Dougherty v. Barrett Business Services Inc
Plaintiff: Amanda Dougherty
Defendant: Barrett Business Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2015cv01501
Filed: September 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 79 Stipulated Motion for Remand; this matter is remanded to King County Superior Court, effective immediately. Defendant's 78 Motion to stay class-related discovery pending resolution of jurisdictional issues is stricken as moot. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 52 Motion to Compel ; granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 54 Cross-Motion for Protective Order ; denying Plaintiff's 60 & 62 Motion for Order to Determ ine Privilege ; granting in part and denying in part parties' 72 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time : Discovery completed by 7/14/2017, Joint Status Report due by 8/18/2017, Motions due by 8/14/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 61 Motion to Seal (Plaintiff's unredacted motion to determine privilege, docket no. 62 , shall remain under seal) ; granting Defendant's 68 Motion to Seal (Defendants unredacted response, docket no. 69 shall remain under seal) ; granting Plaintiff's 74 Second Motion to Seal (Plaintiff's unredacted reply, docket no. 75 , shall remain under seal). Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 59 Stipulation; RENOTING 54 MOTION for Protective Order and 52 MOTION to Compel Further Document Production : Noting Date 4/28/2017, Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON CROSS-MOTIONS REGARDING DISCOVERY by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Defendant shall provide Plaintiff a copy of any declarations to be used in defendant's motion for protective order on or before March 17, 2017; Both plaintiff's motion to compel and defendant's motion for protective order shall be filed and served on or before March 30, 2017, and noted for April 21, 2017; Both responses to the cross-motions shall be filed and served on or before April 21, 2017. No reply shall be filed unless requested by the Court. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dougherty v. Barrett Business Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Dougherty
Represented By: John G Albanese(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Business Services Inc
Represented By: Megan L Starich
Represented By: Joseph Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?