Bykov v. Rosen et al
Plaintiff: Vladik Bykov
Defendant: Steven Rosen, Micheline Murphy, Brian Rogers and Marcus Naylor
Case Number: 2:2015cv00713
Filed: May 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 93 Motion for Reconsideration signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting Defendants' 80 Motion for Summary Judgment or dismissal. Plaintiff's remaining claims against Defendants Murphy and Naylor are DISMISSED without prejudice and without leave to amend. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 84 Motion file an over-length brief (Dkt. No. 84 ) in response to Defendants' motion for summary judgment and dismissal. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting in part Defendants' 63 Motion to Strike and denying Plaintiff's request to strike (Dkt. No. 71 at 2. 74 at 1-3). Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(TH)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER denying 77 Motion for Reconsideration Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER Amending the Court's prior order (Dkt. No. 75 ) on Defendants Judge Steven G. Rosen, Brian Rogers, and their marital communities' motion to strike (Dkt. No. 62 ). On page 2 line 11, the sentence "[t]he Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to strike (Dkt. No. 63)" is amended to state: "The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to strike (Dkt. No. 62)." Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting Defendants' 63 Motion to Strike Pursuant to FRCP 12(f). Asserted claims against Defendants Judge Steven G. Rosen and his marital community and Brian Rogers and his marital community are hereby STRICKEN with prejudice and without leave to amend. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER denying plaintiff's 57 Motion for Reconsideration; plaintiff has until 9/8/17 to amend his remaining claims, should he wish to do so by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re: 55 Mandate of USCA, the Court grants Bykov leave to amend his legal malpractice claim against Murphy and his negligent supervision and hiring claim against Naylor. The Court DENIES Bykov leave to amend his claims against Judge Rosen and Rogers, as well as his vicarious liability claims against the City. Plaintiff's amended complaint due within 45 days of this order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bykov v. Rosen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladik Bykov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheline Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?