Swinomish Indian Tribal Community v BSNF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Swinomish Indian Tribal Community
Defendant: BSNF Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv00543
Filed: April 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Skagit
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting Parties' 122 Stipulated Motion for Leave to File and Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(LH)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting defendant's 96 Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal; staying case. Parties shall, within 7 days of the resolution of the interlocutory proceedings, file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule re parties' 98 Stipulated Motion; RENOTING Defendant's 96 MOTION to Certify and to Stay Proceedings : Noting Date 4/27/2018; Response due no later than 4/19/2018, Reply due no later than 4/27/2018. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER clarifying previous order and denying defendant's 88 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING directing the Clerk to renote Defendant's 88 Motion for Reconsideration for 8/18/2017; Response due by 5:00 p.m. on 8/14/2017; Reply, if any, due on or before the note date. Joint status report due within 7 days of the Court's ruling on BNSF's motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 77 Motion for Reconsideration; granting Plaintiff's 58 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment; parties shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, confer and file a Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING and RENOTING Plaintiff's 77 MOTION for Reconsideration re 75 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ; Noting Date 2/10/2017. Defendant's response, if any, shall be filed by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, F ebruary 7, 2017. Plaintiff's reply, if any, shall be filed on or before the note date. The parties shall file a second joint status report within 7 days' of the Court's ruling on the Tribe's motion for reconsideration, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion for Summary Judgment & 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RM)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER REGARDING BNSF'S 42 MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swinomish Indian Tribal Community v BSNF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swinomish Indian Tribal Community
Represented By: Christopher Ian Brain
Represented By: Stephen T LeCuyer
Represented By: Paul W Moomaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSNF Railway Company
Represented By: Jeffrey B DeGroot
Represented By: Andrew Ramiro Escobar
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?