstrom, SDJ, LLC, TB Plane, LLC (Greene, Douglas)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by 247N, LLC, Hangar Three LLC, JD Plane, LLC, JW Ltd., JWB Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc., M&B Beaver LLC, Blake W. Nordstrom, SDJ, LLC, TB Plane, LLC (Greene, Douglas)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas W Greene on behalf of Defendants 247N, LLC, Hangar Three LLC, JD Plane, LLC, JW Ltd., JWB Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc., M&B Beaver LLC, Blake W. Nordstrom, SDJ, LLC, TB Plane, LLC. (Greene, Douglas)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Claire Loebs Davis on behalf of Defendants 247N, LLC, Hangar Three LLC, JD Plane, LLC, JW Ltd., JWB Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc., M&B Beaver LLC, Blake W. Nordstrom, SDJ, LLC, TB Plane, LLC. (Davis, Claire)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER re: briefing schedule. Motions to dismiss due by 5/21/2015, Response to motions due by 6/29/2015, Reply due by 7/13/2015, by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TM)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND PAGE LIMITS by parties (Varian, Robert)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying Defendant's #51 Motion for an extension of time, by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(TM)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order ***Document Unsealed per Order dated 4/7/15: #11 Sealed Document/complaint. (MD)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DECLARATION of M. Todd Scott filed by Defendant Nordstrom, Inc. re #51 MOTION for Relief from a Deadline (Varian, Robert)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY, filed by Defendant Nordstrom, Inc., TO RESPONSE to #51 MOTION for Relief from a Deadline (Varian, Robert)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Judith Burbrink, to #51 MOTION for Relief from a Deadline. (Ta, Hung)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING NOMINAL DEFENDANT NORDSTROMS #45 MOTION TO SEAL. Plaintiffs #2 Motion to File Materials in Complaint Provisionally Under Seal is hereby TERMINATED as moot, by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(TM)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Relief from a Deadline by Defendant Nordstrom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Individual Defendants' Time to Answer or Respond) Noting Date 4/10/2015, (Dunne, Daniel)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel J Dunne, Jr on behalf of Defendant Nordstrom, Inc.. (Dunne, Daniel)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPLY, filed by Defendant Nordstrom, Inc., TO RESPONSE to #45 MOTION to Seal (Keenan, David)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Judith Burbrink, to #45 MOTION to Seal . (Ta, Hung)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Nordstrom, Inc. (Keenan, David)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DECLARATION of M. Todd Scott filed by Defendant Nordstrom, Inc. re #2 MOTION to Seal (Keenan, David)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Seal by Defendant Nordstrom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal) Noting Date 3/27/2015, (Keenan, David)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re #42 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney M Todd Scott for Nordstrom, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re #41 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert P Varian for Nordstrom, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY M. Todd Scott FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Nordstrom, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3947145 (Keenan, David)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert P. Varian FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Nordstrom, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3947128 (Keenan, David)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David S Keenan on behalf of Defendant Nordstrom, Inc.. (Keenan, David)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant TB Plane, LLC mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant SDJ, LLC mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Robert G. Miller mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Robert D. Walter mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Phyllis J. Campbell mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Philip G. Satre mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Peter E. Nordstrom mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Nordstrom, Inc. mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Michelle M. Ebanks mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant M&B Beaver LLC mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant JW Ltd. mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Jeanne P. Jackson mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant JD Plane, LLC mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant JWB Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc. mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Hangar Three LLC mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Felecia D. Thornton mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Erik B. Nordstrom mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Enrique Hernandez, Jr mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Brad Smith mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Blake W. Nordstrom mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant B. Kevin Turner mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Alison A. Winter mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant 247N, LLC mailed on 3/13/2015 (Kim, JooYun)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Roger A Sachar for Judith Burbrink, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION OF CAMERAS IN THE COURTROOM. The Western District of Washington is participating in the Judiciary's Pilot Project on #Cameras in the Courtroom. The project is a 3-year study to evaluate the effects of cameras in the courtrooms. This case is eligible to have proceedings video recorded and made available to the public via the U.S. Court's and Western District of Washington's web sites. Please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk for United States District Judge John C. Coughenour to indicate whether or not you agree to participate in the pilot project. If you should desire to participate, the court will require formal consent for the recording of each scheduled proceeding. Please contact the Courtroom Deputy at: paul_pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov. Do not e-file your response. (PP)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Peter George Safirstein for Judith Burbrink, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at (206) 370-8805 at least TEN (10) days prior to the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 7/21/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCUMENT UNSEALED PER ORDER DATED 4/7/15 SEALED DOCUMENT Complaint by Plaintiff Judith Burbrink re #1 Complaint, (TM) Modified on 4/23/2015 - NOTIFIED CNSL(MD).
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Roger A. Sachar, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Judith Burbrink (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3943983 (Moore, Bradley)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Peter Safirstein FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Judith Burbrink (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3943967 (Moore, Bradley)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Natalia Williams for Judith Burbrink, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney JooYun Kim for Judith Burbrink, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Hung G Ta for Judith Burbrink, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Natalia Williams FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Judith Burbrink (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3943514 (Moore, Bradley)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY JooYun Kim FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Judith Burbrink (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3943508 (Moore, Bradley)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Hug G. Ta FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Judith Burbrink (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3943500 (Moore, Bradley)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (PM)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff Judith Burbrink. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/20/2015, (Moore, Bradley)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SEALED per chambers request - COMPLAINT against defendant(s) 247N, LLC, Phyllis J. Campbell, Michelle M. Ebanks, Hangar Three LLC, Enrique Hernandez, Jr, JD Plane, LLC, JW Ltd., JWB Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc., Jeanne P. Jackson, M&B Beaver LLC, Robert G. Miller, Blake W. Nordstrom, Erik B. Nordstrom, Peter E. Nordstrom, Nordstrom, Inc., SDJ, LLC, Philip G. Satre, Brad Smith, TB Plane, LLC, Felecia D. Thornton, B. Kevin Turner, Robert D. Walter, Alison A. Winter (Receipt # 0981-3940707) Attorney Bradley Jerome Moore added to party Judith Burbrink(pty:pla), filed by Judith Burbrink. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Bradley) Text Modified on 3/16/2015 (TM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burbrink v. Campbell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis J. Campbell
Represented By: Daniel J Dunne, Jr.
Represented By: David S Keenan
Represented By: M Todd Scott
Represented By: Robert P Varian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle M. Ebanks
Represented By: Daniel J Dunne, Jr.
Represented By: David S Keenan
Represented By: M Todd Scott
Represented By: Robert P Varian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Hernandez, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel J Dunne, Jr.
Represented By: David S Keenan
Represented By: M Todd Scott
Represented By: Robert P Varian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne P. Jackson
Represented By: Daniel J Dunne, Jr.
Represented By: David S Keenan
Represented By: M Todd Scott
Represented By: Robert P Varian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert G. Miller
Represented By: Daniel J Dunne, Jr.
Represented By: David S Keenan
Represented By: M Todd Scott
Represented By: Robert P Varian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake W. Nordstrom
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: Claire Loebs Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik B. Nordstrom
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: Claire Loebs Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter E. Nordstrom
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: Claire Loebs Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip G. Satre
Represented By: Daniel J Dunne, Jr.
Represented By: David S Keenan
Represented By: M Todd Scott
Represented By: Robert P Varian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Smith
Represented By: Daniel J Dunne, Jr.
Represented By: David S Keenan
Represented By: M Todd Scott
Represented By: Robert P Varian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felecia D. Thornton
Represented By: Daniel J Dunne, Jr.
Represented By: David S Keenan
Represented By: M Todd Scott
Represented By: Robert P Varian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Kevin Turner
Represented By: Daniel J Dunne, Jr.
Represented By: David S Keenan
Represented By: M Todd Scott
Represented By: Robert P Varian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Walter
Represented By: Daniel J Dunne, Jr.
Represented By: David S Keenan
Represented By: M Todd Scott
Represented By: Robert P Varian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison A. Winter
Represented By: Daniel J Dunne, Jr.
Represented By: David S Keenan
Represented By: M Todd Scott
Represented By: Robert P Varian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hangar Three LLC
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: Claire Loebs Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JWB Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: Claire Loebs Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD Plane, LLC
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: Claire Loebs Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JW Ltd.
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: Claire Loebs Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&B Beaver LLC
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: Claire Loebs Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TB Plane, LLC
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: Claire Loebs Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 247N, LLC
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: Claire Loebs Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDJ, LLC
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: Claire Loebs Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom, Inc
Represented By: M Todd Scott
Represented By: Robert P Varian
Represented By: Daniel J Dunne, Jr.
Represented By: David S Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burbrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Burbrink
Represented By: Hung G Ta
Represented By: JooYun Kim
Represented By: Natalia Williams
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Represented By: Roger A Sachar
Represented By: Bradley Jerome Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?