Waste Action Project v. Astro Auto Wrecking, LLC
Plaintiff: Waste Action Project
Defendant: Astro Auto Wrecking, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv00796
Filed: May 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER re Plaintiff's 102 MOTION for Order to Show Cause or Be Held in Contempt. The Court ORDERS as follows: if Defendant fails to show full compliance with the stipulated injunctive relief, as ordered by the Court's April 4, 2017 order (Dkt. No. 91 at 10), by September 30, 2018, Defendant must pay to the Court $5,000 per month of noncompliance beyond September 30, 2018. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER on Plaintiff's 92 Statement re litigation costs. The Court FINDS that Plaintiff Waste Action Project is entitled to an award of attorney fees and costs in the amount of $199,541.80. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (RS)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 PRETRIAL ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER permitting Defendant to call only one expert witness. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 31 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waste Action Project v. Astro Auto Wrecking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waste Action Project
Represented By: Richard Adam Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth Hunter Zultoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astro Auto Wrecking, LLC
Represented By: Justin D Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?