Melendrez v. Ofc. Michael Compston et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Paul Melendrez
Defendant: Ofc. Michael Compston, Ofc. A. Young, Ofc. M. Eltayeb, Ofc. K. Hansen, Ofc. K. Jones and John Caster
Case Number: 2:2015cv00917
Filed: June 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying plaintiff's 94 Motion for transcripts at govt expense signed by Judge Richard A Jones.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Vincent Melendrez, Prisoner ID: 373005)(RS)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Richard A Jones adopting the Report and Recommendation 88 . Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. 80 ) is granted. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Vincent Melendrez, Prisoner ID: 373005) (PM)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida denying Plaintiff's 58 Motion for Sanctions. **6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Vincent Melendrez, Prisoner ID: 373005)(PM)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; This issue is returned to Judge Tsuchida with instructions to order service of the summons and complaint on John Caster by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Vincent Melendrez, Prisoner ID: 373005)(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melendrez v. Ofc. Michael Compston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Paul Melendrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. Michael Compston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. M. Eltayeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. K. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. K. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Caster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?