National Products, Inc. v. Arkon Resources, Inc.
Plaintiff: National Products Inc
Defendant: Arkon Resources Inc
Case Number: 2:2015cv01553
Filed: September 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER DIRECTING ARKON TO DESTROY THE INFRINGING PRODUCTS IN USUAL AND CUSTOMARY MANNER OF DISPOSING OF TRASH by Hon. James P. Donohue. (KMP)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER DENYING NPI'S 219 MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION signed by Hon. James P. Donohue.(TF)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER ON THE PARTIES' 182 186 188 190 196 POST-TRIAL MOTIONS signed by Hon. James P. Donohue.(TF)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER ON DEPOSITION OBJECTIONS by Hon. James P. Donohue. (TF)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART THE PARTIES' 92 98 MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Hon. James P. Donohue; Additional proposed jury instructions relating to understanding the patent claims in the '885 patent family are due no later than noon on Tuesday, November 28, 2017.(TF)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting Defendant Arkon Resources, Inc.'s 120 Motion to Seal, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff National Products Inc's 104 Motion to Seal Documents Related to NPI's Opposition to Arkon's Motions in Limine, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Plaintiff's Opposition Memorandum (Dkt. 110 ) and Exhibit E to the Declaration of Jeffrey A. Ware (Dkt. 112 -4) shall remain under seal. (SWT)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 94 Motion to Seal Documents Related to National Products Inc.'s Motions In Limine, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Clerk of Court shall unseal Dkt.# 100-9. The remainder of Dkt. # 100 shall remain under seal. (SWT)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting Defendant Arkon Resources, Inc.'s 105 Motion to Seal Documents related to Arkon's Opposition to NPI's Motions in Limine, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 75 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (swt)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Denying 76 Motion for Reconsideration, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting in part and denying in part dft's 47 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part dft's revised 64 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Products, Inc. v. Arkon Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Products Inc
Represented By: David K Tellekson
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkon Resources Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?