Linehan v. AllianceOne Receivables Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Timothy Linehan
Defendant: AllianceOne Receivables Management Inc
Case Number: 2:2015cv01012
Filed: June 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER, Judgment and Decree Granting Final Approval to Class Action Settlement, Approving Attorney Fee Award, Approving Class Representative Plaintiff Award and Dismissing Claims with Prejudice as to Defendants Physicians & Dentists Credit Bureau, Inc. and Jason Woehler re Consolidated Plaintiffs' 399 Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman for Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 398 MINUTE ORDER dismissing with prejudice Linehan's claims against AllianceOne per 397 Stipulation. The class action claims are dismissed without prejudice. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER granting 376 Motion to preliminarily approve class action settlement, etc; Final Approval Hearing set for 10/24/2017 at 09:00 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 391 MINUTE ORDER granting 390 stipulated motion for dismissal re Plaintiffs Natalie F. Simmons, Stephen H Simmons, Katherine A. Rohr-Smith, and Zaldy Fernandez, and Defendants Asset Recovery Group, Inc. and Robert Friedman. The claims by these Plaintiffs against these Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER denying Plaintiff Linehan's 369 Motion for class certification. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MINUTE ORDER granting 374 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss; Defendants Jason Woehler, Erik Bakke and Merchant's Credit Corporation are dismissed with prejudice by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 373 MINUTE ORDER directing clerk to terminate parties' cross motions for summary judgment 322 343 and Merchants defendants' 348 Motion to Compel by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER granting Defendant King County's 337 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing King County with prejudice from each of these consolidated cases; terminating King County as a party in this case, by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MINUTE ORDER per the 362 stipulation for dismissal filed Plaintiffs Portia Jones, Scott Jones, Angela Root, and Alexandra Hewardt and Defendants Kimberlee Walker Olsen and Audit & Adjustment Co., Inc., all claims asserted by these Plaintiffs agai nst these Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to either party. This order shall have no effect on the claims of the other parties in this consolidated action. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MINUTE ORDER granting 361 Mosby parties' Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; discovery deadline extended to 5/15/17 by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 358 MINUTE ORDER granting 356 stipulated motion to extend discovery deadline to 5/15/2017, as to the Simmons parties only. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MINUTE ORDER granting Consol Plaintiffs Renee Conroy, Marilynn Cormier, Kelsey Erickson, Rebecca Foutz, Theresa Mosby and Katherine A. Rohr-Smith's 346 Motion/Request to Re-Set Motions for Summary Judgment; Motions for Summary Judgment 335 and 322 are RE-NOTED for 4/21/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MINUTE ORDER per 340 Notice of Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Jones, Root, and Hewardt and Defendants Olsen and Audit & Adjustment Co, the Clerk is directed to terminate the following motions: 307 314 317 331 . The 322 Motion for Summary Judg ment filed by Defendants Merchants, Bakke, and Woehler is RENOTED for 3/31/2017. Docket Numbers 335 and 337 shall remain noted for April 7, 2017. The Clerk is directed to terminate the 327 Motion for relief from deadline. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING Plaintiff Alexandra Anderson's 307 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability of Defendants Audit & Adjustment Company, Inc. and Kimberlee Walker Olsen; Motion re-noted for 3/31/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (swt)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER granting plaintiff's 284 Motion to dismiss her WA Consumer Protection Act claim against dfts Audit & Adjustment Co and Kimberlee Walker Olsen by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting Defendant Kimberlee Walker Olsen's 282 Motion to compel discovery from Plaintiffs Jones, Root, and Anderson. Olsen's request for fees is denied. (PM)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff Linehan's 277 motion to stay or extend schedule on his motion for class certification 277 . Linehan's deadline for filing a class certification motion shall be stayed pending the Ninth Circuit's re solution of Plaintiffs' request to appeal the denial of class certification and, if granted, the Ninth Circuit's resolution of that appeal. Linehan shall file notice with the Court within 14 days of such resolution, along with a new proposed motion deadline. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 289 MINUTE ORDER directing Clerk to terminate Plaintiffs' 267 motion for partial summary judgment per 287 Notice of Settlement between Plaintiffs Auxier, Duncan, and Cordova and Defendants Physicians and Dentists Credit Bureau, Inc. and Jason Woehler. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting Defendant Robert S. Friedman's 236 Motion for entry of judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). (PM)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting defendant Robert S. Friedman's 109 Motion to dismiss by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour; The Court rules on the motions as follows: The Merchant Defendants' motion (Dkt. No. 40 ) is DENIED as to vagueness and GRANTED as to joining King County as a necessary party; P&D's motion (D kt. No. 61 ) is DENIED as to its interpretation of § 1692i, vagueness, separation of powers/federalism, and the WCPA, and GRANTED as to Auxier's civil conspiracy claim; Asset's motion (Dkt. No. 133 is DENIED in full; and Friedman's motion (Dkt. No. 134 ) is DENIED as to vagueness, standing, and the WCPA, and GRANTED as to joining King County as a necessary party. (PM)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER ADDRESSING DISPUTED ISSUES by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler re 104 Minute Order. Defendants shall submit a proposed ESI agreement to the Court for consideration or on before 9/1/2016. Plaintiffs shall by 9/12/2016 submit their responsive proposal, identifying in redlined form any specific changes to the agreement they deem necessary. (PM)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS BY DEFENDANTS AUDIT & ADJUSTMENT COMPANY, INC. AND KIMBERLEE WALKER OLSEN by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Defendants' motions to dismiss (Dkt. Nos. 42 , 43 ) are DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. (AD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linehan v. AllianceOne Receivables Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Linehan
Represented By: Daniel A Edelman(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: James A. Sturdevant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AllianceOne Receivables Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?